Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 117 Today
» 1094 Yesterday
» 5848 Week
» 17141 Month
» 281774 Year
» 1503339 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

TVR/GWR Hurry Riches "O4" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
10/04/1948 Condemned 302 98W     COND  
10/07/1948 Condemned 298 98W     COND  
10/07/1948 Condemned 200 98W     COND  
06/12/1948 Condemned 301 98W     COND  
14/03/1949 Condemned 283 98W     COND  
09/05/1949 Condemned 280 98W     COND  
30/06/1949 Reallocation 409     FDL Ferndale  
15/08/1949 Condemned 289 98W     COND  
19/09/1949 Condemned 296 98W     COND  
07/12/1949 Condemned 287 98W     COND  
08/12/1949 Condemned 314 98W     COND  
12/12/1949 Condemned 297 98W     COND  
16/01/1950 Condemned 291 98W     COND  
10/03/1950 Condemned 288 98W     COND  
17/07/1950 Condemned 294 98W     COND  
25/08/1950 Condemned 281 98W     COND  
31/08/1950 Reallocation 286     88A Cardiff Cathays  
02/10/1950 Condemned 286 98W     COND  
30/11/1950 Reallocation 218 FDL Ferndale 88E Abercynon  
08/04/1951 Condemned 220 98W     COND  
28/05/1951 Condemned 278 98W     COND  
04/06/1951 Condemned 219 98W     COND  
18/06/1951 Condemned 299 98W     COND  
23/06/1951 Condemned 295 98W     COND  
07/1951 Condemned 293 CVRYR     COND  
30/09/1951 Reallocation 279     88F Treherbert  
01/1952 Condemned 203       COND  
04/1952 Condemned 292 CVDLIS     COND  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 210     88B Cardiff East Dock  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 217     88F Treherbert  
08/1952 Condemned 209       COND  
09/1952 Condemned 217 88F Treherbert   COND  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 236     88C Barry  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 210 88B Cardiff East Dock 88F Treherbert  
11/1952 Condemned 284       COND  
11/1952 Condemned 207 98W     COND  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 208     86J Aberdare  
12/1952 Condemned 218 88E Abercynon   COND  
01/1953 Condemned 236 88C Barry   COND  
24/01/1953 Reallocation 279 88F Treherbert 88F Treherbert  
24/01/1953 Reallocation 290     88F Treherbert  
21/02/1953 Reallocation 282     86J Aberdare  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 279 88F Treherbert 88E Abercynon  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 285     88C Barry  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 290 88F Treherbert 88E Abercynon  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 210 88F Treherbert 88C Barry  
08/1953 Condemned 285 88C Barry   COND  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 279 88E Abercynon 88B Cardiff East Dock  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 290 88E Abercynon 88B Cardiff East Dock  
25/11/1953 Reallocation 204     88B Cardiff East Dock  
26/12/1953 Reallocation 210 88C Barry 88B Cardiff East Dock  
05/1954 Condemned 279 88B Cardiff East Dock   COND  
22/05/1954 Reallocation 208 86J Aberdare 88B Cardiff East Dock  
06/1954 Condemned 282 86J Aberdare   COND  
07/1954 Condemned 205       COND  
01/1955 Condemned 216 CVFDL     COND  
03/1955 Condemned 210 88B Cardiff East Dock   COND  
05/1955 Condemned 211 CVDLIS     COND  
07/1955 Condemned 290 88B Cardiff East Dock   COND  
07/1955 Condemned 204 88B Cardiff East Dock   COND  
07/1955 Condemned 208 88B Cardiff East Dock   COND  
07/1955 Condemned 215       COND