Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 170 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 2315 Week
» 16572 Month
» 244456 Year
» 1466021 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

84 Bo-Bo


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
29/10/1960 Reallocation 3037     LMW London Midland - Western Lines  
21/10/1972 Reallocation 3040     GS Glasgow Shields Road  
09/03/1974 Reallocation 84006     O/L Glasgow Shields Road  
06/04/1974 Reallocation 84006 O/L   LG Longsight (Electric)  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 84005 GS Glasgow Shields Road LG Longsight (Electric)  
12/04/1975 Reallocation 84001     CE Crewe Electric  
12/04/1975 Reallocation 84002 LMW London Midland - Western Lines CE Crewe Electric  
12/04/1975 Reallocation 84003     CE Crewe Electric  
12/04/1975 Reallocation 84004     CE Crewe Electric  
12/04/1975 Reallocation 84005 LG Longsight (Electric) CE Crewe Electric  
12/04/1975 Reallocation 84006 LG Longsight (Electric) CE Crewe Electric  
12/04/1975 Reallocation 84007     CE Crewe Electric  
12/04/1975 Reallocation 84008     CE Crewe Electric  
12/04/1975 Reallocation 84009     CE Crewe Electric  
12/04/1975 Reallocation 84010     CE Crewe Electric  
20/04/1977 Condemned 84005 CE Crewe Electric   COND  
20/04/1977 Condemned 84007 CE Crewe Electric   COND  
12/11/1977 Condemned 84004 CE Crewe Electric   COND  
15/01/1978 Condemned 84006 CE Crewe Electric   COND  
01/08/1978 Condemned 84009 CE Crewe Electric   COND  
01/01/1979 Condemned 84001 CE Crewe Electric   COND  
26/10/1979 Condemned 84008 CE Crewe Electric   COND  
21/09/1980 Condemned 84002 CE Crewe Electric   COND  
30/11/1980 Condemned 84003 CE Crewe Electric   COND  
30/11/1980 Condemned 84010 CE Crewe Electric   COND