Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 117 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 2706 Week
» 24748 Month
» 131062 Year
» 642164 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Collett "5101" Class 2-6-2T


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sat 19/02/1938 5153,
5166,
5181,
5192
??,
??,
??,
??
  Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - In the shop.
Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - In the shop.
Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - In the shop.
Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - In the shop.
RO 3/1938  
Tue 17/08/1954 4103,
4125,
5151,
5166,
5184
84A,
??,
84A,
??,
84D
  Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works.
Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works.
Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works.
Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works.
Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works.
RO 9/1954  
Sun 04/03/1962 4123,
4126,
5167
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Triangle.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Triangle.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Triangle.
   
Sun 04/03/1962 4122,
4140,
4179
87H,
84F,
84A
  Wolverhampton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Wolverhampton Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Wolverhampton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
   
Sat 07/05/1966 4113,
4161
Wdn,
Wdn
  Cashmore's Scrapyard, Newport: Dumped
Cashmore's Scrapyard, Newport: Dumped
RO 8/1966  
Sat 07/05/1966 4158 Wdn   Birds Scrapyard, Bridgend: Dumped RO 8/1966