Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 555 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5477 Week
» 28458 Month
» 391703 Year
» 468290 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Fowler "4P" Class 2-6-4T


Class LMS BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
4P-D 2300 42300 09/12/1927 14C
14B
9E
W
St Albans
Kentish Town
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1960
20/02/1960
26/11/1960
26/11/1960
4P-D 2301 42301 20/12/1927 11D
12B
12A
W
Oxenholme
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1960
29/04/1961
19/10/1963
19/10/1963
4P-D 2302 42302 22/12/1927 14C
14B
W
St Albans
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1960
20/09/1961
20/09/1961
4P-D 2303 42303 30/12/1927 10A
5D
6C
6A
6D
8F
8E
8F
W
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Stoke
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Chester (MR)
Chester Northgate
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Northwich
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1951
16/06/1956
23/02/1957
10/08/1957
09/01/1960
13/08/1960
15/10/1960
27/10/1962
27/10/1962
4P-D 2304 42304 06/01/1928 1C
1C
5F
9A
1A
9A
12A
W
Watford
Watford
Uttoxeter
Longsight
Willesden
Longsight
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
11/07/1953
28/01/1956
04/10/1958
11/07/1959
05/03/1960
08/09/1962
08/09/1962
4P-D 2305 42305 13/01/1928 9C
87E
87D
W
Macclesfield
Landore
Swansea East Dock
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/09/1959
17/06/1961
01/09/1962
01/09/1962
4P-D 2306 42306 19/01/1928 9D
9D
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
4P-D 2307 42307 26/01/1928 4B
87H
87K
87E
87D
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Neyland
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Landore
Swansea East Dock
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1955
05/11/1955
05/09/1959
17/06/1961
27/09/1961
27/09/1961
4P-D 2308 42308 28/01/1928 11E
9D
6C
6A
6D
W
Tebay
Buxton (LNWR)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Chester (MR)
Chester Northgate
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/11/1955
06/10/1956
23/02/1957
10/08/1957
29/08/1959
29/08/1959
4P-D 2309 42309 03/02/1928 5A
5E
5C
6H
9G
10A
W
Crewe North
Alsager
Stafford
Bangor
Gorton
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
07/10/1950
23/06/1962
26/10/1963
30/11/1963
26/09/1964
26/09/1964
4P-D 2310 42310 10/02/1928 25B
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/03/1963
08/03/1963
4P-D 2311 42311 22/02/1928 25B
25C
56E
56F
56C
56F
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Goole
Sowerby Bridge
Low Moor
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1956
14/06/1958
20/06/1959
14/09/1963
11/01/1964
13/04/1964
13/04/1964
4P-D 2312 42312 23/02/1928 25B
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/11/1959
14/11/1959
4P-D 2313 42313 01/03/1928 11D
12A
9B
W
Oxenholme
Carlisle Kingmoor
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/03/1960
13/07/1963
23/11/1963
23/11/1963
4P-D 2314 42314 03/03/1928 11D
9D
W
Oxenholme
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1961
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
4P-D 2315 42315 10/03/1928 9D
9D
6A
5D
6A
1A
14D
1A
5D
1A
5D
24L
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Buxton (LNWR)
Chester (MR)
Stoke
Chester (MR)
Willesden
Neasden
Willesden
Stoke
Willesden
Stoke
Carnforth
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
17/07/1951
06/10/1956
03/11/1956
30/11/1957
22/03/1958
19/04/1958
14/06/1958
17/12/1960
31/12/1960
07/07/1962
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
4P-D 2316 42316 14/03/1928 1A
5A
2C
1A
14D
1A
9B
W
Willesden
Crewe North
Warwick
Willesden
Neasden
Willesden
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/01/1954
21/04/1956
30/11/1957
22/03/1958
19/04/1958
12/07/1958
16/02/1963
16/02/1963
4P-D 2317 42317 22/03/1928 11D
6D
8F
12C
12H
55G
W
Oxenholme
Chester Northgate
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Carlisle Canal
Tebay
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/10/1959
09/01/1960
06/05/1961
04/11/1961
09/12/1961
09/1965
09/1965
4P-D 2318 42318 30/03/1928 9D
5A
9C
5A
9C
12E
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Crewe North
Macclesfield
Crewe North
Macclesfield
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
29/12/1951
23/02/1952
21/02/1953
10/06/1961
08/09/1962
08/09/1962
4P-D 2319 42319 13/04/1928 9C
9A
9C
8E
24L
W
Macclesfield
Longsight
Macclesfield
Brunswick
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/11/1955
05/10/1957
22/03/1958
10/06/1961
19/10/1963
19/10/1963
4P-D 2320 42320 27/04/1928 5D
2A
11B
9A
11A
84G
91W
11A
12A
W
Stoke
Rugby
Barrow in Furness
Longsight
Carnforth
Shrewsbury
To Western Region / GWR
Barrow in Furness
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1956
11/08/1956
25/01/1958
22/03/1958
21/02/1959
29/08/1959
19/09/1959
22/10/1960
17/11/1962
17/11/1962
4P-D 2321 42321 04/05/1928 11B
5A
1A
24C
1A
W
Barrow in Furness
Crewe North
Willesden
Lostock Hall
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/12/1955
30/11/1957
08/08/1959
19/09/1959
07/11/1959
07/11/1959
4P-D 2322 42322 19/05/1928 9A
9B
12G
24L
W
Longsight
Stockport Edgeley
Oxenholme
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/01/1959
11/06/1960
16/06/1962
07/1965
07/1965
4P-D 2323 42323 04/06/1928 9C
9C
5D
91M
11B
5D
5C
5D
W
Macclesfield
Macclesfield
Stoke
To London Midland Region
Barrow in Furness
Stoke
Stafford
Stoke
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
20/05/1950
11/07/1953
08/08/1953
20/04/1957
22/11/1958
23/06/1962
23/06/1962
4P-D 2324 42324 22/06/1928 25B
25C
56D
56F
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Goole
Mirfield
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1956
14/06/1958
18/06/1960
14/11/1962
14/11/1962
4P-D 2325 42325 01/01/1929 14B
W
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
4P-D 2326 42326 29/01/1929 21A
17A
9E
17A
18C
9G
W
Saltley
Derby
Trafford Park (LMS)
Derby
Hasland
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/10/1957
12/07/1958
06/09/1958
11/07/1959
07/11/1959
02/07/1960
02/07/1960
4P-D 2327 42327 02/02/1929 21B
21B
21A
15C
21A
5C
8F
9B
9G
9E
W
Bournville
Bournville
Saltley
Leicester Midland
Saltley
Stafford
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Stockport Edgeley
Gorton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
14/06/1952
19/06/1954
14/08/1954
20/08/1960
23/06/1962
07/12/1963
22/02/1964
29/05/1965
28/08/1965
28/08/1965
4P-D 2328 42328 09/02/1929 16A
34E
34D
39A
27E
9G
9E
W
Nottingham
Neasden
Hitchin (GNR)
Gorton
Walton on the Hill
Gorton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/03/1954
22/01/1955
15/06/1957
20/06/1959
25/07/1959
09/01/1960
09/09/1961
09/09/1961
4P-D 2329 42329 15/02/1929 14B
W
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1961
10/1961
4P-D 2330 42330 20/02/1929 15C
W
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/12/1961
09/12/1961
4P-D 2331 42331 25/02/1929 14B
W
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/09/1962
01/09/1962
4P-D 2332 42332 03/1929 9B
11B
W
Stockport Edgeley
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/01/1956
10/1961
10/1961
4P-D 2333 42333 06/03/1929 16A
16D
9E
27F
9E
17A
14B
15C
W
Nottingham
Annesley
Trafford Park (LMS)
Brunswick
Trafford Park (LMS)
Derby
Kentish Town
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1959
23/01/1960
24/12/1960
20/05/1961
09/12/1961
27/01/1962
26/05/1962
04/05/1963
04/05/1963
4P-D 2334 42334 12/03/1929 15C
21B
14D
14B
15C
9G
9E
W
Leicester Midland
Bournville
Neasden
Kentish Town
Leicester Midland
Gorton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1954
17/05/1958
01/11/1958
19/05/1962
22/06/1963
12/06/1965
25/12/1965
25/12/1965
4P-D 2335 42335 20/03/1929 14C
2F
14B
17C
17A
17C
12E
W
St Albans
Woodford Halse
Kentish Town
Rowsley
Derby
Rowsley
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
06/02/1960
07/07/1962
13/10/1962
18/05/1963
22/06/1963
25/04/1964
25/04/1964
4P-D 2336 42336 06/04/1929 17B
14C
17B
17A
16A
18C
9E
18C
14C
2F
14B
16A
14B
17C
14B
W
Burton
St Albans
Burton
Derby
Nottingham
Hasland
Trafford Park (LMS)
Hasland
St Albans
Woodford Halse
Kentish Town
Nottingham
Kentish Town
Rowsley
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
14/01/1950
03/01/1953
21/05/1955
19/04/1958
14/06/1958
18/07/1959
24/10/1959
07/11/1959
06/02/1960
10/09/1960
05/11/1960
07/07/1962
22/09/1962
20/10/1962
20/10/1962
4P-D 2337 42337 23/03/1929 21A
9B
W
Saltley
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/08/1960
21/12/1963
21/12/1963
4P-D 2338 42338 02/04/1929 21B
14D
14B
15C
9G
W
Bournville
Neasden
Kentish Town
Leicester Midland
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/05/1958
01/11/1958
26/05/1962
29/06/1963
11/01/1964
11/01/1964
4P-D 2339 42339 06/04/1929 21B
21B
16D
9E
27F
9E
17A
14B
17C
17A
17C
26C
W
Bournville
Bournville
Annesley
Trafford Park (LMS)
Brunswick
Trafford Park (LMS)
Derby
Kentish Town
Rowsley
Derby
Rowsley
Bolton
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
10/01/1959
23/01/1960
24/12/1960
11/04/1961
09/12/1961
10/02/1962
07/07/1962
13/10/1962
18/05/1963
22/06/1963
28/09/1963
28/09/1963
4P-D 2340 42340 11/04/1929 17A
21B
21A
8E
9C
8E
12E
W
Derby
Bournville
Saltley
Northwich
Macclesfield
Northwich
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1955
12/07/1958
20/08/1960
17/09/1960
05/11/1960
10/06/1961
09/06/1962
09/06/1962
4P-D 2341 42341 16/04/1929 17A
17A
14C
W
Derby
Derby
St Albans
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
17/10/1959
17/10/1959
4P-D 2342 42342 23/04/1929 21B
21A
17A
16A
14D
14B
W
Bournville
Saltley
Derby
Nottingham
Neasden
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
22/03/1952
21/05/1955
17/05/1958
01/11/1958
02/06/1962
02/06/1962
4P-D 2343 42343 26/04/1929 5D
1C
3B
12A
9B
8F
9E
W
Stoke
Watford
Bushbury
Carlisle Upperby
Stockport Edgeley
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1954
21/05/1955
24/03/1956
16/06/1957
22/05/1965
04/09/1965
30/10/1965
30/10/1965
4P-D 2344 42344 02/05/1929 5D
9D
5D
5F
5D
W
Stoke
Buxton (LNWR)
Stoke
Uttoxeter
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
06/10/1956
09/08/1958
07/02/1959
27/05/1961
27/05/1961
4P-D 2345 42345 08/05/1929 5C
11C
W
Stafford
Oxenholme
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
21/05/1960
21/05/1960
4P-D 2346 42346 14/05/1929 5C
5D
W
Stafford
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/11/1958
10/09/1960
10/09/1960
4P-D 2347 42347 17/05/1929 23C
5C
5D
9C
12E
W
Southport
Stafford
Stoke
Macclesfield
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
20/06/1959
07/11/1959
10/06/1961
15/09/1962
15/09/1962
4P-D 2348 42348 23/05/1929 5E
5D
9A
9C
9B
W
Alsager
Stoke
Longsight
Macclesfield
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1951
23/02/1957
05/10/1957
10/06/1961
10/1961
10/1961
4P-D 2349 42349 30/05/1929 9C
5D
8E
18C
2F
14B
W
Macclesfield
Stoke
Brunswick
Hasland
Woodford Halse
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
16/05/1953
11/07/1959
07/11/1959
06/02/1960
22/07/1961
22/07/1961
4P-D 2350 42350 04/06/1929 9A
1A
24C
1A
6C
6A
5C
W
Longsight
Willesden
Lostock Hall
Willesden
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Chester (MR)
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1958
08/08/1959
12/09/1959
25/05/1963
20/07/1963
20/06/1964
13/02/1965
13/02/1965
4P-D 2351 42351 06/06/1929 9A
11B
1A
14D
1A
24D
1A
1E
12E
2E
1A
6C
W
Longsight
Barrow in Furness
Willesden
Neasden
Willesden
Lower Darwen
Willesden
Bletchley
Barrow in Furness
Northampton
Willesden
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1957
30/11/1957
14/06/1958
04/10/1958
22/08/1959
12/09/1959
07/01/1961
24/06/1961
25/11/1961
03/03/1962
30/06/1962
25/08/1962
25/08/1962
4P-D 2352 42352 11/06/1929 9B
6J
8E
18C
17A
15C
W
Stockport Edgeley
Holyhead
Brunswick
Hasland
Derby
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/03/1953
16/05/1953
18/07/1959
07/11/1959
10/12/1960
28/04/1962
28/04/1962
4P-D 2353 42353 14/06/1929 9B
2E
6H
12A
W
Stockport Edgeley
Northampton
Bangor
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1957
16/06/1962
09/11/1963
13/06/1964
13/06/1964
4P-D 2354 42354 20/06/1929 9B
W
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/11/1959
14/11/1959
4P-D 2355 42355 27/06/1929 9C
12E
15C
W
Macclesfield
Barrow in Furness
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/06/1961
25/11/1961
11/1963
11/1963
4P-D 2356 42356 02/07/1929 9C
8E
W
Macclesfield
Brunswick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1958
10/1961
10/1961
4P-D 2357 42357 07/07/1929 9C
9B
6C
12B
9A
9B
W
Macclesfield
Stockport Edgeley
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Carlisle Upperby
Longsight
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/08/1958
14/01/1961
10/06/1961
20/10/1962
19/01/1963
16/03/1963
16/03/1963
4P-D 2358 42358 08/07/1929 5F
5D
5F
24L
5D
W
Uttoxeter
Stoke
Uttoxeter
Carnforth
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1957
05/10/1957
16/06/1962
07/07/1962
27/10/1962
27/10/1962
4P-D 2359 42359 12/07/1929 11B
1A
14D
1A
8E
24L
W
Barrow in Furness
Willesden
Neasden
Willesden
Northwich
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
14/06/1958
04/10/1958
15/08/1959
10/06/1961
24/10/1964
24/10/1964
4P-D 2360 42360 18/07/1929 5D
5D
1A
9A
1A
W
Stoke
Stoke
Willesden
Longsight
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
30/11/1957
14/06/1958
04/10/1958
19/08/1961
19/08/1961
4P-D 2361 42361 23/07/1929 16A
16D
9E
15C
9G
W
Nottingham
Annesley
Trafford Park (LMS)
Leicester Midland
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/01/1959
23/01/1960
07/01/1961
10/11/1962
08/02/1964
08/02/1964
4P-D 2362 42362 26/07/1929 23D
2A
9C
5D
84G
91W
5D
8E
5D
W
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Rugby
Macclesfield
Stoke
Shrewsbury
To Western Region / GWR
Stoke
Northwich
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1957
25/01/1958
22/03/1958
21/02/1959
29/08/1959
12/09/1959
02/07/1960
10/09/1960
02/06/1962
02/06/1962
4P-D 2363 42363 01/08/1929 5F
9C
9A
W
Uttoxeter
Macclesfield
Longsight
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
10/06/1961
23/12/1961
23/12/1961
4P-D 2364 42364 09/08/1929 5D
11B
W
Stoke
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/08/1953
10/1961
10/1961
4P-D 2365 42365 14/08/1929 9D
9A
1A
8E
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Longsight
Willesden
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1957
04/10/1958
15/08/1959
08/10/1960
08/10/1960
4P-D 2366 42366 27/08/1929 9D
5D
1A
14D
1A
27C
1A
6A
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Stoke
Willesden
Neasden
Willesden
Southport
Willesden
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1956
30/11/1957
22/02/1958
19/04/1958
15/08/1959
19/09/1959
30/06/1962
11/04/1964
11/04/1964
4P-D 2367 42367 02/09/1929 9D
5D
1A
27C
1A
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Stoke
Willesden
Southport
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1956
30/11/1957
08/08/1959
26/09/1959
25/08/1962
25/08/1962
4P-D 2368 42368 06/09/1929 9D
5E
5D
1A
27C
1A
1C
1A
6H
9B
9G
9K
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Alsager
Stoke
Willesden
Southport
Willesden
Watford
Willesden
Bangor
Stockport Edgeley
Gorton
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1957
05/10/1957
30/11/1957
15/08/1959
12/09/1959
07/01/1961
10/06/1961
30/06/1962
09/11/1963
25/01/1964
29/05/1965
19/06/1965
19/06/1965
4P-D 2369 42369 11/09/1929 9C
9A
8E
12G
24L
12B
12A
8M
9G
8F
W
Macclesfield
Longsight
Northwich
Oxenholme
Carnforth
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Southport
Gorton
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/09/1958
19/11/1960
10/06/1961
16/06/1962
23/06/1962
13/10/1962
14/03/1964
24/10/1964
08/05/1965
15/05/1965
15/05/1965
4P-D 2370 42370 16/09/1929 9D
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/06/1962
30/06/1962
4P-D 2371 42371 19/09/1929 9D
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/04/1962
28/04/1962
4P-D 2372 42372 24/09/1929 1A
84G
91W
11A
9B
W
Willesden
Shrewsbury
To Western Region / GWR
Barrow in Furness
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1959
29/08/1959
12/09/1959
17/10/1959
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
4P-D 2373 42373 27/09/1929 21B
16A
18C
9G
W
Bournville
Nottingham
Hasland
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
19/04/1958
07/11/1959
19/11/1960
19/11/1960
4P-D 2374 42374 03/10/1929 14C
34E
34D
34B
34D
39A
9B
8F
9E
W
St Albans
Neasden
Hitchin (GNR)
Hornsey
Hitchin (GNR)
Gorton
Stockport Edgeley
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/01/1954
19/02/1955
24/03/1956
21/07/1956
15/06/1957
19/01/1963
01/05/1965
11/09/1965
02/10/1965
02/10/1965
4P-D 2375 42375 13/05/1932 5D
5F
5D
2A
5D
5F
W
Stoke
Uttoxeter
Stoke
Rugby
Stoke
Uttoxeter
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/09/1953
26/01/1957
05/10/1957
30/11/1957
22/03/1958
24/02/1962
24/02/1962
4P-D 2376 42376 18/05/1932 5D
11B
11A
W
Stoke
Barrow in Furness
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
02/01/1960
17/11/1962
17/11/1962
4P-D 2377 42377 25/05/1932 20E
20D
20A
55G
55A
W
Manningham
Normanton
Holbeck (MR)
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/05/1955
11/08/1956
22/11/1958
07/11/1959
16/05/1961
16/05/1961
4P-D 2378 42378 01/06/1932 5D
4A
5D
2A
5D
24L
W
Stoke
Bletchley
Stoke
Rugby
Stoke
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
24/03/1951
05/10/1957
30/11/1957
21/07/1962
18/04/1964
18/04/1964
4P-D 2379 42379 08/06/1932 10A
9B
12H
9D
26A
W
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Stockport Edgeley
Tebay
Buxton (LNWR)
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/01/1960
17/06/1961
16/09/1961
06/07/1963
01/08/1964
01/08/1964
4P-D 2380 42380 15/06/1932 20E
67A
56E
56F
56E
56F
W
Manningham
Corkerhill
Sowerby Bridge
Low Moor
Sowerby Bridge
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1951
14/06/1958
20/06/1959
10/10/1959
18/06/1960
10/12/1960
10/12/1960
4P-D 2381 42381 22/06/1932 23D
9A
2A
2E
6H
5D
5C
W
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Longsight
Rugby
Northampton
Bangor
Stoke
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1956
12/11/1960
06/05/1961
16/06/1962
01/12/1962
11/07/1964
08/05/1965
08/05/1965
4P-D 2382 42382 29/06/1932 9C
9B
W
Macclesfield
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/06/1961
10/1961
10/1961
4P-D 2383 42383 07/07/1932 14B
21A
18A
W
Kentish Town
Saltley
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
23/04/1960
10/1961
10/1961
4P-D 2384 42384 15/07/1932 24B
25B
W
Rose Grove
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
10/08/1963
10/08/1963
4P-D 2385 42385 04/05/1933 4B
87E
87D
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Landore
Swansea East Dock
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/09/1959
17/06/1961
08/09/1962
08/09/1962
4P-D 2386 42386 11/05/1933 11B
8E
W
Barrow in Furness
Brunswick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1958
10/1961
10/1961
4P-D 2387 42387 22/05/1933 4B
87E
87D
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Landore
Swansea East Dock
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/09/1959
17/06/1961
04/1962
04/1962
4P-D 2388 42388 25/05/1933 4B
87H
87K
87E
87D
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Neyland
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Landore
Swansea East Dock
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1955
10/09/1955
05/09/1959
17/06/1961
02/11/1962
02/11/1962
4P-D 2389 42389 06/1933 1C
5D
1C
5D
5C
8C
W
Watford
Stoke
Watford
Stoke
Stafford
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/07/1953
28/11/1953
21/05/1955
20/04/1957
23/06/1962
23/03/1963
23/03/1963
4P-D 2390 42390 06/1933 4B
87E
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Landore
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/09/1959
10/09/1960
10/09/1960
4P-D 2391 42391 05/06/1933 5C
9A
9B
9D
W
Stafford
Longsight
Stockport Edgeley
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/01/1953
03/11/1956
16/06/1962
02/03/1963
02/03/1963
4P-D 2392 42392 13/06/1933 11B
5D
W
Barrow in Furness
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/08/1960
09/02/1963
09/02/1963
4P-D 2393 42393 20/06/1933 11B
11C
11D
2A
11D
8E
12B
W
Barrow in Furness
Oxenholme
Tebay
Rugby
Tebay
Northwich
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
01/01/1955
03/12/1955
28/01/1956
18/04/1959
10/06/1961
26/05/1962
26/05/1962
4P-D 2394 42394 22/06/1933 4B
87E
87D
6C
55A
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Landore
Swansea East Dock
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/09/1959
17/06/1961
18/08/1962
04/01/1964
06/1966
06/1966
4P-D 2395 42395 28/08/1933 9A
84G
91W
11A
W
Longsight
Shrewsbury
To Western Region / GWR
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1959
29/08/1959
12/09/1959
18/11/1961
18/11/1961
4P-D 2396 42396 29/08/1933 9A
W
Longsight
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/07/1962
07/07/1962
4P-D 2397 42397 09/1933 9A
9C
11A
W
Longsight
Macclesfield
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/10/1957
04/07/1959
21/01/1961
21/01/1961
4P-D 2398 42398 04/09/1933 9A
21A
W
Longsight
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/08/1960
03/12/1960
03/12/1960
4P-D 2399 42399 06/09/1933 9A
W
Longsight
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/09/1960
03/09/1960
4P-D 2400 42400 13/09/1933 27B
5D
9A
5C
21A
5C
5C
W
Greenock Ladyburn
Stoke
Longsight
Stafford
Saltley
Stafford
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/03/1954
09/08/1958
06/09/1958
20/08/1960
16/05/1964
20/06/1964
23/01/1965
23/01/1965
4P-D 2401 42401 13/09/1933 9A
9B
W
Longsight
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1963
29/06/1963
29/06/1963
4P-D 2402 42402 20/09/1933 9A
W
Longsight
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/10/1962
13/10/1962
4P-D 2403 42403 26/09/1933 11D
11E
W
Oxenholme
Tebay
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
4P-D 2404 42404 29/09/1933 11E
12A
11D
W
Tebay
Carlisle Upperby
Tebay
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1957
23/03/1957
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
4P-D 2405 42405 05/10/1933 25D
56E
W
Mirfield
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/03/1958
10/1964
10/1964
4P-D 2406 42406 10/10/1933 25F
56A
W
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/06/1963
09/1965
09/1965
4P-D 2407 42407 12/10/1933 25F
25C
56D
W
Low Moor
Goole
Mirfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1956
14/06/1958
12/11/1962
12/11/1962
4P-D 2408 42408 18/10/1933 25B
25B
55D
55C
55A
55G
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Royston
Farnley Junction
Holbeck (MR)
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
18/06/1960
26/11/1960
16/03/1963
04/1964
04/1964
4P-D 2409 42409 19/10/1933 25F
55A
W
Low Moor
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
01/1964
01/1964
4P-D 2410 42410 25/10/1933 25B
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1966
09/1966
4P-D 2411 42411 28/10/1933 25B
25D
25C
54A
50A
50B
56F
56E
56F
56C
56F
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Mirfield
Goole
Sunderland
York (North)
Neville Hill
Low Moor
Sowerby Bridge
Low Moor
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
24/03/1956
12/04/1958
16/08/1958
11/10/1958
31/01/1959
10/10/1959
18/06/1960
14/01/1961
11/01/1964
08/1964
08/1964
4P-D 2412 42412 01/11/1933 25B
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/01/1962
03/01/1962
4P-D 2413 42413 04/11/1933 25B
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1964
06/1964
4P-D 2414 42414 08/11/1933 25B
12H
W
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Tebay
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/12/1961
10/10/1964
10/10/1964
4P-D 2415 42415 13/11/1933 27B
6H
6D
9B
21A
15C
12E
24L
12H
W
Greenock Ladyburn
Bangor
Chester Northgate
Stockport Edgeley
Saltley
Leicester Midland
Barrow in Furness
Carnforth
Tebay
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1954
10/08/1957
07/11/1959
20/08/1960
21/01/1961
25/11/1961
23/06/1962
14/07/1962
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
4P-D 2416 42416 15/11/1933 27B
6H
6A
1A
9A
5B
6H
21A
5C
2E
W
Greenock Ladyburn
Bangor
Chester (MR)
Willesden
Longsight
Crewe South
Bangor
Saltley
Stafford
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1954
10/08/1957
30/11/1957
14/06/1958
09/01/1960
18/06/1960
20/08/1960
16/05/1964
20/06/1964
27/06/1964
27/06/1964
4P-D 2417 42417 20/11/1933 27B
6H
6D
6A
21A
W
Greenock Ladyburn
Bangor
Chester Northgate
Chester (MR)
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1954
06/10/1956
09/01/1960
20/08/1960
11/04/1964
11/04/1964
4P-D 2418 42418 22/11/1933 27B
6H
5C
5D
84G
91W
5D
W
Greenock Ladyburn
Bangor
Stafford
Stoke
Shrewsbury
To Western Region / GWR
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1954
06/10/1956
20/04/1957
21/02/1959
29/08/1959
12/09/1959
09/04/1960
09/04/1960
4P-D 2419 42419 28/11/1933 27B
67A
66D
3E
5D
9E
21A
W
Greenock Ladyburn
Corkerhill
Greenock Ladyburn
Monument Lane
Stoke
Trafford Park (LMS)
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
19/04/1952
27/03/1954
24/03/1956
19/05/1956
05/11/1960
11/1963
11/1963
4P-D 2420 42420 01/12/1933 27B
67A
66D
3E
5D
84G
91W
5D
12E
W
Greenock Ladyburn
Corkerhill
Greenock Ladyburn
Monument Lane
Stoke
Shrewsbury
To Western Region / GWR
Stoke
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
19/04/1952
27/03/1954
24/03/1956
21/02/1959
29/08/1959
12/09/1959
20/08/1960
19/05/1962
19/05/1962
4P-D 2421 42421 06/12/1933 27B
3E
5D
6H
5C
5D
21A
5C
W
Greenock Ladyburn
Monument Lane
Stoke
Bangor
Stafford
Stoke
Saltley
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/03/1954
24/03/1956
11/08/1956
06/10/1956
20/04/1957
20/08/1960
20/06/1964
22/08/1964
22/08/1964
4P-D 2422 42422 11/12/1933 27B
3E
1A
27C
1A
8E
21A
W
Greenock Ladyburn
Monument Lane
Willesden
Southport
Willesden
Northwich
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/03/1954
30/11/1957
08/08/1959
19/09/1959
30/07/1960
20/08/1960
22/12/1962
22/12/1962
4P-D 2423 42423 19/12/1933 27B
10A
9E
10C
5E
9C
8E
W
Greenock Ladyburn
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Trafford Park (LMS)
Patricroft
Alsager
Macclesfield
Brunswick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/03/1954
26/03/1955
06/10/1956
10/08/1957
05/10/1957
22/03/1958
10/1961
10/1961
4P-D 2424 42424 15/01/1934 11E
9B
W
Tebay
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/03/1963
26/09/1964
26/09/1964