12 0-6-0
BR (1955 Num) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
15211 | 02/04/1949 | AS | 31/12/1971 | 22.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 11/1972 | 23.64 | |||
15212 | 09/04/1949 | AS | 31/12/1971 | 22.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 11/1972 | 23.62 | |||
15213 | 16/04/1949 | AS | 03/11/1968 | 19.58 | Cut | British Rail (at Hither Green MPD) | 03/1970 | 20.93 | |||
15214 | 07/05/1949 | AS | Norwood Junction | 10/1971 | 22.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1972 | 23.04 | ||
15215 | 07/05/1949 | AS | Norwood Junction | 03/1968 | Hither Green | 18.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1968 | 19.29 | |
15216 | 04/06/1949 | AS | Norwood Junction | 28/04/1969 | 19.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/1970 | 20.72 | ||
15217 | 18/06/1949 | AS | Norwood Junction | 08/1970 | 21.17 | Cut | British Rail (at Selhurst MPD) | 07/1971 | 22.09 | ||
15218 | 02/07/1949 | AS | 31/01/1970 | 20.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/1970 | 21.13 | |||
15219 | 09/07/1949 | AS | 31/10/1971 | 22.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1972 | 22.87 | |||
15220 | 23/07/1949 | AS | 31/10/1971 | 22.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 11/1972 | 23.33 | |||
15221 | 20/08/1949 | AS | 31/10/1971 | 22.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1972 | 22.75 | |||
15222 | 03/09/1949 | AS | 31/10/1971 | 22.08 | Cut | John Williams Ltd (Kidwelly) | 09/1978 | 29.05 | |||
15223 | 01/10/1949 | AS | Hither Green | 09/06/1969 | 19.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/1970 | 20.80 | ||
15224 | 22/10/1949 | AS | Hither Green | 31/10/1971 | 22 | Prs | Preserved | 74.23 | |||
15225 | 09/11/1949 | AS | 31/10/1971 | 21.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1972 | 22.45 | |||
15226 | 30/12/1950 | AS | Hither Green | 28/04/1969 | 18.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 11/1969 | 18.89 | ||
15227 | 03/02/1951 | AS | Hither Green | 30/04/1970 | 19.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) | 06/1970 | 19.38 | ||
15228 | 28/04/1951 | AS | Hither Green | 06/01/1969 | 17.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/1969 | 18.23 | ||
15229 | 28/07/1951 | AS | Hither Green | 31/10/1971 | 20.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1972 | 20.81 | ||
15230 | 22/09/1951 | AS | Hither Green | 31/10/1971 | 20.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 11/1972 | 21.16 | ||
15231 | 20/10/1951 | AS | 31/10/1971 | 20 | Cut | Tilcon (Grassington) | 02/1984 | 32.35 | |||
15232 | 10/11/1951 | AS | 30/04/1971 | 19.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/1972 | 20.28 | |||
15233 | 24/11/1951 | AS | 07/05/1969 | 17.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 11/1969 | 17.99 | |||
15234 | 01/12/1951 | AS | Hither Green | 22/12/1968 | 17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/1970 | 18.22 | ||
15235 | 15/12/1951 | AS | Norwood Junction | 31/05/1971 | 19.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 11/1972 | 20.93 | ||
15236 | 19/01/1952 | AS | Hither Green | 22/12/1968 | 16.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/1972 | 20.09 |