Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 137 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 137 Week
» 11430 Month
» 276063 Year
» 1497628 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Fowler "4P" Class 2-6-4T


Old Number Company Old Num Type New Number Company Subtype New Num Type Date
2418 LMS Big Four 42418 BR   British Rail w/e 20/03/1948
2344 LMS Big Four 42344 BR   British Rail w/e 24/04/1948
2415 LMS Big Four 42415 BR   British Rail w/e 24/04/1948
2311 LMS Big Four 42311 BR   British Rail w/e 01/05/1948
2314 LMS Big Four 42314 BR   British Rail w/e 01/05/1948
2383 LMS Big Four 42383 BR   British Rail w/e 01/05/1948
2322 LMS Big Four 42322 BR   British Rail w/e 08/05/1948
2320 LMS Big Four 42320 BR   British Rail w/e 15/05/1948
2370 LMS Big Four 42370 BR   British Rail w/e 15/05/1948
2417 LMS Big Four 42417 BR   British Rail w/e 15/05/1948
2305 LMS Big Four 42305 BR   British Rail w/e 22/05/1948
2392 LMS Big Four 42392 BR   British Rail w/e 22/05/1948
2363 LMS Big Four 42363 BR   British Rail w/e 29/05/1948
2384 LMS Big Four 42384 BR   British Rail w/e 29/05/1948
2386 LMS Big Four 42386 BR   British Rail w/e 29/05/1948
2358 LMS Big Four 42358 BR   British Rail w/e 12/06/1948
2300 LMS Big Four 42300 BR   British Rail w/e 26/06/1948
2331 LMS Big Four 42331 BR   British Rail w/e 26/06/1948
2346 LMS Big Four 42346 BR   British Rail w/e 03/07/1948
2416 LMS Big Four 42416 BR   British Rail w/e 03/07/1948
2302 LMS Big Four 42302 BR   British Rail w/e 10/07/1948
2339 LMS Big Four 42339 BR   British Rail w/e 10/07/1948
2347 LMS Big Four 42347 BR   British Rail w/e 10/07/1948
2405 LMS Big Four 42405 BR   British Rail w/e 10/07/1948
2374 LMS Big Four 42374 BR   British Rail w/e 07/08/1948
2389 LMS Big Four 42389 BR   British Rail w/e 14/08/1948
2412 LMS Big Four 42412 BR   British Rail w/e 14/08/1948
2360 LMS Big Four 42360 BR   British Rail w/e 28/08/1948
2421 LMS Big Four 42421 BR   British Rail w/e 28/08/1948
2328 LMS Big Four 42328 BR   British Rail w/e 04/09/1948
2345 LMS Big Four 42345 BR   British Rail w/e 04/09/1948
2334 LMS Big Four 42334 BR   British Rail w/e 11/09/1948
2364 LMS Big Four 42364 BR   British Rail w/e 11/09/1948
2381 LMS Big Four 42381 BR   British Rail w/e 11/09/1948
2410 LMS Big Four 42410 BR   British Rail w/e 11/09/1948
2419 LMS Big Four 42419 BR   British Rail w/e 11/09/1948
2404 LMS Big Four 42404 BR   British Rail w/e 18/09/1948
2395 LMS Big Four 42395 BR   British Rail w/e 25/09/1948
2397 LMS Big Four 42397 BR   British Rail w/e 25/09/1948
2414 LMS Big Four 42414 BR   British Rail w/e 25/09/1948
2307 LMS Big Four 42307 BR   British Rail w/e 02/10/1948
2335 LMS Big Four 42335 BR   British Rail w/e 02/10/1948
2315 LMS Big Four 42315 BR   British Rail w/e 09/10/1948
2324 LMS Big Four 42324 BR   British Rail w/e 09/10/1948
2400 LMS Big Four 42400 BR   British Rail w/e 09/10/1948
2303 LMS Big Four 42303 BR   British Rail w/e 16/10/1948
2340 LMS Big Four 42340 BR   British Rail w/e 16/10/1948
2371 LMS Big Four 42371 BR   British Rail w/e 16/10/1948
2312 LMS Big Four 42312 BR   British Rail w/e 23/10/1948
2326 LMS Big Four 42326 BR   British Rail w/e 30/10/1948
2350 LMS Big Four 42350 BR   British Rail w/e 30/10/1948
2301 LMS Big Four 42301 BR   British Rail w/e 06/11/1948
2388 LMS Big Four 42388 BR   British Rail w/e 06/11/1948
2398 LMS Big Four 42398 BR   British Rail w/e 13/11/1948
2316 LMS Big Four 42316 BR   British Rail w/e 20/11/1948
2318 LMS Big Four 42318 BR   British Rail w/e 27/11/1948
2399 LMS Big Four 42399 BR   British Rail w/e 27/11/1948
2406 LMS Big Four 42406 BR   British Rail w/e 27/11/1948
2349 LMS Big Four 42349 BR   British Rail w/e 11/12/1948
2352 LMS Big Four 42352 BR   British Rail w/e 11/12/1948
2304 LMS Big Four 42304 BR   British Rail w/e 25/12/1948
2329 LMS Big Four 42329 BR   British Rail w/e 01/01/1949
2422 LMS Big Four 42422 BR   British Rail w/e 01/01/1949
2327 LMS Big Four 42327 BR   British Rail w/e 08/01/1949
2338 LMS Big Four 42338 BR   British Rail w/e 15/01/1949
2343 LMS Big Four 42343 BR   British Rail w/e 15/01/1949
2402 LMS Big Four 42402 BR   British Rail w/e 22/01/1949
2317 LMS Big Four 42317 BR   British Rail w/e 29/01/1949
2337 LMS Big Four 42337 BR   British Rail w/e 29/01/1949
2351 LMS Big Four 42351 BR   British Rail w/e 05/02/1949
2375 LMS Big Four 42375 BR   British Rail w/e 05/02/1949
2393 LMS Big Four 42393 BR   British Rail w/e 05/02/1949
2357 LMS Big Four 42357 BR   British Rail w/e 12/02/1949
2390 LMS Big Four 42390 BR   British Rail w/e 12/02/1949
2342 LMS Big Four 42342 BR   British Rail w/e 19/02/1949
2413 LMS Big Four 42413 BR   British Rail w/e 19/02/1949
2310 LMS Big Four 42310 BR   British Rail w/e 26/02/1949
2333 LMS Big Four 42333 BR   British Rail w/e 26/02/1949
2348 LMS Big Four 42348 BR   British Rail w/e 19/03/1949
2377 LMS Big Four 42377 BR   British Rail w/e 26/03/1949
2382 LMS Big Four 42382 BR   British Rail w/e 26/03/1949
2403 LMS Big Four 42403 BR   British Rail w/e 02/04/1949
2423 LMS Big Four 42423 BR   British Rail w/e 02/04/1949
2362 LMS Big Four 42362 BR   British Rail w/e 16/04/1949
2376 LMS Big Four 42376 BR   British Rail w/e 23/04/1949
2332 LMS Big Four 42332 BR   British Rail w/e 30/04/1949
2369 LMS Big Four 42369 BR   British Rail w/e 07/05/1949
2420 LMS Big Four 42420 BR   British Rail w/e 07/05/1949
2325 LMS Big Four 42325 BR   British Rail w/e 14/05/1949
2391 LMS Big Four 42391 BR   British Rail w/e 14/05/1949
2373 LMS Big Four 42373 BR   British Rail w/e 21/05/1949
2330 LMS Big Four 42330 BR   British Rail w/e 04/06/1949
2394 LMS Big Four 42394 BR   British Rail w/e 04/06/1949
2319 LMS Big Four 42319 BR   British Rail w/e 11/06/1949
2396 LMS Big Four 42396 BR   British Rail w/e 18/06/1949
2409 LMS Big Four 42409 BR   British Rail w/e 18/06/1949
2353 LMS Big Four 42353 BR   British Rail w/e 02/07/1949
2387 LMS Big Four 42387 BR   British Rail w/e 02/07/1949
2309 LMS Big Four 42309 BR   British Rail w/e 09/07/1949
2385 LMS Big Four 42385 BR   British Rail w/e 06/08/1949
2323 LMS Big Four 42323 BR   British Rail w/e 27/08/1949
2355 LMS Big Four 42355 BR   British Rail w/e 27/08/1949
2321 LMS Big Four 42321 BR   British Rail w/e 17/09/1949
2379 LMS Big Four 42379 BR   British Rail w/e 17/09/1949
2356 LMS Big Four 42356 BR   British Rail w/e 01/10/1949
2361 LMS Big Four 42361 BR   British Rail w/e 01/10/1949
2411 LMS Big Four 42411 BR   British Rail w/e 15/10/1949
2401 LMS Big Four 42401 BR   British Rail w/e 22/10/1949
2424 LMS Big Four 42424 BR   British Rail w/e 22/10/1949
2378 LMS Big Four 42378 BR   British Rail w/e 29/10/1949
2336 LMS Big Four 42336 BR   British Rail w/e 05/11/1949
2368 LMS Big Four 42368 BR   British Rail w/e 05/11/1949
2372 LMS Big Four 42372 BR   British Rail w/e 05/11/1949
2313 LMS Big Four 42313 BR   British Rail w/e 12/11/1949
2308 LMS Big Four 42308 BR   British Rail w/e 19/11/1949
2354 LMS Big Four 42354 BR   British Rail w/e 26/11/1949
2408 LMS Big Four 42408 BR   British Rail w/e 24/12/1949
2380 LMS Big Four 42380 BR   British Rail w/e 07/01/1950
2359 LMS Big Four 42359 BR   British Rail w/e 14/01/1950
2341 LMS Big Four 42341 BR   British Rail w/e 21/01/1950
2365 LMS Big Four 42365 BR   British Rail w/e 11/02/1950
2306 LMS Big Four 42306 BR   British Rail w/e 25/02/1950
2367 LMS Big Four 42367 BR   British Rail w/e 01/04/1950
2407 LMS Big Four 42407 BR   British Rail w/e 22/04/1950
2366 LMS Big Four 42366 BR   British Rail w/e 27/05/1950