Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

13 0-6-0+0-6-0


BR (Class 13) BR (Pre Tops) BR (TOPS) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
D4502 D3697 13002 01/05/1959 41A
41F
41C
41A
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Mexborough
Wath
Tinsley
01/05/1959
08/08/1959
07/03/1964
10/07/1965
D4500 D3698 13003 07/05/1959 41A
41B
41A
41A
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
07/05/1959
15/04/1961
16/09/1961
02/05/1964
D4502 D4187 13002 06/07/1962 30A
41A
Stratford (New)
Tinsley
06/07/1962
16/01/1965
D4500 D4188 13003 11/07/1962 30A
41A
Stratford (New)
Tinsley
11/07/1962
16/01/1965
D4501 D4189 13001 31/07/1962 30A
30F
41A
Stratford (New)
Parkeston Quay
Tinsley
31/07/1962
13/06/1964
30/01/1965
D4501 D4190 13001 02/08/1962 30A
41A
Stratford (New)
Tinsley
02/08/1962
16/01/1965