Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 138 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6445 Week
» 21559 Month
» 324749 Year
» 1546314 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Collett "72xx" Class 2-8-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/12/1945 Reallocation 7246     136 Severn Tunnel Junction  
01/12/1945 Reallocation 7223     136 Severn Tunnel Junction  
01/12/1945 Reallocation 7202     136 Severn Tunnel Junction  
18/05/1946 Reallocation 7252     SLO Slough  
18/05/1946 Reallocation 7228     SLO Slough  
18/05/1946 Reallocation 7214     SLO Slough  
30/10/1948 Reallocation 7252 SLO Slough NPTG Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
30/10/1948 Reallocation 7247     NPTG Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
30/10/1948 Reallocation 7228 SLO Slough LLY Llanelly  
30/10/1948 Reallocation 7211     LDR Landore  
31/08/1950 Reallocation 7209     83A Newton Abbot  
30/09/1950 Reallocation 7232     86C Cardiff Canton  
30/09/1950 Reallocation 7210     86C Cardiff Canton  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 7204     87A Neath (Court Sart)  
31/01/1951 Reallocation 7209 83A Newton Abbot 83E St Blazey  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 7242     88A Cardiff Cathays  
30/04/1951 Reallocation 7240     87A Neath (Court Sart)  
30/04/1951 Reallocation 7248     87A Neath (Court Sart)  
30/04/1951 Reallocation 7222     87A Neath (Court Sart)  
30/04/1951 Reallocation 7236     87A Neath (Court Sart)  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 7240 87A Neath (Court Sart) 83A Newton Abbot  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 7236 87A Neath (Court Sart) 83A Newton Abbot  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 7216     86C Cardiff Canton  
31/08/1951 Reallocation 7244     87F Llanelly  
30/09/1951 Reallocation 7201     82B St Philips Marsh  
30/09/1951 Reallocation 7211 LDR Landore 87F Llanelly  
31/01/1952 Reallocation 7244 87F Llanelly 87B Duffryn Yard  
31/01/1952 Reallocation 7222 87A Neath (Court Sart) 87F Llanelly  
31/01/1952 Reallocation 7208     84B Oxley  
31/01/1952 Reallocation 7218     84B Oxley  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 7232 86C Cardiff Canton 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 7210 86C Cardiff Canton 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 7216 86C Cardiff Canton 86J Aberdare  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 7207     87E Landore  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 7217     87E Landore  
31/08/1952 Reallocation 7218 84B Oxley 87B Duffryn Yard  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 7237     86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 7250     82B St Philips Marsh  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 7240 83A Newton Abbot 87B Duffryn Yard  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 7220     87A Neath (Court Sart)  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 7222 87F Llanelly 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 7226     87A Neath (Court Sart)  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 7236 83A Newton Abbot 87E Landore  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 7200     87E Landore  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 7208 84B Oxley 86C Cardiff Canton  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 7209 83E St Blazey 87E Landore  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 7243     86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 7227     86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
27/12/1952 Reallocation 7248 87A Neath (Court Sart) 87D Swansea East Dock  
27/12/1952 Reallocation 7226 87A Neath (Court Sart) 87D Swansea East Dock  
27/12/1952 Reallocation 7208 86C Cardiff Canton 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
27/12/1952 Reallocation 7218 87B Duffryn Yard 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
21/02/1953 Reallocation 7238     87B Duffryn Yard  
21/02/1953 Reallocation 7208 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 7222 87A Neath (Court Sart) 85C Hereford  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 7204 87A Neath (Court Sart) 85C Hereford  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 7246 136 Severn Tunnel Junction 81F Oxford  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 7238 87B Duffryn Yard 81F Oxford  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 7239     81F Oxford  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 7212     81F Oxford  
05/09/1953 Reallocation 7240 87B Duffryn Yard 87F Llanelly  
05/09/1953 Reallocation 7215     87F Llanelly  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 7224     87D Swansea East Dock  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 7219     86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 7220 87A Neath (Court Sart) 84A Stafford Road  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 7229     86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 7249     81F Oxford  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 7252 NPTG Ebbw Junction (Newport) 81F Oxford  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 7241     82B St Philips Marsh  
22/05/1954 Reallocation 7249 81F Oxford 88A Cardiff Cathays  
22/05/1954 Reallocation 7252 81F Oxford 88A Cardiff Cathays  
17/07/1954 Reallocation 7249 88A Cardiff Cathays 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
17/07/1954 Reallocation 7252 88A Cardiff Cathays 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 7248 87D Swansea East Dock 87E Landore  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 7220 84A Stafford Road 86G Pontypool Road  
04/12/1954 Reallocation 7249 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 88A Cardiff Cathays  
04/12/1954 Reallocation 7252 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 88A Cardiff Cathays  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 7201 82B St Philips Marsh 86C Cardiff Canton  
26/03/1955 Reallocation 7252 88A Cardiff Cathays 88C Barry  
26/03/1955 Reallocation 7247 NPTG Ebbw Junction (Newport) 84B Oxley  
26/03/1955 Reallocation 7201 86C Cardiff Canton 86G Pontypool Road  
26/03/1955 Reallocation 7203     87F Llanelly  
26/03/1955 Reallocation 7204 85C Hereford 86G Pontypool Road  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 7249 88A Cardiff Cathays 87B Duffryn Yard  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 7241 82B St Philips Marsh 87B Duffryn Yard  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 7222 85C Hereford 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
28/01/1956 Reallocation 7241 87B Duffryn Yard 88C Barry  
28/01/1956 Reallocation 7230     88C Barry  
21/04/1956 Reallocation 7251     86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 7246 81F Oxford 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 7212 81F Oxford 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
13/07/1957 Reallocation 7248 87E Landore 87B Duffryn Yard  
13/07/1957 Reallocation 7224 87D Swansea East Dock 87F Llanelly  
13/07/1957 Reallocation 7226 87D Swansea East Dock 87F Llanelly  
13/07/1957 Reallocation 7233     86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
13/07/1957 Reallocation 7234     86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 7250 82B St Philips Marsh 85A Worcester  
02/11/1957 Reallocation 7251 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 87F Llanelly  
02/11/1957 Reallocation 7215 87F Llanelly 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 7235     87F Llanelly  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 7215 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 87F Llanelly  
25/01/1958 Reallocation 7248 87B Duffryn Yard 87D Swansea East Dock  
25/01/1958 Reallocation 7225     87D Swansea East Dock  
25/01/1958 Reallocation 7226 87F Llanelly 87D Swansea East Dock  
25/01/1958 Reallocation 7215 87F Llanelly 87D Swansea East Dock  
22/02/1958 Reallocation 7246 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 86G Pontypool Road  
22/02/1958 Reallocation 7210 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 86G Pontypool Road  
19/04/1958 Reallocation 7251 87F Llanelly 86G Pontypool Road  
19/04/1958 Reallocation 7227 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 88C Barry  
19/04/1958 Reallocation 7235 87F Llanelly 85A Worcester  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 7250 85A Worcester 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 7240 87F Llanelly 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 7214 SLO Slough 86J Aberdare  
01/11/1958 Reallocation 7227 88C Barry 86C Cardiff Canton  
29/11/1958 Reallocation 7227 86C Cardiff Canton 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
29/11/1958 Reallocation 7235 85A Worcester 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
27/12/1958 Reallocation 7227 85B Gloucester Horton Road 86C Cardiff Canton  
24/01/1959 Reallocation 7224 87F Llanelly 87E Landore  
24/01/1959 Reallocation 7232 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 87F Llanelly  
21/02/1959 Reallocation 7230 88C Barry 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
21/03/1959 Reallocation 7230 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 87E Landore  
21/03/1959 Reallocation 7235 85B Gloucester Horton Road 87F Llanelly  
13/06/1959 Reallocation 7248 87D Swansea East Dock 87C Danygraig  
13/06/1959 Reallocation 7225 87D Swansea East Dock 87C Danygraig  
13/06/1959 Reallocation 7226 87D Swansea East Dock 87C Danygraig  
13/06/1959 Reallocation 7227 86C Cardiff Canton 86G Pontypool Road  
13/06/1959 Reallocation 7215 87D Swansea East Dock 87C Danygraig  
11/07/1959 Reallocation 7237 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 84C Banbury  
11/07/1959 Reallocation 7206     86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
11/07/1959 Reallocation 7217 87E Landore 84C Banbury  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 7252 88C Barry 88A Radyr  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 7237 84C Banbury 86J Aberdare  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 7211 87F Llanelly 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
03/10/1959 Reallocation 7217 84C Banbury 84B Oxley  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 7248 87C Danygraig 87D Swansea East Dock  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 7225 87C Danygraig 87D Swansea East Dock  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 7226 87C Danygraig 87D Swansea East Dock  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 7215 87C Danygraig 87D Swansea East Dock  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 7224 87E Landore 86J Aberdare  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 7203 87F Llanelly 86J Aberdare  
26/12/1959 Reallocation 7204 86G Pontypool Road 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
26/12/1959 Reallocation 7217 84B Oxley 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 7247 84B Oxley 84C Banbury  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 7235 87F Llanelly 87B Duffryn Yard  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 7218 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 81F Oxford  
27/02/1960 Reallocation 7244 87B Duffryn Yard 84C Banbury  
27/02/1960 Reallocation 7228 LLY Llanelly 84C Banbury  
27/02/1960 Reallocation 7230 87E Landore 84J Croes Newydd  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 7236 87E Landore 84C Banbury  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 7200 87E Landore 87B Duffryn Yard  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 7207 87E Landore 84C Banbury  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 7209 87E Landore 86C Cardiff Canton  
08/10/1960 Reallocation 7212 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 7235 87B Duffryn Yard 87F Llanelly  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 7200 87B Duffryn Yard 87F Llanelly  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 7211 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 87F Llanelly  
03/12/1960 Reallocation 7238 81F Oxford 84B Oxley  
03/12/1960 Reallocation 7208 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 84C Banbury  
03/12/1960 Reallocation 7213     84B Oxley  
03/12/1960 Reallocation 7217 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 84C Banbury  
03/12/1960 Reallocation 7218 81F Oxford 84B Oxley  
25/02/1961 Reallocation 7217 84C Banbury 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 7224 86J Aberdare 83C Exeter  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 7214 86J Aberdare 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 7243 87B Duffryn Yard 88A Cardiff Canton  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 7243 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 87B Duffryn Yard  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 7204 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
12/08/1961 Reallocation 7247 84C Banbury 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
09/09/1961 Reallocation 7244 84C Banbury 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
09/09/1961 Reallocation 7225 87D Swansea East Dock 87F Llanelly  
09/09/1961 Reallocation 7208 84C Banbury 88J Aberdare  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 7228 84C Banbury 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 7237 86J Aberdare 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
04/11/1961 Reallocation 7223 136 Severn Tunnel Junction 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
04/11/1961 Reallocation 7238 84B Oxley 85A Worcester  
02/12/1961 Reallocation 7224 83C Exeter 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
02/12/1961 Reallocation 7225 87F Llanelly 87D Swansea East Dock  
27/01/1962 Reallocation 7238 85A Worcester 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
27/01/1962 Reallocation 7214 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
24/02/1962 Reallocation 7250 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
24/02/1962 Reallocation 7229 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 87B Duffryn Yard  
24/02/1962 Reallocation 7216 86J Aberdare 87B Duffryn Yard  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 7203 86J Aberdare 87G Carmarthen  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 7216 87B Duffryn Yard 87B Duffryn Yard  
19/05/1962 Reallocation 7243 88A Cardiff Canton 87G Carmarthen  
19/05/1962 Reallocation 7244 87A Neath (Court Sart) 87D Swansea East Dock  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 7243 87G Carmarthen 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 7203 87G Carmarthen 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
11/08/1962 Reallocation 7250 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 88B Radyr  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 7221     88C Barry  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 7228 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 88C Barry  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 7231     88C Barry  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 7239 81F Oxford 88B Radyr  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 7202 136 Severn Tunnel Junction 88C Barry  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 7208 88J Aberdare 88C Barry  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 7209 86C Cardiff Canton 88B Radyr  
17/11/1962 Reallocation 7244 87D Swansea East Dock 87F Llanelly  
17/11/1962 Reallocation 7239 88B Radyr 87F Llanelly  
17/11/1962 Reallocation 7218 84B Oxley 84C Banbury  
26/11/1962 Condemned 7241 88C Barry   COND  
06/12/1962 Condemned 7224 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)   COND  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 7247 87A Neath (Court Sart) 88J Aberdare  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 7248 87D Swansea East Dock 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 7222 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 87B Duffryn Yard  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 7234 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 88J Aberdare  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 7237 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 87F Llanelly  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 7209 88B Radyr 88J Aberdare  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 7214 87A Neath (Court Sart) 88J Aberdare  
12/01/1963 Reallocation 7206 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 86G Pontypool Road  
12/01/1963 Reallocation 7217 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
09/02/1963 Reallocation 7243 87A Neath (Court Sart) 87B Duffryn Yard  
09/02/1963 Reallocation 7245     86F Aberbeeg  
09/02/1963 Reallocation 7225 87D Swansea East Dock 87F Llanelly  
09/02/1963 Reallocation 7203 87A Neath (Court Sart) 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
09/02/1963 Reallocation 7212 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 86F Aberbeeg  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 7248 87A Neath (Court Sart) 87D Swansea East Dock  
22/03/1963 Condemned 7247 98W     COND  
06/04/1963 Reallocation 7204 87A Neath (Court Sart) 88J Aberdare  
17/06/1963 Condemned 7237 98W     COND  
24/06/1963 Condemned 7227 98W     COND  
24/06/1963 Condemned 7215 98W     COND  
29/06/1963 Reallocation 7240 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 86G Pontypool Road  
29/06/1963 Reallocation 7253     87F Llanelly  
29/06/1963 Reallocation 7231 88C Barry 88B Radyr  
29/06/1963 Reallocation 7232 87F Llanelly 88C Barry  
29/06/1963 Reallocation 7233 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
29/06/1963 Reallocation 7238 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 88C Barry  
29/06/1963 Reallocation 7217 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 88B Radyr  
29/06/1963 Reallocation 7219 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 88B Radyr  
02/07/1963 Condemned 7200 98W     COND  
27/07/1963 Reallocation 7242 88A Cardiff Cathays 87F Llanelly  
27/07/1963 Reallocation 7252 88A Radyr 87B Duffryn Yard  
27/07/1963 Reallocation 7223 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 88C Barry  
27/07/1963 Reallocation 7231 88B Radyr 87F Llanelly  
27/07/1963 Reallocation 7204 88J Aberdare 87B Duffryn Yard  
27/07/1963 Reallocation 7217 88B Radyr 87F Llanelly  
29/07/1963 Condemned 7228 98W     COND  
28/09/1963 Reallocation 7251 86G Pontypool Road 88J Aberdare  
28/09/1963 Reallocation 7203 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
30/09/1963 Condemned 7246 98W     COND  
07/10/1963 Condemned 7216 98W     COND  
22/10/1963 Condemned 7234 98W     COND  
22/10/1963 Condemned 7239 98W     COND  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 7233 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 86G Pontypool Road  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 7212 86F Aberbeeg 88J Aberdare  
13/11/1963 Condemned 7236 98W     COND  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 7223 88C Barry 87F Llanelly  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 7232 88C Barry 87F Llanelly  
01/12/1963 Reallocation 7221 88C Barry 2D Banbury  
16/12/1963 Condemned 7203 98W     COND  
16/12/1963 Condemned 7214 98W     COND  
28/12/1963 Reallocation 7248 87D Swansea East Dock 87E Landore  
28/12/1963 Reallocation 7222 87B Duffryn Yard 88J Aberdare  
28/12/1963 Reallocation 7226 87D Swansea East Dock 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
06/01/1964 Condemned 7251 98W     COND  
22/01/1964 Condemned 7219 98W     COND  
14/02/1964 Condemned 7212 98W     COND  
22/02/1964 Reallocation 7245 86F Aberbeeg 88B Radyr  
22/02/1964 Reallocation 7253 87F Llanelly 88J Aberdare  
26/02/1964 Condemned 7204 98W     COND  
13/04/1964 Reallocation 7243 87B Duffryn Yard 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
13/04/1964 Reallocation 7252 87B Duffryn Yard 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
13/04/1964 Reallocation 7244 87F Llanelly 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
13/04/1964 Reallocation 7229 87B Duffryn Yard 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
20/04/1964 Condemned 7235 98W     COND  
20/04/1964 Condemned 7238 98W     COND  
20/04/1964 Condemned 7208 98W     COND  
04/05/1964 Reallocation 7225 98W   86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
04/05/1964 Reallocation 7206 86G Pontypool Road 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
04/05/1964 Reallocation 7211 98W   86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
06/05/1964 Condemned 7225 86E Severn Tunnel Junction   COND  
06/05/1964 Condemned 7211 86E Severn Tunnel Junction   COND  
01/06/1964 Condemned 7202 98W     COND  
08/06/1964 Condemned 7242 98W     COND  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 7229 87A Neath (Court Sart) 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 7209 88J Aberdare 88C Barry  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 7217 87F Llanelly 86F Aberbeeg  
06/07/1964 Condemned 7230 98W     COND  
06/07/1964 Condemned 7206 98W     COND  
06/07/1964 Condemned 7217 98W     COND  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 7201 86G Pontypool Road 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
24/07/1964 Condemned 7243 98W     COND  
24/07/1964 Condemned 7209 98W     COND  
10/08/1964 Condemned 7229 98W     COND  
05/09/1964 Condemned 7218 98W     COND  
07/09/1964 Condemned 7245 98W     COND  
07/09/1964 Condemned 7240 98W     COND  
07/09/1964 Condemned 7220 98W     COND  
07/09/1964 Condemned 7233 98W     COND  
07/09/1964 Condemned 7213 98W     COND  
28/09/1964 Condemned 7250 98W     COND  
09/10/1964 Condemned 7231 98W     COND  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 7245 98W   88B Radyr  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 7252 87A Neath (Court Sart) 88B Radyr  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 7244 87A Neath (Court Sart) 87F Llanelly  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 7201 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 87F Llanelly  
08/11/1964 Reallocation 7226 98W   88J Aberdare  
13/11/1964 Condemned 7223 98W     COND  
13/11/1964 Condemned 7226 88J Aberdare   COND  
14/11/1964 Condemned 7207 98W     COND  
15/11/1964 Reallocation 7249 87B Duffryn Yard 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
28/11/1964 Condemned 7221 98W     COND  
10/01/1965 Reallocation 7252 88B Radyr 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
10/01/1965 Reallocation 7205     88J Aberdare  
15/01/1965 Condemned 7222 98W     COND  
06/02/1965 Condemned 7244 98W     COND  
07/03/1965 Reallocation 7253 88J Aberdare 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
07/03/1965 Reallocation 7205 88J Aberdare 86G Pontypool Road  
11/04/1965 Reallocation 7249 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 88A Cardiff East Dock  
11/04/1965 Reallocation 7253 98W   86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
21/04/1965 Condemned 7201 98W     COND  
30/04/1965 Condemned 7253 86E Severn Tunnel Junction   COND  
30/04/1965 Condemned 7210 98W     COND  
16/05/1965 Reallocation 7249 88A Cardiff East Dock 87F Llanelly  
16/05/1965 Reallocation 7205 86G Pontypool Road 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
21/05/1965 Condemned 7232 98W     COND  
16/06/1965 Condemned 7249 98W     COND  
16/06/1965 Condemned 7252 98W     COND  
16/06/1965 Condemned 7248 98W     COND  
16/06/1965 Condemned 7205 98W     COND