11 0-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/06/1945 | To Service | 7121 | NEW | 5B | Crewe South | ||
19/06/1945 | To Service | 7122 | NEW | 5B | Crewe South | ||
09/08/1945 | To Service | 7123 | NEW | 5B | Crewe South | ||
19/10/1946 | Reallocation | 12035 | 5B | Crewe South | |||
26/10/1946 | Reallocation | 7120 | 5B | Crewe South | |||
26/10/1946 | Reallocation | 12037 | 5B | Crewe South | |||
30/11/1946 | Reallocation | 7125 | 18A | Toton | |||
15/08/1947 | To Service | 7126 | NEW | 21A | Saltley | ||
12/09/1947 | To Service | 7127 | NEW | 21A | Saltley | ||
09/10/1947 | To Service | 7128 | NEW | 21A | Saltley | ||
13/11/1947 | To Service | 7129 | NEW | 21A | Saltley | ||
04/02/1948 | To Service | 7130 | NEW | 21A | Saltley | ||
11/03/1948 | To Service | 7131 | NEW | 21A | Saltley | ||
28/04/1948 | To Service | 12045 | NEW | 18A | Toton | ||
04/06/1948 | To Service | 12046 | NEW | 18A | Toton | ||
18/08/1948 | To Service | 12047 | NEW | 18A | Toton | ||
14/12/1948 | To Service | 12048 | NEW | 18A | Toton | ||
17/02/1949 | To Service | 12050 | NEW | 5B | Crewe South | ||
10/03/1949 | To Service | 12051 | NEW | 5B | Crewe South | ||
12/04/1949 | To Service | 12052 | NEW | 5B | Crewe South | ||
13/05/1949 | To Service | 12053 | NEW | 5B | Crewe South | ||
30/05/1949 | To Service | 12054 | NEW | 5B | Crewe South | ||
08/07/1949 | To Service | 12055 | NEW | 5B | Crewe South | ||
09/08/1949 | To Service | 12056 | NEW | 18A | Toton | ||
16/09/1949 | To Service | 12057 | NEW | 18A | Toton | ||
20/10/1949 | To Service | 12058 | NEW | 18A | Toton | ||
04/11/1949 | To Service | 12059 | NEW | 21A | Saltley | ||
11/11/1949 | To Service | 12060 | NEW | 21A | Saltley | ||
21/11/1949 | To Service | 12061 | NEW | 21A | Saltley | ||
06/12/1949 | To Service | 12062 | NEW | 21A | Saltley | ||
12/12/1949 | To Service | 12063 | NEW | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
20/12/1949 | To Service | 12064 | NEW | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
30/12/1949 | To Service | 12065 | NEW | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
30/12/1949 | To Service | 12066 | NEW | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
31/12/1949 | To Service | 12049 | NEW | 5B | Crewe South | ||
31/12/1949 | Reallocation | 12062 | 21A | Saltley | |||
31/12/1949 | Reallocation | 12066 | 14A | Cricklewood East | |||
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 12066 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 14A | Toton | |
24/02/1950 | To Service | 12067 | NEW | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
24/03/1950 | To Service | 12068 | NEW | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
24/06/1950 | Reallocation | 12066 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
04/07/1950 | To Service | 12069 | NEW | 18A | Toton | ||
11/08/1950 | To Service | 12070 | NEW | 18A | Toton | ||
31/08/1950 | To Service | 12071 | NEW | 18A | Toton | ||
31/08/1950 | To Service | 12072 | NEW | 18A | Toton | ||
30/09/1950 | To Service | 12073 | NEW | 18A | Toton | ||
30/09/1950 | To Service | 12074 | NEW | 21A | Saltley | ||
30/09/1950 | To Service | 12075 | NEW | 21A | Saltley | ||
31/10/1950 | To Service | 12076 | NEW | 21A | Saltley | ||
31/10/1950 | To Service | 12077 | NEW | 21A | Saltley | ||
31/10/1950 | To Service | 12078 | NEW | 5B | Crewe South | ||
30/11/1950 | To Service | 12079 | NEW | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
30/11/1950 | To Service | 12080 | NEW | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
30/11/1950 | To Service | 12081 | NEW | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
30/11/1950 | To Service | 12082 | NEW | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
30/11/1950 | To Service | 12083 | NEW | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
09/12/1950 | To Service | 12084 | NEW | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
31/12/1950 | To Service | 12085 | NEW | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
31/12/1950 | To Service | 12086 | NEW | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
31/12/1950 | To Service | 12087 | NEW | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 12081 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 12082 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 12083 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 12084 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 12085 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 12086 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 12087 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
30/04/1951 | Reallocation | 12071 | 18A | Toton | 84E | Tyseley | |
30/04/1951 | Reallocation | 12072 | 18A | Toton | 84E | Tyseley | |
30/04/1951 | Reallocation | 12087 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 84E | Tyseley | |
05/05/1951 | Reallocation | 12070 | 18A | Tyseley | |||
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 12084 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Canal | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 12085 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Canal | |
16/06/1951 | To Service | 12088 | NEW | 3D | Aston | ||
16/06/1951 | To Service | 12089 | NEW | 3D | Aston | ||
17/07/1951 | To Service | 12090 | NEW | 3B | Bushbury | ||
17/07/1951 | To Service | 12091 | NEW | 3A | Bescot | ||
11/08/1951 | To Service | 12092 | NEW | 3A | Bescot | ||
18/08/1951 | Reallocation | 12091 | 3A | Bescot | 36B | Mexborough | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 12049 | 5B | Willesden | |||
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 12084 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 12B | Carlisle Canal | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 12085 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 12B | Carlisle Canal | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 12086 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 12B | Carlisle Canal | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 12090 | 3A | Bescot | 1A | Willesden | |
08/09/1951 | To Service | 12093 | NEW | 3B | Bushbury | ||
29/09/1951 | Reallocation | 12049 | 5B | Crewe South | 5B | Crewe South | |
06/10/1951 | To Service | 12094 | NEW | 3B | Bushbury | ||
29/12/1951 | To Service | 12095 | NEW | 3D | Aston | ||
29/12/1951 | To Service | 12096 | NEW | 16A | Nottingham | ||
29/12/1951 | To Service | 12097 | NEW | 16A | Nottingham | ||
19/01/1952 | Reallocation | 12058 | 16A | Nottingham | |||
19/01/1952 | Reallocation | 12069 | 16A | Nottingham | |||
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 12090 | 1A | Willesden | 3D | Aston | |
23/02/1952 | To Service | 12098 | NEW | 16A | Nottingham | ||
22/03/1952 | To Service | 12099 | NEW | 16A | Nottingham | ||
22/03/1952 | To Service | 12103 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | ||
19/04/1952 | To Service | 12100 | NEW | 16A | Nottingham | ||
19/04/1952 | To Service | 12104 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | ||
19/04/1952 | To Service | 12105 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | ||
15/05/1952 | To Service | 12101 | NEW | 16A | Nottingham | ||
17/05/1952 | To Service | 12106 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | ||
17/05/1952 | To Service | 12107 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | ||
17/05/1952 | To Service | 12108 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | ||
04/06/1952 | To Service | 12109 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | ||
04/06/1952 | To Service | 12110 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | ||
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 12093 | 3B | Bushbury | 1A | Willesden | |
14/06/1952 | To Service | 12102 | NEW | 16A | Nottingham | ||
02/07/1952 | To Service | 12112 | NEW | 34B | Hornsey | ||
19/07/1952 | To Service | 12111 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | ||
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 12112 | 34B | Hornsey | |||
19/07/1952 | To Service | 12113 | NEW | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
19/07/1952 | To Service | 12114 | NEW | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
02/08/1952 | Reallocation | 12058 | 16A | Nottingham | 16A | Toton | |
23/08/1952 | To Service | 12115 | NEW | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
20/09/1952 | To Service | 12116 | NEW | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
20/09/1952 | To Service | 12117 | NEW | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
20/09/1952 | To Service | 12118 | NEW | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
20/09/1952 | To Service | 12119 | NEW | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
20/09/1952 | To Service | 12120 | NEW | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
18/10/1952 | To Service | 12121 | NEW | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
18/10/1952 | To Service | 12122 | NEW | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
18/10/1952 | To Service | 12123 | NEW | 34B | Hornsey | ||
18/10/1952 | To Service | 12124 | NEW | 34B | Hornsey | ||
18/10/1952 | To Service | 12125 | NEW | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
15/11/1952 | To Service | 12126 | NEW | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
15/11/1952 | To Service | 12127 | NEW | 31B | March | ||
15/11/1952 | To Service | 12128 | NEW | 31B | March | ||
15/11/1952 | To Service | 12129 | NEW | 31B | March | ||
15/11/1952 | To Service | 12130 | NEW | 31B | March | ||
15/11/1952 | To Service | 12131 | NEW | 31B | March | ||
15/11/1952 | To Service | 12132 | NEW | 31B | March | ||
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 12070 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Toton | |
06/12/1952 | Reallocation | 12058 | 16A | Nottingham | 16A | Nottingham | |
13/12/1952 | To Service | 12133 | NEW | 31B | March | ||
13/12/1952 | To Service | 12134 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | ||
03/01/1953 | Reallocation | 12071 | 84E | Tyseley | 18A | Toton | |
17/01/1953 | To Service | 12135 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | ||
17/01/1953 | To Service | 12136 | NEW | 30A | Stratford | ||
17/01/1953 | To Service | 12137 | NEW | 31B | March | ||
17/01/1953 | To Service | 12138 | NEW | 31B | March | ||
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 12072 | 84E | Tyseley | 18A | Toton | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 12087 | 84E | Tyseley | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 12093 | 1A | Willesden | 3B | Bushbury | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 12129 | 31B | March | 34A | Kings Cross | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 12131 | 31B | March | 34A | Kings Cross | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 12137 | 31B | March | 34A | Kings Cross | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 12138 | 31B | March | 34A | Kings Cross | |
22/08/1953 | Reallocation | 12105 | 30A | Stratford | 36B | Mexborough | |
19/09/1953 | Reallocation | 12103 | 30A | Stratford | 36B | Mexborough | |
19/09/1953 | Reallocation | 12104 | 30A | Stratford | 36B | Mexborough | |
26/09/1953 | Reallocation | 12052 | 5B | Rugby | |||
24/10/1953 | Reallocation | 12104 | 36B | Mexborough | 30A | Stratford | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 12052 | 5B | Crewe South | 5B | Crewe South | |
19/12/1953 | Reallocation | 12114 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
19/12/1953 | Reallocation | 12115 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
09/01/1954 | Reallocation | 12057 | 18A | Cricklewood East | |||
09/01/1954 | Reallocation | 12070 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Cricklewood East | |
23/01/1954 | Reallocation | 12103 | 36B | Mexborough | 30A | Stratford | |
23/01/1954 | Reallocation | 12113 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 12057 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Toton | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 12070 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Toton | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 12133 | 31B | March | 36B | Mexborough | |
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 12116 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 12117 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 12118 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 12119 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 12120 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
03/07/1954 | Reallocation | 12047 | 18A | Buxton (LNWR) | |||
24/07/1954 | Reallocation | 12105 | 36B | Mexborough | 30A | Stratford | |
24/07/1954 | Reallocation | 12133 | 36B | Mexborough | 31B | March | |
31/07/1954 | Reallocation | 12047 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Toton | |
31/07/1954 | Reallocation | 12057 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Buxton (LNWR) | |
21/08/1954 | Reallocation | 12045 | 18A | Saltley | |||
21/08/1954 | Reallocation | 12048 | 18A | Buxton (LNWR) | |||
21/08/1954 | Reallocation | 12057 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Toton | |
02/10/1954 | Reallocation | 12046 | 18A | Buxton (LNWR) | |||
02/10/1954 | Reallocation | 12048 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Toton | |
16/10/1954 | Reallocation | 12034 | 5B | Crewe South | 1A | Willesden | |
16/10/1954 | Reallocation | 12037 | 5B | Crewe South | 1A | Willesden | |
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 12035 | 5B | Crewe South | 1A | Willesden | |
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 12036 | 5B | Crewe South | 1A | Willesden | |
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 12046 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Toton | |
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 12132 | 31B | March | 36B | Mexborough | |
30/10/1954 | Reallocation | 12033 | 5B | Crewe South | 1A | Willesden | |
30/10/1954 | Reallocation | 12051 | 1A | Willesden | |||
30/10/1954 | Reallocation | 12070 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Buxton (LNWR) | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 12049 | 5B | Crewe South | 1A | Willesden | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 12054 | 1A | Willesden | |||
13/11/1954 | Reallocation | 12052 | 5B | Crewe South | 1A | Willesden | |
13/11/1954 | Reallocation | 12055 | 1A | Willesden | |||
13/11/1954 | Reallocation | 12132 | 36B | Mexborough | 31B | March | |
13/11/1954 | Reallocation | 12137 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34B | Hornsey | |
18/11/1954 | Reallocation | 12045 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Toton | |
20/11/1954 | Reallocation | 12050 | 1A | Willesden | |||
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 12056 | 18A | Buxton (LNWR) | |||
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 12070 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Toton | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 12078 | 5B | Crewe South | 1A | Willesden | |
11/12/1954 | Reallocation | 12053 | 1A | Willesden | |||
18/12/1954 | Reallocation | 12056 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Toton | |
18/12/1954 | Reallocation | 12057 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Buxton (LNWR) | |
25/12/1954 | Reallocation | 12127 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
25/12/1954 | Reallocation | 12133 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
25/12/1954 | Reallocation | 12134 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
01/01/1955 | Reallocation | 12057 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Toton | |
01/01/1955 | Reallocation | 12073 | 18A | Toton | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
26/02/1955 | Reallocation | 12072 | 18A | Toton | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
26/02/1955 | Reallocation | 12073 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | |
12/03/1955 | Reallocation | 12057 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Buxton (LNWR) | |
19/03/1955 | Reallocation | 12121 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
19/03/1955 | Reallocation | 12122 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 12072 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 18A | Toton | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 12073 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 18A | Toton | |
09/04/1955 | Reallocation | 12056 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Buxton (LNWR) | |
09/04/1955 | Reallocation | 12057 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Toton | |
14/05/1955 | Reallocation | 12056 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Toton | |
21/05/1955 | Reallocation | 12071 | 18A | Toton | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 12071 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 18A | Toton | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 12072 | 18A | Toton | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
23/07/1955 | Reallocation | 12070 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Buxton (LNWR) | |
30/07/1955 | Reallocation | 12045 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Coventry | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 12050 | 1A | Willesden | 1E | Bletchley | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 12053 | 1A | Willesden | 1E | Bletchley | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 12056 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Buxton (LNWR) | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 12070 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Toton | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 12072 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 18A | Toton | |
20/08/1955 | Reallocation | 12046 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Rugby | |
27/08/1955 | Reallocation | 12047 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Rugby | |
03/09/1955 | Reallocation | 12048 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Rugby | |
10/09/1955 | Reallocation | 12056 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Northampton | |
10/09/1955 | Reallocation | 12073 | 18A | Toton | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
17/09/1955 | Reallocation | 12057 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Northampton | |
17/09/1955 | Reallocation | 12070 | 18A | Toton | 18A | Northampton | |
17/09/1955 | Reallocation | 12112 | 34B | Hornsey | 34A | Kings Cross | |
17/09/1955 | Reallocation | 12128 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
17/09/1955 | Reallocation | 12131 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34B | Hornsey | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 12071 | 18A | Toton | 2E | Northampton | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 12072 | 18A | Toton | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 12073 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 18A | Toton | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 12072 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 18A | Toton | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 12073 | 18A | Toton | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
03/12/1955 | Reallocation | 12072 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 18A | Toton | |
03/12/1955 | Reallocation | 12072 | 18A | Toton | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
03/12/1955 | Reallocation | 12073 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 18A | Toton | |
03/12/1955 | Reallocation | 12073 | 18A | Toton | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
10/12/1955 | Reallocation | 12045 | 18A | Toton | 2A | Rugby | |
10/12/1955 | Reallocation | 12046 | 18A | Toton | 2A | Rugby | |
10/12/1955 | Reallocation | 12047 | 18A | Toton | 2A | Rugby | |
10/12/1955 | Reallocation | 12048 | 18A | Toton | 2A | Rugby | |
10/12/1955 | Reallocation | 12056 | 18A | Toton | 2A | Rugby | |
10/12/1955 | Reallocation | 12057 | 18A | Toton | 2A | Rugby | |
10/12/1955 | Reallocation | 12070 | 18A | Toton | 2A | Rugby | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 12127 | 40B | Immingham | 30A | Stratford | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 12130 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
07/01/1956 | Reallocation | 12063 | 14A | Saltley | |||
14/01/1956 | Reallocation | 12050 | 1E | Bletchley | 1A | Willesden | |
14/01/1956 | Reallocation | 12053 | 1E | Bletchley | 1A | Willesden | |
21/01/1956 | Reallocation | 12132 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
21/01/1956 | Reallocation | 12133 | 40B | Immingham | 31B | March | |
28/01/1956 | Reallocation | 12063 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
28/01/1956 | Reallocation | 12066 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 21A | Saltley | |
28/01/1956 | Reallocation | 12077 | 21A | Saltley | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
28/01/1956 | Reallocation | 12113 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | |
18/02/1956 | Reallocation | 12087 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
18/02/1956 | Reallocation | 12113 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | |
18/02/1956 | Reallocation | 12123 | 34B | Hornsey | 30A | Stratford | |
18/02/1956 | Reallocation | 12124 | 34B | Hornsey | 30A | Stratford | |
18/02/1956 | Reallocation | 12125 | 34A | Kings Cross | 30A | Stratford | |
18/02/1956 | Reallocation | 12126 | 34A | Kings Cross | 30A | Stratford | |
18/02/1956 | Reallocation | 12129 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34B | Hornsey | |
18/02/1956 | Reallocation | 12133 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
18/02/1956 | Reallocation | 12138 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34B | Hornsey | |
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 12071 | 2E | Northampton | 2A | Rugby | |
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 12072 | 18A | Toton | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 12073 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 18A | Toton | |
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 12072 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 18A | Toton | |
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 12113 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 12115 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | |
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 12134 | 40B | Immingham | 30A | Stratford | |
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 12115 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
12/05/1956 | Reallocation | 12082 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 12058 | 16A | Nottingham | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 12069 | 16A | Nottingham | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 12082 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 12072 | 18A | Toton | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 12073 | 18A | Toton | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 12073 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 18A | Toton | |
24/11/1956 | Reallocation | 12070 | 2A | Rugby | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 12071 | 2A | Rugby | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 12081 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 8C | Speke Junction | |
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 12082 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 8C | Speke Junction | |
02/02/1957 | Reallocation | 12056 | 2A | Rugby | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | |
23/02/1957 | Reallocation | 12082 | 8C | Speke Junction | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
23/03/1957 | Reallocation | 12077 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 17A | Derby | |
15/06/1957 | Reallocation | 12053 | 1A | Willesden | 1A | Rugby | |
22/06/1957 | Reallocation | 12033 | 1A | Willesden | 21A | Saltley | |
22/06/1957 | Reallocation | 12034 | 1A | Willesden | 21A | Saltley | |
22/06/1957 | Reallocation | 12035 | 1A | Willesden | 21A | Saltley | |
22/06/1957 | Reallocation | 12036 | 1A | Willesden | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
22/06/1957 | Reallocation | 12037 | 1A | Willesden | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
22/06/1957 | Reallocation | 12049 | 1A | Willesden | 16A | Nottingham | |
22/06/1957 | Reallocation | 12050 | 1A | Willesden | 16A | Nottingham | |
22/06/1957 | Reallocation | 12051 | 1A | Willesden | 16A | Nottingham | |
22/06/1957 | Reallocation | 12052 | 1A | Willesden | 16A | Nottingham | |
22/06/1957 | Reallocation | 12053 | 1A | Willesden | 2A | Rugby | |
22/06/1957 | Reallocation | 12054 | 1A | Willesden | 2A | Rugby | |
22/06/1957 | Reallocation | 12055 | 1A | Willesden | 18A | Toton | |
22/06/1957 | Reallocation | 12070 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1A | Willesden | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 12071 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1A | Willesden | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 12073 | 18A | Toton | 1A | Willesden | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 12074 | 21A | Saltley | 1A | Willesden | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 12075 | 21A | Saltley | 1A | Willesden | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 12076 | 21A | Saltley | 1A | Willesden | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 12082 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 8C | Speke Junction | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 12099 | 16A | Nottingham | 1A | Willesden | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 12100 | 16A | Nottingham | 1A | Willesden | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 12101 | 16A | Nottingham | 1A | Willesden | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 12102 | 16A | Nottingham | 1A | Willesden | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 12077 | 17A | Derby | 21A | Saltley | |
11/01/1958 | Reallocation | 12033 | 21A | Saltley | 17A | Derby | |
19/07/1958 | Reallocation | 12034 | 21A | Saltley | 17A | Derby | |
19/07/1958 | Reallocation | 12134 | 30A | Stratford | 30F | Parkeston Quay | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 12071 | 1A | Willesden | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 12099 | 1A | Willesden | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 12102 | 1A | Willesden | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
11/10/1958 | Reallocation | 12112 | 34A | Kings Cross | 34B | Hornsey | |
11/10/1958 | Reallocation | 12126 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
11/10/1958 | Reallocation | 12134 | 30F | Parkeston Quay | 31B | March | |
22/11/1958 | Reallocation | 12123 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
22/11/1958 | Reallocation | 12124 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
22/11/1958 | Reallocation | 12125 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 12083 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 12126 | 31B | March | 40B | Immingham | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 12133 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 12135 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 12136 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 12069 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 14A | Devons Road (Bow) | |
04/04/1959 | Reallocation | 12053 | 2A | Rugby | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
04/04/1959 | Reallocation | 12054 | 2A | Rugby | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
04/04/1959 | Reallocation | 12069 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
27/06/1959 | Reallocation | 12072 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 17A | Derby | |
18/07/1959 | Reallocation | 12082 | 8C | Speke Junction | 18A | Toton | |
14/11/1959 | Reallocation | 12072 | 17A | Derby | 2F | Woodford Halse | |
09/01/1960 | Reallocation | 12049 | 16A | Nottingham | 21A | Saltley | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 12072 | 2F | Woodford Halse | 17A | Derby | |
05/03/1960 | Reallocation | 12048 | 2A | Rugby | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
05/03/1960 | Reallocation | 12057 | 2A | Rugby | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 12112 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 12129 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 12131 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 12137 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 12138 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
14/05/1960 | Reallocation | 12072 | 17A | Derby | 2F | Woodford Halse | |
24/09/1960 | Reallocation | 12072 | 2F | Woodford Halse | 17A | Derby | |
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 12087 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 21C | Bushbury | |
26/11/1960 | Reallocation | 12092 | 3A | Bescot | 21E | Monument Lane | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 12073 | 1A | Willesden | 1E | Bletchley | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 12074 | 1A | Willesden | 1E | Bletchley | |
21/01/1961 | Reallocation | 12071 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 5B | Crewe South | |
21/01/1961 | Reallocation | 12099 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 5B | Crewe South | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 12035 | 21A | Saltley | 21A | Wellingborough | |
04/02/1961 | Reallocation | 12134 | 31B | March | 31A | Cambridge | |
11/02/1961 | Reallocation | 12035 | 21A | Saltley | 21A | Saltley | |
25/02/1961 | Reallocation | 12129 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 30A | Stratford | |
20/05/1961 | Reallocation | 12129 | 30A | Stratford | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
10/06/1961 | Reallocation | 12099 | 5B | Crewe South | 2B | Nuneaton | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 12071 | 5B | Crewe South | 21E | Monument Lane | |
09/12/1961 | Reallocation | 12095 | 3D | Aston | 21B | Bescot | |
23/12/1961 | Reallocation | 12075 | 1A | Willesden | 8B | Warrington Dallam | |
03/02/1962 | Reallocation | 12060 | 18A | Toton | |||
24/02/1962 | Reallocation | 12076 | 1A | Willesden | 8B | Warrington Dallam | |
10/03/1962 | Reallocation | 12056 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 21B | Bescot | |
10/03/1962 | Reallocation | 12078 | 1A | Willesden | 8B | Warrington Dallam | |
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 12087 | 21C | Bushbury | 21B | Bescot | |
31/03/1962 | Reallocation | 12100 | 1A | Willesden | 8B | Warrington Dallam | |
07/04/1962 | Reallocation | 12070 | 1A | Willesden | 8B | Warrington Dallam | |
05/05/1962 | Reallocation | 12099 | 2B | Nuneaton | 2A | Rugby | |
26/05/1962 | Reallocation | 12122 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | |
11/05/1963 | Reallocation | 12137 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 12084 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 12085 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 12086 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
05/10/1963 | Reallocation | 12136 | 31B | March | 31A | Cambridge | |
18/04/1964 | Reallocation | 12049 | 21A | Saltley | 2H | Monument Lane | |
03/10/1964 | Reallocation | 12062 | 21A | Saltley | 2A | Tyseley | |
03/10/1964 | Reallocation | 12066 | 21A | Saltley | 2A | Tyseley | |
03/10/1964 | Reallocation | 12077 | 21A | Saltley | 2A | Tyseley | |
03/10/1964 | Reallocation | 12091 | 36B | Mexborough | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | |
03/10/1964 | Reallocation | 12095 | 21B | Bescot | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | |
17/10/1964 | Reallocation | 12091 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | 2K | Bushbury | |
17/10/1964 | Reallocation | 12094 | 3B | Bushbury | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | |
24/10/1964 | Reallocation | 12063 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 16D | Nottingham | |
07/11/1964 | Reallocation | 12089 | 3D | Aston | 1A | Willesden | |
07/11/1964 | Reallocation | 12090 | 3D | Aston | 1A | Willesden | |
21/11/1964 | Reallocation | 12060 | 18A | Toton | 15E | Coalville | |
28/11/1964 | Reallocation | 12070 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
28/11/1964 | Reallocation | 12075 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
28/11/1964 | Reallocation | 12076 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
28/11/1964 | Reallocation | 12078 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
28/11/1964 | Reallocation | 12100 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
28/11/1964 | Reallocation | 12102 | 5G | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
05/12/1964 | Reallocation | 12088 | 3D | Aston | 1F | Rugby | |
12/12/1964 | Reallocation | 12053 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1C | Watford | |
12/12/1964 | Reallocation | 12058 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 1A | Willesden | |
12/12/1964 | Reallocation | 12064 | 1A | Willesden | |||
12/12/1964 | Reallocation | 12067 | 1A | Willesden | |||
12/12/1964 | Reallocation | 12068 | 1A | Willesden | |||
23/01/1965 | Reallocation | 12049 | 2H | Monument Lane | 1A | Willesden | |
13/02/1965 | Reallocation | 12060 | 15E | Coalville | 16C | Derby | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 12053 | 1C | Watford | 1A | Willesden | |
17/04/1965 | Reallocation | 12091 | 2K | Bushbury | 2F | Bescot | |
17/04/1965 | Reallocation | 12093 | 3B | Bushbury | 2F | Bescot | |
21/08/1965 | Reallocation | 12069 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 16D | Nottingham | |
30/10/1965 | Reallocation | 12077 | 2A | Tyseley | 2F | Bescot | |
08/01/1966 | Reallocation | 12112 | 34G | Finsbury Park | D14 | London (Midland) | |
22/01/1966 | Reallocation | 12086 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 12C | Barrow in Furness | |
29/01/1966 | Reallocation | 12086 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
12/02/1966 | Reallocation | 12069 | 16D | Nottingham | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | |
12/02/1966 | Reallocation | 12089 | 1A | Willesden | 1F | Rugby | |
19/02/1966 | Reallocation | 12051 | 16A | Nottingham | 16A | Toton | |
19/02/1966 | Reallocation | 12052 | 16A | Nottingham | 16A | Toton | |
19/02/1966 | Reallocation | 12063 | 16D | Nottingham | 16A | Toton | |
19/03/1966 | Reallocation | 12051 | 16A | Toton | 16G | Westhouses | |
19/03/1966 | Reallocation | 12052 | 16A | Toton | 16G | Westhouses | |
16/04/1966 | Reallocation | 12056 | 21B | Bescot | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | |
16/04/1966 | Reallocation | 12077 | 2F | Bescot | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | |
16/04/1966 | Reallocation | 12087 | 21B | Bescot | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | |
16/04/1966 | Reallocation | 12091 | 2F | Bescot | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | |
16/04/1966 | Reallocation | 12093 | 2F | Bescot | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | |
28/05/1966 | Reallocation | 12095 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | 9D | Newton Heath | |
04/06/1966 | Reallocation | 12136 | 31A | Cambridge | 31B | March | |
11/06/1966 | Reallocation | 12081 | 8C | Speke Junction | 9A | Longsight | |
02/07/1966 | Reallocation | 12086 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 12C | Barrow in Furness | |
03/09/1966 | Reallocation | 12137 | 40B | Immingham | 31B | March | |
10/09/1966 | Reallocation | 12129 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 30A | Stratford | |
10/09/1966 | Reallocation | 12131 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 30A | Stratford | |
10/09/1966 | Reallocation | 12138 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 30A | Stratford | |
01/10/1966 | Reallocation | 12039 | 99C | Crewe Works | |||
01/10/1966 | Reallocation | 12040 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |||
01/10/1966 | Reallocation | 12047 | 2A | Rugby | 99C | Crewe Works | |
01/10/1966 | Reallocation | 12062 | 2A | Tyseley | 99C | Crewe Works | |
01/10/1966 | Reallocation | 12077 | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
01/10/1966 | Reallocation | 12091 | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
01/10/1966 | Reallocation | 12093 | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
15/10/1966 | Reallocation | 12089 | 1F | Rugby | 1A | Willesden | |
29/10/1966 | Reallocation | 12134 | 31A | Cambridge | 30A | Stratford | |
12/11/1966 | Reallocation | 12038 | 18A | Toton | 8C | Speke Junction | |
12/11/1966 | Reallocation | 12050 | 16A | Nottingham | 9D | Newton Heath | |
12/11/1966 | Reallocation | 12051 | 16G | Westhouses | 9D | Newton Heath | |
12/11/1966 | Reallocation | 12052 | 16G | Westhouses | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
12/11/1966 | Reallocation | 12055 | 18A | Toton | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
12/11/1966 | Reallocation | 12081 | 9A | Longsight | 9D | Newton Heath | |
12/11/1966 | Reallocation | 12097 | 16A | Nottingham | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
12/11/1966 | Reallocation | 12098 | 16A | Nottingham | 9D | Newton Heath | |
10/12/1966 | Reallocation | 12033 | 17A | Derby | 9A | Longsight | |
10/12/1966 | Reallocation | 12034 | 17A | Derby | 8C | Speke Junction | |
10/12/1966 | Reallocation | 12060 | 16C | Derby | 9D | Newton Heath | |
10/12/1966 | Reallocation | 12063 | 16A | Toton | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
10/12/1966 | Reallocation | 12069 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
10/12/1966 | Reallocation | 12072 | 17A | Derby | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
10/12/1966 | Reallocation | 12082 | 18A | Toton | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
10/12/1966 | Reallocation | 12096 | 16A | Nottingham | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
07/01/1967 | Reallocation | 12033 | 9A | Longsight | 9D | Newton Heath | |
21/01/1967 | Reallocation | 12086 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | 12D | Workington | |
25/02/1967 | Reallocation | 12113 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 55E | Normanton | |
25/03/1967 | Reallocation | 12113 | 55E | Normanton | 55D | Royston | |
15/04/1967 | Reallocation | 12079 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 12D | Workington | |
22/04/1967 | Reallocation | 12049 | 1A | Willesden | 1F | Rugby | |
22/04/1967 | Reallocation | 12056 | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 2F | Bescot | |
22/04/1967 | Reallocation | 12066 | 2A | Tyseley | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
22/04/1967 | Reallocation | 12071 | 21E | Monument Lane | 2F | Bescot | |
22/04/1967 | Reallocation | 12087 | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 2F | Bescot | |
22/04/1967 | Reallocation | 12092 | 21E | Monument Lane | 2F | Bescot | |
22/04/1967 | Reallocation | 12094 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | 2F | Bescot | |
07/05/1967 | Condemned | 12104 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
13/05/1967 | Reallocation | 12107 | 30A | Stratford | 64B | Haymarket | |
20/05/1967 | Reallocation | 12034 | 8C | Speke Junction | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
20/05/1967 | Reallocation | 12038 | 8C | Speke Junction | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
27/05/1967 | Reallocation | 12092 | 2F | Bescot | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
27/05/1967 | Reallocation | 12107 | 64B | Haymarket | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
25/06/1967 | Condemned | 12123 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
19/08/1967 | Reallocation | 12065 | 2F | Bescot | |||
19/08/1967 | Reallocation | 12112 | D14 | London (Midland) | 2F | Bescot | |
24/09/1967 | Condemned | 12129 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
07/10/1967 | Reallocation | 12035 | 21A | Saltley | 8C | Speke Junction | |
07/10/1967 | Reallocation | 12061 | 8C | Speke Junction | |||
07/10/1967 | Reallocation | 12094 | 2F | Bescot | 8C | Speke Junction | |
16/12/1967 | Reallocation | 12038 | 10D | Lostock Hall | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
23/12/1967 | Condemned | 12068 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
30/12/1967 | Reallocation | 12039 | 99C | Crewe Works | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
30/12/1967 | Condemned | 12107 | 62A | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
06/01/1968 | Reallocation | 12034 | 10D | Lostock Hall | 8C | Speke Junction | |
06/01/1968 | Reallocation | 12040 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | 99C | Crewe Works | |
06/01/1968 | Reallocation | 12079 | 12D | Workington | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
06/01/1968 | Reallocation | 12086 | 12D | Workington | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
27/01/1968 | Reallocation | 12039 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 12034 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8J | Allerton | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 12035 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8J | Allerton | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 12061 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8J | Allerton | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 12063 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | 8J | Allerton | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 12065 | 2F | Bescot | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 12094 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8J | Allerton | |
18/05/1968 | Reallocation | 12040 | 99C | Crewe Works | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
18/05/1968 | Reallocation | 12047 | 99C | Crewe Works | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
18/05/1968 | Reallocation | 12057 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 8J | Allerton | |
18/05/1968 | Reallocation | 12062 | 99C | Crewe Works | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
18/05/1968 | Reallocation | 12073 | 1E | Bletchley | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
18/05/1968 | Reallocation | 12074 | 1E | Bletchley | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
29/06/1968 | Reallocation | 12114 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 30A | Stratford | |
29/06/1968 | Reallocation | 12115 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 30A | Stratford | |
29/06/1968 | Reallocation | 12116 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 30A | Stratford | |
06/07/1968 | Reallocation | 12033 | 9D | Newton Heath | 9A | Longsight | |
06/07/1968 | Reallocation | 12050 | 9D | Newton Heath | 9A | Longsight | |
06/07/1968 | Reallocation | 12051 | 9D | Newton Heath | 9A | Longsight | |
06/07/1968 | Reallocation | 12060 | 9D | Newton Heath | 9A | Longsight | |
06/07/1968 | Reallocation | 12081 | 9D | Newton Heath | 9A | Longsight | |
06/07/1968 | Reallocation | 12095 | 9D | Newton Heath | 9A | Longsight | |
06/07/1968 | Reallocation | 12098 | 9D | Newton Heath | 9A | Longsight | |
06/07/1968 | Reallocation | 12137 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
14/09/1968 | Reallocation | 12136 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
19/10/1968 | Condemned | 12034 | 8J | Allerton | COND | ||
19/10/1968 | Condemned | 12035 | 8J | Allerton | COND | ||
19/10/1968 | Condemned | 12036 | 6A | Chester (MR) | COND | ||
19/10/1968 | Condemned | 12037 | 6A | Chester (MR) | COND | ||
19/10/1968 | Condemned | 12039 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
19/10/1968 | Condemned | 12040 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
19/10/1968 | Condemned | 12041 | COND | ||||
19/10/1968 | Condemned | 12042 | COND | ||||
19/10/1968 | Condemned | 12043 | COND | ||||
19/10/1968 | Condemned | 12044 | COND | ||||
02/11/1968 | Reallocation | 12112 | 2F | Bescot | 2E | Saltley | |
18/11/1968 | Condemned | 12119 | 53C | Hull Springhead | COND | ||
18/11/1968 | Condemned | 12137 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
18/11/1968 | Condemned | 12138 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
19/11/1968 | Condemned | 12124 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
25/11/1968 | Condemned | 12126 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
30/11/1968 | Reallocation | 12117 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 40B | Immingham | |
30/11/1968 | Reallocation | 12118 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 40B | Immingham | |
07/12/1968 | Reallocation | 12084 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
21/12/1968 | Condemned | 12072 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
28/12/1968 | Condemned | 12120 | 53C | Hull Springhead | COND | ||
11/01/1969 | Reallocation | 12045 | 2A | Rugby | 1E | Bletchley | |
11/01/1969 | Reallocation | 12046 | 2A | Rugby | 1E | Bletchley | |
11/01/1969 | Reallocation | 12049 | 1F | Rugby | 1E | Bletchley | |
11/01/1969 | Reallocation | 12071 | 2F | Bescot | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
11/01/1969 | Reallocation | 12088 | 1F | Rugby | 1E | Bletchley | |
11/01/1969 | Reallocation | 12090 | 1A | Willesden | 1E | Bletchley | |
11/01/1969 | Reallocation | 12099 | 2A | Rugby | 1E | Bletchley | |
25/01/1969 | Condemned | 12033 | 9A | Longsight | COND | ||
25/01/1969 | Condemned | 12038 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
25/01/1969 | Condemned | 12045 | 1E | Bletchley | COND | ||
25/01/1969 | Condemned | 12046 | 1E | Bletchley | COND | ||
25/01/1969 | Condemned | 12047 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
25/01/1969 | Condemned | 12048 | 6A | Chester (MR) | COND | ||
25/01/1969 | Condemned | 12057 | 8J | Allerton | COND | ||
25/01/1969 | Condemned | 12059 | COND | ||||
25/01/1969 | Condemned | 12067 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
25/01/1969 | Condemned | 12096 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
01/02/1969 | Condemned | 12133 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
28/02/1969 | Condemned | 12117 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
31/03/1969 | Condemned | 12100 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
16/04/1969 | Condemned | 12092 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
16/04/1969 | Condemned | 12095 | 9A | Longsight | COND | ||
16/04/1969 | Condemned | 12131 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
19/04/1969 | Condemned | 12064 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
19/04/1969 | Condemned | 12066 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
10/05/1969 | Reallocation | 12065 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 8J | Allerton | |
28/06/1969 | Condemned | 12125 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
28/06/1969 | Condemned | 12135 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
31/07/1969 | Condemned | 12086 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
30/09/1969 | Condemned | 12070 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
30/09/1969 | Condemned | 12116 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
18/10/1969 | Condemned | 12112 | 2E | Saltley | COND | ||
29/11/1969 | Reallocation | 12088 | 1E | Bletchley | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
29/11/1969 | Reallocation | 12122 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 40B | Immingham | |
27/02/1970 | Condemned | 12098 | 9A | Longsight | COND | ||
19/04/1970 | Condemned | 12062 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
20/06/1970 | Condemned | 12081 | 9A | Longsight | COND | ||
20/06/1970 | Condemned | 12091 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
11/07/1970 | Condemned | 12050 | 9A | Longsight | COND | ||
25/07/1970 | Condemned | 12054 | 6A | Chester (MR) | COND | ||
30/07/1970 | Condemned | 12106 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
30/07/1970 | Condemned | 12128 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
15/08/1970 | Reallocation | 12082 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
15/08/1970 | Condemned | 12101 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
12/09/1970 | Condemned | 12089 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
26/09/1970 | Reallocation | 12121 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
05/10/1970 | Condemned | 12114 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
05/10/1970 | Condemned | 12115 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 12071 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |
14/11/1970 | Reallocation | 12071 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
14/11/1970 | Reallocation | 12088 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 8J | Allerton | |
26/12/1970 | Reallocation | 12121 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | 40B | Immingham | |
09/01/1971 | Reallocation | 12051 | 9A | Longsight | 8J | Allerton | |
14/01/1971 | Condemned | 12105 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
17/01/1971 | Condemned | 12078 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
17/01/1971 | Condemned | 12102 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
23/01/1971 | Reallocation | 12063 | 8J | Allerton | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
07/02/1971 | Condemned | 12060 | 9A | Longsight | COND | ||
27/02/1971 | Reallocation | 12098 | 98W | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
14/03/1971 | Condemned | 12069 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
14/03/1971 | Condemned | 12113 | 55D | Royston | COND | ||
28/03/1971 | Condemned | 12097 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
03/04/1971 | Reallocation | 12077 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 9A | Longsight | |
10/04/1971 | Reallocation | 12065 | 8J | Allerton | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
18/04/1971 | Condemned | 12053 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
24/04/1971 | Condemned | 12080 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
25/04/1971 | Condemned | 12118 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
28/04/1971 | Condemned | 12058 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
08/05/1971 | Reallocation | 12077 | 9A | Longsight | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
09/05/1971 | Condemned | 12111 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
10/05/1971 | Condemned | 12065 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
11/05/1971 | Condemned | 12088 | 8J | Allerton | COND | ||
16/05/1971 | Condemned | 12084 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
16/05/1971 | Condemned | 12093 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
22/05/1971 | Condemned | 12085 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
13/06/1971 | Condemned | 12052 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
04/07/1971 | Condemned | 12121 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
04/07/1971 | Condemned | 12122 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
17/07/1971 | Condemned | 12055 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
17/07/1971 | Condemned | 12087 | 2F | Bescot | COND | ||
17/07/1971 | Condemned | 12090 | 1E | Bletchley | COND | ||
17/07/1971 | Condemned | 12099 | 1E | Bletchley | COND | ||
11/09/1971 | Condemned | 12079 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
03/10/1971 | Condemned | 12049 | 1E | Bletchley | COND | ||
03/10/1971 | Condemned | 12082 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | COND | ||
09/10/1971 | Condemned | 12051 | 8J | Allerton | COND | ||
09/10/1971 | Condemned | 12056 | 2F | Bescot | COND | ||
09/10/1971 | Condemned | 12061 | 8J | Allerton | COND | ||
09/10/1971 | Condemned | 12071 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
09/10/1971 | Condemned | 12077 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
09/10/1971 | Condemned | 12083 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
09/10/1971 | Condemned | 12094 | 8J | Allerton | COND | ||
06/11/1971 | Condemned | 12073 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
13/11/1971 | Condemned | 12075 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
01/12/1971 | Condemned | 12108 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
12/12/1971 | Condemned | 12076 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
18/12/1971 | Reallocation | 12074 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
30/12/1971 | Condemned | 12136 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
01/01/1972 | Condemned | 12063 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
01/01/1972 | Condemned | 12074 | 6A | Chester (MR) | COND | ||
10/01/1972 | Reallocation | 12103 | 98W | 30A | Stratford | ||
18/06/1972 | Condemned | 12103 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
25/06/1972 | Condemned | 12132 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
16/07/1972 | Condemned | 12130 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
22/10/1972 | Condemned | 12127 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
19/11/1972 | Condemned | 12109 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
19/11/1972 | Condemned | 12110 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
19/11/1972 | Condemned | 12134 | 30A | Stratford | COND |