21/02/1930 |
To Service |
5150 |
|
NEW |
SWSTCK |
Swindon Stock shed |
|
22/02/1930 |
To Service |
5151 |
|
NEW |
SWSTCK |
Swindon Stock shed |
|
26/02/1930 |
To Service |
5152 |
|
NEW |
SWSTCK |
Swindon Stock shed |
|
12/03/1930 |
To Service |
5153 |
|
NEW |
CHR |
Chester West |
|
14/03/1930 |
To Service |
5154 |
|
NEW |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
14/03/1930 |
To Service |
5155 |
|
NEW |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
15/03/1930 |
To Service |
5156 |
|
NEW |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
24/03/1930 |
To Service |
5157 |
|
NEW |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
26/03/1930 |
To Service |
5158 |
|
NEW |
SWSTCK |
Swindon Stock shed |
|
28/03/1930 |
To Service |
5159 |
|
NEW |
PDK |
Pembroke Dock |
|
06/11/1930 |
To Service |
5160 |
|
NEW |
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
15/11/1930 |
To Service |
5161 |
|
NEW |
BAN |
Banbury |
|
21/11/1930 |
To Service |
5162 |
|
NEW |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
21/11/1930 |
To Service |
5164 |
|
NEW |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
22/11/1930 |
To Service |
5165 |
|
NEW |
SWSTCK |
Swindon Stock shed |
|
08/12/1930 |
To Service |
5163 |
|
NEW |
SWSTCK |
Swindon Stock shed |
|
16/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
5162 |
|
|
TYS.1 |
Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) |
|
16/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
5175 |
|
|
TYS.1 |
Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) |
|
14/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
4108 |
|
|
BAN |
Banbury |
|
14/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
5104 |
|
|
CHELHS |
Cheltenham High Street |
|
14/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
5165 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
14/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
5166 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
14/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
5171 |
|
|
TYS.1 |
Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) |
|
14/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
5178 |
|
|
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
11/01/1936 |
Reallocation |
4109 |
|
|
NA |
Newton Abbot |
|
11/01/1936 |
Reallocation |
5150 |
CHR |
Chester West |
CHR |
Chester West |
|
11/01/1936 |
Reallocation |
5189 |
|
|
CHR |
Chester West |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
5169 |
|
|
NA |
Newton Abbot |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
5174 |
|
|
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
07/03/1936 |
Reallocation |
4105 |
|
|
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
07/03/1936 |
Reallocation |
4109 |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
SBZ |
St Blazey |
|
07/03/1936 |
Reallocation |
5182 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
26/01/1946 |
Reallocation |
5182 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
23/03/1946 |
Reallocation |
4133 |
|
|
LA |
Laira |
|
20/04/1946 |
Reallocation |
4133 |
LA |
Laira |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
|
18/05/1946 |
Reallocation |
5172 |
|
|
TN |
Taunton |
|
18/05/1946 |
Reallocation |
5183 |
|
|
CDF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
07/09/1946 |
Reallocation |
4118 |
|
|
OXF |
Oxford |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4100 |
|
|
WOS |
Worcester |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4101 |
|
|
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4102 |
|
|
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4103 |
|
|
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4104 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4105 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4106 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4107 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4108 |
BAN |
Banbury |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4109 |
SBZ |
St Blazey |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4110 |
|
|
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4111 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4112 |
|
|
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4113 |
|
|
TN |
Taunton |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4114 |
|
|
WOS |
Worcester |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4115 |
|
|
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4116 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4117 |
|
|
TN |
Taunton |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4118 |
OXF |
Oxford |
BAN |
Banbury |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4119 |
|
|
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4120 |
|
|
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4121 |
|
|
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4122 |
|
|
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4123 |
|
|
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4124 |
|
|
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4125 |
|
|
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4126 |
|
|
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4127 |
|
|
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4128 |
|
|
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4129 |
|
|
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4130 |
|
|
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4131 |
|
|
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4132 |
|
|
NEATH |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4133 |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4134 |
87 |
|
LDR |
Landore |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4135 |
|
|
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4136 |
|
|
TN |
Taunton |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4137 |
|
|
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4138 |
|
|
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4139 |
|
|
WOS |
Worcester |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4140 |
|
|
GLO |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4141 |
|
|
CHEL |
Cheltenham Malvern Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4142 |
|
|
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4143 |
|
|
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4144 |
|
|
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4145 |
|
|
NPTG |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4146 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4147 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4148 |
|
|
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4149 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4150 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4151 |
|
|
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5101 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5102 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5103 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5104 |
CHELHS |
Cheltenham High Street |
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5105 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5106 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5107 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5108 |
|
|
NA |
Newton Abbot |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5109 |
|
|
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5110 |
|
|
KDR |
Kidderminster |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5150 |
CHR |
Chester West |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5151 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5152 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5153 |
|
|
NA |
Newton Abbot |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5154 |
|
|
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5155 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5156 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5157 |
|
|
NA |
Newton Abbot |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5158 |
|
|
SBZ |
St Blazey |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5159 |
|
|
THT |
Treherbert |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5160 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5161 |
|
|
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5162 |
TYS.1 |
Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5163 |
|
|
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5164 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5165 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5166 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5167 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5168 |
|
|
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5169 |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5170 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5171 |
TYS.1 |
Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5172 |
TN |
Taunton |
TN |
Taunton |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5173 |
|
|
WOS |
Worcester |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5174 |
LMTN |
Leamington |
CHR |
Chester West |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5175 |
TYS.1 |
Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5176 |
|
|
CHR |
Chester West |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5178 |
LMTN |
Leamington |
WLN |
Wellington |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5179 |
|
|
CHR |
Chester West |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5180 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5181 |
|
|
CHR |
Chester West |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5182 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5183 |
CDF |
Cardiff Canton |
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5184 |
|
|
CHR |
Chester West |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5185 |
|
|
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5186 |
|
|
CHR |
Chester West |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5187 |
|
|
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5188 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5189 |
CHR |
Chester West |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5190 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5191 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5192 |
|
|
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5193 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5194 |
|
|
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5195 |
CVRHY |
|
BRY |
Barry |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5196 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5197 |
|
|
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5198 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
5199 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5158 |
SBZ |
St Blazey |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4100 |
WOS |
Worcester |
KDR |
Kidderminster |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
5198 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
31/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
5187 |
LMTN |
Leamington |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
30/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
5166 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
30/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
5198 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
30/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4107 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
30/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4156 |
|
|
NPTG |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
30/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4159 |
|
|
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
30/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
5166 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
4107 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
4110 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
4142 |
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
SPM |
St Philips Marsh |
|
14/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
4142 |
SPM |
St Philips Marsh |
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
18/10/1948 |
To Service |
4166 |
|
NEW |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
22/10/1948 |
To Service |
4167 |
|
NEW |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
|
30/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
4107 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
30/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
4145 |
NPTG |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
CDF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
01/11/1948 |
To Service |
4168 |
|
NEW |
SDN |
Swindon |
|
16/11/1948 |
To Service |
4169 |
|
NEW |
SDN |
Swindon |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4130 |
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4148 |
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
NPTG |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
25/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
4107 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
29/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
4158 |
|
|
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
|
26/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
5190 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
26/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
4137 |
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
NPTG |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
26/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
5103 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
23/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
4101 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
21/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
4121 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
21/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
4124 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
CHR |
Chester West |
|
21/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
5103 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
21/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
5183 |
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
BRY |
Barry |
|
21/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
5190 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
18/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
4101 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
18/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
4110 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
4110 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
4124 |
CHR |
Chester West |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
5103 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
CHR |
Chester West |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
5190 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
08/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
5109 |
LMTN |
Leamington |
WLN |
Wellington |
|
08/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
5199 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
28/10/1949 |
To Service |
4173 |
|
NEW |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
02/11/1949 |
To Service |
4174 |
|
NEW |
CHEL |
Cheltenham Malvern Road |
|
05/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
4168 |
SDN |
Swindon |
NEY |
Neyland |
|
05/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
4169 |
SDN |
Swindon |
CARM |
Carmarthen |
|
05/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
5190 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
22/11/1949 |
To Service |
4177 |
|
NEW |
THT |
Treherbert |
|
29/11/1949 |
To Service |
4178 |
|
NEW |
NEATH |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
03/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
4100 |
VVOS |
|
KDR |
Kidderminster |
|
03/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
4121 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
|
03/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
4167 |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
TR |
Truro |
|
03/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
4168 |
NEY |
Neyland |
NPTG |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
4169 |
CARM |
Carmarthen |
NEATH |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
5162 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
LDR |
Landore |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
5190 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
4178 |
NEATH |
Neath (Court Sart) |
CARM |
Carmarthen |
|
25/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
4149 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
84C |
Banbury |
|
25/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
5182 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
25/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
5190 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
25/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
4157 |
|
|
84E |
Tyseley |
|
25/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
4159 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
25/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
5182 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
12/08/1950 |
Reallocation |
5176 |
CHR |
Chester West |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
4140 |
GLO |
Gloucester Horton Road |
85A |
Worcester |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
5176 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
4140 |
85A |
Worcester |
85A |
Worcester |
|
17/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
4140 |
85A |
Worcester |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
17/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
4177 |
THT |
Treherbert |
88C |
Barry |
|
17/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
5183 |
BRY |
Barry |
88F |
Treherbert |
|
31/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
4140 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
31/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
4177 |
88C |
Barry |
88C |
Barry |
|
31/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
5183 |
88F |
Treherbert |
88F |
Treherbert |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
5150 |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
83F |
Truro |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
5150 |
83F |
Truro |
83F |
Truro |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
4130 |
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
5150 |
83F |
Truro |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
5169 |
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
4130 |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
5150 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
5169 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
4130 |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
4155 |
|
|
85A |
Worcester |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
4130 |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
86B |
Newport Pill |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
4155 |
85A |
Worcester |
85A |
Worcester |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
4159 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
4159 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
21/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
4133 |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
83D |
Laira |
|
21/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
5151 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
30/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
5151 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
4133 |
83D |
Laira |
83D |
Laira |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
4151 |
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
5102 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
5151 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
4157 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
30/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
4157 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
14/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
4142 |
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
31/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
4142 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
4133 |
83D |
Laira |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
4159 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
5102 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
31/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
4133 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
31/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
4159 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
31/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
5102 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
31/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
4159 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
31/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
5106 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
03/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
4143 |
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
85A |
Worcester |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
4143 |
85A |
Worcester |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
4145 |
CDF |
Cardiff Canton |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
4152 |
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
4172 |
|
|
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
4102 |
LMTN |
Leamington |
84C |
Banbury |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
4134 |
LDR |
Landore |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
5102 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
5106 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
31/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
4143 |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
|
31/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
4145 |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
31/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
4152 |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
|
31/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
4172 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
31/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
4102 |
84C |
Banbury |
84C |
Banbury |
|
31/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
4134 |
87G |
Carmarthen |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
31/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
5102 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
31/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
5106 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
4172 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
5106 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
4102 |
84C |
Banbury |
84D |
Leamington |
|
31/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
4172 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
31/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
5106 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
4102 |
84D |
Leamington |
84C |
Banbury |
|
30/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
4102 |
84C |
Banbury |
84D |
Leamington |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
4102 |
84D |
Leamington |
84C |
Banbury |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
5102 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
5106 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
30/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
5102 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
30/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
5106 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
4166 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
5187 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
4101 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
4106 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
87E |
Landore |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
4107 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
87E |
Landore |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
4147 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
4157 |
84E |
Tyseley |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
4159 |
84E |
Tyseley |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
4165 |
|
|
84K |
Chester West |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
5102 |
84E |
Tyseley |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
5171 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
5173 |
WOS |
Worcester |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
5175 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
83D |
Laira |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
5182 |
84E |
Tyseley |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
5188 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
5190 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
5193 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
83F |
Truro |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
5196 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
83F |
Truro |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
5106 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
5177 |
|
|
84K |
Chester West |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
4158 |
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
84H |
Wellington |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
5182 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
5196 |
83F |
Truro |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
4121 |
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
4139 |
WOS |
Worcester |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
4142 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
4178 |
CARM |
Carmarthen |
84H |
Wellington |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
5163 |
LMTN |
Leamington |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
5184 |
CHR |
Chester West |
84D |
Leamington |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
5155 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
4105 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
81F |
Oxford |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
4147 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
81F |
Oxford |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
4150 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
4167 |
TR |
Truro |
83E |
St Blazey |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
5170 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
84C |
Banbury |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
5190 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
82F |
Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
5197 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
4105 |
81F |
Oxford |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
4115 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
84K |
Chester West |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
4150 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
82F |
Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
4154 |
|
|
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
5157 |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
83B |
Taunton |
|
08/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
5183 |
88F |
Treherbert |
88C |
Barry |
|
08/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
5193 |
83F |
Truro |
83E |
St Blazey |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
5195 |
BRY |
Barry |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
4101 |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
4155 |
85A |
Worcester |
84H |
Wellington |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
4160 |
|
|
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
4161 |
|
|
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
4163 |
|
|
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
4164 |
|
|
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
5162 |
LDR |
Landore |
88F |
Treherbert |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
5181 |
CHR |
Chester West |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
5195 |
84E |
Tyseley |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
4103 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
4113 |
TN |
Taunton |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
4133 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
82D |
Westbury |
|
25/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
4103 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
25/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
4113 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
85A |
Worcester |
|
25/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
4137 |
NPTG |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
25/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
4145 |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
25/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
4154 |
87G |
Carmarthen |
85A |
Worcester |
|
25/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
4156 |
NPTG |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
25/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
4166 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
26/12/1953 |
Reallocation |
4162 |
|
|
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
|
26/12/1953 |
Reallocation |
5195 |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
88F |
Treherbert |
|
24/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
4131 |
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
22/05/1954 |
Reallocation |
4171 |
|
|
84E |
Tyseley |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
4131 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
87H |
Neyland |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
4166 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
87H |
Neyland |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
4166 |
87H |
Neyland |
82D |
Westbury |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
4176 |
|
|
83B |
Taunton |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
5192 |
LMTN |
Leamington |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
14/08/1954 |
Reallocation |
4145 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
4114 |
WOS |
Worcester |
85D |
Kidderminster |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
4118 |
BAN |
Banbury |
84D |
Leamington |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
4140 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
4142 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
4171 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84D |
Leamington |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
5192 |
87G |
Carmarthen |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
4167 |
83E |
St Blazey |
83D |
Laira |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
5193 |
83E |
St Blazey |
83D |
Laira |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
4148 |
NPTG |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
4167 |
83D |
Laira |
83E |
St Blazey |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
4169 |
NEATH |
Neath (Court Sart) |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
01/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
4169 |
87F |
Llanelli |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
01/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
4178 |
84H |
Wellington |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
4106 |
87E |
Landore |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
4114 |
85D |
Kidderminster |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
4133 |
82D |
Westbury |
83C |
Exeter |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
4142 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
4178 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84H |
Wellington |
|
23/04/1955 |
Reallocation |
4106 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
87E |
Landore |
|
23/04/1955 |
Reallocation |
4133 |
83C |
Exeter |
82D |
Westbury |
|
21/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
4102 |
84C |
Banbury |
84K |
Chester West |
|
21/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
4155 |
84H |
Wellington |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
21/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
5109 |
WLN |
Wellington |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
21/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
5164 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
84H |
Wellington |
|
18/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
4130 |
86B |
Newport Pill |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
18/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
5167 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
84H |
Wellington |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
4130 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
4133 |
82D |
Westbury |
82F |
Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
4166 |
82D |
Westbury |
82F |
Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
5188 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
13/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
4109 |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
83B |
Taunton |
|
13/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
4148 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
85A |
Worcester |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
4101 |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
4109 |
83B |
Taunton |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
4131 |
87H |
Neyland |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
4142 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
84H |
Wellington |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
4150 |
82F |
Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
83B |
Taunton |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
4176 |
83B |
Taunton |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
4177 |
88C |
Barry |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
5152 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
84C |
Banbury |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
5182 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
82D |
Westbury |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
5188 |
87G |
Carmarthen |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
4105 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
5154 |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
88F |
Treherbert |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
5168 |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
88F |
Treherbert |
|
28/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
5190 |
82F |
Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
81F |
Oxford |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
4114 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
85D |
Kidderminster |
|
16/04/1956 |
Condemned |
5159 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
5182 |
82D |
Westbury |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
4106 |
87E |
Landore |
83F |
Truro |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
4107 |
87E |
Landore |
83F |
Truro |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
4114 |
85D |
Kidderminster |
83G |
Penzance |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
4119 |
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
4134 |
87G |
Carmarthen |
83F |
Truro |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
4148 |
85A |
Worcester |
83G |
Penzance |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
4159 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
83B |
Taunton |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
4174 |
CHEL |
Cheltenham Malvern Road |
83D |
Laira |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
5102 |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
83F |
Truro |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
5107 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
83G |
Penzance |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
5161 |
LMTN |
Leamington |
83G |
Penzance |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
5184 |
84D |
Leamington |
83G |
Penzance |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
5186 |
CHR |
Chester West |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
14/07/1956 |
Reallocation |
4106 |
83F |
Truro |
87E |
Landore |
|
14/07/1956 |
Reallocation |
4107 |
83F |
Truro |
87E |
Landore |
|
14/07/1956 |
Reallocation |
4114 |
83G |
Penzance |
85D |
Kidderminster |
|
14/07/1956 |
Reallocation |
4134 |
83F |
Truro |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
14/07/1956 |
Reallocation |
4148 |
83G |
Penzance |
85A |
Worcester |
|
14/07/1956 |
Reallocation |
4174 |
83D |
Laira |
83C |
Exeter |
|
14/07/1956 |
Reallocation |
5102 |
83F |
Truro |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
14/07/1956 |
Reallocation |
5107 |
83G |
Penzance |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
14/07/1956 |
Reallocation |
5161 |
83G |
Penzance |
84D |
Leamington |
|
14/07/1956 |
Reallocation |
5184 |
83G |
Penzance |
84D |
Leamington |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
4101 |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
88F |
Treherbert |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
4157 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
83B |
Taunton |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
4178 |
84H |
Wellington |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
4101 |
88F |
Treherbert |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
4105 |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
5154 |
88F |
Treherbert |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
5160 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
84K |
Chester West |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
5164 |
84H |
Wellington |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
5178 |
WLN |
Wellington |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
5183 |
88C |
Barry |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
5168 |
88F |
Treherbert |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
5195 |
88F |
Treherbert |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
4150 |
83B |
Taunton |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
5162 |
88F |
Treherbert |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
5157 |
83B |
Taunton |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
4110 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
84H |
Wellington |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
4146 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
4120 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
84H |
Wellington |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
4122 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
4123 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
4124 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
4125 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
4126 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
4127 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
4128 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
84K |
Chester West |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
4129 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
4138 |
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
86H |
Aberbeeg |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
4139 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
85D |
Kidderminster |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
5171 |
87G |
Carmarthen |
86F |
Tondu |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
5176 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
25/04/1957 |
Condemned |
5161 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
4117 |
TN |
Taunton |
83C |
Exeter |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
4138 |
86H |
Aberbeeg |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
4146 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
24/06/1957 |
Condemned |
5109 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
13/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
4100 |
KDR |
Kidderminster |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
13/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
4117 |
83C |
Exeter |
83B |
Taunton |
|
13/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
4139 |
85D |
Kidderminster |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
13/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
5101 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
84D |
Leamington |
|
30/07/1957 |
Condemned |
5107 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
COND |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
5165 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
5188 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
4144 |
STJ |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
86F |
Tondu |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
4117 |
83B |
Taunton |
83C |
Exeter |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
4174 |
83C |
Exeter |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
02/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
4125 |
84E |
Tyseley |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
02/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
4127 |
84E |
Tyseley |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
02/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
4128 |
84K |
Chester West |
84D |
Leamington |
|
02/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
5105 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
02/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
5106 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
83D |
Laira |
|
02/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
5156 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
85C |
Hereford |
|
02/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
5166 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
02/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
5181 |
84E |
Tyseley |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
02/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
5198 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
84D |
Leamington |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
4103 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
84D |
Leamington |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
4125 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
81F |
Oxford |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
4148 |
85A |
Worcester |
81F |
Oxford |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
5191 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
4119 |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
4138 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
85A |
Worcester |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
4140 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
4168 |
NPTG |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
10/02/1958 |
Condemned |
5165 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
4101 |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
4130 |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
4175 |
|
|
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
5104 |
LMTN |
Leamington |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
5193 |
83D |
Laira |
83E |
St Blazey |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
4122 |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
87E |
Landore |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
4123 |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
4142 |
84H |
Wellington |
85A |
Worcester |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
5188 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
19/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
4105 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
19/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
4138 |
85A |
Worcester |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
19/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
4161 |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
19/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
4162 |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
4143 |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
88A |
Radyr |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
4152 |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
88A |
Radyr |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
4160 |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
88A |
Radyr |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
4163 |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
88A |
Radyr |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
4164 |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
88A |
Radyr |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
4175 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
85D |
Kidderminster |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
5156 |
85C |
Hereford |
85A |
Worcester |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
5188 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
12/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
4125 |
81F |
Oxford |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
12/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
5194 |
LMTN |
Leamington |
83B |
Taunton |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
4105 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
4108 |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
4128 |
84D |
Leamington |
83B |
Taunton |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
5180 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
87H |
Neyland |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
5184 |
84D |
Leamington |
83B |
Taunton |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
5185 |
LMTN |
Leamington |
83B |
Taunton |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
5186 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
03/07/1958 |
Condemned |
4138 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
04/07/1958 |
Condemned |
5108 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
08/07/1958 |
Condemned |
4139 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
16/07/1958 |
Condemned |
5162 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
28/07/1958 |
Condemned |
5157 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
28/07/1958 |
Condemned |
5171 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
4102 |
84K |
Chester West |
82C |
Swindon |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
4115 |
84K |
Chester West |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
4121 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
86F |
Tondu |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
4125 |
84E |
Tyseley |
81F |
Oxford |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
4165 |
84K |
Chester West |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
5103 |
CHR |
Chester West |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
5156 |
85A |
Worcester |
85C |
Hereford |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
5160 |
84K |
Chester West |
83E |
St Blazey |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
5177 |
84K |
Chester West |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
5179 |
CHR |
Chester West |
86F |
Tondu |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
5198 |
84D |
Leamington |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
18/08/1958 |
Condemned |
5168 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
4116 |
TYS |
Tyseley |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
4124 |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
85A |
Worcester |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
4136 |
TN |
Taunton |
83G |
Penzance |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
4152 |
88A |
Radyr |
85A |
Worcester |
|
09/09/1958 |
Condemned |
5156 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
4117 |
83C |
Exeter |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
4122 |
87E |
Landore |
87H |
Neyland |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
4164 |
88A |
Radyr |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
5179 |
86F |
Tondu |
85A |
Worcester |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
5184 |
83B |
Taunton |
84D |
Leamington |
|
06/10/1958 |
Condemned |
5172 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
16/10/1958 |
Condemned |
5105 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
01/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
4161 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
01/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
4162 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84D |
Leamington |
|
01/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
5188 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
01/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
5194 |
83B |
Taunton |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
25/11/1958 |
Condemned |
5160 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
29/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
4109 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
85D |
Kidderminster |
|
29/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
5198 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
81F |
Oxford |
|
27/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
4115 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
85C |
Hereford |
|
27/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
4126 |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
24/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
5198 |
81F |
Oxford |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
21/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
4129 |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
82C |
Swindon |
|
21/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
4163 |
88A |
Radyr |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
21/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
5153 |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
81B |
Slough |
|
21/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
4109 |
85D |
Kidderminster |
85A |
Worcester |
|
21/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
4117 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
83C |
Exeter |
|
21/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
5153 |
81B |
Slough |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
18/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
4161 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
11/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
4129 |
82C |
Swindon |
83B |
Taunton |
|
11/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
5197 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
03/08/1959 |
Condemned |
5189 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
10/08/1959 |
Condemned |
5186 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
4103 |
84D |
Leamington |
81F |
Oxford |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
4108 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
83F |
Truro |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
4110 |
84H |
Wellington |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
4129 |
83B |
Taunton |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
4146 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
84B |
Oxley |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
4163 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
88A |
Radyr |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
5167 |
84H |
Wellington |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
31/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
5110 |
KDR |
Kidderminster |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
02/11/1959 |
Condemned |
5163 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
28/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
5110 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
85A |
Worcester |
|
28/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
5173 |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
07/12/1959 |
Condemned |
5170 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
24/12/1959 |
Condemned |
5196 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
26/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
4174 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
83D |
Laira |
|
26/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
5180 |
87H |
Neyland |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
26/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
5194 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
84D |
Leamington |
|
18/01/1960 |
Condemned |
4164 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
25/01/1960 |
Condemned |
5155 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
4129 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
4146 |
84B |
Oxley |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
4154 |
85A |
Worcester |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
4174 |
83D |
Laira |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
5167 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
5197 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
27/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
5110 |
85A |
Worcester |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
14/03/1960 |
Condemned |
5102 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
14/03/1960 |
Condemned |
5106 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
14/03/1960 |
Condemned |
5178 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
15/03/1960 |
Condemned |
5185 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
26/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
4152 |
85A |
Worcester |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
26/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
5177 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
84D |
Leamington |
|
23/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
4154 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
84C |
Banbury |
|
23/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
5167 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84C |
Banbury |
|
21/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
4105 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
83C |
Exeter |
|
21/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
4145 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
83C |
Exeter |
|
21/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
4150 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
83C |
Exeter |
|
21/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
4176 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
83C |
Exeter |
|
21/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
4178 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
83C |
Exeter |
|
21/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
5174 |
CHR |
Chester West |
83C |
Exeter |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
4107 |
87E |
Landore |
87H |
Neyland |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
4129 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
83C |
Exeter |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
4134 |
87G |
Carmarthen |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
5198 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
83E |
St Blazey |
|
11/07/1960 |
Condemned |
4162 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
16/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
4120 |
84H |
Wellington |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
21/07/1960 |
Condemned |
5179 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
21/07/1960 |
Condemned |
5197 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
13/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
4132 |
NEATH |
Neath (Court Sart) |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
13/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
4142 |
85A |
Worcester |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
13/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
4147 |
81F |
Oxford |
87E |
Landore |
|
13/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
4165 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
15/08/1960 |
Condemned |
5150 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
10/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
4147 |
87E |
Landore |
81F |
Oxford |
|
16/09/1960 |
Condemned |
4170 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
16/09/1960 |
Condemned |
5169 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
4105 |
83C |
Exeter |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
4108 |
83F |
Truro |
88H |
Tondu |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
4117 |
83C |
Exeter |
83B |
Taunton |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
4129 |
83C |
Exeter |
84G |
Kidderminster |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
4167 |
83E |
St Blazey |
85A |
Worcester |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
4178 |
83C |
Exeter |
84H |
Wellington |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
5174 |
83C |
Exeter |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
05/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
4145 |
83C |
Exeter |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
05/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
5151 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
84G |
Kidderminster |
|
05/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
5175 |
83D |
Laira |
83C |
Exeter |
|
05/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
5187 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
05/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
5193 |
83E |
St Blazey |
83D |
Laira |
|
09/11/1960 |
Condemned |
5104 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
4120 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84H |
Wellington |
|
03/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
4143 |
88A |
Radyr |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
03/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
4159 |
83B |
Taunton |
87H |
Neyland |
|
03/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
4176 |
83C |
Exeter |
84D |
Leamington |
|
03/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
5193 |
83D |
Laira |
87H |
Neyland |
|
05/12/1960 |
Condemned |
5110 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
23/12/1960 |
Condemned |
5103 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
31/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
5175 |
83C |
Exeter |
83D |
Laira |
|
31/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
5198 |
83E |
St Blazey |
83B |
Taunton |
|
10/01/1961 |
Condemned |
5176 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
28/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
4163 |
88A |
Radyr |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
28/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
5190 |
81F |
Oxford |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
25/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
4165 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
83C |
Exeter |
|
06/04/1961 |
Condemned |
5158 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
18/04/1961 |
Condemned |
5175 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
18/04/1961 |
Condemned |
5194 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
22/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
4131 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
22/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
4147 |
81F |
Oxford |
84G |
Kidderminster |
|
22/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
4179 |
|
|
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
22/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
5183 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
20/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
4125 |
81F |
Oxford |
84D |
Leamington |
|
20/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
4167 |
85A |
Worcester |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
30/05/1961 |
Condemned |
5166 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
30/05/1961 |
Condemned |
5177 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
13/06/1961 |
Condemned |
5195 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
4106 |
87E |
Landore |
87H |
Neyland |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
5173 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
20/06/1961 |
Condemned |
5198 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
4131 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
4150 |
83C |
Exeter |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
12/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
4125 |
84D |
Leamington |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
12/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
4143 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
83B |
Taunton |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
4106 |
87H |
Neyland |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
25/09/1961 |
Condemned |
4117 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
4106 |
87G |
Carmarthen |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
4109 |
85A |
Worcester |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
4110 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
4157 |
83B |
Taunton |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
5152 |
84C |
Banbury |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
5173 |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
5199 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
04/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
5164 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
04/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
5192 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84D |
Leamington |
|
05/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
4133 |
82F |
Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
05/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
4166 |
82F |
Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
88B |
Radyr |
|
14/11/1961 |
Condemned |
5174 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
17/11/1961 |
Condemned |
4123 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
30/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
4103 |
81F |
Oxford |
83B |
Taunton |
|
24/01/1962 |
Condemned |
4126 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
27/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
4125 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84D |
Leamington |
|
27/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
4174 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
82D |
Westbury |
|
27/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
5180 |
87G |
Carmarthen |
82D |
Westbury |
|
29/01/1962 |
Condemned |
5167 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
24/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
4148 |
81F |
Oxford |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
24/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
4112 |
LMTN |
Leamington |
84C |
Banbury |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
4135 |
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
86C |
Hereford |
|
14/05/1962 |
Condemned |
5187 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
19/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
4120 |
84H |
Wellington |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
19/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
5192 |
84D |
Leamington |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
21/05/1962 |
Condemned |
5183 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
25/05/1962 |
Condemned |
5182 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
4165 |
83C |
Exeter |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
22/06/1962 |
Condemned |
5193 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
03/07/1962 |
Condemned |
5180 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
4104 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
85A |
Worcester |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
4110 |
84E |
Tyseley |
83B |
Taunton |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
4120 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
4132 |
87G |
Carmarthen |
87H |
Neyland |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
4137 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
4146 |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
4150 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
82D |
Westbury |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
4151 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
4157 |
84E |
Tyseley |
82D |
Westbury |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
4159 |
87H |
Neyland |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
5190 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
83C |
Exeter |
|
19/07/1962 |
Condemned |
5188 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
10/08/1962 |
Condemned |
4112 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
11/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
4150 |
82D |
Westbury |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
11/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
4178 |
84H |
Wellington |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
16/08/1962 |
Condemned |
4146 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
17/08/1962 |
Condemned |
5151 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
17/08/1962 |
Condemned |
5173 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
24/08/1962 |
Condemned |
5181 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
05/09/1962 |
Condemned |
4118 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
05/09/1962 |
Condemned |
5190 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
4137 |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
4151 |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
4158 |
84H |
Wellington |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
4161 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
4178 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
84D |
Leamington |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
5153 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
84G |
Kidderminster |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
5154 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
5184 |
84D |
Leamington |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
13/09/1962 |
Condemned |
4106 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
13/09/1962 |
Condemned |
4152 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
17/09/1962 |
Condemned |
4129 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
21/09/1962 |
Condemned |
4102 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
21/09/1962 |
Condemned |
4116 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
06/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
4103 |
83B |
Taunton |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
06/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
4105 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84C |
Banbury |
|
06/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
4120 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84D |
Leamington |
|
06/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
4128 |
83B |
Taunton |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
06/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
4148 |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
06/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
4173 |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
84G |
Kidderminster |
|
30/10/1962 |
Condemned |
4163 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
COND |
|
03/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
4103 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
03/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
4131 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
03/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
4133 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84D |
Leamington |
|
15/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
4110 |
83B |
Taunton |
83B |
Taunton |
|
15/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
4144 |
86F |
Tondu |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
15/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
5152 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
85A |
Worcester |
|
18/12/1962 |
Condemned |
4145 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
COND |
|
01/01/1963 |
Condemned |
4127 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
COND |
|
09/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
4115 |
85C |
Hereford |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
26/02/1963 |
Condemned |
4149 |
84C |
Banbury |
|
COND |
|
01/03/1963 |
Condemned |
4141 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
5199 |
98W |
|
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
15/03/1963 |
Condemned |
5199 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
COND |
|
30/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
4101 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
84C |
Banbury |
|
05/04/1963 |
Condemned |
5164 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
06/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
4104 |
85A |
Worcester |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
06/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
4160 |
88A |
Radyr |
88B |
Radyr |
|
04/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
4157 |
82D |
Westbury |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
04/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
4161 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
86C |
Hereford |
|
04/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
4174 |
82D |
Westbury |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
04/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
5154 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
86C |
Hereford |
|
13/05/1963 |
Condemned |
4134 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
01/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
4110 |
83B |
Taunton |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
15/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
4151 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
84D |
Leamington |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
4148 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
84B |
Oxley |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
4165 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
84B |
Oxley |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
4172 |
84E |
Tyseley |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
4179 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
84B |
Oxley |
|
24/06/1963 |
Condemned |
5101 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
24/06/1963 |
Condemned |
5192 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
29/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
4136 |
83G |
Penzance |
87H |
Neyland |
|
27/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
4108 |
88H |
Tondu |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
29/08/1963 |
Condemned |
5154 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
13/09/1963 |
Condemned |
4119 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
28/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
4107 |
87H |
Neyland |
86C |
Hereford |
|
28/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
4122 |
87H |
Neyland |
88G |
Llantrisant |
|
28/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
4132 |
87H |
Neyland |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
28/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
4142 |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
4122 |
88G |
Llantrisant |
88J |
Aberdare |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
4124 |
85A |
Worcester |
88J |
Aberdare |
|
20/11/1963 |
Condemned |
4114 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
20/11/1963 |
Condemned |
4140 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
20/11/1963 |
Condemned |
5152 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
4136 |
87H |
Neyland |
88J |
Aberdare |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
4143 |
83B |
Taunton |
88B |
Radyr |
|
28/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
4124 |
88J |
Aberdare |
85A |
Worcester |
|
28/12/1963 |
Condemned |
4142 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
01/02/1964 |
Condemned |
4105 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
11/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
4179 |
84B |
Oxley |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
20/04/1964 |
Condemned |
4109 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
04/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
4121 |
86F |
Tondu |
88J |
Aberdare |
|
14/05/1964 |
Condemned |
4104 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
16/05/1964 |
Condemned |
4167 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
08/06/1964 |
Condemned |
4135 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
13/06/1964 |
Condemned |
4101 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
15/06/1964 |
Condemned |
4122 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
15/06/1964 |
Condemned |
4128 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
15/06/1964 |
Condemned |
4136 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
15/06/1964 |
Condemned |
4143 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
15/06/1964 |
Condemned |
4159 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
15/06/1964 |
Condemned |
4166 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
15/06/1964 |
Condemned |
4174 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
15/06/1964 |
Condemned |
5191 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
06/07/1964 |
Condemned |
4130 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
20/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
4132 |
98W |
|
88B |
Radyr |
|
20/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
4169 |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
88B |
Radyr |
|
24/07/1964 |
Condemned |
4132 |
88B |
Radyr |
|
COND |
|
10/08/1964 |
Condemned |
4124 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
15/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
4147 |
84G |
Kidderminster |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
4153 |
|
|
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
4173 |
84G |
Kidderminster |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
4175 |
85D |
Kidderminster |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
15/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
5153 |
84G |
Kidderminster |
2L |
Leamington |
|
07/09/1964 |
Condemned |
4103 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
07/09/1964 |
Condemned |
4131 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
09/10/1964 |
Condemned |
4108 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
09/10/1964 |
Condemned |
4137 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
12/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
4160 |
88B |
Radyr |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
23/10/1964 |
Condemned |
5184 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
24/10/1964 |
Condemned |
4133 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
24/10/1964 |
Condemned |
4171 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
24/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
4178 |
84D |
Leamington |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
08/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
4107 |
86C |
Hereford |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
08/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
4110 |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
88B |
Radyr |
|
08/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
4157 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
08/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
4161 |
86C |
Hereford |
85A |
Worcester |
|
14/11/1964 |
Condemned |
4120 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
21/11/1964 |
Condemned |
4153 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
21/11/1964 |
Condemned |
5153 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
05/12/1964 |
Condemned |
4173 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
16/01/1965 |
Condemned |
4172 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
27/02/1965 |
Condemned |
4179 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
4125 |
84D |
Leamington |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
4151 |
84D |
Leamington |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
17/04/1965 |
Condemned |
4151 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
4176 |
84D |
Leamington |
2B |
Oxley |
|
15/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
4154 |
84C |
Banbury |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
16/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
4110 |
88B |
Radyr |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
21/05/1965 |
Condemned |
4169 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
21/05/1965 |
Condemned |
4177 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
03/06/1965 |
Condemned |
4110 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
03/06/1965 |
Condemned |
4144 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
03/06/1965 |
Condemned |
4160 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
13/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
4115 |
98W |
|
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
16/06/1965 |
Condemned |
4115 |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
COND |
|
16/06/1965 |
Condemned |
4121 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
16/06/1965 |
Condemned |
4150 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
16/06/1965 |
Condemned |
4156 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
16/06/1965 |
Condemned |
4157 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
19/06/1965 |
Condemned |
4125 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
4154 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
2B |
Oxley |
|
19/06/1965 |
Condemned |
4158 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
4178 |
2A |
Tyseley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
25/06/1965 |
Condemned |
4107 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
17/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
4147 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
17/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
4168 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
18/09/1965 |
Condemned |
4111 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
25/09/1965 |
Condemned |
4148 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
25/09/1965 |
Condemned |
4155 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
25/09/1965 |
Condemned |
4178 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
02/10/1965 |
Condemned |
4147 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
02/10/1965 |
Condemned |
4154 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
02/10/1965 |
Condemned |
4168 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
02/10/1965 |
Condemned |
4175 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
09/10/1965 |
Condemned |
4165 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
09/10/1965 |
Condemned |
4176 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
26/10/1965 |
Condemned |
4100 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
18/11/1965 |
Condemned |
4113 |
85A |
Worcester |
|
COND |
|
18/11/1965 |
Condemned |
4161 |
85A |
Worcester |
|
COND |
|