Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1796 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15202 Week
» 68218 Month
» 187745 Year
» 3214598 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
TVR/GWR Cameron "A" Class 0-6-2T
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
TVR |
10 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
337 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
11 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
343 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
12 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
344 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
120 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
441 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
122 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
352 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
123 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
356 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
124 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
357 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
125 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
360 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
127 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
361 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
128 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
362 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
129 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
364 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
130 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
365 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
132 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
366 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
133 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
367 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
134 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
368 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
135 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
370 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
136 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
371 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
138 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
372 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
139 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
373 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
140 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
374 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
144 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
375 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
149 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
376 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
154 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
377 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
156 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
378 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
157 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
379 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
158 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
380 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
159 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
381 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
160 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
382 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
162 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
383 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
164 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
384 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
165 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
385 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
20 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
345 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
3 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
438 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
400 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
386 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
401 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
387 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
402 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
388 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
403 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
389 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
404 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
390 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
405 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
391 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
406 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
393 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
407 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
394 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
408 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
397 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
409 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
398 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
410 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
399 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
411 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
401 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
412 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
402 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
413 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
403 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
414 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
404 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
415 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
406 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
416 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
408 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
42 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
439 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
45 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
346 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
52 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
440 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
7 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
335 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
75 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
347 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
80 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
348 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
90 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
349 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
TVR |
91 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
351 |
|
y/e |
1924 |
|
GWR |
401 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
303 |
|
on |
21/01/1947 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
441 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
322 |
|
on |
29/03/1947 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
403 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
305 |
|
on |
28/05/1947 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
402 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
304 |
1947 |
on |
10/03/1948 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
408 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
308 |
1947 |
on |
03/12/1948 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
438 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
309 |
1947 |
on |
17/06/1949 |
|
GWR |
406 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
307 |
1947 |
on |
13/07/1949 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
404 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
306 |
1947 |
on |
27/07/1949 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
439 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
312 |
1947 |
on |
22/09/1949 |
At Caerphilly Factory |
GWR |
440 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
316 |
1947 |
on |
15/06/1950 |
At Caerphilly Factory |