Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 120 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 2265 Week
» 16522 Month
» 244406 Year
» 1465971 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Collett "61xx" Class 2-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
26/01/1946 Reallocation 6103     PDN Old Oak Common  
23/03/1946 Reallocation 6103 PDN Old Oak Common OXF Oxford  
07/09/1946 Reallocation 6102     PDN Old Oak Common  
31/12/1949 Reallocation 6134     DID Didcot  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 6102 PDN Old Oak Common 82A Bristol Bath Road  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 6107     82A Bristol Bath Road  
31/01/1951 Reallocation 6109     82A Bristol Bath Road  
31/01/1951 Reallocation 6153     82A Bristol Bath Road  
31/03/1951 Reallocation 6112     81F Oxford  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 6129     91W To Western Region / GWR  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 6166     91W To Western Region / GWR  
31/07/1951 Reallocation 6114     82A Bristol Bath Road  
31/07/1951 Reallocation 6129 91W To Western Region / GWR 81D Reading (W.R.)  
31/07/1951 Reallocation 6132     81B Slough  
31/07/1951 Reallocation 6153 82A Bristol Bath Road 81B Slough  
31/07/1951 Reallocation 6166 91W To Western Region / GWR 81E Didcot  
30/09/1951 Reallocation 6116     81E Didcot  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 6104     81F Oxford  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 6117     81D Reading (W.R.)  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 6161     81D Reading (W.R.)  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 6104 81F Oxford 81D Reading (W.R.)  
27/12/1952 Reallocation 6109 82A Bristol Bath Road 81E Didcot  
27/12/1952 Reallocation 6126     81D Reading (W.R.)  
24/01/1953 Reallocation 6113     81F Oxford  
21/02/1953 Reallocation 6109 81E Didcot 81D Reading (W.R.)  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 6110     81A Old Oak Common  
05/09/1953 Reallocation 6106     81F Oxford  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 6105     84E Tyseley  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 6118     84E Tyseley  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 6121     84E Tyseley  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 6134 DID Didcot 84E Tyseley  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 6139     84E Tyseley  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 6166 81E Didcot 84E Tyseley  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 6102 82A Bristol Bath Road 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 6107 82A Bristol Bath Road 86G Pontypool Road  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 6109 81D Reading (W.R.) 81A Old Oak Common  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 6114 82A Bristol Bath Road 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 6116 81E Didcot 84E Tyseley  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 6121 84E Tyseley 81A Old Oak Common  
25/11/1953 Reallocation 6102 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
25/11/1953 Reallocation 6107 86G Pontypool Road 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
25/11/1953 Reallocation 6114 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
30/01/1954 Reallocation 6107 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 82A Bristol Bath Road  
26/03/1955 Reallocation 6103 OXF Oxford 83C Exeter  
26/03/1955 Reallocation 6153 81B Slough 81D Reading (W.R.)  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 6105 84E Tyseley 87H Neyland  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 6163     82C Swindon  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 6105 87H Neyland 84E Tyseley  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 6115     81D Reading (W.R.)  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 6137     82A Bristol Bath Road  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 6163 82C Swindon 82A Bristol Bath Road  
13/08/1955 Reallocation 6123     81D Reading (W.R.)  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 6132 81B Slough 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
31/12/1955 Reallocation 6132 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 81A Old Oak Common  
25/02/1956 Reallocation 6155     86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 6119     86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 6109 81A Old Oak Common 81C Southall  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 6114 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 83F Truro  
14/07/1956 Reallocation 6114 83F Truro 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 6119 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 81C Southall  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 6115 81D Reading (W.R.) 81B Slough  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 6122     81B Slough  
01/12/1956 Reallocation 6119 81C Southall 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 6109 81C Southall 81B Slough  
20/04/1957 Reallocation 6126 81D Reading (W.R.) 81B Slough  
13/07/1957 Reallocation 6160     84E Tyseley  
07/09/1957 Reallocation 6160 84E Tyseley 81B Slough  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 6113 81F Oxford 81A Old Oak Common  
02/11/1957 Reallocation 6166 84E Tyseley 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 6134 84E Tyseley 84D Leamington  
25/01/1958 Reallocation 6102 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
25/01/1958 Reallocation 6114 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
25/01/1958 Reallocation 6134 84D Leamington 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
25/01/1958 Reallocation 6157     81D Reading (W.R.)  
25/01/1958 Reallocation 6163 82A Bristol Bath Road 81F Oxford  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 6134 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 81D Reading (W.R.)  
12/06/1958 Reallocation 6145     81A Old Oak Common  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 6117 81D Reading (W.R.) 81B Slough  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 6118 84E Tyseley 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 6123 81D Reading (W.R.) 81B Slough  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 6131     81D Reading (W.R.)  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 6140     81D Reading (W.R.)  
09/1958 Condemned 6100       COND  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 6114 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 81D Reading (W.R.)  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 6137 82A Bristol Bath Road 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 6157 81D Reading (W.R.) 81C Southall  
16/05/1959 Reallocation 6122 81B Slough 81D Reading (W.R.)  
11/07/1959 Reallocation 6107 82A Bristol Bath Road 83A Newton Abbot  
11/07/1959 Reallocation 6114 81D Reading (W.R.) 87E Landore  
11/07/1959 Reallocation 6119 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 83A Newton Abbot  
11/07/1959 Reallocation 6140 81D Reading (W.R.) 83B Taunton  
11/07/1959 Reallocation 6166 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 83A Newton Abbot  
08/08/1959 Reallocation 6107 83A Newton Abbot 82A Bristol Bath Road  
17/08/1959 Condemned 6102 98W     COND  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 6107 82A Bristol Bath Road 81D Reading (W.R.)  
03/10/1959 Reallocation 6112 81F Oxford 81D Reading (W.R.)  
03/10/1959 Reallocation 6166 83A Newton Abbot 83D Laira  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 6125     81A Old Oak Common  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 6105 84E Tyseley 81E Didcot  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 6108     81A Old Oak Common  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 6119 83A Newton Abbot 81D Reading (W.R.)  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 6124     81E Didcot  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 6125 81A Old Oak Common 81D Reading (W.R.)  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 6133     81F Oxford  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 6139 84E Tyseley 81F Oxford  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 6140 83B Taunton 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 6149     81C Southall  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 6157 81C Southall 81A Old Oak Common  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 6159     81C Southall  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 6164     81E Didcot  
26/12/1959 Reallocation 6110 81A Old Oak Common 81C Southall  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 6133 81F Oxford 81C Southall  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 6144     81C Southall  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 6163 81F Oxford 81A Old Oak Common  
14/03/1960 Condemned 6105 98W     COND  
26/03/1960 Reallocation 6139 81F Oxford 81E Didcot  
26/03/1960 Reallocation 6141     81C Southall  
06/1960 Condemned 6104 81D Reading (W.R.)   COND  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 6123 81B Slough 81E Didcot  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 6155 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 83B Taunton  
07/1960 Condemned 6121 81A Old Oak Common   COND  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 6108 81A Old Oak Common 87H Neyland  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 6109 81B Slough 81E Didcot  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 6125 81D Reading (W.R.) 87G Carmarthen  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 6154     81F Oxford  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 6156     81E Didcot  
13/08/1960 Reallocation 6110 81C Southall 81A Old Oak Common  
13/08/1960 Reallocation 6113 81A Old Oak Common 81E Didcot  
13/08/1960 Reallocation 6128     85D Kidderminster  
13/08/1960 Reallocation 6144 81C Southall 85D Kidderminster  
13/08/1960 Reallocation 6146     83C Exeter  
13/08/1960 Reallocation 6159 81C Southall 81E Didcot  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 6136     81E Didcot  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 6166 83D Laira 83A Newton Abbot  
08/10/1960 Reallocation 6108 87H Neyland 88B Radyr  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 6110 81A Old Oak Common 81C Southall  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 6120     81E Didcot  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 6132 81A Old Oak Common 81C Southall  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 6141 81C Southall 81A Old Oak Common  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 6148     87H Neyland  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 6164 81E Didcot 81A Old Oak Common  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 6169     81A Old Oak Common  
03/12/1960 Reallocation 6112 81D Reading (W.R.) 81C Southall  
03/12/1960 Reallocation 6129 81D Reading (W.R.) 81F Oxford  
03/12/1960 Reallocation 6147     82B St Philips Marsh  
31/12/1960 Reallocation 6101     84E Tyseley  
31/12/1960 Reallocation 6126 81B Slough 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
28/01/1961 Reallocation 6150     81F Oxford  
25/02/1961 Reallocation 6115 81B Slough 86G Pontypool Road  
25/02/1961 Reallocation 6162     81C Southall  
20/05/1961 Reallocation 6125 87G Carmarthen 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
20/05/1961 Reallocation 6130     81E Didcot  
20/05/1961 Reallocation 6168     81F Oxford  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 6114 87E Landore 87H Neyland  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 6149 81C Southall 81F Oxford  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 6125 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 87H Neyland  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 6156 81E Didcot 81F Oxford  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 6157 81A Old Oak Common 83B Taunton  
12/08/1961 Reallocation 6113 81E Didcot 83B Taunton  
12/08/1961 Reallocation 6148 87H Neyland 83B Taunton  
12/08/1961 Reallocation 6158     86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 6168 81F Oxford 81A Old Oak Common  
01/1962 Condemned 6152       COND  
01/1962 Condemned 6153 81D Reading (W.R.)   COND  
01/1962 Condemned 6166 83A Newton Abbot   COND  
27/01/1962 Reallocation 6124 81E Didcot 81F Oxford  
24/02/1962 Reallocation 6112 81C Southall 81E Didcot  
03/1962 Condemned 6101 84E Tyseley   COND  
03/1962 Condemned 6127       COND  
03/1962 Condemned 6162 81C Southall   COND  
03/1962 Condemned 6168 81A Old Oak Common   COND  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 6114 87H Neyland 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 6128 85D Kidderminster 81B Slough  
04/1962 Condemned 6120 81E Didcot   COND  
04/1962 Condemned 6123 81E Didcot   COND  
21/04/1962 Reallocation 6125 87H Neyland 81A Old Oak Common  
05/1962 Condemned 6157 83B Taunton   COND  
19/05/1962 Reallocation 6126 85B Gloucester Horton Road 81E Didcot  
19/05/1962 Reallocation 6144 85D Kidderminster 81F Oxford  
19/05/1962 Reallocation 6146 83C Exeter 83B Taunton  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 6114 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 87G Carmarthen  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 6118 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 87G Carmarthen  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 6116 84E Tyseley 87J Fishguard Goodwick  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 6138     81D Reading (W.R.)  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 6151     87G Carmarthen  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 6164 81A Old Oak Common 81D Reading (W.R.)  
08/1962 Condemned 6109 81E Didcot   COND  
09/1962 Condemned 6146 83B Taunton   COND  
08/09/1962 Reallocation 6129 81F Oxford 84C Banbury  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 6147 82B St Philips Marsh 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 6155 83B Taunton 85A Worcester  
09/02/1963 Reallocation 6114 87G Carmarthen 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
09/02/1963 Reallocation 6118 87G Carmarthen 87H Neyland  
03/1963 Condemned 6119 81D Reading (W.R.)   COND  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 6106 81F Oxford 81D Reading (W.R.)  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 6148 83B Taunton 82B St Philips Marsh  
06/04/1963 Reallocation 6148 82B St Philips Marsh 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
04/05/1963 Reallocation 6116 87J Fishguard Goodwick 88B Radyr  
04/05/1963 Reallocation 6124 81F Oxford 81A Old Oak Common  
04/05/1963 Reallocation 6151 87G Carmarthen 86G Pontypool Road  
09/1963 Condemned 6138 81D Reading (W.R.)   COND  
28/09/1963 Reallocation 6118 87H Neyland 81D Reading (W.R.)  
12/10/1963 Reallocation 6137 85B Gloucester Horton Road 2A Tyseley  
11/1963 Condemned 6118 81D Reading (W.R.)   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 6151 86G Pontypool Road   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 6164 81D Reading (W.R.)   COND  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 6147 82E Bristol Barrow Road 83C Westbury  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 6158 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 88J Aberdare  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 6113 83B Taunton 88B Radyr  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 6114 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 86G Pontypool Road  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 6122 81D Reading (W.R.) 81D Reading (W.R.)  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 6137 2A Tyseley 2C Stourbridge Junction  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 6144 81F Oxford 85A Worcester  
12/1963 Condemned 6133 81C Southall   COND  
28/12/1963 Reallocation 6144 85A Worcester 88J Aberdare  
28/12/1963 Reallocation 6149 81F Oxford 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
28/12/1963 Reallocation 6165     81D Reading (W.R.)  
25/01/1964 Reallocation 6106 81D Reading (W.R.) 82C Swindon  
25/01/1964 Reallocation 6130 81E Didcot 82C Swindon  
25/01/1964 Reallocation 6139 81E Didcot 81C Southall  
25/01/1964 Reallocation 6140 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 85A Worcester  
25/01/1964 Reallocation 6147 83C Westbury 85A Worcester  
22/02/1964 Reallocation 6117 81B Slough 81C Southall  
04/05/1964 Reallocation 6124 81A Old Oak Common 88B Radyr  
04/05/1964 Reallocation 6126 81E Didcot 81F Oxford  
04/05/1964 Reallocation 6128 81B Slough 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
04/05/1964 Reallocation 6169 81A Old Oak Common 88B Radyr  
06/1964 Condemned 6124 88B Radyr   COND  
06/1964 Condemned 6144 88J Aberdare   COND  
06/1964 Condemned 6149 87A Neath (Court Sart)   COND  
06/1964 Condemned 6158 88J Aberdare   COND  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 6114 86G Pontypool Road 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 6115 86G Pontypool Road 86E Severn Tunnel Junction  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 6143     81C Southall  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 6148 82E Bristol Barrow Road 83B Taunton  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 6160 81B Slough 81C Southall  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 6167     81C Southall  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 6169 88B Radyr 85A Worcester  
07/1964 Condemned 6130 82C Swindon   COND  
07/1964 Condemned 6140 85A Worcester   COND  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 6106 82C Swindon 85A Worcester  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 6110 81C Southall 81A Old Oak Common  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 6156 81F Oxford 81A Old Oak Common  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 6165 81D Reading (W.R.) 81A Old Oak Common  
24/08/1964 Reallocation 6106 85A Worcester 82C Swindon  
24/08/1964 Reallocation 6110 81A Old Oak Common 81C Southall  
24/08/1964 Reallocation 6122 81D Reading (W.R.) 82C Swindon  
24/08/1964 Reallocation 6125 81A Old Oak Common 81C Southall  
24/08/1964 Reallocation 6141 81A Old Oak Common 81C Southall  
24/08/1964 Reallocation 6142     81C Southall  
24/08/1964 Reallocation 6156 81A Old Oak Common 81C Southall  
24/08/1964 Reallocation 6163 81A Old Oak Common 81C Southall  
24/08/1964 Reallocation 6165 81A Old Oak Common 81C Southall  
09/1964 Condemned 6122 82C Swindon   COND  
09/1964 Condemned 6131 81D Reading (W.R.)   COND  
09/1964 Condemned 6142 81C Southall   COND  
09/1964 Condemned 6148 83B Taunton   COND  
10/1964 Condemned 6114 86E Severn Tunnel Junction   COND  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 6108 88B Radyr 81F Oxford  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 6113 88B Radyr 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 6135     81D Reading (W.R.)  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 6156 81C Southall 81E Didcot  
11/1964 Condemned 6107 81D Reading (W.R.)   COND  
11/1964 Condemned 6115 86E Severn Tunnel Junction   COND  
11/1964 Condemned 6137 2C Stourbridge Junction   COND  
11/1964 Condemned 6139 81C Southall   COND  
08/11/1964 Reallocation 6106 82C Swindon 81E Didcot  
08/11/1964 Reallocation 6113 85B Gloucester Horton Road 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)  
08/11/1964 Reallocation 6128 85B Gloucester Horton Road 81C Southall  
29/11/1964 Reallocation 6113 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
12/1964 Condemned 6103 83C Exeter   COND  
27/12/1964 Reallocation 6112 81E Didcot 81C Southall  
01/1965 Condemned 6125 81C Southall   COND  
10/01/1965 Reallocation 6106 81E Didcot 81C Southall  
10/01/1965 Reallocation 6128 81C Southall 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
10/01/1965 Reallocation 6134 81D Reading (W.R.) 81C Southall  
10/01/1965 Reallocation 6135 81D Reading (W.R.) 81C Southall  
10/01/1965 Reallocation 6161 81D Reading (W.R.) 81C Southall  
16/01/1965 Reallocation 6129 84C Banbury 2C Stourbridge Junction  
03/1965 Condemned 6128 85B Gloucester Horton Road   COND  
03/1965 Condemned 6150 81F Oxford   COND  
28/03/1965 Reallocation 6110 81C Southall 81F Oxford  
16/05/1965 Reallocation 6156 81E Didcot 81C Southall  
06/1965 Condemned 6110 81F Oxford   COND  
06/1965 Condemned 6116 88B Radyr   COND  
06/1965 Condemned 6154 81F Oxford   COND  
06/1965 Condemned 6159 81E Didcot   COND  
25/06/1965 Reallocation 6145 98W   81F Oxford  
11/07/1965 Reallocation 6136 81E Didcot 81F Oxford  
06/08/1965 Condemned 6108 98W     COND  
08/08/1965 Reallocation 6160 81C Southall 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
09/1965 Condemned 6112 81C Southall   COND  
09/1965 Condemned 6117 81C Southall   COND  
09/1965 Condemned 6129 2C Stourbridge Junction   COND  
19/09/1965 Reallocation 6106 81C Southall 81F Oxford  
19/09/1965 Reallocation 6132 81C Southall 81F Oxford  
19/09/1965 Reallocation 6134 81C Southall 81F Oxford  
19/09/1965 Reallocation 6135 81C Southall 81F Oxford  
19/09/1965 Reallocation 6161 81C Southall 81F Oxford  
10/1965 Condemned 6132 81F Oxford   COND  
10/1965 Condemned 6155 85A Worcester   COND  
10/1965 Condemned 6161 81F Oxford   COND  
10/1965 Condemned 6163 81C Southall   COND  
10/1965 Condemned 6167 81C Southall   COND  
26/10/1965 Condemned 6169 98W     COND  
07/11/1965 Reallocation 6141 81C Southall 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
07/11/1965 Reallocation 6143 81C Southall 81F Oxford  
07/11/1965 Reallocation 6156 81C Southall 81F Oxford  
07/11/1965 Reallocation 6165 81C Southall 85A Worcester  
18/11/1965 Condemned 6113 85B Gloucester Horton Road   COND  
18/11/1965 Condemned 6143 81F Oxford   COND  
03/12/1965 Condemned 6156 81F Oxford   COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6106 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6111 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6126 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6134 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6135 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6136 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6141 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6145 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6147 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6160 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 6165 98W     COND