Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 31 Today
» 918 Yesterday
» 31 Week
» 17792 Month
» 307184 Year
» 818286 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Fowler "4P" Class 2-6-4T


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sat 25/02/1961 42306,
42322,
42327,
42332,
42335,
42343,
42363,
42375,
42381,
42400,
42409
9D,
12G,
5C,
12E,
14B,
9B,
9C,
5F,
2A,
21A,
55A
  Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Shed road.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Awaiting works.
   
Fri 15/12/1961 42328,
42330,
42332,
42363,
42366,
42395,
42404,
42412,
42416
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
9A,
1A,
Wdn,
Wdn,
55G,
21A
  Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
SLS 1/1962  
Fri 16/03/1962 42327,
42332,
42343,
42350,
42356,
42363,
42375,
42381,
42385,
42387,
42409
5C,
Wdn,
9B,
1A,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
2E,
87D,
87D,
55A
  Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
   
Fri 06/04/1962 42332,
42350,
42363,
42374,
42375,
42387,
42401
Wdn,
1A,
Wdn,
9G,
Wdn,
Wdn,
9A
  Derby Works visit: Around the works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Paint shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - "Spike Island" (Gasworks) -
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Derby shed.
SLS 5/1962  
Fri 08/06/1962 42332,
42337,
42342,
42393,
42394
Wdn,
9B,
Wdn,
Wdn,
87D
  Derby Works visit: Around the works - Foundry row. SLS 7/1962