Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 155 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7162 Week
» 13296 Month
» 241180 Year
» 1462745 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

84 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
E3036 84001 26/03/1960 01/01/1979 18.83 Prs Preserved 60.30
E3037 84002 05/05/1960 21/09/1980 20.33 Cut Texas Metals (Hyde) 31/12/1982 22.67
E3038 84003 10/06/1960 30/11/1980 20.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/03/1986 25.82
E3039 84004 08/07/1960 12/11/1977 17.33 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/03/1985 24.66
E3040 84005 11/08/1960 20/04/1977 16.67 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/03/1985 24.57
E3041 84006 22/09/1960 15/01/1978 17.33 Cut Cashmore's (at Crewe South Yard) 31/10/1979 19.12
E3042 84007 07/10/1960 20/04/1977 16.5 Cut Cashmore's (at Crewe South Yard) 31/10/1979 19.08
E3043 84008 25/11/1960 26/10/1979 Crewe Electric 18.92 Cut A Hampton (at Crewe Works) 30/11/1988 28.03
E3044 84009 28/12/1960 01/08/1978 17.67 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 01/12/1995 34.95
E3045 84010 26/03/1961 30/11/1980 19.67 Cut Texas Metals (Hyde) 31/12/1982 21.78