03/06/1961 |
To Service |
3057 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
03/06/1961 |
To Service |
3058 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
17/07/1961 |
To Service |
3059 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
28/07/1961 |
To Service |
3060 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
15/08/1961 |
To Service |
3056 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
23/10/1961 |
To Service |
3063 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
26/11/1961 |
To Service |
3064 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
26/11/1961 |
To Service |
3065 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
07/12/1961 |
To Service |
3062 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
20/12/1961 |
To Service |
3061 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
17/01/1962 |
To Service |
3067 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
24/03/1962 |
To Service |
3086 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
17/04/1962 |
To Service |
3066 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
01/05/1962 |
To Service |
3068 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
19/05/1962 |
To Service |
3069 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
06/07/1962 |
To Service |
3072 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
21/07/1962 |
To Service |
3070 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
26/10/1962 |
To Service |
3087 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
27/10/1962 |
To Service |
3071 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
05/12/1962 |
To Service |
3074 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
19/01/1963 |
To Service |
3075 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
02/02/1963 |
To Service |
3073 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
10/02/1963 |
To Service |
3088 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
02/03/1963 |
To Service |
3077 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
23/03/1963 |
To Service |
3078 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
30/03/1963 |
To Service |
3080 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
20/04/1963 |
To Service |
3076 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
08/06/1963 |
To Service |
3082 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
14/06/1963 |
To Service |
3089 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
17/08/1963 |
To Service |
3083 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
10/09/1963 |
To Service |
3079 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
27/09/1963 |
To Service |
3081 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
29/09/1963 |
To Service |
3091 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
29/10/1963 |
To Service |
3090 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
01/11/1963 |
To Service |
3093 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
22/01/1964 |
To Service |
3094 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
05/02/1964 |
To Service |
3092 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
07/05/1964 |
To Service |
3084 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
11/07/1964 |
To Service |
3085 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
21/12/1964 |
To Service |
3095 |
|
NEW |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
22/01/1972 |
Reallocation |
3072 |
|
|
66A |
Polmadie |
|
29/01/1972 |
Reallocation |
3072 |
66A |
Polmadie |
Hy |
Hyndland |
|
26/02/1972 |
Reallocation |
3072 |
Hy |
Hyndland |
GS |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
03/02/1973 |
Reallocation |
3082 |
|
|
GS |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
12/05/1973 |
Reallocation |
3080 |
|
|
GS |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
12/01/1974 |
Reallocation |
3080 |
GS |
Glasgow Shields Road |
CE |
Crewe Electric |
|
12/01/1974 |
Reallocation |
3082 |
GS |
Glasgow Shields Road |
CE |
Crewe Electric |
|
26/01/1974 |
Reallocation |
85003 |
|
|
GS |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
26/01/1974 |
Reallocation |
85013 |
|
|
GS |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
09/03/1974 |
Reallocation |
85002 |
|
|
O/L |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
09/03/1974 |
Reallocation |
3087 |
|
|
O/L |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
09/03/1974 |
Reallocation |
3091 |
|
|
O/L |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
06/04/1974 |
Reallocation |
3087 |
O/L |
|
CE |
Crewe Electric |
|
06/04/1974 |
Reallocation |
3091 |
O/L |
|
CE |
Crewe Electric |
|
11/05/1974 |
Reallocation |
85002 |
O/L |
|
CE |
Crewe Electric |
|
11/05/1974 |
Reallocation |
85003 |
GS |
Glasgow Shields Road |
CE |
Crewe Electric |
|
11/05/1974 |
Reallocation |
85013 |
GS |
Glasgow Shields Road |
CE |
Crewe Electric |
|
29/05/1983 |
Condemned |
85027 |
CE |
Crewe Electric |
|
COND |
|
29/07/1984 |
Condemned |
85033 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
16/10/1985 |
Condemned |
85001 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/03/1987 |
Condemned |
85039 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/08/1987 |
Condemned |
85017 |
GS |
Glasgow Shields Road |
|
COND |
|
17/05/1988 |
Condemned |
85029 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
19/02/1989 |
Condemned |
85022 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
17/05/1989 |
Condemned |
85002 |
CE |
Crewe Electric |
|
COND |
|
16/10/1989 |
Condemned |
85014 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/12/1989 |
Condemned |
85019 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/01/1990 |
Condemned |
85038 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/01/1990 |
Condemned |
85025 |
CE |
Crewe Electric |
|
COND |
|
10/01/1990 |
Condemned |
85028 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/03/1990 |
Condemned |
85111 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/04/1990 |
Condemned |
85023 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/05/1990 |
Condemned |
85107 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/05/1990 |
Condemned |
85026 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
21/05/1990 |
Condemned |
85031 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
25/05/1990 |
Condemned |
85005 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/09/1990 |
Condemned |
85037 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/09/1990 |
Condemned |
85015 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/09/1990 |
Condemned |
85008 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/09/1990 |
Condemned |
85030 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/10/1990 |
Condemned |
85106 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
17/10/1990 |
Condemned |
85013 |
CE |
Crewe Electric |
|
COND |
|
17/10/1990 |
Condemned |
85020 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
17/10/1990 |
Condemned |
85034 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/05/1991 |
Condemned |
85102 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/05/1991 |
Condemned |
85103 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/07/1991 |
Condemned |
85112 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/07/1991 |
Condemned |
85114 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/07/1991 |
Condemned |
85104 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/07/1991 |
Condemned |
85105 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/07/1991 |
Condemned |
85108 |
CE |
Crewe Electric |
|
COND |
|
01/07/1991 |
Condemned |
85109 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/10/1991 |
Condemned |
85110 |
CE |
Crewe Electric |
|
COND |
|
15/10/1991 |
Condemned |
85018 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
28/10/1991 |
Condemned |
85040 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/11/1991 |
Condemned |
85113 |
CE |
Crewe Electric |
|
COND |
|
01/11/1992 |
Condemned |
85101 |
|
|
|
COND |
|