TVR/GWR Cameron "A" Class 0-6-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 344 | RHY.1 | Dowlais Central | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 371 | THT | Treherbert | |||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 371 | THT | Treherbert | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 303 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 305 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 322 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 335 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 337 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 343 | CVCYS | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 344 | RHY.1 | Dowlais Central | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 345 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 346 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 347 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 348 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 349 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 351 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 352 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 356 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 357 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 360 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 361 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 362 | ABDR | Aberdare | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 364 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 365 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 366 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 367 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 368 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 370 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 371 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 372 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 373 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 374 | ABDR | Aberdare | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 375 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 376 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 377 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 378 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 379 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 380 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 381 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 382 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 383 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 384 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 385 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 386 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 387 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 388 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 389 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 390 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 391 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 393 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 394 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 397 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 398 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 399 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 402 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 404 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 406 | 58 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 408 | SED | Swansea East Dock | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 438 | SED | Swansea East Dock | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 439 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 440 | BRY | Barry | |||
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 348 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | RHY | Rhymney | |
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 360 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | RHY | Rhymney | |
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 371 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | RHY | Rhymney | |
07/08/1948 | Reallocation | 348 | RHY | Rhymney | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
07/08/1948 | Reallocation | 360 | RHY | Rhymney | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
07/08/1948 | Reallocation | 371 | RHY | Rhymney | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
14/10/1948 | Reallocation | 440 | BRY | Barry | RHY | Rhymney | |
29/01/1949 | Reallocation | 388 | BRY | Barry | RHY | Rhymney | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 345 | BRY | Barry | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 377 | BRY | Barry | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
22/04/1950 | Reallocation | 386 | BRY | Barry | 88E | Abercynon | |
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 373 | THT | Treherbert | 88C | Barry | |
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 388 | RHY | Rhymney | 88C | Barry | |
12/08/1950 | Reallocation | 316 | RHY | Rhymney | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 349 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 349 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 375 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88E | Abercynon | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 375 | 88E | Abercynon | 88E | Abercynon | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 357 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 86J | Aberdare | |
01/12/1951 | Reallocation | 375 | 88E | Abercynon | 88C | Barry | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 322 | BRY | Barry | 88E | Abercynon | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 371 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
31/12/1951 | Reallocation | 375 | 88C | Barry | 88C | Barry | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 379 | BRY | Barry | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 393 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/01/1952 | Reallocation | 322 | 88E | Abercynon | 88E | Abercynon | |
31/01/1952 | Reallocation | 371 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
29/02/1952 | Reallocation | 379 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
29/02/1952 | Reallocation | 393 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 371 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86J | Aberdare | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 385 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 86J | Aberdare | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 371 | 86J | Aberdare | 86J | Aberdare | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 385 | 86J | Aberdare | 86J | Aberdare | |
18/11/1952 | Condemned | 344 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 371 | 86J | Aberdare | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 357 | 86J | Aberdare | 88C | Barry | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 362 | ABDR | Aberdare | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
09/02/1953 | Condemned | 337 | AYN | Abercynon | COND | ||
16/02/1953 | Condemned | 309 | SED | Swansea East Dock | COND | ||
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 374 | ABDR | Aberdare | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 385 | 86J | Aberdare | 88E | Abercynon | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 370 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88E | Abercynon | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 303 | THT | Treherbert | 88C | Barry | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 379 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88E | Abercynon | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 393 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88C | Barry | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 399 | THT | Treherbert | 88C | Barry | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 335 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 376 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 377 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 378 | THT | Treherbert | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 390 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88C | Barry | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 399 | 88C | Barry | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 384 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88F | Treherbert | |
18/03/1954 | Condemned | 335 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | COND | ||
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 378 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
22/05/1954 | Reallocation | 385 | 88E | Abercynon | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 376 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 308 | SED | Swansea East Dock | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 349 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 371 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 374 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 381 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 399 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 377 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88F | Treherbert | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 381 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88F | Treherbert | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 385 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88F | Treherbert | |
30/10/1954 | Condemned | 322 | 88E | Abercynon | COND | ||
22/11/1954 | Condemned | 375 | 88C | Barry | COND | ||
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 378 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 399 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88E | Abercynon | |
01/01/1955 | Reallocation | 349 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88C | Barry | |
01/01/1955 | Reallocation | 376 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88C | Barry | |
03/01/1955 | Condemned | 356 | AYN | Abercynon | COND | ||
18/01/1955 | Condemned | 371 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | COND | ||
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 312 | BRY | Barry | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
10/02/1955 | Condemned | 360 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
23/02/1955 | Condemned | 372 | BRY | Barry | COND | ||
14/03/1955 | Condemned | 352 | THT | Treherbert | COND | ||
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 378 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 389 | BRY | Barry | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 307 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88E | Abercynon | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 377 | 88F | Treherbert | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 307 | 88E | Abercynon | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 365 | THT | Treherbert | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 381 | 88F | Treherbert | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
10/09/1955 | Reallocation | 365 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88E | Abercynon | |
19/09/1955 | Condemned | 374 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | COND | ||
22/09/1955 | Condemned | 345 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
05/10/1955 | Condemned | 343 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
05/10/1955 | Condemned | 346 | 98W | COND | |||
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 384 | 88F | Treherbert | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 312 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
10/10/1955 | Condemned | 366 | THT | Treherbert | COND | ||
17/10/1955 | Condemned | 365 | 88E | Abercynon | COND | ||
03/12/1955 | Reallocation | 381 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
19/12/1955 | Condemned | 308 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | COND | ||
02/01/1956 | Condemned | 357 | 88C | Barry | COND | ||
20/01/1956 | Condemned | 389 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | COND | ||
28/01/1956 | Reallocation | 377 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88E | Abercynon | |
13/02/1956 | Condemned | 384 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 368 | THT | Treherbert | 88E | Abercynon | |
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 377 | 88E | Abercynon | 88C | Barry | |
27/02/1956 | Condemned | 379 | 88E | Abercynon | COND | ||
13/03/1956 | Condemned | 307 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
23/03/1956 | Condemned | 367 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 385 | 88F | Treherbert | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
16/04/1956 | Condemned | 306 | BRY | Barry | COND | ||
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 387 | BRY | Barry | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
26/04/1956 | Condemned | 382 | BRY | Barry | COND | ||
27/04/1956 | Condemned | 386 | 88E | Abercynon | COND | ||
05/05/1956 | Condemned | 303 | 88C | Barry | COND | ||
05/05/1956 | Condemned | 348 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
14/05/1956 | Condemned | 377 | 88C | Barry | COND | ||
28/05/1956 | Condemned | 362 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
11/06/1956 | Condemned | 312 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 388 | 88C | Barry | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
09/07/1956 | Condemned | 351 | AYN | Abercynon | COND | ||
09/07/1956 | Condemned | 394 | BRY | Barry | COND | ||
14/07/1956 | Reallocation | 361 | BRY | Barry | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
23/07/1956 | Condemned | 316 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | COND | ||
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 390 | 88C | Barry | 88E | Abercynon | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 393 | 88C | Barry | 88E | Abercynon | |
03/09/1956 | Condemned | 391 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
03/09/1956 | Condemned | 399 | 88E | Abercynon | COND | ||
08/09/1956 | Reallocation | 349 | 88C | Barry | 88E | Abercynon | |
01/10/1956 | Condemned | 388 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 373 | 88C | Barry | 88E | Abercynon | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 376 | 88C | Barry | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
22/10/1956 | Condemned | 380 | AYN | Abercynon | COND | ||
24/10/1956 | Condemned | 368 | 88E | Abercynon | COND | ||
05/11/1956 | Condemned | 387 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
04/12/1956 | Condemned | 347 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
17/12/1956 | Condemned | 378 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
14/01/1957 | Condemned | 376 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
26/01/1957 | Reallocation | 390 | 88E | Abercynon | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
29/01/1957 | Condemned | 361 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
04/03/1957 | Condemned | 349 | 88E | Abercynon | COND | ||
04/03/1957 | Condemned | 364 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
01/04/1957 | Condemned | 305 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
01/04/1957 | Condemned | 385 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | COND | ||
01/04/1957 | Condemned | 397 | AYN | Abercynon | COND | ||
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 381 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88E | Abercynon | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 383 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88E | Abercynon | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 390 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88E | Abercynon | |
13/05/1957 | Condemned | 393 | 98W | COND | |||
12/08/1957 | Condemned | 383 | 98W | COND | |||
12/08/1957 | Condemned | 304 | 98W | COND | |||
13/08/1957 | Condemned | 370 | 98W | COND | |||
13/08/1957 | Condemned | 398 | 98W | COND | |||
26/08/1957 | Condemned | 373 | 98W | COND | |||
26/08/1957 | Condemned | 381 | 98W | COND | |||
26/08/1957 | Condemned | 390 | 98W | COND |