Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 140 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 2285 Week
» 16542 Month
» 244426 Year
» 1465991 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Collett "61xx" Class 2-6-2T


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Tue 17/08/1954 6114 86A   Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954  
Sun 04/03/1962 6152,
6153,
6166
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Triangle.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Triangle.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Triangle.
   
Sun 04/03/1962 6110,
6125,
6137,
6150
81C,
87H,
85B,
81F
  Wolverhampton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Wolverhampton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Wolverhampton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Wolverhampton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
   
Sun 29/11/1964 6122 Wdn   Swindon Works visit: Outside the stock shed RO 1/1965  
Sat 07/05/1966 6111,
6136,
6141
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Cashmore's Scrapyard, Newport: Dumped
Cashmore's Scrapyard, Newport: Dumped
Cashmore's Scrapyard, Newport: Dumped
RO 8/1966  
Sat 07/05/1966 6147 Wdn   At Dock Street Goods yard, Newport: Dumped - Awaiting entry to Cashmore's scrapyard RO 8/1966