GWR Collett "4575" Class 2-6-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4579 | PDK | Pembroke Dock | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4582 | NA | Newton Abbot | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4585 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4592 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 4598 | LA | Laira | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5505 | NA | Newton Abbot | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5512 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5524 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5528 | SPM.4 | Yatton | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5536 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5539 | WTD | Whitland | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5548 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5551 | TN | Taunton | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5564 | WES.1 | Frome | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5566 | SPM.2 | Wells | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 4598 | LA | Laira | LA.4 | Moorswater | |
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 5514 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 5531 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |||
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 5543 | EXE | Exeter | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 5570 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 4594 | HFD | Hereford | |||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 5524 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | |
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 5531 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | |
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 5556 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
26/01/1946 | Reallocation | 5554 | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | |||
23/03/1946 | Reallocation | 4578 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |||
23/03/1946 | Reallocation | 4581 | TR | Truro | |||
23/03/1946 | Reallocation | 5502 | SBZ | St Blazey | |||
23/03/1946 | Reallocation | 5509 | WES | Westbury | |||
23/03/1946 | Reallocation | 5525 | EXE | Exeter | |||
23/03/1946 | Reallocation | 5545 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
23/03/1946 | Reallocation | 5554 | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | WES | Westbury | |
23/03/1946 | Reallocation | 5567 | LA | Laira | |||
07/09/1946 | Reallocation | 5551 | TN | Taunton | NA | Newton Abbot | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4575 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4576 | WTD | Whitland | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4577 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4578 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4579 | PDK | Pembroke Dock | WTD | Whitland | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4580 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4581 | TR | Truro | TR | Truro | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4582 | NA | Newton Abbot | NA | Newton Abbot | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4583 | LA | Laira | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4584 | KDR | Kidderminster | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4585 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | SDN | Swindon | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4586 | KDR | Kidderminster | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4587 | NA | Newton Abbot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4588 | TR | Truro | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4589 | TR | Truro | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4590 | SDN | Swindon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4591 | LA | Laira | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4592 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | SDN | Swindon | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4593 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4594 | HFD | Hereford | KDR | Kidderminster | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4595 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4596 | WOS | Worcester | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4597 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4598 | LA.4 | Moorswater | SBZ | St Blazey | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 4599 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5500 | TR | Truro | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5501 | TN | Taunton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5502 | SBZ | St Blazey | SBZ | St Blazey | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5503 | TN | Taunton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5504 | TN | Taunton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5505 | NA | Newton Abbot | NA | Newton Abbot | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5506 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5507 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5508 | WES | Westbury | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5509 | WES | Westbury | WES | Westbury | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5510 | SDN | Swindon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5511 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5512 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5513 | WTD | Whitland | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5514 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5515 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5516 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5517 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5518 | KDR | Kidderminster | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5519 | SBZ | St Blazey | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5520 | ABDR | Aberdare | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5521 | TN | Taunton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5522 | TN | Taunton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5523 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5524 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | MCH | Machynlleth | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5525 | EXE | Exeter | EXE | Exeter | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5526 | TR | Truro | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5527 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5528 | SPM.4 | Yatton | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5529 | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5530 | NA | Newton Abbot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5531 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | SBZ | St Blazey | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5532 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5533 | TN | Taunton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5534 | SDN | Swindon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5535 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5536 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5537 | TR | Truro | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5538 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5539 | WTD | Whitland | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5540 | LA | Laira | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5541 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5542 | TN | Taunton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5543 | EXE | Exeter | TN | Taunton | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5544 | WOS | Worcester | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5545 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5546 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5547 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5548 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5549 | WTD | Whitland | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5550 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5551 | NA | Newton Abbot | NA | Newton Abbot | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5552 | NA | Newton Abbot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5553 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5554 | WES | Westbury | WES | Westbury | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5555 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5556 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | TDU | Tondu | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5557 | NA | Newton Abbot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5558 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5559 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5560 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5561 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5562 | TR | Truro | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5563 | SDN | Swindon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5564 | WES.1 | Frome | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5565 | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5566 | SPM.2 | Wells | SDN | Swindon | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5567 | LA | Laira | LA | Laira | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5568 | WTD | Whitland | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5569 | LA | Laira | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5570 | MCH | Machynlleth | MCH | Machynlleth | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5571 | TN | Taunton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5572 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5573 | KDR | Kidderminster | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5574 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | |||
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 5509 | WES | Westbury | WES | Westbury | |
31/03/1948 | Reallocation | 5544 | WOS | Worcester | KDR | Kidderminster | |
30/04/1948 | Reallocation | 5520 | ABDR | Aberdare | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | |
31/05/1948 | Reallocation | 5573 | KDR | Kidderminster | WOS | Worcester | |
30/06/1948 | Reallocation | 4599 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | MCH | Machynlleth | |
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 4593 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 4596 | WOS | Worcester | KDR | Kidderminster | |
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 4599 | MCH | Machynlleth | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
29/01/1949 | Reallocation | 4596 | KDR | Kidderminster | WOS | Worcester | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 4599 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | MCH | Machynlleth | |
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 4599 | MCH | Machynlleth | KDR | Kidderminster | |
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 5536 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 5544 | KDR | Kidderminster | NA | Newton Abbot | |
31/12/1949 | Reallocation | 5536 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
28/01/1950 | Reallocation | 5518 | KDR | Kidderminster | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |
28/01/1950 | Reallocation | 5530 | NA | Newton Abbot | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |
25/02/1950 | Reallocation | 4578 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | 85D | Kidderminster | |
25/02/1950 | Reallocation | 5516 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 4581 | TR | Truro | 89C | Machynlleth | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 5522 | TN | Taunton | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
12/08/1950 | Reallocation | 5515 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | 83F | Truro | |
31/08/1950 | Reallocation | 5515 | 83F | Truro | 83F | Truro | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5551 | NA | Newton Abbot | 83F | Truro | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5551 | 83F | Truro | 83F | Truro | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 5531 | SBZ | St Blazey | 83D | Laira | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 5551 | 83F | Truro | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 5531 | 83D | Laira | 83D | Laira | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 5551 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 4581 | 89C | Machynlleth | 83B | Taunton | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 4581 | 83B | Taunton | 83B | Taunton | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 5509 | WES | Westbury | 82C | Swindon | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 5540 | LA | Laira | 82C | Swindon | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 4586 | KDR | Kidderminster | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 4590 | SDN | Swindon | 83D | Laira | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 4596 | WOS | Worcester | 85D | Kidderminster | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 5508 | WES | Westbury | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 5509 | 82C | Swindon | 82C | Swindon | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 5518 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 85D | Kidderminster | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 5536 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 82C | Swindon | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 5540 | 82C | Swindon | 82C | Swindon | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 5558 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 83B | Taunton | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 4584 | KDR | Kidderminster | 89C | Machynlleth | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 4599 | KDR | Kidderminster | 85A | Worcester | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 5508 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82D | Westbury | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 5521 | TN | Taunton | 89C | Machynlleth | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 4584 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89C | Machynlleth | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 4599 | 85A | Worcester | 85A | Worcester | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 5508 | 82D | Westbury | 82D | Westbury | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 5521 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89C | Machynlleth | |
14/07/1951 | Reallocation | 5564 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 82C | Swindon | |
31/07/1951 | Reallocation | 5564 | 82C | Swindon | 82C | Swindon | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 4592 | SDN | Swindon | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 4592 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 4597 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
30/09/1951 | Reallocation | 4597 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 4584 | 89C | Machynlleth | 83E | St Blazey | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 5521 | 89C | Machynlleth | 83E | St Blazey | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 5545 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 4593 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
31/01/1952 | Reallocation | 4593 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
23/02/1952 | Reallocation | 4594 | KDR | Kidderminster | 85A | Worcester | |
31/03/1952 | Reallocation | 4594 | 85A | Worcester | 85A | Worcester | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 4585 | SDN | Swindon | 83E | St Blazey | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 5532 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
31/08/1952 | Reallocation | 5532 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5512 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 82D | Westbury | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5534 | SDN | Swindon | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5550 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 87H | Neyland | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5563 | SDN | Swindon | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 5565 | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 5512 | 82D | Westbury | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 5534 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82C | Swindon | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 4598 | SBZ | St Blazey | 83F | Truro | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 5539 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
08/08/1953 | Reallocation | 5522 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 83C | Exeter | |
05/09/1953 | Reallocation | 4581 | 83B | Taunton | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
05/09/1953 | Reallocation | 5522 | 83C | Exeter | 83B | Taunton | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 4578 | 85D | Kidderminster | 88C | Barry | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 4580 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 4582 | NA | Newton Abbot | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 4587 | NA | Newton Abbot | 83G | Penzance | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 4589 | TR | Truro | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 4599 | 85A | Worcester | 89C | Machynlleth | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5511 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 88F | Treherbert | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5524 | MCH | Machynlleth | 86F | Tondu | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5525 | EXE | Exeter | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5527 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 88C | Barry | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5529 | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | 88C | Barry | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5534 | 82C | Swindon | 88C | Barry | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5545 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86F | Tondu | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5555 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 86F | Tondu | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5556 | TDU | Tondu | 89C | Machynlleth | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5560 | MCH | Machynlleth | 86F | Tondu | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5572 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 88F | Treherbert | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5573 | WOS | Worcester | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5574 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | 86F | Tondu | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5511 | 88F | Treherbert | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5534 | 88C | Barry | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5542 | TN | Taunton | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5543 | TN | Taunton | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5572 | 88F | Treherbert | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 5568 | WTD | Whitland | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
26/12/1953 | Reallocation | 4597 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
26/12/1953 | Reallocation | 5505 | NA | Newton Abbot | 83F | Truro | |
26/12/1953 | Reallocation | 5532 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
26/12/1953 | Reallocation | 5573 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 4587 | 83G | Penzance | 83F | Truro | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 5518 | 85D | Kidderminster | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 5531 | 83D | Laira | 83E | St Blazey | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 5531 | 83E | St Blazey | 83D | Laira | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 5514 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 5544 | NA | Newton Abbot | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 5552 | NA | Newton Abbot | 83D | Laira | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 5539 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 5557 | NA | Newton Abbot | 83D | Laira | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 5533 | TN | Taunton | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 5542 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 83B | Taunton | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 5543 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 83B | Taunton | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 5552 | 83D | Laira | 83F | Truro | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 5557 | 83D | Laira | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 5558 | 83B | Taunton | 83D | Laira | |
10/09/1955 | Reallocation | 5558 | 83D | Laira | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 4592 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 83D | Laira | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 5506 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 83D | Laira | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 5520 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 87H | Neyland | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 5551 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 83D | Laira | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 5555 | 86F | Tondu | 87H | Neyland | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 5557 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 83E | St Blazey | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 5555 | 87H | Neyland | 86F | Tondu | |
31/12/1955 | Reallocation | 4594 | 85A | Worcester | 87H | Neyland | |
31/12/1955 | Reallocation | 5574 | 86F | Tondu | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 5548 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
16/04/1956 | Condemned | 4586 | 98W | COND | |||
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 5536 | 82C | Swindon | 83B | Taunton | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 5548 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 5558 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 87G | Carmarthen | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 5564 | 82C | Swindon | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 5574 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
14/07/1956 | Reallocation | 4581 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 86F | Tondu | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 5518 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85D | Kidderminster | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 5558 | 87G | Carmarthen | 83D | Laira | |
08/09/1956 | Reallocation | 5558 | 83D | Laira | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 5536 | 83B | Taunton | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 4593 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 5539 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
17/12/1956 | Condemned | 4598 | 98W | COND | |||
26/01/1957 | Reallocation | 5545 | 86F | Tondu | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
11/02/1957 | Condemned | 5512 | 98W | COND | |||
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 4596 | 85D | Kidderminster | 85A | Worcester | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 5516 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 5564 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
27/05/1957 | Condemned | 5505 | 98W | COND | |||
03/06/1957 | Condemned | 5513 | 98W | COND | |||
20/06/1957 | Condemned | 5535 | 98W | COND | |||
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 5536 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 83C | Exeter | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 5545 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 86F | Tondu | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 5547 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 82C | Swindon | |
16/09/1957 | Condemned | 4596 | 98W | COND | |||
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 5542 | 83B | Taunton | 82D | Westbury | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 5560 | 86F | Tondu | 87H | Neyland | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 5511 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 4577 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 83G | Penzance | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 4578 | 88C | Barry | 88F | Treherbert | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 4580 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88F | Treherbert | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 4589 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88F | Treherbert | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 5530 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 83C | Exeter | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 5573 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
27/01/1958 | Condemned | 4583 | 98W | COND | |||
27/01/1958 | Condemned | 4597 | 98W | COND | |||
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 4589 | 88F | Treherbert | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 5527 | 88C | Barry | 88A | Radyr | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 5529 | 88C | Barry | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 5539 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 83E | St Blazey | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 5572 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 83D | Laira | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 4578 | 88F | Treherbert | 89A | Oswestry | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 4580 | 88F | Treherbert | 89A | Oswestry | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 5574 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
21/04/1958 | Condemned | 4581 | 98W | COND | |||
28/04/1958 | Condemned | 4582 | 98W | COND | |||
12/05/1958 | Condemned | 5506 | 98W | COND | |||
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 4595 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 5525 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 83F | Truro | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 4589 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 86F | Tondu | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5525 | 83F | Truro | 83B | Taunton | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5527 | 88A | Radyr | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5530 | 83C | Exeter | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5534 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5568 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5574 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 86F | Tondu | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5525 | 83B | Taunton | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5527 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 88C | Barry | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5534 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 88C | Barry | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5568 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 88C | Barry | |
23/06/1958 | Condemned | 4580 | 98W | COND | |||
14/07/1958 | Condemned | 5502 | 98W | COND | |||
21/07/1958 | Condemned | 5501 | 98W | COND | |||
18/08/1958 | Condemned | 5507 | 98W | COND | |||
22/08/1958 | Condemned | 4578 | 98W | COND | |||
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 4595 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 89A | Oswestry | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 5521 | 83E | St Blazey | 83B | Taunton | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 5523 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 5536 | 83C | Exeter | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
08/09/1958 | Condemned | 4579 | 98W | COND | |||
18/09/1958 | Condemned | 4576 | 98W | COND | |||
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 4589 | 86F | Tondu | 83C | Exeter | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 5523 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 83E | St Blazey | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 5524 | 86F | Tondu | 83C | Exeter | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 5527 | 88C | Barry | 87H | Neyland | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 5546 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 83C | Exeter | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 5551 | 83D | Laira | 83E | St Blazey | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 5559 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 83F | Truro | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 5565 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 89C | Machynlleth | |
24/10/1958 | Condemned | 4590 | 98W | COND | |||
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 5511 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 83D | Laira | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 5528 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 82C | Swindon | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 5532 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82C | Swindon | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 5533 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 83F | Truro | |
01/12/1958 | Condemned | 5517 | 98W | COND | |||
08/12/1958 | Condemned | 5574 | 98W | COND | |||
16/12/1958 | Condemned | 4595 | 98W | COND | |||
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 5553 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 89C | Machynlleth | |
24/01/1959 | Reallocation | 4588 | TR | Truro | 89A | Oswestry | |
26/01/1959 | Condemned | 5566 | 98W | COND | |||
06/02/1959 | Condemned | 4584 | 98W | COND | |||
21/02/1959 | Reallocation | 5524 | 83C | Exeter | 83G | Penzance | |
11/03/1959 | Reallocation | 5548 | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | 72C | Yeovil Town | |
11/03/1959 | Reallocation | 5563 | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | 72C | Yeovil Town | |
13/03/1959 | Condemned | 4599 | 98W | COND | |||
20/03/1959 | Condemned | 5522 | 98W | COND | |||
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 4588 | 89A | Oswestry | 83G | Penzance | |
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 5526 | TR | Truro | 82D | Westbury | |
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 5534 | 88C | Barry | 86F | Tondu | |
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 5524 | 83G | Penzance | 83C | Exeter | |
13/06/1959 | Reallocation | 5532 | 82C | Swindon | 82D | Westbury | |
11/07/1959 | Reallocation | 4593 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
11/07/1959 | Reallocation | 5519 | SBZ | St Blazey | 83D | Laira | |
11/07/1959 | Reallocation | 5546 | 83C | Exeter | 83F | Truro | |
08/08/1959 | Reallocation | 5529 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 86F | Tondu | |
05/09/1959 | Reallocation | 5554 | WES | Westbury | 83B | Taunton | |
05/09/1959 | Reallocation | 5564 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 4577 | 83G | Penzance | 83E | St Blazey | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 5509 | 82C | Swindon | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 5529 | 86F | Tondu | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 5540 | 82C | Swindon | 89C | Machynlleth | |
12/10/1959 | Condemned | 4585 | 98W | COND | |||
12/10/1959 | Condemned | 5500 | 98W | COND | |||
02/11/1959 | Condemned | 4577 | 98W | COND | |||
16/11/1959 | Condemned | 5528 | 98W | COND | |||
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 5532 | 82D | Westbury | 83D | Laira | |
07/12/1959 | Condemned | 5556 | 98W | COND | |||
24/12/1959 | Condemned | 5533 | 98W | COND | |||
26/12/1959 | Reallocation | 5536 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 82C | Swindon | |
04/01/1960 | Condemned | 5530 | 98W | COND | |||
04/01/1960 | Condemned | 5551 | 98W | COND | |||
04/01/1960 | Condemned | 5559 | 98W | COND | |||
04/01/1960 | Condemned | 5567 | 98W | COND | |||
18/01/1960 | Condemned | 4592 | 98W | COND | |||
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 4593 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 83F | Truro | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 5509 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 83F | Truro | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 5534 | 86F | Tondu | 83E | St Blazey | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 5538 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | 83F | Truro | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 5541 | MCH | Machynlleth | 83D | Laira | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 5564 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 83E | St Blazey | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 4575 | MCH | Machynlleth | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 5541 | 83D | Laira | 83G | Penzance | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 5570 | MCH | Machynlleth | 83G | Penzance | |
26/03/1960 | Reallocation | 5570 | 83G | Penzance | 83E | St Blazey | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 4575 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 89C | Machynlleth | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 4589 | 83C | Exeter | 83D | Laira | |
20/06/1960 | Condemned | 5519 | 98W | COND | |||
20/06/1960 | Condemned | 5523 | 98W | COND | |||
20/06/1960 | Condemned | 5524 | 98W | COND | |||
20/06/1960 | Condemned | 5527 | 98W | COND | |||
16/07/1960 | Reallocation | 5509 | 83F | Truro | 87H | Neyland | |
16/07/1960 | Reallocation | 5529 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 86F | Tondu | |
16/07/1960 | Reallocation | 5546 | 83F | Truro | 87H | Neyland | |
25/07/1960 | Condemned | 5543 | 98W | COND | |||
25/07/1960 | Condemned | 5561 | 98W | COND | |||
01/08/1960 | Condemned | 4587 | 98W | COND | |||
01/08/1960 | Condemned | 5529 | 98W | COND | |||
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 5544 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 83F | Truro | |
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 5560 | 87H | Neyland | 86F | Tondu | |
15/08/1960 | Condemned | 4575 | 98W | COND | |||
15/08/1960 | Condemned | 5540 | 98W | COND | |||
16/09/1960 | Condemned | 5565 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1960 | Condemned | 4589 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1960 | Condemned | 5534 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1960 | Condemned | 5546 | 98W | COND | |||
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 5541 | 83G | Penzance | 83D | Laira | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 5545 | 86F | Tondu | 89C | Machynlleth | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 5555 | 86F | Tondu | 89C | Machynlleth | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 5560 | 86F | Tondu | 83D | Laira | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 5564 | 83E | St Blazey | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 5572 | 83D | Laira | 83E | St Blazey | |
24/10/1960 | Condemned | 5504 | 98W | COND | |||
24/10/1960 | Condemned | 5510 | 98W | COND | |||
24/10/1960 | Condemned | 5552 | 98W | COND | |||
24/10/1960 | Condemned | 5557 | 98W | COND | |||
24/10/1960 | Condemned | 5558 | 98W | COND | |||
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 5508 | 82D | Westbury | 83C | Exeter | |
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 5516 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 83B | Taunton | |
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 5518 | 85D | Kidderminster | 83B | Taunton | |
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 5568 | 88C | Barry | 83D | Laira | |
07/11/1960 | Condemned | 4594 | 87H | Neyland | COND | ||
09/11/1960 | Condemned | 5514 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | COND | ||
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 5509 | 87H | Neyland | 83F | Truro | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 5515 | 83F | Truro | 83B | Taunton | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 5518 | 83B | Taunton | 83E | St Blazey | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 5553 | 89C | Machynlleth | 83E | St Blazey | |
13/12/1960 | Condemned | 5536 | 98W | COND | |||
25/02/1961 | Reallocation | 5515 | 83B | Taunton | 83G | Penzance | |
25/02/1961 | Reallocation | 5555 | 89C | Machynlleth | 82C | Swindon | |
22/04/1961 | Reallocation | 5545 | 89C | Machynlleth | 83G | Penzance | |
22/04/1961 | Reallocation | 5572 | 83E | St Blazey | 83D | Laira | |
30/05/1961 | Condemned | 5503 | 98W | COND | |||
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 5538 | 83F | Truro | 89C | Machynlleth | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 5555 | 82C | Swindon | 89C | Machynlleth | |
15/07/1961 | Reallocation | 5538 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89A | Shrewsbury | |
15/07/1961 | Reallocation | 5544 | 83F | Truro | 83D | Laira | |
15/07/1961 | Reallocation | 5555 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89A | Shrewsbury | |
12/08/1961 | Reallocation | 5525 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
24/08/1961 | Condemned | 5516 | 98W | COND | |||
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 4593 | 83F | Truro | 83B | Taunton | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 5531 | 83D | Laira | 83E | St Blazey | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 5568 | 83D | Laira | 82C | Swindon | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 5570 | 83E | St Blazey | 82C | Swindon | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 4588 | 83G | Penzance | 83B | Taunton | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 5515 | 83G | Penzance | 83D | Laira | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 5555 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 83C | Exeter | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 5560 | 83D | Laira | 83C | Exeter | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 5568 | 82C | Swindon | 83D | Laira | |
19/10/1961 | Condemned | 5538 | 98W | COND | |||
16/11/1961 | Condemned | 5553 | 98W | COND | |||
21/11/1961 | Condemned | 5515 | 98W | COND | |||
02/12/1961 | Reallocation | 4588 | 83B | Taunton | 83D | Laira | |
02/12/1961 | Reallocation | 5508 | 83C | Exeter | 83G | Penzance | |
02/12/1961 | Reallocation | 5521 | 83B | Taunton | 83D | Laira | |
05/12/1961 | Condemned | 5511 | 98W | COND | |||
12/12/1961 | Condemned | 5542 | 98W | COND | |||
21/12/1961 | Condemned | 5509 | 98W | COND | |||
08/01/1962 | Condemned | 5549 | 98W | COND | |||
27/01/1962 | Reallocation | 5537 | TR | Truro | 83G | Penzance | |
28/02/1962 | Condemned | 5547 | 98W | COND | |||
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 5562 | TR | Truro | 83G | Penzance | |
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 5571 | TN | Taunton | 87H | Neyland | |
03/04/1962 | Condemned | 5572 | 98W | COND | |||
05/04/1962 | Condemned | 5521 | 98W | COND | |||
05/04/1962 | Condemned | 5560 | 98W | COND | |||
13/04/1962 | Condemned | 5539 | 98W | COND | |||
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 5564 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 83D | Laira | |
08/06/1962 | Condemned | 5526 | 98W | COND | |||
10/07/1962 | Condemned | 5532 | 98W | COND | |||
10/07/1962 | Condemned | 5541 | 98W | COND | |||
13/07/1962 | Condemned | 4588 | 98W | COND | |||
17/08/1962 | Condemned | 5537 | 98W | COND | |||
17/09/1962 | Condemned | 5520 | 98W | COND | |||
17/09/1962 | Condemned | 5525 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1962 | Condemned | 5544 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1962 | Condemned | 5550 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1962 | Condemned | 5562 | 98W | COND | |||
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 5508 | 83G | Penzance | 87H | Neyland | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 5545 | 83G | Penzance | 87H | Neyland | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 5554 | 83B | Taunton | 87H | Neyland | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 5573 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 87H | Neyland | |
14/01/1963 | Condemned | 5568 | 83D | Laira | COND | ||
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 5564 | 83D | Laira | 82C | Swindon | |
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 5569 | LA | Laira | 82C | Swindon | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 4591 | LA | Laira | 83D | Laira | |
04/05/1963 | Reallocation | 5573 | 87H | Neyland | 82D | Westbury | |
01/06/1963 | Reallocation | 4591 | 83D | Laira | 72C | Yeovil Town | |
06/06/1963 | Condemned | 5548 | 98W | COND | |||
02/07/1963 | Condemned | 5555 | 98W | COND | |||
19/08/1963 | Condemned | 5554 | 98W | COND | |||
31/08/1963 | Reallocation | 4593 | 83B | Taunton | 72C | Yeovil Town | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 5518 | 83E | St Blazey | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 5531 | 83E | St Blazey | 84A | Laira | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 5508 | 87H | Neyland | 81C | Southall | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 5531 | 84A | Laira | 81C | Southall | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 5545 | 87H | Neyland | 81C | Southall | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 5564 | 82C | Swindon | 81C | Southall | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 5569 | 82C | Swindon | 81C | Southall | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 5570 | 82C | Swindon | 81C | Southall | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 5571 | 87H | Neyland | 81C | Southall | |
28/12/1963 | Condemned | 5570 | 98W | COND | |||
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 5573 | 82D | Westbury | 81C | Southall | |
11/01/1964 | Condemned | 5573 | 98W | COND | |||
06/05/1964 | Condemned | 5518 | 98W | COND | |||
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 5545 | 81C | Southall | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
20/07/1964 | Reallocation | 4591 | 72C | Yeovil Town | 82C | Swindon | |
10/08/1964 | Condemned | 4591 | 98W | COND | |||
07/09/1964 | Condemned | 4593 | 98W | COND | |||
07/09/1964 | Condemned | 5563 | 98W | COND | |||
19/10/1964 | Condemned | 5571 | 98W | COND | |||
27/11/1964 | Condemned | 5545 | 98W | COND | |||
26/12/1964 | Condemned | 5508 | 98W | COND | |||
26/12/1964 | Condemned | 5531 | 98W | COND | |||
26/12/1964 | Condemned | 5564 | 98W | COND | |||
26/12/1964 | Condemned | 5569 | 98W | COND |