Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 331 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1430 Week
» 7564 Month
» 235448 Year
» 1457013 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

84 Bo-Bo


Class BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
  3036 84001 26/03/1960 CE
W
Crewe Electric
Withdrawn
12/04/1975
01/01/1979
01/01/1979
  3037 84002 05/05/1960 LMW
CE
W
London Midland - Western Lines
Crewe Electric
Withdrawn
29/10/1960
12/04/1975
21/09/1980
21/09/1980
  3038 84003 10/06/1960 CE
W
Crewe Electric
Withdrawn
12/04/1975
30/11/1980
30/11/1980
  3039 84004 08/07/1960 CE
W
Crewe Electric
Withdrawn
12/04/1975
12/11/1977
12/11/1977
  3040 84005 11/08/1960 GS
LG
CE
W
Glasgow Shields Road
Longsight (Electric)
Crewe Electric
Withdrawn
21/10/1972
11/05/1974
12/04/1975
20/04/1977
20/04/1977
  3041 84006 22/09/1960 LG
CE
W
Longsight (Electric)
Crewe Electric
Withdrawn
09/03/1974
06/04/1974
12/04/1975
15/01/1978
15/01/1978
  3042 84007 07/10/1960 CE
W
Crewe Electric
Withdrawn
12/04/1975
20/04/1977
20/04/1977
  3043 84008 25/11/1960 CE
W
Crewe Electric
Withdrawn
12/04/1975
26/10/1979
26/10/1979
  3044 84009 28/12/1960 CE
W
Crewe Electric
Withdrawn
12/04/1975
01/08/1978
01/08/1978
  3045 84010 26/03/1961 CE
W
Crewe Electric
Withdrawn
12/04/1975
30/11/1980
30/11/1980