Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 374 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3965 Week
» 14100 Month
» 330331 Year
» 841433 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

86 Bo-Bo


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
27/11/1971 Reallocation 3173 99R   ACL London Midland - Western Lines  
04/12/1971 Reallocation 3119 99R   ACL London Midland - Western Lines  
01/07/1972 Reallocation 3161     GS Glasgow Shields Road  
26/01/1974 Reallocation 86010     GS Glasgow Shields Road  
26/01/1974 Reallocation 86006     GS Glasgow Shields Road  
26/01/1974 Reallocation 3161 GS Glasgow Shields Road WN Willesden  
26/01/1974 Reallocation 86002     GS Glasgow Shields Road  
26/01/1974 Reallocation 86011     GS Glasgow Shields Road  
26/01/1974 Reallocation 86007     GS Glasgow Shields Road  
06/04/1974 Reallocation 86002 GS Glasgow Shields Road WN Willesden  
06/04/1974 Reallocation 86011 GS Glasgow Shields Road WN Willesden  
06/04/1974 Reallocation 86007 GS Glasgow Shields Road WN Willesden  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 86010 GS Glasgow Shields Road WN Willesden  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 86006 GS Glasgow Shields Road WN Willesden  
11/1986 Condemned 86211       COND  
11/1986 Condemned 86329       COND  
09/1995 Condemned 86103       COND  
04/1996 Condemned 86239       COND  
05/1996 Condemned 86219       COND  
04/1998 Condemned 86216       COND  
08/1998 Condemned 86255       COND  
08/1998 Condemned 86204 ACL London Midland - Western Lines   COND  
09/1998 Condemned 86213       COND  
03/1999 Condemned 86419       COND  
09/1999 Condemned 86403       COND  
09/1999 Condemned 86603       COND  
01/2000 Condemned 86241       COND  
03/2000 Condemned 86208       COND  
08/2001 Condemned 86418       COND  
08/2001 Condemned 86618       COND  
09/2001 Condemned 86417       COND  
12/2001 Condemned 86101       COND  
02/2002 Condemned 86416       COND  
02/2002 Condemned 86425       COND  
04/2002 Condemned 86102       COND  
05/2002 Condemned 86252       COND  
05/2002 Condemned 86220       COND  
05/2002 Condemned 86434       COND  
05/2002 Condemned 86634       COND  
07/2002 Condemned 86224       COND  
07/2002 Condemned 86258       COND  
07/2002 Condemned 86225       COND  
07/2002 Condemned 86207       COND  
10/2002 Condemned 86214       COND  
10/2002 Condemned 86248       COND  
10/2002 Condemned 86240       COND  
10/2002 Condemned 86222       COND  
10/2002 Condemned 86236       COND  
10/2002 Condemned 86256       COND  
10/2002 Condemned 86254       COND  
10/2002 Condemned 86244       COND  
10/2002 Condemned 86206       COND  
11/2002 Condemned 86261       COND  
11/2002 Condemned 86257       COND  
11/2002 Condemned 86243       COND  
05/2003 Condemned 86221       COND  
10/2003 Condemned 86259       COND  
10/2003 Condemned 86423       COND  
10/2003 Condemned 86623       COND  
10/2003 Condemned 86249 WN Willesden   COND  
10/2003 Condemned 86245       COND  
11/2003 Condemned 86406 WN Willesden   COND  
11/2003 Condemned 86606 WN Willesden   COND  
11/2003 Condemned 86411 WN Willesden   COND  
11/2003 Condemned 86611 WN Willesden   COND  
11/2003 Condemned 86431       COND  
11/2003 Condemned 86631       COND  
04/2004 Condemned 86250       COND  
04/2004 Condemned 86237       COND  
06/2004 Condemned 86430       COND  
06/2004 Condemned 86426       COND  
10/2004 Condemned 86238       COND  
10/2004 Condemned 86227       COND  
10/2004 Condemned 86209       COND  
03/2005 Condemned 86402 WN Willesden   COND  
03/2005 Condemned 86602 WN Willesden   COND  
04/2005 Condemned 86415       COND  
04/2005 Condemned 86615       COND  
07/2005 Condemned 86232       COND  
09/2005 Condemned 86620       COND  
09/2005 Condemned 86420       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86229 ACL London Midland - Western Lines   COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86231       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86701 99R     COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86242       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86246       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86212       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86234       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86223       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86226       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86215       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86228       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86230       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86218       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86217       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86251       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86247       COND  
30/09/2008 Condemned 86235       COND  
11/2013 Condemned 86902       COND