Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 141 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6448 Week
» 21562 Month
» 324752 Year
» 1546317 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Collett "81xx" Class 2-6-2T


Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Build Date Rebuild Rebuild Date Notes
  99
99
3100
3100
5100
5100
8100
8100
  09/1903 Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx 26/09/1938  
3115
3115
5115
5115
8109
8109
02/1905 Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx 30/11/1939  
3116
3116
5116
5116
8107
8107
02/1905 Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx 28/07/1939  
3118
3118
5118
5118
8102
8102
02/1905 Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx 15/06/1938  
3120
3120
5120
5120
8106
8106
03/1905 Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx 17/06/1939  
3123
3123
5123
5123
8101
8101
05/1905 Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx 25/03/1938  
3124
3124
5124
5124
8104
8104
05/1905 Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx 13/01/1939  
3126
3126
5126
5126
8105
8105
06/1905 Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx 01/04/1939  
3133
3133
5133
5133
8108
8108
01/1906 Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx 26/09/1939  
3145
3145
5145
5145
8103
8103
03/1906 Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx 01/11/1938