Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 62 Today
» 890 Yesterday
» 62 Week
» 24724 Month
» 283583 Year
» 794685 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

12 0-6-0


BR (1955 Num) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
15211 02/04/1949 W Withdrawn 31/12/1971 31/12/1971
15212 09/04/1949 73C
W
Hither Green
Withdrawn
01/05/1962
31/12/1971
31/12/1971
15213 16/04/1949 73C
W
Hither Green
Withdrawn
01/02/1962
03/11/1968
03/11/1968
15214 07/05/1949 NORW
71A
73C
73F
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Eastleigh
Hither Green
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
07/05/1949
26/11/1959
05/03/1962
25/02/1971
10/1971
10/1971
15215 07/05/1949 NORW
73C
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Hither Green
Withdrawn
07/05/1949
05/03/1962
03/1968
03/1968
15216 04/06/1949 NORW
73C
70C
73C
73FSub
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Hither Green
Guildford
Hither Green
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
04/06/1949
09/05/1955
08/10/1957
24/02/1958
12/10/1964
28/04/1969
28/04/1969
15217 18/06/1949 NORW
73C
70C
73C
73C
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Hither Green
Guildford
Hither Green
Hither Green
Withdrawn
18/06/1949
09/05/1955
08/10/1957
24/02/1958
05/04/1960
08/1970
08/1970
15218 02/07/1949 75C
73C
W
Norwood Junction
Hither Green
Withdrawn
19/03/1952
08/02/1955
31/01/1970
31/01/1970
15219 09/07/1949 75C
73C
73FSub
W
Norwood Junction
Hither Green
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
19/03/1952
08/02/1955
28/05/1962
31/10/1971
31/10/1971
15220 23/07/1949 75C
73C
74A
73C
W
Norwood Junction
Hither Green
Ashford
Hither Green
Withdrawn
30/06/1952
20/07/1953
24/02/1958
12/10/1964
31/10/1971
31/10/1971
15221 20/08/1949 73FSub
73E
73FSub
70D
73C
W
Ashford Chart Leacon
Faversham
Ashford Chart Leacon
Eastleigh
Hither Green
Withdrawn
05/03/1962
09/12/1963
27/01/1964
05/02/1968
30/04/1970
31/10/1971
31/10/1971
15222 03/09/1949 73FSub
73C
W
Ashford Chart Leacon
Hither Green
Withdrawn
01/05/1962
12/10/1964
31/10/1971
31/10/1971
15223 01/10/1949 HIT
73E
73FSub
W
Hither Green (New)
Faversham
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
01/10/1949
09/12/1963
27/01/1964
09/06/1969
09/06/1969
15224 22/10/1949 HIT
74A
75C
W
Hither Green (New)
Ashford
Norwood Junction
Withdrawn
22/10/1949
24/02/1958
28/05/1962
31/10/1971
31/10/1971
15225 09/11/1949 74A
75C
W
Ashford
Norwood Junction
Withdrawn
24/02/1958
01/05/1962
31/10/1971
31/10/1971
15226 30/12/1950 73C
74A
73E
73FSub
W
Hither Green (New)
Ashford
Faversham
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
30/12/1950
24/02/1958
09/12/1963
27/01/1964
28/04/1969
28/04/1969
15227 03/02/1951 73C
74A
W
Hither Green (New)
Ashford
Withdrawn
03/02/1951
24/02/1958
30/04/1970
30/04/1970
15228 28/04/1951 73C
74A
W
Hither Green (New)
Ashford
Withdrawn
28/04/1951
24/02/1958
06/01/1969
06/01/1969
15229 28/07/1951 73C
74A
61A
73F
71A
73C
W
Hither Green (New)
Ashford
Kittybrewster
Ashford
Eastleigh
Hither Green
Withdrawn
28/07/1951
24/02/1958
25/10/1958
06/05/1960
05/03/1962
19/08/1963
31/10/1971
31/10/1971
15230 22/09/1951 73C
71A
82B
71A
70F
73F
W
Hither Green (New)
Eastleigh
St Philips Marsh
Eastleigh
Bournemouth
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
22/09/1951
14/02/1953
21/03/1959
05/04/1960
09/07/1967
14/06/1968
31/10/1971
31/10/1971
15231 20/10/1951 71A
70F
73F
W
Eastleigh
Bournemouth
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
14/02/1953
09/07/1967
05/02/1968
31/10/1971
31/10/1971
15232 10/11/1951 71A
70F
73F
W
Eastleigh
Bournemouth
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
20/07/1953
09/07/1967
30/09/1968
30/04/1971
30/04/1971
15233 24/11/1951 71A
70F
73F
W
Eastleigh
Bournemouth
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
14/02/1953
09/07/1967
30/09/1968
07/05/1969
07/05/1969
15234 01/12/1951 73C
71A
W
Hither Green (New)
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/12/1951
11/03/1955
22/12/1968
22/12/1968
15235 15/12/1951 75C
73C
71A
73C
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Hither Green
Eastleigh
Hither Green
Withdrawn
15/12/1951
14/02/1953
21/06/1955
09/06/1969
31/05/1971
31/05/1971
15236 19/01/1952 73C
71A
W
Hither Green (New)
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
19/01/1952
20/04/1955
22/12/1968
22/12/1968