Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 122 Today
» 844 Yesterday
» 5207 Week
» 22156 Month
» 136417 Year
» 1020798 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

87 Bo-Bo


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
09/03/1974 Reallocation 87003     O/L Glasgow Shields Road  
09/03/1974 Reallocation 87005     O/L Glasgow Shields Road  
09/03/1974 Reallocation 87008     O/L Glasgow Shields Road  
06/04/1974 Reallocation 87006     O/L Glasgow Shields Road  
06/04/1974 Reallocation 87012     O/L Glasgow Shields Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 87003 O/L   WN Willesden  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 87005 O/L   WN Willesden  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 87006 O/L   WN Willesden  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 87008 O/L   WN Willesden  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 87012 O/L   WN Willesden  
21/08/1976 Reallocation 87101 99R   WN Willesden  
01/12/2003 Condemned 87020       COND  
01/08/2004 Condemned 87029       COND  
14/09/2004 Condemned 87016       COND  
01/01/2005 Condemned 87035       COND  
01/03/2005 Condemned 87033       COND  
30/04/2005 Condemned 87005 WN Willesden   COND  
30/04/2005 Condemned 87015       COND  
31/05/2005 Condemned 87024       COND  
01/06/2005 Condemned 87001       COND  
01/06/2005 Condemned 87004       COND  
01/08/2005 Condemned 87013       COND  
01/08/2005 Condemned 87014       COND  
01/07/2006 Condemned 87007       COND  
01/07/2006 Condemned 87008 WN Willesden   COND  
01/10/2006 Condemned 87026       COND  
30/11/2006 Condemned 87012 WN Willesden   COND  
30/11/2006 Condemned 87019       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 87010       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 87022       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 87028       COND