Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 221 Today
» 968 Yesterday
» 5981 Week
» 15915 Month
» 48304 Year
» 932685 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

87 Bo-Bo


Class Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
  87001 01/06/1973 W Withdrawn 01/06/2005 01/06/2005
  87002 29/06/1973
  87003 11/07/1973 WN Willesden 09/03/1974
11/05/1974
  87004 13/07/1973 W Withdrawn 01/06/2005 01/06/2005
  87005 14/08/1973 WN
W
Willesden
Withdrawn
09/03/1974
11/05/1974
30/04/2005
30/04/2005
  87006 05/11/1973 WN Willesden 06/04/1974
11/05/1974
  87007 26/10/1973 W Withdrawn 01/07/2006 01/07/2006
  87008 02/11/1973 WN
W
Willesden
Withdrawn
09/03/1974
11/05/1974
01/07/2006
01/07/2006
  87009 26/11/1973
  87010 15/12/1973 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  87011 25/01/1974
  87012 25/01/1974 WN
W
Willesden
Withdrawn
06/04/1974
11/05/1974
30/11/2006
30/11/2006
  87013 23/02/1974 W Withdrawn 01/08/2005 01/08/2005
  87014 26/01/1974 W Withdrawn 01/08/2005 01/08/2005
  87015 19/02/1974 W Withdrawn 30/04/2005 30/04/2005
  87016 12/03/1974 W Withdrawn 14/09/2004 14/09/2004
  87017 06/03/1974
  87018 07/05/1974
  87019 11/03/1974 W Withdrawn 30/11/2006 30/11/2006
  87020 16/03/1974 W Withdrawn 01/12/2003 01/12/2003
  87021 04/04/1974
  87022 11/04/1974 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  87023 11/04/1974
  87024 25/04/1974 W Withdrawn 31/05/2005 31/05/2005
  87025 26/04/1974
  87026 04/05/1974 W Withdrawn 01/10/2006 01/10/2006
  87027 04/05/1974
  87028 13/05/1974 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  87029 04/06/1974 W Withdrawn 01/08/2004 01/08/2004
  87030 08/06/1974
  87031 04/07/1974
  87032 25/07/1974
  87033 15/08/1974 W Withdrawn 01/03/2005 01/03/2005
  87034 11/09/1974
  87035 09/10/1974 W Withdrawn 01/01/2005 01/01/2005
  87101 05/03/1975 WN Willesden 05/03/1975
21/08/1976