Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 118 Today
» 1044 Yesterday
» 3384 Week
» 20035 Month
» 213879 Year
» 724981 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

12 0-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Fri 16/07/1954 15211 ??   Brighton Works Arrivals: Period under review. RO 9/1954  
Sat 18/02/1961 15212 ??   Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.    
Sat 25/02/1961 15212 ??   Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.    
Sun 26/11/1961 15211 ??   Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. SLS 1/1962  
Sun 27/10/1968 15212 73C   Hither Green depot: On shed RO 12/1968  
Sun 09/01/1972 15232 Wdn   Swindon Works visit: Derelict shell RO 3/1972  
Fri 21/01/1972 15232 Wdn   Swindon Works visit: Around the works RO 3/1972