TVR |
GWR (1922) |
GWR (1946) |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Mileage |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
105
|
236
|
|
06/1908 |
|
12/01/1953 |
|
44.58 |
745,262 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
18/04/1953 |
44.87 |
1
|
278
|
|
07/1910 |
|
28/05/1951 |
|
40.83 |
656,178 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
08/09/1951 |
41.18 |
2
|
279
|
|
07/1910 |
|
31/05/1954 |
|
43.83 |
693,176 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
26/03/1955 |
44.73 |
6
|
280
|
|
07/1908 |
|
09/05/1949 |
|
40.83 |
361,204 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
16/07/1949 |
41.03 |
8
|
281
|
|
08/1910 |
|
25/08/1950 |
|
40 |
672,749 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
24/02/1951 |
40.56 |
9
|
282
|
|
07/1908 |
|
14/06/1954 |
|
45.92 |
713,654 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
14/08/1954 |
46.11 |
17
|
283
|
|
08/1910 |
|
14/03/1949 |
|
38.58 |
353,784 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Caerphilly) |
21/05/1949 |
38.79 |
35
|
284
|
|
08/1910 |
|
03/11/1952 |
|
42.25 |
689,171 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
21/03/1953 |
42.63 |
38
|
285
|
|
04/1907 |
|
24/08/1953 |
|
46.33 |
703,792 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
22/03/1958 |
50.97 |
39
|
286
|
|
06/1908 |
|
02/10/1950 |
|
42.33 |
669,201 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
30/12/1950 |
42.57 |
43
|
287
|
|
04/1907 |
|
07/12/1949 |
Abercynon |
42.67 |
692,338 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
20/05/1950 |
43.13 |
46
|
288
|
|
09/1910 |
|
10/03/1950 |
|
39.5 |
661,530 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
20/05/1950 |
39.70 |
48
|
289
|
|
07/1908 |
|
15/08/1949 |
|
41.08 |
654,250 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
08/10/1949 |
41.26 |
49
|
290
|
|
10/1910 |
|
26/07/1955 |
|
44.75 |
829,727 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
10/09/1955 |
44.93 |
56
|
291
|
|
07/1908 |
|
16/01/1950 |
|
41.5 |
302,370 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
17/06/1950 |
41.95 |
58
|
292
|
|
07/1908 |
|
10/04/1952 |
|
43.75 |
660,238 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
12/07/1952 |
44.02 |
59
|
293
|
|
06/1907 |
|
27/07/1951 |
|
44.08 |
689,952 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
08/09/1951 |
44.26 |
67
|
294
|
|
07/1907 |
|
17/07/1950 |
|
43 |
587,001 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
24/02/1951 |
43.64 |
68
|
295
|
|
07/1907 |
|
23/06/1951 |
|
43.92 |
753,891 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
08/09/1951 |
44.18 |
94
|
296
|
|
09/1907 |
|
19/09/1949 |
|
42 |
265,286 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Barry, South Glamorgan) |
25/02/1950 |
42.48 |
95
|
297
|
|
07/1908 |
|
12/12/1949 |
Cardiff East Dock |
41.42 |
625,224 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
09/09/1950 |
42.18 |
97
|
298
|
|
07/1908 |
|
10/07/1948 |
|
40 |
649,852 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
03/12/1949 |
41.41 |
98
|
299
|
|
07/1908 |
|
18/06/1951 |
|
42.92 |
740,519 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
11/08/1951 |
43.10 |
101
|
300
|
200
|
07/1908 |
|
10/07/1948 |
|
40 |
624,630 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
02/10/1948 |
40.24 |
102
|
301
|
|
06/1908 |
|
06/12/1948 |
|
40.5 |
664,012 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
29/01/1949 |
40.65 |
104
|
302
|
|
07/1908 |
|
10/04/1948 |
|
39.75 |
577,173 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
12/06/1948 |
39.94 |
108
|
310
|
203
|
09/1910 |
|
07/01/1952 |
|
41.33 |
654,691 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
24/01/1953 |
42.39 |
109
|
311
|
204
|
09/1910 |
|
26/07/1955 |
|
44.83 |
659,613 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
10/09/1955 |
45.02 |
110
|
313
|
205
|
09/1910 |
|
12/07/1954 |
|
43.83 |
703,603 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
20/04/1957 |
46.63 |
111
|
314
|
|
08/1908 |
|
08/12/1949 |
Aberdare |
41.33 |
665,234 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
22/04/1950 |
41.71 |
112
|
315
|
207
|
10/1910 |
|
18/11/1952 |
|
42.08 |
649,929 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
31/10/1953 |
43.07 |
113
|
317
|
208
|
10/1910 |
|
22/07/1955 |
|
44.75 |
735,416 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
08/10/1955 |
45.01 |
114
|
318
|
209
|
10/1910 |
|
27/08/1952 |
|
41.83 |
704,687 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
27/12/1952 |
42.23 |
115
|
319
|
210
|
10/1910 |
|
04/03/1955 |
|
44.42 |
718,902 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
21/05/1955 |
44.63 |
116
|
320
|
211
|
10/1910 |
|
03/05/1955 |
|
44.58 |
753,715 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
19/05/1956 |
45.62 |
118
|
321
|
215
|
10/1910 |
|
23/07/1955 |
|
44.75 |
739,825 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
05/11/1955 |
45.09 |
119
|
324
|
216
|
10/1910 |
|
24/01/1955 |
|
44.25 |
741,351 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
|
|
121
|
333
|
217
|
10/1910 |
|
08/09/1952 |
|
41.92 |
685,266 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
01/11/1952 |
42.08 |
13
|
409
|
218
|
10/1910 |
|
04/12/1952 |
|
42.17 |
680,803 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
24/01/1953 |
42.31 |
36
|
414
|
219
|
08/1910 |
|
04/06/1951 |
|
40.83 |
715,156 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
26/01/1952 |
41.48 |
69
|
420
|
220
|
08/1907 |
|
08/04/1951 |
|
43.67 |
406,830 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
08/09/1951 |
44.10 |