Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 692 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 4527 Week
» 22998 Month
» 158663 Year
» 669765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Fowler "4P" Class 2-6-4T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2304     1C Watford  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2306     9D Buxton (LNWR)  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2315     9D Buxton (LNWR)  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2323     9C Macclesfield  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2327     21B Bournville  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2339     21B Bournville  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2341     17A Derby  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2347     23C Southport  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2384     24B Rose Grove  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2403     11D Oxenholme  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2408     25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2300     14C St Albans  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2301     11D Oxenholme  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2302     14C St Albans  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2303     10A Springs Branch (Wigan)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2304 1C Watford 1C Watford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2305     9C Macclesfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2306 9D Buxton (LNWR) 9D Buxton (LNWR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2307     4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2308     11E Tebay  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2309     5A Crewe North  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2310     25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2311     25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2312     25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2313     11D Oxenholme  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2314     11D Oxenholme  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2315 9D Buxton (LNWR) 9D Buxton (LNWR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2316     1A Willesden  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2317     11D Oxenholme  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2318     9D Buxton (LNWR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2319     9C Macclesfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2320     5D Stoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2321     11B Barrow in Furness  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2322     9A Longsight  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2323 9C Macclesfield 9C Macclesfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2324     25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2325     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2326     21A Saltley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2327 21B Bournville 21B Bournville  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2328     16A Nottingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2329     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2330     15C Leicester Midland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2331     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2332     9B Stockport Edgeley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2333     16A Nottingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2334     15C Leicester Midland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2335     14C St Albans  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2336     17B Burton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2337     21A Saltley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2338     21B Bournville  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2339 21B Bournville 21B Bournville  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2340     17A Derby  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2341 17A Derby 17A Derby  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2342     21B Bournville  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2343     5D Stoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2344     5D Stoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2345     5C Stafford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2346     5C Stafford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2347 23C Southport 5C Stafford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2348     5E Alsager  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2349     9C Macclesfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2350     9A Longsight  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2351     9A Longsight  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2352     9B Stockport Edgeley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2353     9B Stockport Edgeley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2354     9B Stockport Edgeley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2355     9C Macclesfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2356     9C Macclesfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2357     9C Macclesfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2358     5F Uttoxeter  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2359     11B Barrow in Furness  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2360     5D Stoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2361     16A Nottingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2362     23D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2363     5F Uttoxeter  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2364     5D Stoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2365     9D Buxton (LNWR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2366     9D Buxton (LNWR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2367     9D Buxton (LNWR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2368     9D Buxton (LNWR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2369     9C Macclesfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2370     9D Buxton (LNWR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2371     9D Buxton (LNWR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2372     1A Willesden  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2373     21B Bournville  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2374     14C St Albans  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2375     5D Stoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2376     5D Stoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2377     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2378     5D Stoke  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2379     10A Springs Branch (Wigan)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2380     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2381     23D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2382     9C Macclesfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2383     14B Kentish Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2384 24B Rose Grove 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2385     4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2386     11B Barrow in Furness  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2387     4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2388     4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2389     1C Watford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2390     4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2391     5C Stafford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2392     11B Barrow in Furness  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2393     11B Barrow in Furness  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2394     4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2395     9A Longsight  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2396     9A Longsight  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2397     9A Longsight  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2398     9A Longsight  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2399     9A Longsight  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2400     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2401     9A Longsight  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2402     9A Longsight  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2403 11D Oxenholme 11E Tebay  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2404     11E Tebay  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2405     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2406     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2407     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2408 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2409     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2410     25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2411     25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2412     25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2413     25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2414     25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2415     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2416     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2417     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2418     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2419     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2420     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2421     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2422     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2423     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2424     11E Tebay  
11/12/1948 Reallocation 42349 9C Macclesfield 5D Stoke  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 42336 17B Burton 14C St Albans  
14/01/1950 Reallocation 42309 5A Crewe North 5E Alsager  
14/01/1950 Reallocation 42323 9C Macclesfield 5D Stoke  
14/01/1950 Reallocation 42336 14C St Albans 17B Burton  
14/01/1950 Reallocation 42373 21B Bournville 16A Nottingham  
20/05/1950 Reallocation 42323 5D Stoke 91M To London Midland Region  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 42363 5F Uttoxeter 9C Macclesfield  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 42309 5E Alsager 5C Stafford  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 42318 9D Buxton (LNWR) 5A Crewe North  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 42378 5D Stoke 4A Bletchley  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 42411 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 25D Mirfield  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 42378 4A Bletchley 5D Stoke  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 42341 17A Derby 14C St Albans  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 42376 5D Stoke 11B Barrow in Furness  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 42315 9D Buxton (LNWR) 6A Chester (MR)  
09/09/1951 Reallocation 42380 20E Manningham 67A Corkerhill  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 42342 21B Bournville 21A Saltley  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 42419 27B Greenock Ladyburn 67A Corkerhill  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 42420 27B Greenock Ladyburn 67A Corkerhill  
29/12/1951 Reallocation 42303 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 5D Stoke  
29/12/1951 Reallocation 42318 5A Crewe North 9C Macclesfield  
29/12/1951 Reallocation 42348 5E Alsager 5D Stoke  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 42318 9C Macclesfield 5A Crewe North  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 42342 21A Saltley 17A Derby  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 42419 67A Corkerhill 66D Greenock Ladyburn  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 42420 67A Corkerhill 66D Greenock Ladyburn  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 42327 21B Bournville 21A Saltley  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 42393 11B Barrow in Furness 11C Oxenholme  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 42360 5D Stoke 5D Stoke  
03/01/1953 Reallocation 42336 17B Burton 17A Derby  
03/01/1953 Reallocation 42391 5C Stafford 9A Longsight  
21/02/1953 Reallocation 42318 5A Crewe North 9C Macclesfield  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 42352 9B Stockport Edgeley 6J Holyhead  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 42349 5D Stoke 8E Brunswick  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 42352 6J Holyhead 8E Brunswick  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 42304 1C Watford 5F Uttoxeter  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 42323 91M To London Midland Region 11B Barrow in Furness  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 42389 1C Watford 5D Stoke  
08/08/1953 Reallocation 42323 11B Barrow in Furness 5D Stoke  
08/08/1953 Reallocation 42364 5D Stoke 11B Barrow in Furness  
05/09/1953 Reallocation 42375 5D Stoke 5F Uttoxeter  
28/11/1953 Reallocation 42389 5D Stoke 1C Watford  
30/01/1954 Reallocation 42316 1A Willesden 5A Crewe North  
30/01/1954 Reallocation 42374 14C St Albans 34E Neasden  
20/03/1954 Reallocation 42328 16A Nottingham 34E Neasden  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 42400 27B Greenock Ladyburn 5D Stoke  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 42419 66D Greenock Ladyburn 3E Monument Lane  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 42420 66D Greenock Ladyburn 3E Monument Lane  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 42421 27B Greenock Ladyburn 3E Monument Lane  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 42422 27B Greenock Ladyburn 3E Monument Lane  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 42423 27B Greenock Ladyburn 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 42343 5D Stoke 1C Watford  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 42415 27B Greenock Ladyburn 6H Bangor  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 42416 27B Greenock Ladyburn 6H Bangor  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 42417 27B Greenock Ladyburn 6H Bangor  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 42418 27B Greenock Ladyburn 6H Bangor  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 42327 21A Saltley 15C Leicester Midland  
14/08/1954 Reallocation 42327 15C Leicester Midland 21A Saltley  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 42344 5D Stoke 9D Buxton (LNWR)  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 42383 14B Kentish Town 21A Saltley  
04/12/1954 Reallocation 42334 15C Leicester Midland 21B Bournville  
01/01/1955 Reallocation 42393 11C Oxenholme 11D Tebay  
22/01/1955 Reallocation 42328 34E Neasden 34D Hitchin (GNR)  
19/02/1955 Reallocation 42374 34E Neasden 34D Hitchin (GNR)  
26/03/1955 Reallocation 42423 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 42336 17A Derby 16A Nottingham  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 42342 17A Derby 16A Nottingham  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 42343 1C Watford 3B Bushbury  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 42377 20E Manningham 20D Normanton  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 42389 1C Watford 5D Stoke  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 42307 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 87H Neyland  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 42340 17A Derby 21B Bournville  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 42388 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 87H Neyland  
10/09/1955 Reallocation 42388 87H Neyland 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)  
05/11/1955 Reallocation 42307 87H Neyland 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)  
05/11/1955 Reallocation 42308 11E Tebay 9D Buxton (LNWR)  
05/11/1955 Reallocation 42319 9C Macclesfield 9A Longsight  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 42321 11B Barrow in Furness 5A Crewe North  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 42393 11D Tebay 2A Rugby  
28/01/1956 Reallocation 42304 5F Uttoxeter 9A Longsight  
28/01/1956 Reallocation 42332 9B Stockport Edgeley 11B Barrow in Furness  
28/01/1956 Reallocation 42393 2A Rugby 11D Tebay  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 42320 5D Stoke 2A Rugby  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 42324 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 25C Goole  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 42343 3B Bushbury 12A Carlisle Upperby  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 42374 34D Hitchin (GNR) 34B Hornsey  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 42407 25F Low Moor 25C Goole  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 42411 25D Mirfield 25C Goole  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 42419 3E Monument Lane 5D Stoke  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 42420 3E Monument Lane 5D Stoke  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 42421 3E Monument Lane 5D Stoke  
21/04/1956 Reallocation 42311 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 25C Goole  
21/04/1956 Reallocation 42316 5A Crewe North 2C Warwick  
19/05/1956 Reallocation 42381 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 9A Longsight  
19/05/1956 Reallocation 42419 5D Stoke 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 42303 5D Stoke 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
21/07/1956 Reallocation 42374 34B Hornsey 34D Hitchin (GNR)  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 42320 2A Rugby 11B Barrow in Furness  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 42377 20D Normanton 20A Holbeck (MR)  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 42421 5D Stoke 6H Bangor  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 42308 9D Buxton (LNWR) 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 42315 6A Chester (MR) 5D Stoke  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 42344 9D Buxton (LNWR) 5D Stoke  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 42366 9D Buxton (LNWR) 5D Stoke  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 42367 9D Buxton (LNWR) 5D Stoke  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 42417 6H Bangor 6D Chester Northgate  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 42418 6H Bangor 5C Stafford  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 42421 6H Bangor 5C Stafford  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 42423 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 10C Patricroft  
03/11/1956 Reallocation 42315 5D Stoke 6A Chester (MR)  
03/11/1956 Reallocation 42391 9A Longsight 9B Stockport Edgeley  
26/01/1957 Reallocation 42375 5F Uttoxeter 5D Stoke  
26/01/1957 Reallocation 42404 11E Tebay 12A Carlisle Upperby  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 42303 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6A Chester (MR)  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 42308 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6A Chester (MR)  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 42348 5D Stoke 9A Longsight  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 42358 5F Uttoxeter 5D Stoke  
23/03/1957 Reallocation 42404 12A Carlisle Upperby 11D Tebay  
20/04/1957 Reallocation 42323 5D Stoke 5C Stafford  
20/04/1957 Reallocation 42389 5D Stoke 5C Stafford  
20/04/1957 Reallocation 42418 5C Stafford 5D Stoke  
20/04/1957 Reallocation 42421 5C Stafford 5D Stoke  
15/06/1957 Reallocation 42328 34D Hitchin (GNR) 39A Gorton  
15/06/1957 Reallocation 42374 34D Hitchin (GNR) 39A Gorton  
16/06/1957 Reallocation 42343 12A Carlisle Upperby 9B Stockport Edgeley  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 42303 6A Chester (MR) 6D Chester Northgate  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 42308 6A Chester (MR) 6D Chester Northgate  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 42351 9A Longsight 11B Barrow in Furness  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 42365 9D Buxton (LNWR) 9A Longsight  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 42368 9D Buxton (LNWR) 5E Alsager  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 42415 6H Bangor 6D Chester Northgate  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 42416 6H Bangor 6A Chester (MR)  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 42423 10C Patricroft 5E Alsager  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 42319 9A Longsight 9C Macclesfield  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 42326 21A Saltley 17A Derby  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 42348 9A Longsight 9C Macclesfield  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 42358 5D Stoke 5F Uttoxeter  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 42368 5E Alsager 5D Stoke  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 42375 5D Stoke 2A Rugby  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 42378 5D Stoke 2A Rugby  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 42397 9A Longsight 9C Macclesfield  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 42423 5E Alsager 9C Macclesfield  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 42315 6A Chester (MR) 1A Willesden  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 42316 2C Warwick 1A Willesden  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 42321 5A Crewe North 1A Willesden  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 42351 11B Barrow in Furness 1A Willesden  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 42359 11B Barrow in Furness 1A Willesden  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 42360 5D Stoke 1A Willesden  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 42366 5D Stoke 1A Willesden  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 42367 5D Stoke 1A Willesden  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 42368 5D Stoke 1A Willesden  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 42375 2A Rugby 5D Stoke  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 42378 2A Rugby 5D Stoke  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 42416 6A Chester (MR) 1A Willesden  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 42422 3E Monument Lane 1A Willesden  
28/12/1957 Reallocation 42353 9B Stockport Edgeley 2E Northampton  
28/12/1957 Reallocation 42362 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 2A Rugby  
25/01/1958 Reallocation 42320 11B Barrow in Furness 9A Longsight  
25/01/1958 Reallocation 42362 2A Rugby 9C Macclesfield  
22/02/1958 Reallocation 42366 1A Willesden 14D Neasden  
08/03/1958 Reallocation 42405 25D Mirfield 56E Sowerby Bridge  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 42315 1A Willesden 14D Neasden  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 42316 1A Willesden 14D Neasden  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 42319 9C Macclesfield 8E Brunswick  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 42320 9A Longsight 11A Carnforth  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 42356 9C Macclesfield 8E Brunswick  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 42362 9C Macclesfield 5D Stoke  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 42375 5D Stoke 5F Uttoxeter  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 42386 11B Barrow in Furness 8E Brunswick  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 42423 9C Macclesfield 8E Brunswick  
12/04/1958 Reallocation 42411 25C Goole 54A Sunderland  
19/04/1958 Reallocation 42315 14D Neasden 1A Willesden  
19/04/1958 Reallocation 42316 14D Neasden 1A Willesden  
19/04/1958 Reallocation 42336 16A Nottingham 18C Hasland  
19/04/1958 Reallocation 42366 14D Neasden 1A Willesden  
19/04/1958 Reallocation 42373 16A Nottingham 18C Hasland  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 42334 21B Bournville 14D Neasden  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 42338 21B Bournville 14D Neasden  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 42342 16A Nottingham 14D Neasden  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 42311 25C Goole 56E Sowerby Bridge  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 42315 1A Willesden 5D Stoke  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 42324 25C Goole 56D Mirfield  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 42336 18C Hasland 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 42345 5C Stafford 11C Oxenholme  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 42351 1A Willesden 14D Neasden  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 42359 1A Willesden 14D Neasden  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 42360 1A Willesden 9A Longsight  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 42380 67A Corkerhill 56E Sowerby Bridge  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 42407 25C Goole 56D Mirfield  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 42416 1A Willesden 9A Longsight  
12/07/1958 Reallocation 42316 1A Willesden 9B Stockport Edgeley  
12/07/1958 Reallocation 42326 17A Derby 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
12/07/1958 Reallocation 42340 21B Bournville 21A Saltley  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 42344 5D Stoke 5F Uttoxeter  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 42357 9C Macclesfield 9B Stockport Edgeley  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 42400 5D Stoke 9A Longsight  
16/08/1958 Reallocation 42411 54A Sunderland 50A York (North)  
06/09/1958 Reallocation 42326 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 17A Derby  
06/09/1958 Reallocation 42369 9C Macclesfield 9A Longsight  
06/09/1958 Reallocation 42400 9A Longsight 5C Stafford  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 42304 9A Longsight 1A Willesden  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 42350 9A Longsight 1A Willesden  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 42351 14D Neasden 1A Willesden  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 42359 14D Neasden 1A Willesden  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 42360 9A Longsight 1A Willesden  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 42365 9A Longsight 1A Willesden  
11/10/1958 Reallocation 42411 50A York (North) 50B Neville Hill  
01/11/1958 Reallocation 42334 14D Neasden 14B Kentish Town  
01/11/1958 Reallocation 42338 14D Neasden 14B Kentish Town  
01/11/1958 Reallocation 42342 14D Neasden 14B Kentish Town  
22/11/1958 Reallocation 42323 5C Stafford 5D Stoke  
22/11/1958 Reallocation 42346 5C Stafford 5D Stoke  
22/11/1958 Reallocation 42377 20A Holbeck (MR) 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse  
10/01/1959 Reallocation 42339 21B Bournville 16D Annesley  
10/01/1959 Reallocation 42361 16A Nottingham 16D Annesley  
17/01/1959 Reallocation 42333 16A Nottingham 16D Annesley  
31/01/1959 Reallocation 42322 9A Longsight 9B Stockport Edgeley  
31/01/1959 Reallocation 42411 50B Neville Hill 56F Low Moor  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 42344 5F Uttoxeter 5D Stoke  
21/02/1959 Reallocation 42320 11A Carnforth 84G Shrewsbury  
21/02/1959 Reallocation 42362 5D Stoke 84G Shrewsbury  
21/02/1959 Reallocation 42372 1A Willesden 84G Shrewsbury  
21/02/1959 Reallocation 42395 9A Longsight 84G Shrewsbury  
21/02/1959 Reallocation 42418 5D Stoke 84G Shrewsbury  
21/02/1959 Reallocation 42420 5D Stoke 84G Shrewsbury  
18/04/1959 Reallocation 42393 11D Tebay 8E Northwich  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 42311 56E Sowerby Bridge 56F Low Moor  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 42328 39A Gorton 27E Walton on the Hill  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 42347 5C Stafford 5D Stoke  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 42380 56E Sowerby Bridge 56F Low Moor  
04/07/1959 Reallocation 42397 9C Macclesfield 11A Barrow in Furness  
11/07/1959 Reallocation 42304 1A Willesden 9A Longsight  
11/07/1959 Reallocation 42326 17A Derby 18C Hasland  
11/07/1959 Reallocation 42349 8E Brunswick 18C Hasland  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 42336 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 18C Hasland  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 42352 8E Brunswick 18C Hasland  
25/07/1959 Reallocation 42328 27E Walton on the Hill 9G Gorton  
08/08/1959 Reallocation 42321 1A Willesden 24C Lostock Hall  
08/08/1959 Reallocation 42350 1A Willesden 24C Lostock Hall  
08/08/1959 Reallocation 42367 1A Willesden 27C Southport  
08/08/1959 Reallocation 42422 1A Willesden 27C Southport  
15/08/1959 Reallocation 42359 1A Willesden 8E Northwich  
15/08/1959 Reallocation 42365 1A Willesden 8E Northwich  
15/08/1959 Reallocation 42366 1A Willesden 27C Southport  
15/08/1959 Reallocation 42368 1A Willesden 27C Southport  
22/08/1959 Reallocation 42351 1A Willesden 24D Lower Darwen  
29/08/1959 Condemned 42308 6D Chester Northgate   COND  
29/08/1959 Reallocation 42320 84G Shrewsbury 91W To Western Region / GWR  
29/08/1959 Reallocation 42362 84G Shrewsbury 91W To Western Region / GWR  
29/08/1959 Reallocation 42372 84G Shrewsbury 91W To Western Region / GWR  
29/08/1959 Reallocation 42395 84G Shrewsbury 91W To Western Region / GWR  
29/08/1959 Reallocation 42418 84G Shrewsbury 91W To Western Region / GWR  
29/08/1959 Reallocation 42420 84G Shrewsbury 91W To Western Region / GWR  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 42305 9C Macclesfield 87E Landore  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 42307 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 87E Landore  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 42385 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 87E Landore  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 42387 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 87E Landore  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 42388 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 87E Landore  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 42390 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 87E Landore  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 42394 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 87E Landore  
12/09/1959 Reallocation 42350 24C Lostock Hall 1A Willesden  
12/09/1959 Reallocation 42351 24D Lower Darwen 1A Willesden  
12/09/1959 Reallocation 42362 91W To Western Region / GWR 5D Stoke  
12/09/1959 Reallocation 42368 27C Southport 1A Willesden  
12/09/1959 Reallocation 42372 91W To Western Region / GWR 11A Barrow in Furness  
12/09/1959 Reallocation 42395 91W To Western Region / GWR 11A Barrow in Furness  
12/09/1959 Reallocation 42418 91W To Western Region / GWR 5D Stoke  
12/09/1959 Reallocation 42420 91W To Western Region / GWR 5D Stoke  
19/09/1959 Reallocation 42320 91W To Western Region / GWR 11A Barrow in Furness  
19/09/1959 Reallocation 42321 24C Lostock Hall 1A Willesden  
19/09/1959 Reallocation 42366 27C Southport 1A Willesden  
19/09/1959 Reallocation 42422 27C Southport 1A Willesden  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 42367 27C Southport 1A Willesden  
10/10/1959 Reallocation 42380 56F Low Moor 56E Sowerby Bridge  
10/10/1959 Reallocation 42411 56F Low Moor 56E Sowerby Bridge  
17/10/1959 Reallocation 42317 11D Oxenholme 6D Chester Northgate  
17/10/1959 Condemned 42341 14C St Albans   COND  
17/10/1959 Reallocation 42372 11A Barrow in Furness 9B Stockport Edgeley  
24/10/1959 Reallocation 42336 18C Hasland 14C St Albans  
07/11/1959 Condemned 42321 1A Willesden   COND  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 42326 18C Hasland 9G Gorton  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 42335 14C St Albans 2F Woodford Halse  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 42336 14C St Albans 2F Woodford Halse  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 42347 5D Stoke 9C Macclesfield  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 42349 18C Hasland 2F Woodford Halse  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 42352 18C Hasland 17A Derby  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 42373 18C Hasland 9G Gorton  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 42377 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse 55A Holbeck (MR)  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 42408 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 55D Royston  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 42409 25F Low Moor 55A Holbeck (MR)  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 42415 6D Chester Northgate 9B Stockport Edgeley  
14/11/1959 Condemned 42312 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
14/11/1959 Condemned 42354 9B Stockport Edgeley   COND  
02/01/1960 Reallocation 42376 11B Barrow in Furness 11A Barrow in Furness  
02/01/1960 Reallocation 42379 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 9B Stockport Edgeley  
09/01/1960 Reallocation 42303 6D Chester Northgate 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
09/01/1960 Reallocation 42317 6D Chester Northgate 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
09/01/1960 Reallocation 42328 9G Gorton 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
09/01/1960 Reallocation 42416 9A Longsight 5B Crewe South  
09/01/1960 Reallocation 42417 6D Chester Northgate 6A Chester (MR)  
23/01/1960 Reallocation 42333 16D Annesley 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
23/01/1960 Reallocation 42339 16D Annesley 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
23/01/1960 Reallocation 42361 16D Annesley 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
06/02/1960 Reallocation 42300 14C St Albans 14B Kentish Town  
06/02/1960 Reallocation 42302 14C St Albans 14B Kentish Town  
06/02/1960 Reallocation 42335 2F Woodford Halse 14B Kentish Town  
06/02/1960 Reallocation 42336 2F Woodford Halse 14B Kentish Town  
06/02/1960 Reallocation 42349 2F Woodford Halse 14B Kentish Town  
20/02/1960 Reallocation 42300 14B Kentish Town 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
05/03/1960 Reallocation 42304 9A Longsight 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
05/03/1960 Reallocation 42313 11D Oxenholme 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
09/04/1960 Condemned 42418 5D Stoke   COND  
23/04/1960 Reallocation 42383 21A Saltley 18A Toton  
21/05/1960 Condemned 42345 11C Oxenholme   COND  
11/06/1960 Reallocation 42322 9B Stockport Edgeley 12G Oxenholme  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 42324 56D Mirfield 56F Low Moor  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 42380 56E Sowerby Bridge 56F Low Moor  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 42408 55D Royston 55C Farnley Junction  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 42411 56E Sowerby Bridge 56F Low Moor  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 42416 5B Crewe South 6H Bangor  
02/07/1960 Condemned 42326 9G Gorton   COND  
02/07/1960 Reallocation 42362 5D Stoke 8E Northwich  
30/07/1960 Reallocation 42422 1A Willesden 8E Northwich  
13/08/1960 Reallocation 42303 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 8E Northwich  
20/08/1960 Reallocation 42327 21A Saltley 5C Stafford  
20/08/1960 Reallocation 42337 21A Saltley 9B Stockport Edgeley  
20/08/1960 Reallocation 42340 21A Saltley 8E Northwich  
20/08/1960 Reallocation 42392 11B Barrow in Furness 5D Stoke  
20/08/1960 Reallocation 42398 9A Longsight 21A Saltley  
20/08/1960 Reallocation 42400 5C Stafford 21A Saltley  
20/08/1960 Reallocation 42415 9B Stockport Edgeley 21A Saltley  
20/08/1960 Reallocation 42416 6H Bangor 21A Saltley  
20/08/1960 Reallocation 42417 6A Chester (MR) 21A Saltley  
20/08/1960 Reallocation 42420 5D Stoke 12E Barrow in Furness  
20/08/1960 Reallocation 42421 5D Stoke 21A Saltley  
20/08/1960 Reallocation 42422 8E Northwich 21A Saltley  
03/09/1960 Condemned 42399 9A Longsight   COND  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 42336 14B Kentish Town 16A Nottingham  
10/09/1960 Condemned 42346 5D Stoke   COND  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 42362 8E Northwich 5D Stoke  
10/09/1960 Condemned 42390 87E Landore   COND  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 42340 8E Northwich 9C Macclesfield  
08/10/1960 Condemned 42365 8E Northwich   COND  
15/10/1960 Reallocation 42303 8E Northwich 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 42301 11D Oxenholme 12B Carlisle Upperby  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 42320 11A Barrow in Furness 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 42336 16A Nottingham 14B Kentish Town  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 42340 9C Macclesfield 8E Northwich  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 42419 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 21A Saltley  
12/11/1960 Reallocation 42381 9A Longsight 2A Rugby  
19/11/1960 Reallocation 42369 9A Longsight 8E Northwich  
19/11/1960 Condemned 42373 9G Gorton   COND  
26/11/1960 Condemned 42300 9E Trafford Park (LMS)   COND  
26/11/1960 Reallocation 42408 55C Farnley Junction 55A Holbeck (MR)  
03/12/1960 Condemned 42398 21A Saltley   COND  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 42352 17A Derby 15C Leicester Midland  
10/12/1960 Condemned 42380 56F Low Moor   COND  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 42315 5D Stoke 1A Willesden  
24/12/1960 Reallocation 42333 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 27F Brunswick  
24/12/1960 Reallocation 42339 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 27F Brunswick  
31/12/1960 Reallocation 42315 1A Willesden 5D Stoke  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 42351 1A Willesden 1E Bletchley  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 42361 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 15C Leicester Midland  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 42368 1A Willesden 1C Watford  
14/01/1961 Reallocation 42357 9B Stockport Edgeley 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
14/01/1961 Reallocation 42411 56F Low Moor 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)  
21/01/1961 Condemned 42397 11A Barrow in Furness   COND  
21/01/1961 Reallocation 42415 21A Saltley 15C Leicester Midland  
11/04/1961 Reallocation 42339 27F Brunswick 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
29/04/1961 Reallocation 42301 12B Carlisle Upperby 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
06/05/1961 Reallocation 42317 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 12C Carlisle Canal  
06/05/1961 Reallocation 42381 2A Rugby 2E Northampton  
16/05/1961 Condemned 42377 55A Holbeck (MR)   COND  
20/05/1961 Reallocation 42333 27F Brunswick 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
27/05/1961 Condemned 42344 5D Stoke   COND  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 42318 9C Macclesfield 12E Barrow in Furness  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 42319 8E Brunswick 24L Carnforth  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 42340 8E Northwich 12E Barrow in Furness  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 42347 9C Macclesfield 12E Barrow in Furness  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 42348 9C Macclesfield 9B Stockport Edgeley  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 42355 9C Macclesfield 12E Barrow in Furness  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 42357 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 12B Carlisle Upperby  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 42359 8E Northwich 24L Carnforth  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 42363 9C Macclesfield 9A Longsight  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 42368 1C Watford 1A Willesden  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 42369 8E Northwich 12G Oxenholme  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 42382 9C Macclesfield 9B Stockport Edgeley  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 42393 8E Northwich 12B Carlisle Upperby  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 42305 87E Landore 87D Swansea East Dock  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 42307 87E Landore 87D Swansea East Dock  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 42379 9B Stockport Edgeley 12H Tebay  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 42385 87E Landore 87D Swansea East Dock  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 42387 87E Landore 87D Swansea East Dock  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 42388 87E Landore 87D Swansea East Dock  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 42394 87E Landore 87D Swansea East Dock  
24/06/1961 Reallocation 42351 1E Bletchley 12E Barrow in Furness  
22/07/1961 Condemned 42349 14B Kentish Town   COND  
19/08/1961 Condemned 42360 1A Willesden   COND  
09/09/1961 Reallocation 42314 11D Oxenholme 9D Buxton (LNWR)  
09/09/1961 Condemned 42328 9E Trafford Park (LMS)   COND  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 42379 12H Tebay 9D Buxton (LNWR)  
20/09/1961 Condemned 42302 14B Kentish Town   COND  
27/09/1961 Condemned 42307 87D Swansea East Dock   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 42325 14B Kentish Town   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 42329 14B Kentish Town   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 42332 11B Barrow in Furness   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 42348 9B Stockport Edgeley   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 42356 8E Brunswick   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 42364 11B Barrow in Furness   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 42382 9B Stockport Edgeley   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 42383 18A Toton   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 42386 8E Brunswick   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 42423 8E Brunswick   COND  
21/10/1961 Condemned 42404 11D Tebay   COND  
04/11/1961 Reallocation 42317 12C Carlisle Canal 12H Tebay  
18/11/1961 Condemned 42395 11A Barrow in Furness   COND  
25/11/1961 Reallocation 42351 12E Barrow in Furness 2E Northampton  
25/11/1961 Reallocation 42355 12E Barrow in Furness 15C Leicester Midland  
25/11/1961 Reallocation 42415 15C Leicester Midland 12E Barrow in Furness  
09/12/1961 Reallocation 42317 12H Tebay 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse  
09/12/1961 Condemned 42330 15C Leicester Midland   COND  
09/12/1961 Reallocation 42333 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 17A Derby  
09/12/1961 Reallocation 42339 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 17A Derby  
09/12/1961 Reallocation 42414 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 12H Tebay  
23/12/1961 Condemned 42363 9A Longsight   COND  
03/01/1962 Condemned 42412 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
27/01/1962 Reallocation 42333 17A Derby 14B Kentish Town  
10/02/1962 Reallocation 42339 17A Derby 14B Kentish Town  
24/02/1962 Condemned 42375 5F Uttoxeter   COND  
03/03/1962 Reallocation 42351 2E Northampton 1A Willesden  
04/1962 Condemned 42387 87D Swansea East Dock   COND  
28/04/1962 Condemned 42352 15C Leicester Midland   COND  
28/04/1962 Condemned 42371 9D Buxton (LNWR)   COND  
19/05/1962 Reallocation 42334 14B Kentish Town 15C Leicester Midland  
19/05/1962 Condemned 42420 12E Barrow in Furness   COND  
26/05/1962 Reallocation 42333 14B Kentish Town 15C Leicester Midland  
26/05/1962 Reallocation 42338 14B Kentish Town 15C Leicester Midland  
26/05/1962 Condemned 42393 12B Carlisle Upperby   COND  
02/06/1962 Condemned 42342 14B Kentish Town   COND  
02/06/1962 Condemned 42362 5D Stoke   COND  
09/06/1962 Condemned 42340 12E Barrow in Furness   COND  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 42322 12G Oxenholme 24L Carnforth  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 42353 2E Northampton 6H Bangor  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 42358 5F Uttoxeter 24L Carnforth  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 42369 12G Oxenholme 24L Carnforth  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 42381 2E Northampton 6H Bangor  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 42391 9B Stockport Edgeley 9D Buxton (LNWR)  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 42309 5C Stafford 6H Bangor  
23/06/1962 Condemned 42323 5D Stoke   COND  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 42327 5C Stafford 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 42369 24L Carnforth 12B Carlisle Upperby  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 42389 5C Stafford 8C Speke Junction  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 42415 12E Barrow in Furness 24L Carnforth  
30/06/1962 Reallocation 42351 1A Willesden 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
30/06/1962 Reallocation 42366 1A Willesden 6A Chester (MR)  
30/06/1962 Reallocation 42368 1A Willesden 6H Bangor  
30/06/1962 Condemned 42370 9D Buxton (LNWR)   COND  
07/07/1962 Reallocation 42315 5D Stoke 24L Carnforth  
07/07/1962 Reallocation 42335 14B Kentish Town 17C Rowsley  
07/07/1962 Reallocation 42336 14B Kentish Town 17C Rowsley  
07/07/1962 Reallocation 42339 14B Kentish Town 17C Rowsley  
07/07/1962 Reallocation 42358 24L Carnforth 5D Stoke  
07/07/1962 Condemned 42396 9A Longsight   COND  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 42415 24L Carnforth 12H Tebay  
21/07/1962 Reallocation 42378 5D Stoke 24L Carnforth  
18/08/1962 Reallocation 42394 87D Swansea East Dock 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
25/08/1962 Condemned 42351 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street   COND  
25/08/1962 Condemned 42367 1A Willesden   COND  
01/09/1962 Condemned 42305 87D Swansea East Dock   COND  
01/09/1962 Condemned 42331 14B Kentish Town   COND  
08/09/1962 Condemned 42304 12A Carlisle Kingmoor   COND  
08/09/1962 Condemned 42318 12E Barrow in Furness   COND  
08/09/1962 Condemned 42385 87D Swansea East Dock   COND  
15/09/1962 Condemned 42347 12E Barrow in Furness   COND  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 42336 17C Rowsley 14B Kentish Town  
13/10/1962 Reallocation 42335 17C Rowsley 17A Derby  
13/10/1962 Reallocation 42339 17C Rowsley 17A Derby  
13/10/1962 Reallocation 42369 12B Carlisle Upperby 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
13/10/1962 Condemned 42402 9A Longsight   COND  
20/10/1962 Condemned 42336 14B Kentish Town   COND  
20/10/1962 Reallocation 42357 12B Carlisle Upperby 9A Longsight  
27/10/1962 Condemned 42303 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)   COND  
27/10/1962 Condemned 42358 5D Stoke   COND  
02/11/1962 Condemned 42388 87D Swansea East Dock   COND  
10/11/1962 Reallocation 42361 15C Leicester Midland 9G Gorton  
12/11/1962 Condemned 42407 56D Mirfield   COND  
14/11/1962 Condemned 42324 56F Low Moor   COND  
17/11/1962 Condemned 42320 12A Carlisle Kingmoor   COND  
17/11/1962 Condemned 42376 11A Barrow in Furness   COND  
01/12/1962 Reallocation 42381 6H Bangor 5D Stoke  
22/12/1962 Condemned 42422 21A Saltley   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 42306 9D Buxton (LNWR)   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 42314 9D Buxton (LNWR)   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 42315 24L Carnforth   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 42372 9B Stockport Edgeley   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 42403 11E Tebay   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 42415 12H Tebay   COND  
19/01/1963 Reallocation 42357 9A Longsight 9B Stockport Edgeley  
19/01/1963 Reallocation 42374 39A Gorton 9B Stockport Edgeley  
09/02/1963 Condemned 42392 5D Stoke   COND  
16/02/1963 Condemned 42316 9B Stockport Edgeley   COND  
23/02/1963 Reallocation 42401 9A Longsight 9B Stockport Edgeley  
02/03/1963 Condemned 42391 9D Buxton (LNWR)   COND  
08/03/1963 Condemned 42310 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
16/03/1963 Condemned 42357 9B Stockport Edgeley   COND  
16/03/1963 Reallocation 42408 55A Holbeck (MR) 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse  
23/03/1963 Condemned 42389 8C Speke Junction   COND  
30/03/1963 Reallocation 42424 11E Tebay 9B Stockport Edgeley  
04/05/1963 Condemned 42333 15C Leicester Midland   COND  
18/05/1963 Reallocation 42335 17A Derby 17C Rowsley  
18/05/1963 Reallocation 42339 17A Derby 17C Rowsley  
25/05/1963 Reallocation 42350 1A Willesden 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
22/06/1963 Reallocation 42334 15C Leicester Midland 9G Gorton  
22/06/1963 Reallocation 42335 17C Rowsley 12E Barrow in Furness  
22/06/1963 Reallocation 42339 17C Rowsley 26C Bolton  
29/06/1963 Reallocation 42338 15C Leicester Midland 9G Gorton  
29/06/1963 Condemned 42401 9B Stockport Edgeley   COND  
29/06/1963 Reallocation 42406 25F Low Moor 56A Wakefield  
06/07/1963 Reallocation 42379 9D Buxton (LNWR) 26A Newton Heath  
13/07/1963 Reallocation 42313 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 9B Stockport Edgeley  
20/07/1963 Reallocation 42350 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6A Chester (MR)  
10/08/1963 Condemned 42384 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
14/09/1963 Reallocation 42311 56F Low Moor 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)  
28/09/1963 Condemned 42339 26C Bolton   COND  
19/10/1963 Condemned 42301 12A Carlisle Kingmoor   COND  
19/10/1963 Condemned 42319 24L Carnforth   COND  
26/10/1963 Reallocation 42309 6H Bangor 9G Gorton  
11/1963 Condemned 42355 15C Leicester Midland   COND  
11/1963 Condemned 42419 21A Saltley   COND  
09/11/1963 Reallocation 42353 6H Bangor 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
09/11/1963 Reallocation 42368 6H Bangor 9B Stockport Edgeley  
23/11/1963 Condemned 42313 9B Stockport Edgeley   COND  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 42309 9G Gorton 10A Carnforth  
07/12/1963 Reallocation 42327 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 9B Stockport Edgeley  
21/12/1963 Condemned 42337 9B Stockport Edgeley   COND  
01/1964 Condemned 42409 55A Holbeck (MR)   COND  
04/01/1964 Reallocation 42394 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 55A Holbeck (MR)  
11/01/1964 Reallocation 42311 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 56F Low Moor  
11/01/1964 Condemned 42338 9G Gorton   COND  
11/01/1964 Reallocation 42411 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 56F Low Moor  
25/01/1964 Reallocation 42368 9B Stockport Edgeley 9G Gorton  
08/02/1964 Condemned 42361 9G Gorton   COND  
22/02/1964 Reallocation 42327 9B Stockport Edgeley 9G Gorton  
14/03/1964 Reallocation 42369 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 8M Southport  
04/1964 Condemned 42408 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
11/04/1964 Condemned 42366 6A Chester (MR)   COND  
11/04/1964 Condemned 42417 21A Saltley   COND  
13/04/1964 Condemned 42311 56F Low Moor   COND  
18/04/1964 Condemned 42378 24L Carnforth   COND  
25/04/1964 Condemned 42335 12E Barrow in Furness   COND  
16/05/1964 Reallocation 42400 21A Saltley 5C Stafford  
16/05/1964 Reallocation 42416 21A Saltley 5C Stafford  
06/1964 Condemned 42413 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
13/06/1964 Condemned 42353 12A Carlisle Kingmoor   COND  
20/06/1964 Reallocation 42350 6A Chester (MR) 5C Stafford  
20/06/1964 Reallocation 42400 5C Stafford 5C Stafford  
20/06/1964 Reallocation 42416 5C Stafford 2E Saltley  
20/06/1964 Reallocation 42421 21A Saltley 5C Stafford  
27/06/1964 Condemned 42416 2E Saltley   COND  
11/07/1964 Reallocation 42381 5D Stoke 5C Stafford  
08/1964 Condemned 42411 56F Low Moor   COND  
01/08/1964 Condemned 42379 26A Newton Heath   COND  
22/08/1964 Condemned 42421 5C Stafford   COND  
26/09/1964 Condemned 42309 10A Carnforth   COND  
26/09/1964 Condemned 42424 9B Stockport Edgeley   COND  
10/1964 Condemned 42405 56E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
10/10/1964 Condemned 42414 12H Tebay   COND  
24/10/1964 Condemned 42359 24L Carnforth   COND  
24/10/1964 Reallocation 42369 8M Southport 9G Gorton  
23/01/1965 Condemned 42400 5C Stafford   COND  
13/02/1965 Condemned 42350 5C Stafford   COND  
01/05/1965 Reallocation 42374 9B Stockport Edgeley 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
08/05/1965 Reallocation 42369 9G Gorton 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
08/05/1965 Condemned 42381 5C Stafford   COND  
15/05/1965 Condemned 42369 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)   COND  
22/05/1965 Reallocation 42343 9B Stockport Edgeley 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
29/05/1965 Reallocation 42327 9G Gorton 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
29/05/1965 Reallocation 42368 9G Gorton 9K Bolton  
12/06/1965 Reallocation 42334 9G Gorton 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
19/06/1965 Condemned 42368 9K Bolton   COND  
07/1965 Condemned 42322 24L Carnforth   COND  
28/08/1965 Condemned 42327 9E Trafford Park (LMS)   COND  
09/1965 Condemned 42317 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
09/1965 Condemned 42406 56A Wakefield   COND  
04/09/1965 Reallocation 42343 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
11/09/1965 Reallocation 42374 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 9E Trafford Park (LMS)  
02/10/1965 Condemned 42374 9E Trafford Park (LMS)   COND  
30/10/1965 Condemned 42343 9E Trafford Park (LMS)   COND  
25/12/1965 Condemned 42334 9E Trafford Park (LMS)   COND  
06/1966 Condemned 42394 55A Holbeck (MR)   COND  
09/1966 Condemned 42410 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND