Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

86 Bo-Bo


Class BR (Pre Tops) BR (86/0) BR (86/1) BR (86/2) BR (86/2 Revert) BR (86/3) BR (86/4) BR (86/5a) BR (86/5b) BR (86/6) BR (86/7) BR (86/9) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
  3101     86252                 21/08/1965 W Withdrawn 05/2002 05/2002
  3102 86009         86409     86609     21/08/1965
  3103 86004         86404     86604     21/08/1965
  3104 86010         86410     86610     27/09/1965 GS
WN
Glasgow Shields Road
Willesden
26/01/1974
11/05/1974
  3105 86030         86430           19/06/1965 W Withdrawn 06/2004 06/2004
  3106     86214                 19/06/1965 W Withdrawn 10/2002 10/2002
  3107     86248                 27/09/1965 W Withdrawn 10/2002 10/2002
  3108 86038         86438     86638     19/06/1965
  3109 86016       86316 86416     86616     19/06/1965 W Withdrawn 02/2002 02/2002
  3110 86027       86327 86427     86627     19/06/1965
  3111 86024       86324 86424           19/06/1965
  3112 86006         86406     86606     24/08/1965 GS
WN
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Willesden
Withdrawn
26/01/1974
11/05/1974
11/2003
11/2003
  3113     86232                 24/08/1965 W Withdrawn 07/2005 07/2005
  3114 86020       86320 86420     86620     27/09/1965 W Withdrawn 09/2005 09/2005
  3115 86003         86403     86603     27/09/1965 W Withdrawn 09/1999 09/1999
  3116     86238                 27/09/1965 W Withdrawn 10/2004 10/2004
  3117     86227                 27/09/1965 W Withdrawn 10/2004 10/2004
  3118 86041   86261                 25/09/1965 W Withdrawn 11/2002 11/2002
  3119     86229                 25/09/1965 ACL
W
London Midland - Western Lines
Withdrawn
27/11/1971
04/12/1971
30/09/2008
30/09/2008
  3120 86019       86319 86419           25/09/1965 W Withdrawn 03/1999 03/1999
  3121     86241 86241     86508         25/09/1965 W Withdrawn 01/2000 01/2000
  3122 86012       86312 86412     86612     27/09/1965
  3123 86015       86315 86415     86615     28/10/1965 W Withdrawn 04/2005 04/2005
  3124 86035         86435     86635     26/10/1965
  3125     86209                 25/11/1965 W Withdrawn 10/2004 10/2004
  3126     86231                 03/11/1965 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  3127     86240                 26/10/1965 W Withdrawn 10/2002 10/2002
  3128 86013       86313 86413     86613     23/11/1965
  3129     86205       86503     86701   24/11/1965 W Withdrawn 12/06/1971
30/09/2008
30/09/2008
  3130 86037         86437     86637     07/12/1965
  3131     86222 86222     86502         28/12/1965 W Withdrawn 10/2002 10/2002
  3132     86221                 15/12/1965 W Withdrawn 05/2003 05/2003
  3133     86236                 13/12/1965 W Withdrawn 10/2002 10/2002
  3134     86224                 15/12/1965 W Withdrawn 07/2002 07/2002
  3135 86040   86256                 21/01/1966 W Withdrawn 10/2002 10/2002
  3136 86044   86253               86901 22/12/1965
  3137 86045   86259                 15/01/1966 W Withdrawn 10/2003 10/2003
  3138     86242                 21/01/1966 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  3139 86043   86257                 26/01/1966 W Withdrawn 11/2002 11/2002
  3140 86046   86258       86501         01/03/1966 W Withdrawn 07/2002 07/2002
  3141     86208                 16/02/1966 W Withdrawn 03/2000 03/2000
  3142 86047   86254                 18/02/1966 W Withdrawn 10/2002 10/2002
  3143   86103 86203                 15/03/1966 W Withdrawn 09/1995 09/1995
  3144 86048   86260             86702   18/03/1966
  3145 86014       86314 86414     86614     22/03/1966
  3146 86017       86317 86417           02/04/1966 W Withdrawn 09/2001 09/2001
  3147     86211                 02/04/1966 W Withdrawn 11/1986 11/1986
  3148 86032         86432     86632     07/04/1966
  3149     86246 86246     86505         02/04/1966 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  3150   86102 86202                 10/04/1966 W Withdrawn 04/2002 04/2002
  3151     86212                 18/04/1966 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  3152 86023       86323 86423     86623     07/05/1966 W Withdrawn 10/2003 10/2003
  3153 86039         86439     86639     07/05/1966
  3154 86042   86255                 21/05/1966 W Withdrawn 08/1998 08/1998
  3155     86234                 27/05/1966 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  3156     86220                 18/06/1966 W Withdrawn 05/2002 05/2002
  3157 86021       86321 86421     86621     24/06/1966
  3158     86223                 01/07/1966 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  3159 86028       86328 86428     86628     14/07/1966
  3160 86036         86436     86636     14/10/1966
  3161     86249                 27/09/1965 GS
WN
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/07/1972
26/01/1974
10/2003
10/2003
  3162     86226                 21/08/1965 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  3163 86018       86318 86418     86618     21/08/1965 W Withdrawn 08/2001 08/2001
  3164     86225                 21/08/1965 W Withdrawn 07/2002 07/2002
  3165     86215                 21/08/1965 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  3166     86216                 27/09/1965 W Withdrawn 04/1998 04/1998
  3167     86228                 21/08/1965 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  3168     86230                 19/06/1965 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  3169     86239 86239     86507         19/06/1965 W Withdrawn 04/1996 04/1996
  3170 86002         86402     86602     19/06/1965 GS
WN
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Willesden
Withdrawn
26/01/1974
06/04/1974
03/2005
03/2005
  3171 86011       86311 86411     86611     27/09/1965 GS
WN
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Willesden
Withdrawn
26/01/1974
06/04/1974
11/2003
11/2003
  3172     86233 86233     86506         19/06/1965
  3173     86204                 21/08/1965 ACL
W
London Midland - Western Lines
Withdrawn
15/05/1971
27/11/1971
08/1998
08/1998
  3174 86022       86322 86422     86622     21/08/1965
  3175     86218                 27/09/1965 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  3176 86007         86407     86607     21/08/1965 GS
WN
Glasgow Shields Road
Willesden
26/01/1974
06/04/1974
  3177     86217       86504         21/08/1965 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  3178     86244                 21/08/1965 W Withdrawn 10/2002 10/2002
  3179     86207                 27/09/1965 W Withdrawn 07/2002 07/2002
  3180 86008         86408   86501 86608     27/09/1965
  3181     86243                 12/10/1965 W Withdrawn 11/2002 11/2002
  3182     86245                 25/09/1965 W Withdrawn 10/2003 10/2003
  3183     86251                 28/10/1965 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  3184     86206                 01/10/1965 W Withdrawn 10/2002 10/2002
  3185 86005         86405     86605     01/10/1965
  3186 86025       86325 86425           18/10/1965 W Withdrawn 02/2002 02/2002
  3187 86034         86434     86634     17/10/1965 W Withdrawn 05/2002 05/2002
  3188 86031         86431     86631     29/10/1965 W Withdrawn 11/2003 11/2003
  3189     86250                 04/11/1965 W Withdrawn 04/2004 04/2004
  3190     86210               86902 30/10/1965 11/2013
  3191   86101 86201                 11/11/1965 W Withdrawn 12/2001 12/2001
  3192     86247                 02/12/1965 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  3193     86213                 02/12/1965 W Withdrawn 09/1998 09/1998
  3194     86235                 03/12/1965 W Withdrawn 30/09/2008 30/09/2008
  3195 86026       86326 86426           17/12/1965 W Withdrawn 06/2004 06/2004
  3196     86219                 08/12/1965 W Withdrawn 05/1996 05/1996
  3197     86237                 30/12/1965 W Withdrawn 04/2004 04/2004
  3198 86033         86433     86633     18/01/1966
  3199 86001         86401           21/01/1966
  3200 86029       86329 86429           10/02/1966 W Withdrawn 11/1986 11/1986