Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 370 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3961 Week
» 14096 Month
» 330327 Year
» 841429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

86 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) BR (86/0) BR (86/2) BR (86/1) BR (86/3) BR (86/4) BR (86/5a) BR (86/6) BR (86/2 Revert) BR (86/5b) BR (86/7) BR (86/9) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
E3101 86252 21/08/1965 05/2002 36.75 Cut Easco (at Immingham Railfreight Terminal) 01/08/2002 36.97
E3102 86009 86409 86609 21/08/1965 53.12
E3103 86004 86404 86604 21/08/1965 53.12
E3104 86010 86410 86610 27/09/1965 53.02
E3105 86030 86430 19/06/1965 06/2004 39 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/12/2005 40.48
E3106 86214 19/06/1965 10/2002 37.33 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 11/03/2006 40.75
E3107 86248 27/09/1965 10/2002 37.08 43.38
E3108 86038 86438 86638 19/06/1965 53.30
E3109 86016 86316 86416 86616 19/06/1965 02/2002 36.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/06/2005 39.98
E3110 86027 86327 86427 86627 19/06/1965 53.30
E3111 86024 86324 86424 19/06/1965 53.30
E3112 86006 86406 86606 24/08/1965 11/2003 38.25 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/06/2007 41.80
E3113 86232 24/08/1965 07/2005 39.92 53.12
E3114 86020 86320 86420 86620 27/09/1965 09/2005 40 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/06/2007 41.70
E3115 86003 86403 86603 27/09/1965 09/1999 34 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/11/2005 40.12
E3116 86238 27/09/1965 10/2004 39.08 Cut Boreham Scrap Co. (Boreham) 31/05/2005 39.70
E3117 86227 27/09/1965 10/2004 39.08 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 31/07/2005 39.87
E3118 86041 86261 25/09/1965 11/2002 37.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/12/2004 39.21
E3119 86229 25/09/1965 30/09/2008 43 53.03
E3120 86019 86319 86419 25/09/1965 03/1999 33.5 Cut Sandbach Car and Commercial Dismantlers (at Crewe EMD) 01/03/2003 37.45
E3121 86241 86508 86241 25/09/1965 01/2000 34.33 Cut Sandbach Car and Commercial Dismantlers (at Crewe EMD) 21/02/2003 37.43
E3122 86012 86312 86412 86612 27/09/1965 53.02
E3123 86015 86315 86415 86615 28/10/1965 04/2005 39.5 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/07/2007 41.70
E3124 86035 86435 86635 26/10/1965 52.94
E3125 86209 25/11/1965 10/2004 38.92 Cut Boreham Scrap Co. (Boreham) 01/05/2005 39.46
E3126 86231 03/11/1965 30/09/2008 42.83 52.92
E3127 86240 26/10/1965 10/2002 37 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 28/04/2008 42.53
E3128 86013 86313 86413 86613 23/11/1965 52.87
E3129 86205 86503 86701 24/11/1965 30/09/2008 42.83 52.86
E3130 86037 86437 86637 07/12/1965 52.83
E3131 86222 86502 86222 28/12/1965 10/2002 36.83 Cut Easco (at Immingham Railfreight Terminal) 11/12/2003 37.98
E3132 86221 15/12/1965 05/2003 37.42 Cut Easco (at Immingham Railfreight Terminal) 13/11/2003 37.94
E3133 86236 13/12/1965 10/2002 36.83 Cut Easco (at Immingham Railfreight Terminal) 01/12/2003 37.99
E3134 86224 15/12/1965 07/2002 36.58 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/05/2006 40.40
E3135 86040 86256 21/01/1966 10/2002 36.75 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/03/2006 40.13
E3136 86044 86253 86901 22/12/1965 52.79
E3137 86045 86259 15/01/1966 10/2003 37.75 Prs Preserved 52.72
E3138 86242 21/01/1966 30/09/2008 42.67 52.70
E3139 86043 86257 26/01/1966 11/2002 36.83 Cut Easco (at Immingham Railfreight Terminal) 01/11/2003 37.79
E3140 86046 86258 86501 01/03/1966 07/2002 36.33 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/12/2009 43.78
E3141 86208 16/02/1966 03/2000 34.08 Cut Sandbach Car and Commercial Dismantlers (at Crewe EMD) 31/07/2003 37.48
E3142 86047 86254 18/02/1966 10/2002 36.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/08/2004 38.48
E3143 86203 86103 15/03/1966 09/1995 29.5 Cut Easco (at Immingham Railfreight Terminal) 01/11/2002 36.66
E3144 86048 86260 86702 18/03/1966 52.55
E3145 86014 86314 86414 86614 22/03/1966 52.54
E3146 86017 86317 86417 02/04/1966 09/2001 35.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/11/2004 38.61
E3147 86211 02/04/1966 11/1986 20.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 30/09/1987 21.51
E3148 86032 86432 86632 07/04/1966 52.50
E3149 86246 86505 86246 02/04/1966 30/09/2008 42.42 52.51
E3150 86202 86102 10/04/1966 04/2002 36 Cut J T Lanscapes (at MoD Caerwent) 01/04/2005 39.00
E3151 86212 18/04/1966 30/09/2008 42.42 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 52.47
E3152 86023 86323 86423 86623 07/05/1966 10/2003 37.42 Cut Sandbach Car and Commercial Dismantlers (at Crewe LNWR) 52.41
E3153 86039 86439 86639 07/05/1966 52.41
E3154 86042 86255 21/05/1966 08/1998 32.25 Cut Easco (at Immingham Railfreight Terminal) 01/09/2002 36.31
E3155 86234 27/05/1966 30/09/2008 42.33 52.36
E3156 86220 18/06/1966 05/2002 35.92 Cut Easco (at Immingham Railfreight Terminal) 28/11/2003 37.47
E3157 86021 86321 86421 86621 24/06/1966 52.28
E3158 86223 01/07/1966 30/09/2008 42.17 52.26
E3159 86028 86328 86428 86628 14/07/1966 52.23
E3160 86036 86436 86636 14/10/1966 51.98
E3161 86249 27/09/1965 10/2003 38.08 Cut J T Lanscapes (at MoD Caerwent) 31/10/2005 40.12
E3162 86226 21/08/1965 30/09/2008 43.08 53.12
E3163 86018 86318 86418 86618 21/08/1965 08/2001 36 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/2005 39.55
E3164 86225 21/08/1965 07/2002 36.92 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 03/04/2006 40.64
E3165 86215 21/08/1965 30/09/2008 43.08 53.12
E3166 86216 27/09/1965 04/1998 32.58 Cut Easco (at Immingham Railfreight Terminal) 13/03/2002 36.48
E3167 86228 21/08/1965 30/09/2008 43.08 53.12
E3168 86230 19/06/1965 30/09/2008 43.25 53.30
E3169 86239 86507 86239 19/06/1965 04/1996 30.83 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe EMD) 30/04/1997 31.88
E3170 86002 86402 86602 19/06/1965 03/2005 39.75 Cut Sandbach Car and Commercial Dismantlers (at Crewe LNWR) 53.30
E3171 86011 86311 86411 86611 27/09/1965 11/2003 38.17 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Crewe Works) 01/02/2005 39.38
E3172 86233 86506 86233 19/06/1965 53.30
E3173 86204 21/08/1965 08/1998 33 Cut Easco (at Immingham Railfreight Terminal) 30/06/2003 37.88
E3174 86022 86322 86422 86622 21/08/1965 53.12
E3175 86218 27/09/1965 30/09/2008 43 53.02
E3176 86007 86407 86607 21/08/1965 53.12
E3177 86217 86504 21/08/1965 30/09/2008 43.08 53.12
E3178 86244 21/08/1965 10/2002 37.17 Cut Easco (at Immingham Railfreight Terminal) 09/11/2003 38.24
E3179 86207 27/09/1965 07/2002 36.83 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 08/04/2006 40.56
E3180 86008 86408 86608 86501 27/09/1965 53.02
E3181 86243 12/10/1965 11/2002 37.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/10/2004 39.08
E3182 86245 25/09/1965 10/2003 38.08 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 53.03
E3183 86251 28/10/1965 30/09/2008 42.92 52.94
E3184 86206 01/10/1965 10/2002 37 Cut Sims Metals (Cardiff) 01/02/2004 38.36
E3185 86005 86405 86605 01/10/1965 53.01
E3186 86025 86325 86425 18/10/1965 02/2002 36.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/01/2005 39.23
E3187 86034 86434 86634 17/10/1965 05/2002 36.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/2005 39.40
E3188 86031 86431 86631 29/10/1965 11/2003 38.08 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Crewe Works) 01/03/2005 39.36
E3189 86250 04/11/1965 04/2004 38.42 43.52
E3190 86210 86902 30/10/1965 11/2013 48.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/11/2016 51.05
E3191 86201 86101 11/11/1965 12/2001 36.08 Prs Preserved 52.90
E3192 86247 02/12/1965 30/09/2008 42.75 52.84
E3193 86213 02/12/1965 09/1998 32.75 Prs Preserved 52.84
E3194 86235 03/12/1965 30/09/2008 42.75 52.84
E3195 86026 86326 86426 17/12/1965 06/2004 38.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/11/2005 39.90
E3196 86219 08/12/1965 05/1996 30.42 Cut Easco (at Immingham Railfreight Terminal) 31/05/2002 36.50
E3197 86237 30/12/1965 04/2004 38.33 Cut Sims Metals (Cardiff) 01/10/2004 38.78
E3198 86033 86433 86633 18/01/1966 52.71
E3199 86001 86401 21/01/1966 Prs Preserved 52.70
E3200 86029 86329 86429 10/02/1966 11/1986 20.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/09/1987 21.57