12 0-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/05/1949 | To Service | 15214 | NEW | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
07/05/1949 | To Service | 15215 | NEW | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
04/06/1949 | To Service | 15216 | NEW | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
18/06/1949 | To Service | 15217 | NEW | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
01/10/1949 | To Service | 15223 | NEW | HIT | Hither Green | ||
22/10/1949 | To Service | 15224 | NEW | HIT | Hither Green | ||
30/12/1950 | To Service | 15226 | NEW | 73C | Hither Green | ||
03/02/1951 | To Service | 15227 | NEW | 73C | Hither Green | ||
28/04/1951 | To Service | 15228 | NEW | 73C | Hither Green | ||
28/07/1951 | To Service | 15229 | NEW | 73C | Hither Green | ||
22/09/1951 | To Service | 15230 | NEW | 73C | Hither Green | ||
01/12/1951 | To Service | 15234 | NEW | 73C | Hither Green | ||
15/12/1951 | To Service | 15235 | NEW | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
19/01/1952 | To Service | 15236 | NEW | 73C | Hither Green | ||
19/03/1952 | Reallocation | 15218 | 75C | Norwood Junction | |||
19/03/1952 | Reallocation | 15219 | 75C | Norwood Junction | |||
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 15220 | 75C | Norwood Junction | |||
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 15230 | 73C | Hither Green | 71A | Eastleigh | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 15231 | 71A | Eastleigh | |||
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 15233 | 71A | Eastleigh | |||
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 15235 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 73C | Hither Green | |
20/07/1953 | Reallocation | 15220 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 73C | Hither Green | |
20/07/1953 | Reallocation | 15232 | 71A | Eastleigh | |||
08/02/1955 | Reallocation | 15218 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 73C | Hither Green | |
08/02/1955 | Reallocation | 15219 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 73C | Hither Green | |
11/03/1955 | Reallocation | 15234 | 73C | Hither Green | 71A | Eastleigh | |
20/04/1955 | Reallocation | 15236 | 73C | Hither Green | 71A | Eastleigh | |
09/05/1955 | Reallocation | 15216 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 73C | Hither Green | |
09/05/1955 | Reallocation | 15217 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 73C | Hither Green | |
21/06/1955 | Reallocation | 15235 | 73C | Hither Green | 71A | Eastleigh | |
08/10/1957 | Reallocation | 15216 | 73C | Hither Green | 70C | Guildford | |
08/10/1957 | Reallocation | 15217 | 73C | Hither Green | 70C | Guildford | |
24/02/1958 | Reallocation | 15216 | 70C | Guildford | 73C | Hither Green | |
24/02/1958 | Reallocation | 15217 | 70C | Guildford | 73C | Hither Green | |
24/02/1958 | Reallocation | 15220 | 73C | Hither Green | 74A | Ashford | |
24/02/1958 | Reallocation | 15224 | HIT | Hither Green | 74A | Ashford | |
24/02/1958 | Reallocation | 15225 | 74A | Ashford | |||
24/02/1958 | Reallocation | 15226 | 73C | Hither Green | 74A | Ashford | |
24/02/1958 | Reallocation | 15227 | 73C | Hither Green | 74A | Ashford | |
24/02/1958 | Reallocation | 15228 | 73C | Hither Green | 74A | Ashford | |
24/02/1958 | Reallocation | 15229 | 73C | Hither Green | 74A | Ashford | |
25/10/1958 | Reallocation | 15229 | 74A | Ashford | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 15230 | 71A | Eastleigh | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
26/11/1959 | Reallocation | 15214 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 71A | Eastleigh | |
05/04/1960 | Reallocation | 15217 | 73C | Hither Green | 73C | Hither Green | |
05/04/1960 | Reallocation | 15230 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 71A | Eastleigh | |
06/05/1960 | Reallocation | 15229 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 73F | Ashford | |
01/02/1962 | Reallocation | 15213 | 73C | Hither Green | |||
05/03/1962 | Reallocation | 15214 | 71A | Eastleigh | 73C | Hither Green | |
05/03/1962 | Reallocation | 15215 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 73C | Hither Green | |
05/03/1962 | Reallocation | 15221 | 73F | Ashford | |||
05/03/1962 | Reallocation | 15229 | 73F | Ashford | 71A | Eastleigh | |
01/05/1962 | Reallocation | 15212 | 73C | Hither Green | |||
01/05/1962 | Reallocation | 15222 | 73F | Ashford | |||
01/05/1962 | Reallocation | 15225 | 74A | Ashford | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
28/05/1962 | Reallocation | 15219 | 73C | Hither Green | 73F | Ashford | |
28/05/1962 | Reallocation | 15224 | 74A | Ashford | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
19/08/1963 | Reallocation | 15229 | 71A | Eastleigh | 73C | Hither Green | |
09/12/1963 | Reallocation | 15221 | 73F | Ashford | 73E | Faversham | |
09/12/1963 | Reallocation | 15223 | HIT | Hither Green | 73E | Faversham | |
09/12/1963 | Reallocation | 15226 | 74A | Ashford | 73E | Faversham | |
27/01/1964 | Reallocation | 15221 | 73E | Faversham | 73F | Ashford | |
27/01/1964 | Reallocation | 15223 | 73E | Faversham | 73F | Ashford | |
27/01/1964 | Reallocation | 15226 | 73E | Faversham | 73F | Ashford | |
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 15216 | 73C | Hither Green | 73F | Ashford | |
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 15220 | 74A | Ashford | 73C | Hither Green | |
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 15222 | 73F | Ashford | 73C | Hither Green | |
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 15230 | 71A | Eastleigh | 70F | Bournemouth | |
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 15231 | 71A | Eastleigh | 70F | Bournemouth | |
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 15232 | 71A | Eastleigh | 70F | Bournemouth | |
09/07/1967 | Reallocation | 15233 | 71A | Eastleigh | 70F | Bournemouth | |
05/02/1968 | Reallocation | 15221 | 73F | Ashford | 70D | Eastleigh | |
05/02/1968 | Reallocation | 15231 | 70F | Bournemouth | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | |
03/1968 | Condemned | 15215 | 73C | Hither Green | COND | ||
14/06/1968 | Reallocation | 15230 | 70F | Bournemouth | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | |
30/09/1968 | Reallocation | 15232 | 70F | Bournemouth | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | |
30/09/1968 | Reallocation | 15233 | 70F | Bournemouth | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | |
03/11/1968 | Condemned | 15213 | 73C | Hither Green | COND | ||
22/12/1968 | Condemned | 15234 | 71A | Eastleigh | COND | ||
22/12/1968 | Condemned | 15236 | 71A | Eastleigh | COND | ||
06/01/1969 | Condemned | 15228 | 74A | Ashford | COND | ||
28/04/1969 | Condemned | 15216 | 73F | Ashford | COND | ||
28/04/1969 | Condemned | 15226 | 73F | Ashford | COND | ||
07/05/1969 | Condemned | 15233 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | COND | ||
09/06/1969 | Condemned | 15223 | 73F | Ashford | COND | ||
09/06/1969 | Reallocation | 15235 | 71A | Eastleigh | 73C | Hither Green | |
31/01/1970 | Condemned | 15218 | 73C | Hither Green | COND | ||
30/04/1970 | Reallocation | 15221 | 70D | Eastleigh | 73C | Hither Green | |
30/04/1970 | Condemned | 15227 | 74A | Ashford | COND | ||
08/1970 | Condemned | 15217 | 73C | Hither Green | COND | ||
25/02/1971 | Reallocation | 15214 | 73C | Hither Green | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | |
30/04/1971 | Condemned | 15232 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | COND | ||
31/05/1971 | Condemned | 15235 | 73C | Hither Green | COND | ||
10/1971 | Condemned | 15214 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | COND | ||
31/10/1971 | Condemned | 15219 | 73F | Ashford | COND | ||
31/10/1971 | Condemned | 15220 | 73C | Hither Green | COND | ||
31/10/1971 | Condemned | 15221 | 73C | Hither Green | COND | ||
31/10/1971 | Condemned | 15222 | 73C | Hither Green | COND | ||
31/10/1971 | Condemned | 15224 | 75C | Norwood Junction | COND | ||
31/10/1971 | Condemned | 15225 | 75C | Norwood Junction | COND | ||
31/10/1971 | Condemned | 15229 | 73C | Hither Green | COND | ||
31/10/1971 | Condemned | 15230 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | COND | ||
31/10/1971 | Condemned | 15231 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | COND | ||
31/12/1971 | Condemned | 15211 | COND | ||||
31/12/1971 | Condemned | 15212 | 73C | Hither Green | COND |