GWR Collett "5101" Class 2-6-2T
Class | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5101 | 4100 | 15/08/1935 | WOS KDR KDR 85B W |
Worcester Kidderminster Kidderminster Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/02/1948 05/11/1949 03/12/1949 13/07/1957 10/1965 |
26/10/1965 |
5101 | 4101 | 22/08/1935 | SRD TYS TYS 87B 88D 88A 88F 88A 85B 84C W |
Stafford Road Tyseley Tyseley Duffryn Yard Merthyr Tydfil Cardiff Cathays Treherbert Cardiff Cathays Gloucester Horton Road Banbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 23/04/1949 18/06/1949 01/11/1952 03/10/1953 08/10/1955 11/08/1956 08/09/1956 22/02/1958 30/03/1963 06/1964 |
13/06/1964 |
5101 | 4102 | 29/08/1935 | LMTN 84C 84C 84D 84C 84D 84C 84K 82C W |
Leamington Banbury Banbury Leamington Banbury Leamington Banbury Chester West Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 29/12/1951 31/01/1952 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 30/04/1952 17/05/1952 21/05/1955 09/08/1958 09/1962 |
21/09/1962 |
5101 | 4103 | 29/08/1935 | SRD 84E 84A 84D 81F 83B 82B 82E W |
Stafford Road Tyseley Stafford Road Leamington Oxford Taunton St Philips Marsh Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/10/1953 25/11/1953 30/11/1957 05/09/1959 30/12/1961 06/10/1962 03/11/1962 09/1964 |
07/09/1964 |
5101 | 4104 | 31/08/1935 | STB 85A 85B W |
Stourbridge Junction Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/07/1962 06/04/1963 05/1964 |
14/05/1964 |
5101 | 4105 | 07/09/1935 | SRD SRD 81F 84G 88A 83A 82B 83A 83C 84E 84C W |
Stafford Road Stafford Road Oxford Shrewsbury Cardiff Cathays Newton Abbot St Philips Marsh Newton Abbot Exeter Tyseley Banbury Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 15/06/1947 16/05/1953 11/07/1953 03/12/1955 08/09/1956 19/04/1958 14/06/1958 21/05/1960 08/10/1960 06/10/1962 02/1964 |
01/02/1964 |
5101 | 4106 | 11/09/1935 | TYS 87E 86E 87E 83F 87E 87H 87G 85B W |
Tyseley Landore Severn Tunnel Junction Landore Truro Landore Neyland Carmarthen Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/11/1952 26/03/1955 23/04/1955 16/06/1956 14/07/1956 17/06/1961 09/09/1961 07/10/1961 09/1962 |
13/09/1962 |
5101 | 4107 | 16/09/1935 | TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS 87E 83F 87E 87H 86C 86E W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Landore Truro Landore Neyland Hereford Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/06/1948 04/09/1948 30/10/1948 25/12/1948 01/11/1952 16/06/1956 14/07/1956 18/06/1960 28/09/1963 08/11/1964 06/1965 |
25/06/1965 |
5101 | 4108 | 17/09/1935 | BAN SRD 83A 83F 88H 87A W |
Banbury Stafford Road Newton Abbot Truro Tondu Neath (Court Sart) Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 15/06/1947 14/06/1958 03/10/1959 08/10/1960 27/07/1963 10/1964 |
09/10/1964 |
5101 | 4109 | 19/09/1935 | NA SBZ NA 83B 83A 85D 85A 85B W |
Newton Abbot St Blazey Newton Abbot Taunton Newton Abbot Kidderminster Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 07/03/1936 15/06/1947 13/08/1955 08/10/1955 29/11/1958 21/03/1959 07/10/1961 04/1964 |
20/04/1964 |
5101 | 4110 | 06/10/1936 | SRD TYS TYS TYS 84H 84F 84E 83B 83B 87A 88B 86E W |
Stafford Road Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Wellington Stourbridge Junction Tyseley Taunton Taunton Neath (Court Sart) Radyr Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/09/1948 18/06/1949 16/07/1949 29/12/1956 03/10/1959 07/10/1961 14/07/1962 15/12/1962 01/06/1963 08/11/1964 16/05/1965 06/1965 |
03/06/1965 |
5101 | 4111 | 10/10/1936 | TYS W |
Tyseley Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/1965 |
18/09/1965 |
5101 | 4112 | 15/10/1936 | LMTN 84C W |
Leamington Banbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 24/03/1962 08/1962 |
10/08/1962 |
5101 | 4113 | 20/10/1936 | TN 85B 85A W |
Taunton Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/10/1953 25/11/1953 18/11/1965 |
18/11/1965 |
5101 | 4114 | 28/10/1936 | WOS 85D 86E 85D 83G 85D W |
Worcester Kidderminster Severn Tunnel Junction Kidderminster Penzance Kidderminster Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/10/1954 26/03/1955 25/02/1956 16/06/1956 14/07/1956 11/1963 |
20/11/1963 |
5101 | 4115 | 31/10/1936 | SRD 84K 83A 85C 86E W 86E |
Stafford Road Chester West Newton Abbot Hereford Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn Severn Tunnel Junction |
15/06/1947 11/07/1953 09/08/1958 27/12/1958 09/02/1963 06/1965 13/06/1965 |
16/06/1965 |
5101 | 4116 | 05/11/1936 | TYS 85B W |
Tyseley Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/09/1958 09/1962 |
21/09/1962 |
5101 | 4117 | 11/11/1936 | TN 83C 83B 83C 83A 83C 83B W |
Taunton Exeter Taunton Exeter Newton Abbot Exeter Taunton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/05/1957 13/07/1957 05/10/1957 04/10/1958 21/03/1959 08/10/1960 09/1961 |
25/09/1961 |
5101 | 4118 | 13/11/1936 | OXF BAN 84D W |
Oxford Banbury Leamington Withdrawn |
07/09/1946 15/06/1947 09/10/1954 09/1962 |
05/09/1962 |
5101 | 4119 | 20/11/1936 | STJ 86A 86E W |
Severn Tunnel Junction Ebbw Junction (Newport) Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/06/1956 25/01/1958 09/1963 |
13/09/1963 |
5101 | 4120 | 11/12/1937 | BHD 84H 84E 84H 84A 84E 84D W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Wellington Tyseley Wellington Stafford Road Tyseley Leamington Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 20/04/1957 16/07/1960 03/12/1960 19/05/1962 14/07/1962 06/10/1962 11/1964 |
14/11/1964 |
5101 | 4121 | 11/12/1937 | BHD SRD PPRD 86E 86F 88J W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Stafford Road Pontypool Road Severn Tunnel Junction Tondu Aberdare Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/05/1949 03/12/1949 21/02/1953 09/08/1958 04/05/1964 06/1965 |
16/06/1965 |
5101 | 4122 | 01/01/1938 | BHD 88A 87E 87H 88G 88J W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Cardiff Cathays Landore Neyland Llantrisant Aberdare Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 20/04/1957 22/03/1958 04/10/1958 28/09/1963 02/11/1963 06/1964 |
15/06/1964 |
5101 | 4123 | 01/01/1938 | BHD 88A 85B W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Cardiff Cathays Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 20/04/1957 22/03/1958 11/1961 |
17/11/1961 |
5101 | 4124 | 14/01/1938 | BHD CHR BHD 88A 85A 88J 85A W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Chester West Birkenhead Mollington Street Cardiff Cathays Worcester Aberdare Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/05/1949 16/07/1949 20/04/1957 06/09/1958 02/11/1963 28/12/1963 08/1964 |
10/08/1964 |
5101 | 4125 | 02/05/1938 | BHD 84E 86E 81F 84E 81F 84D 84E 84D 2A W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Tyseley Severn Tunnel Junction Oxford Tyseley Oxford Leamington Tyseley Leamington Tyseley Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 20/04/1957 02/11/1957 30/11/1957 12/06/1958 09/08/1958 20/05/1961 12/08/1961 27/01/1962 06/03/1965 06/1965 |
19/06/1965 |
5101 | 4126 | 05/05/1938 | BHD 88A 84E W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Cardiff Cathays Tyseley Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 20/04/1957 27/12/1958 01/1962 |
24/01/1962 |
5101 | 4127 | 12/05/1938 | BHD 84E 86E W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Tyseley Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 20/04/1957 02/11/1957 09/02/1963 |
01/01/1963 |
5101 | 4128 | 18/05/1938 | BHD 84K 84D 83B 86E W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Chester West Leamington Taunton Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 20/04/1957 02/11/1957 14/06/1958 06/10/1962 06/1964 |
15/06/1964 |
5101 | 4129 | 27/05/1938 | BHD 88A 82C 83B 82B 82A 83C 84G W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Cardiff Cathays Swindon Taunton St Philips Marsh Bristol Bath Road Exeter Kidderminster Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 20/04/1957 21/02/1959 11/07/1959 03/10/1959 30/01/1960 18/06/1960 08/10/1960 09/1962 |
17/09/1962 |
5101 | 4130 | 09/10/1939 | STJ PPRD 86A 86A 86C 86B 86E 86A 86E W |
Severn Tunnel Junction Pontypool Road Ebbw Junction (Newport) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Newport Pill Severn Tunnel Junction Ebbw Junction (Newport) Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 27/11/1948 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 31/01/1951 28/02/1951 18/06/1955 16/07/1955 22/02/1958 07/1964 |
06/07/1964 |
5101 | 4131 | 14/10/1939 | PPRD 85B 87H 82B 86E 82B 82E W |
Pontypool Road Gloucester Horton Road Neyland St Philips Marsh Severn Tunnel Junction St Philips Marsh Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 24/04/1954 19/06/1954 08/10/1955 22/04/1961 15/07/1961 03/11/1962 09/1964 |
07/09/1964 |
5101 | 4132 | 19/10/1939 | NEA 87G 87H 86E W 88B |
Neath (Court Sart) Carmarthen Neyland Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn Radyr |
15/06/1947 13/08/1960 14/07/1962 28/09/1963 07/1964 20/07/1964 |
24/07/1964 |
5101 | 4133 | 24/10/1939 | LA NA NA 83D 83D 83A 83A 82D 83C 82D 82F 84E 84D W |
Laira Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Laira Laira Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Westbury Exeter Westbury Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Tyseley Leamington Withdrawn |
23/03/1946 20/04/1946 15/06/1947 21/04/1951 19/05/1951 11/08/1951 31/08/1951 31/10/1953 26/03/1955 23/04/1955 16/07/1955 05/11/1961 03/11/1962 10/1964 |
24/10/1964 |
5101 | 4134 | 27/10/1939 | LDR 87G 87G 83F 87G 87A W |
Landore Carmarthen Carmarthen Truro Carmarthen Neath (Court Sart) Withdrawn |
01/12/1945 15/06/1947 29/12/1951 31/01/1952 16/06/1956 14/07/1956 18/06/1960 05/1963 |
13/05/1963 |
5101 | 4135 | 31/10/1939 | PPRD 86C W |
Pontypool Road Hereford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/04/1962 06/1964 |
08/06/1964 |
5101 | 4136 | 07/11/1939 | TN 83G 87H 88J W |
Taunton Penzance Neyland Aberdare Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/09/1958 29/06/1963 30/11/1963 06/1964 |
15/06/1964 |
5101 | 4137 | 14/11/1939 | STJ NPT 86E 86A 86E W |
Severn Tunnel Junction Ebbw Junction (Newport) Severn Tunnel Junction Ebbw Junction (Newport) Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/03/1949 25/11/1953 14/07/1962 08/09/1962 10/1964 |
09/10/1964 |
5101 | 4138 | 29/11/1939 | PPRD 86H 86G 85A 86G W |
Pontypool Road Aberbeeg Pontypool Road Worcester Pontypool Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 20/04/1957 18/05/1957 25/01/1958 19/04/1958 07/1958 |
03/07/1958 |
5101 | 4139 | 05/12/1939 | WOS 82A 85D 85B W |
Worcester Bristol Bath Road Kidderminster Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/02/1953 20/04/1957 13/07/1957 07/1958 |
08/07/1958 |
5101 | 4140 | 21/08/1946 | GLO 85A 85A 85B 85B 84A 84F W |
Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Gloucester Horton Road Stafford Road Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/09/1950 30/09/1950 17/10/1950 31/10/1950 09/10/1954 25/01/1958 11/1963 |
20/11/1963 |
5101 | 4141 | 28/08/1946 | CHEL W |
Cheltenham Malvern Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/1963 |
01/03/1963 |
5101 | 4142 | 31/08/1946 | BRD SPM BRD 86E 86E 86G 86E 86G 84H 85A 85B 87A W |
Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Bristol Bath Road Severn Tunnel Junction Severn Tunnel Junction Pontypool Road Severn Tunnel Junction Pontypool Road Wellington Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Neath (Court Sart) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/09/1948 14/10/1948 14/07/1951 31/07/1951 21/02/1953 09/10/1954 26/03/1955 08/10/1955 22/03/1958 13/08/1960 28/09/1963 12/1963 |
28/12/1963 |
5101 | 4143 | 05/09/1946 | BRD 85A 88D 88D 88A 85B 83B 88B W |
Bristol Bath Road Worcester Merthyr Tydfil Merthyr Tydfil Radyr Gloucester Horton Road Taunton Radyr Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/11/1951 01/12/1951 31/12/1951 17/05/1958 03/12/1960 12/08/1961 30/11/1963 06/1964 |
15/06/1964 |
5101 | 4144 | 10/09/1946 | STJ 86F 86E W |
Severn Tunnel Junction Tondu Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/09/1957 15/12/1962 06/1965 |
03/06/1965 |
5101 | 4145 | 17/09/1946 | NPT CDF 86A 86A 86E 83A 83C 86E W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Ebbw Junction (Newport) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Severn Tunnel Junction Newton Abbot Exeter Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/10/1948 01/12/1951 31/12/1951 25/11/1953 14/08/1954 21/05/1960 05/11/1960 18/12/1962 |
18/12/1962 |
5101 | 4146 | 21/09/1946 | STB 84E 84F 84B 86A 86E W |
Stourbridge Junction Tyseley Stourbridge Junction Oxley Ebbw Junction (Newport) Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/01/1957 18/05/1957 03/10/1959 30/01/1960 14/07/1962 08/1962 |
16/08/1962 |
5101 | 4147 | 30/09/1946 | TYS 84A 81F 87E 81F 84G 2C 2A W |
Tyseley Stafford Road Oxford Landore Oxford Kidderminster Stourbridge Junction Tyseley Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/11/1952 16/05/1953 13/08/1960 10/09/1960 22/04/1961 15/08/1964 17/07/1965 10/1965 |
02/10/1965 |
5101 | 4148 | 05/10/1946 | STJ NPT 85B 85A 83G 85A 81F 83A 84A 84B W |
Severn Tunnel Junction Ebbw Junction (Newport) Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Penzance Worcester Oxford Newton Abbot Stafford Road Oxley Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 27/11/1948 04/12/1954 13/08/1955 16/06/1956 14/07/1956 30/11/1957 24/02/1962 06/10/1962 22/06/1963 09/1965 |
25/09/1965 |
5101 | 4149 | 10/1946 | STB 84C W |
Stourbridge Junction Banbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/02/1950 02/03/1963 |
26/02/1963 |
5101 | 4150 | 05/06/1947 | STB 82A 82F 83B 83A 83C 83A 82D 86E W |
Stourbridge Junction Bristol Bath Road Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Taunton Newton Abbot Exeter Newton Abbot Westbury Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/05/1953 11/07/1953 08/10/1955 03/11/1956 21/05/1960 15/07/1961 14/07/1962 11/08/1962 06/1965 |
16/06/1965 |
5101 | 4151 | 12/06/1947 | BRD 86E 86A 86E 84D 2C W |
Bristol Bath Road Severn Tunnel Junction Ebbw Junction (Newport) Severn Tunnel Junction Leamington Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 19/05/1951 14/07/1962 08/09/1962 15/06/1963 13/03/1965 04/1965 |
17/04/1965 |
5101 | 4152 | 21/06/1947 | BRD 88D 88D 88A 85A 86E W |
Bristol Bath Road Merthyr Tydfil Merthyr Tydfil Radyr Worcester Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/12/1951 31/12/1951 17/05/1958 06/09/1958 26/03/1960 09/1962 |
13/09/1962 |
5101 | 4153 | 26/06/1947 | 2C W |
Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
15/08/1964 11/1964 |
21/11/1964 |
5101 | 4154 | 05/07/1947 | 87G 85A 83A 84C 2C 2B W |
Carmarthen Worcester Newton Abbot Banbury Stourbridge Junction Oxley Withdrawn |
11/07/1953 25/11/1953 30/01/1960 23/04/1960 15/05/1965 19/06/1965 10/1965 |
02/10/1965 |
5101 | 4155 | 02/08/1947 | 85A 85A 84H 84E W |
Worcester Worcester Wellington Tyseley Withdrawn |
31/01/1951 28/02/1951 03/10/1953 21/05/1955 09/1965 |
25/09/1965 |
5101 | 4156 | 13/08/1947 | NPT 86E W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
30/06/1948 25/11/1953 06/1965 |
16/06/1965 |
5101 | 4157 | 18/08/1947 | 84E 84E 84E 82A 83B 84E 82D 86G 86E W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Bristol Bath Road Taunton Tyseley Westbury Pontypool Road Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
25/03/1950 16/06/1951 30/06/1951 01/11/1952 11/08/1956 07/10/1961 14/07/1962 04/05/1963 08/11/1964 06/1965 |
16/06/1965 |
5101 | 4158 | 25/08/1947 | PPRD 84H 84E W |
Pontypool Road Wellington Tyseley Withdrawn |
29/01/1949 27/12/1952 08/09/1962 06/1965 |
19/06/1965 |
5101 | 4159 | 10/09/1947 | TYS 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 82A 83B 87H 86E W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Bristol Bath Road Taunton Neyland Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
30/06/1948 25/03/1950 28/02/1951 31/03/1951 11/08/1951 31/08/1951 31/10/1951 01/11/1952 16/06/1956 03/12/1960 14/07/1962 06/1964 |
15/06/1964 |
5101 | 4160 | 06/09/1948 | 88D 88A 88B 86E W |
Merthyr Tydfil Radyr Radyr Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 17/05/1958 06/04/1963 12/10/1964 06/1965 |
03/06/1965 |
5101 | 4161 | 14/09/1948 | 88D 84E 84A 84F 85B 86C 85A W |
Merthyr Tydfil Tyseley Stafford Road Stourbridge Junction Gloucester Horton Road Hereford Worcester Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 19/04/1958 01/11/1958 18/04/1959 08/09/1962 04/05/1963 08/11/1964 18/11/1965 |
18/11/1965 |
5101 | 4162 | 20/09/1948 | 88D 84E 84D W |
Merthyr Tydfil Tyseley Leamington Withdrawn |
26/12/1953 19/04/1958 01/11/1958 07/1960 |
11/07/1960 |
5101 | 4163 | 24/09/1948 | 88D 88A 82A 88A 85B W |
Merthyr Tydfil Radyr Bristol Bath Road Radyr Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 17/05/1958 21/02/1959 03/10/1959 28/01/1961 30/10/1962 |
30/10/1962 |
5101 | 4164 | 30/09/1948 | 88D 88A 86E W |
Merthyr Tydfil Radyr Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 17/05/1958 04/10/1958 01/1960 |
18/01/1960 |
5101 | 4165 | 08/10/1948 | 84K 85B 83A 83C 84A 84B W |
Chester West Gloucester Horton Road Newton Abbot Exeter Stafford Road Oxley Withdrawn |
01/11/1952 09/08/1958 13/08/1960 25/02/1961 16/06/1962 22/06/1963 10/1965 |
09/10/1965 |
5101 | 4166 | 18/10/1948 | TYS 83A 82A 87H 82D 82F 88B W |
Tyseley Newton Abbot Bristol Bath Road Neyland Westbury Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Radyr Withdrawn |
18/10/1948 12/07/1952 25/11/1953 19/06/1954 17/07/1954 16/07/1955 05/11/1961 06/1964 |
15/06/1964 |
5101 | 4167 | 22/10/1948 | NA TR 83E 83D 83E 85A 84E W |
Newton Abbot Truro St Blazey Laira St Blazey Worcester Tyseley Withdrawn |
22/10/1948 03/12/1949 16/05/1953 06/11/1954 04/12/1954 08/10/1960 20/05/1961 05/1964 |
16/05/1964 |
5101 | 4168 | 01/11/1948 | SDN NEY NPT 84F 2A W |
Swindon Neyland Ebbw Junction (Newport) Stourbridge Junction Tyseley Withdrawn |
01/11/1948 05/11/1949 03/12/1949 25/01/1958 17/07/1965 10/1965 |
02/10/1965 |
5101 | 4169 | 16/11/1948 | SDN CARM NEA 87F 87A 88B W |
Swindon Carmarthen Neath (Court Sart) Llanelli Neath (Court Sart) Radyr Withdrawn |
16/11/1948 05/11/1949 31/12/1949 04/12/1954 01/01/1955 20/07/1964 05/1965 |
21/05/1965 |
5101 | 4170 | 07/10/1949 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1960 | 16/09/1960 |
5101 | 4171 | 14/10/1949 | 84E 84D W |
Tyseley Leamington Withdrawn |
22/05/1954 09/10/1954 10/1964 |
24/10/1964 |
5101 | 4172 | 24/10/1949 | 84F 84F 84E 84E 84F W |
Stourbridge Junction Stourbridge Junction Tyseley Tyseley Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
01/12/1951 31/12/1951 23/02/1952 31/03/1952 22/06/1963 01/1965 |
16/01/1965 |
5101 | 4173 | 28/10/1949 | STB 84G 2C W |
Stourbridge Junction Kidderminster Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
28/10/1949 06/10/1962 15/08/1964 12/1964 |
05/12/1964 |
5101 | 4174 | 02/11/1949 | CHEL 83D 83C 83A 83D 83A 82D 86G W |
Cheltenham Malvern Road Laira Exeter Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Westbury Pontypool Road Withdrawn |
02/11/1949 16/06/1956 14/07/1956 05/10/1957 26/12/1959 30/01/1960 27/01/1962 04/05/1963 06/1964 |
15/06/1964 |
5101 | 4175 | 07/11/1949 | 85B 85D 2C W |
Gloucester Horton Road Kidderminster Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
22/02/1958 17/05/1958 15/08/1964 10/1965 |
02/10/1965 |
5101 | 4176 | 14/11/1949 | 83B 83A 83C 84D 2B W |
Taunton Newton Abbot Exeter Leamington Oxley Withdrawn |
17/07/1954 08/10/1955 21/05/1960 03/12/1960 17/04/1965 10/1965 |
09/10/1965 |
5101 | 4177 | 22/11/1949 | THT 88C 88C 88A W |
Treherbert Barry Barry Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
22/11/1949 17/10/1950 31/10/1950 08/10/1955 05/1965 |
21/05/1965 |
5101 | 4178 | 29/11/1949 | NEA CARM 84H 84E 84H 83A 83C 84H 84F 84D 2A 2B W |
Neath (Court Sart) Carmarthen Wellington Tyseley Wellington Newton Abbot Exeter Wellington Stourbridge Junction Leamington Tyseley Oxley Withdrawn |
29/11/1949 28/01/1950 21/02/1953 01/01/1955 26/03/1955 11/08/1956 21/05/1960 08/10/1960 11/08/1962 08/09/1962 24/10/1964 19/06/1965 09/1965 |
25/09/1965 |
5101 | 4179 | 02/12/1949 | 84A 84B 2A W |
Stafford Road Oxley Tyseley Withdrawn |
22/04/1961 22/06/1963 11/04/1964 02/1965 |
27/02/1965 |
5101 | 5101 | 11/1929 | STB 84D W |
Stourbridge Junction Leamington Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 13/07/1957 06/1963 |
24/06/1963 |
5101 | 5102 | 11/1929 | TYS 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 87A 83F 87A W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Neath (Court Sart) Truro Neath (Court Sart) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 19/05/1951 11/08/1951 31/08/1951 29/12/1951 31/01/1952 14/06/1952 30/06/1952 01/11/1952 16/06/1956 14/07/1956 03/1960 |
14/03/1960 |
5101 | 5103 | 11/1929 | TYS SRD BHD CHR 86G W |
Tyseley Stafford Road Birkenhead Mollington Street Chester West Pontypool Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/03/1949 21/05/1949 16/07/1949 09/08/1958 12/1960 |
23/12/1960 |
5101 | 5104 | 11/1929 | chel LMTN 82B W |
Cheltenham High Street Leamington St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 15/06/1947 22/02/1958 09/11/1960 |
09/11/1960 |
5101 | 5105 | 11/1929 | STB 85B W |
Stourbridge Junction Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 02/11/1957 10/1958 |
16/10/1958 |
5101 | 5106 | 11/1929 | TYS 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84A 83D W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Stafford Road Laira Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/10/1951 29/12/1951 31/01/1952 23/02/1952 31/03/1952 14/06/1952 30/06/1952 29/11/1952 02/11/1957 03/1960 |
14/03/1960 |
5101 | 5107 | 12/1929 | STB 83G 84F W |
Stourbridge Junction Penzance Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/06/1956 14/07/1956 30/07/1957 |
30/07/1957 |
5101 | 5108 | 12/1929 | NA W |
Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/1958 |
04/07/1958 |
5101 | 5109 | 12/1929 | LMTN WLN 84F W |
Leamington Wellington Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/10/1949 21/05/1955 06/1957 |
24/06/1957 |
5101 | 5110 | 12/1929 | KDR 84G 85A 86E W |
Kidderminster Shrewsbury Worcester Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/10/1959 28/11/1959 27/02/1960 12/1960 |
05/12/1960 |
5101 | 5150 | 21/02/1930 | CHR CHR NA 83F 83F 83A 83A W |
Chester West Chester West Newton Abbot Truro Truro Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
15/02/1930 11/01/1936 15/06/1947 04/11/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 08/1960 |
15/08/1960 |
5101 | 5151 | 22/02/1930 | TYS SRD 84A 84E 84A 84G W |
Tyseley Stafford Road Stafford Road Tyseley Stafford Road Kidderminster Withdrawn |
15/02/1930 15/06/1947 21/04/1951 30/04/1951 19/05/1951 05/11/1960 08/1962 |
17/08/1962 |
5101 | 5152 | 26/02/1930 | STB TYS 84C 84A 85A W |
Stourbridge Junction Tyseley Banbury Stafford Road Worcester Withdrawn |
15/02/1930 15/06/1947 08/10/1955 07/10/1961 15/12/1962 11/1963 |
20/11/1963 |
5101 | 5153 | 12/03/1930 | NA 81B 83A 84G 2L W |
Newton Abbot Slough Newton Abbot Kidderminster Leamington Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/02/1959 21/03/1959 08/09/1962 15/08/1964 11/1964 |
21/11/1964 |
5101 | 5154 | 14/03/1930 | SALOP 88F 83A 85B 86C W |
Shrewsbury Treherbert Newton Abbot Gloucester Horton Road Hereford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/12/1955 08/09/1956 08/09/1962 04/05/1963 08/1963 |
29/08/1963 |
5101 | 5155 | 14/03/1930 | STB 86E W |
Stourbridge Junction Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/04/1953 01/1960 |
25/01/1960 |
5101 | 5156 | 15/03/1930 | TYS 85C 85A 85C W |
Tyseley Hereford Worcester Hereford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 02/11/1957 17/05/1958 09/08/1958 09/1958 |
09/09/1958 |
5101 | 5157 | 24/03/1930 | NA 83B 85B W |
Newton Abbot Taunton Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/07/1953 01/12/1956 07/1958 |
28/07/1958 |
5101 | 5158 | 26/03/1930 | SBZ NA W |
St Blazey Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 24/01/1948 04/1961 |
06/04/1961 |
5101 | 5159 | 28/03/1930 | THT W |
Treherbert Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1956 |
16/04/1956 |
5101 | 5160 | 06/11/1930 | STB 84K 83E W |
Stourbridge Junction Chester West St Blazey Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/09/1956 09/08/1958 11/1958 |
25/11/1958 |
5101 | 5161 | 15/11/1930 | LMTN 83G 84D W |
Leamington Penzance Leamington Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/06/1956 14/07/1956 04/1957 |
25/04/1957 |
5101 | 5162 | 21/11/1930 | Tys TYS LDR 88F 85B W |
Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) Tyseley Landore Treherbert Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 31/12/1949 03/10/1953 03/11/1956 07/1958 |
16/07/1958 |
5101 | 5163 | 08/12/1930 | LMTN 84E W |
Leamington Tyseley Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/02/1953 11/1959 |
02/11/1959 |
5101 | 5164 | 21/11/1930 | TYS 84H 83A 86G W |
Tyseley Wellington Newton Abbot Pontypool Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/05/1955 08/09/1956 04/11/1961 04/1963 |
05/04/1963 |
5101 | 5165 | 22/11/1930 | STB STB 85B W |
Stourbridge Junction Stourbridge Junction Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 15/06/1947 10/08/1957 02/1958 |
10/02/1958 |
5101 | 5166 | 11/1930 | TYS TYS TYS TYS 86E W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 15/06/1947 30/04/1948 30/06/1948 02/11/1957 05/1961 |
30/05/1961 |
5101 | 5167 | 12/1930 | STB 84H 84G 84E 84C W |
Stourbridge Junction Wellington Shrewsbury Tyseley Banbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/06/1955 03/10/1959 30/01/1960 23/04/1960 01/1962 |
29/01/1962 |
5101 | 5168 | 12/1930 | SALOP 88F 83A W |
Shrewsbury Treherbert Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/12/1955 06/10/1956 08/1958 |
18/08/1958 |
5101 | 5169 | 12/1930 | NA BRD 86E 86E W |
Newton Abbot Bristol Bath Road Severn Tunnel Junction Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 15/06/1947 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 09/1960 |
16/09/1960 |
5101 | 5170 | 12/1930 | STB 84C W |
Stourbridge Junction Banbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/05/1953 12/1959 |
07/12/1959 |
5101 | 5171 | 12/1930 | Tys TYS 87G 86F W |
Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) Tyseley Carmarthen Tondu Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 15/06/1947 01/11/1952 20/04/1957 07/1958 |
28/07/1958 |
5101 | 5172 | 12/1930 | TN TN W |
Taunton Taunton Withdrawn |
18/05/1946 15/06/1947 10/1958 |
06/10/1958 |
5101 | 5173 | 12/1930 | WOS 86A 85B 86A 85B W |
Worcester Ebbw Junction (Newport) Gloucester Horton Road Ebbw Junction (Newport) Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/11/1952 28/11/1959 17/06/1961 07/10/1961 08/1962 |
17/08/1962 |
5101 | 5174 | 12/1930 | LMTN CHR 83C 84E W |
Leamington Chester West Exeter Tyseley Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 15/06/1947 21/05/1960 08/10/1960 11/1961 |
14/11/1961 |
5101 | 5175 | 01/1931 | Tys TYS 83D 83C 83D W |
Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) Tyseley Laira Exeter Laira Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 01/11/1952 05/11/1960 31/12/1960 04/1961 |
18/04/1961 |
5101 | 5176 | 01/1931 | CHR 6C 6C 84F W |
Chester West Birkenhead Mollington Street Birkenhead Mollington Street Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/08/1950 09/09/1950 20/04/1957 01/1961 |
10/01/1961 |
5101 | 5177 | 01/1931 | 84K 85B 84D W |
Chester West Gloucester Horton Road Leamington Withdrawn |
29/11/1952 09/08/1958 26/03/1960 05/1961 |
30/05/1961 |
5101 | 5178 | 01/1931 | LMTN WLN 83A W |
Leamington Wellington Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 15/06/1947 08/09/1956 03/1960 |
14/03/1960 |
5101 | 5179 | 02/1931 | CHR 86F 85A W |
Chester West Tondu Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/08/1958 04/10/1958 07/1960 |
21/07/1960 |
5101 | 5180 | 02/1931 | STB 87H 87G 82D W |
Stourbridge Junction Neyland Carmarthen Westbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/06/1958 26/12/1959 27/01/1962 07/1962 |
03/07/1962 |
5101 | 5181 | 03/1931 | CHR 84E 86E W |
Chester West Tyseley Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/10/1953 02/11/1957 08/1962 |
24/08/1962 |
5101 | 5182 | 03/1931 | TYS TYS TYS 84E 84E 82B 82A 82D 85B W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley St Philips Marsh Bristol Bath Road Westbury Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 26/01/1946 15/06/1947 25/02/1950 25/03/1950 01/11/1952 27/12/1952 08/10/1955 21/04/1956 05/1962 |
25/05/1962 |
5101 | 5183 | 03/1931 | CDF STJ CV.BRY 88F 88F 88C 83A 84A W |
Cardiff Canton Severn Tunnel Junction Barry Treherbert Treherbert Barry Newton Abbot Stafford Road Withdrawn |
18/05/1946 15/06/1947 21/05/1949 17/10/1950 31/10/1950 08/08/1953 08/09/1956 22/04/1961 05/1962 |
21/05/1962 |
5101 | 5184 | 03/1931 | CHR 84D 83G 84D 83B 84D 85B W |
Chester West Leamington Penzance Leamington Taunton Leamington Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/02/1953 16/06/1956 14/07/1956 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 08/09/1962 10/1964 |
23/10/1964 |
5101 | 5185 | 03/1931 | LMTN 83B W |
Leamington Taunton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/06/1958 03/1960 |
15/03/1960 |
5101 | 5186 | 03/1931 | CHR 84F 82A W |
Chester West Stourbridge Junction Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/06/1956 14/06/1958 08/1959 |
10/08/1959 |
5101 | 5187 | 04/1931 | LMTN TYS 84A 84F W |
Leamington Tyseley Stafford Road Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/03/1948 12/07/1952 05/11/1960 05/1962 |
14/05/1962 |
5101 | 5188 | 04/1931 | TYS 84A 87G 84A 82A 82B 82A 86A W |
Tyseley Stafford Road Carmarthen Stafford Road Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Bristol Bath Road Ebbw Junction (Newport) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/11/1952 16/07/1955 08/10/1955 10/08/1957 22/03/1958 17/05/1958 01/11/1958 07/1962 |
19/07/1962 |
5101 | 5189 | 04/1931 | CHR STB W |
Chester West Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 15/06/1947 08/1959 |
03/08/1959 |
5101 | 5190 | 08/10/1934 | TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS 84E 84A 82F 81F 84F 83C W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Stafford Road Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Oxford Stourbridge Junction Exeter Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/02/1949 21/05/1949 16/07/1949 05/11/1949 31/12/1949 25/02/1950 01/11/1952 16/05/1953 28/01/1956 28/01/1961 14/07/1962 09/1962 |
05/09/1962 |
5101 | 5191 | 09/10/1934 | STB 86E W |
Stourbridge Junction Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/11/1957 06/1964 |
15/06/1964 |
5101 | 5192 | 11/10/1934 | LMTN 87G 84E 84D 84F W |
Leamington Carmarthen Tyseley Leamington Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 17/07/1954 09/10/1954 04/11/1961 19/05/1962 06/1963 |
24/06/1963 |
5101 | 5193 | 12/10/1934 | STB 83F 83E 83D 83E 83D 87H W |
Stourbridge Junction Truro St Blazey Laira St Blazey Laira Neyland Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/11/1952 08/08/1953 06/11/1954 22/02/1958 05/11/1960 03/12/1960 06/1962 |
22/06/1962 |
5101 | 5194 | 12/10/1934 | LMTN 83B 85B 84D W |
Leamington Taunton Gloucester Horton Road Leamington Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/06/1958 01/11/1958 26/12/1959 04/1961 |
18/04/1961 |
5101 | 5195 | 22/10/1934 | CV.BRY 84E 88D 88F 83A W |
Barry Tyseley Merthyr Tydfil Treherbert Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
29/12/1945 23/03/1946 15/06/1947 05/09/1953 03/10/1953 26/12/1953 06/10/1956 06/1961 |
13/06/1961 |
5101 | 5196 | 26/10/1934 | STB 83F 83A W |
Stourbridge Junction Truro Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/11/1952 27/12/1952 12/1959 |
24/12/1959 |
5101 | 5197 | 25/10/1934 | STB 82A 83A 82B W |
Stourbridge Junction Bristol Bath Road Newton Abbot St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/05/1953 11/07/1959 30/01/1960 07/1960 |
21/07/1960 |
5101 | 5198 | 01/11/1934 | TYS TYS TYS 84D 85B 81F 85B 83E 83B W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Leamington Gloucester Horton Road Oxford Gloucester Horton Road St Blazey Taunton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/02/1948 30/04/1948 02/11/1957 09/08/1958 29/11/1958 24/01/1959 18/06/1960 31/12/1960 06/1961 |
20/06/1961 |
5101 | 5199 | 09/11/1934 | TYS STB 84A W 85B |
Tyseley Stourbridge Junction Stafford Road Withdrawn Gloucester Horton Road |
15/06/1947 08/10/1949 07/10/1961 03/1963 09/03/1963 |
15/03/1963 |