GWR Collett "3100" Class 2-6-2T
Pre Grouping | Big 4 | BR | Build Date | Rebuild | Rebuild Date | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3155 3103 |
04/1907 | Rebuilt from 3150 to 31xx | 22/08/1939 | |||
3156 3101 |
04/1907 | Rebuilt from 3150 to 31xx | 21/02/1939 | |||
3173 3100 |
10/1907 | Rebuilt from 3150 to 31xx | 10/12/1938 | |||
3179 3104 |
11/1907 | Rebuilt from 3150 to 31xx | 18/10/1939 | |||
3181 3102 |
12/1907 | Rebuilt from 3150 to 31xx | 19/05/1939 |