Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3362 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16768 Week
» 69784 Month
» 189311 Year
» 3216164 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRP" Class 0-6-2T
GWR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Mileage |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
76
|
07/1909 |
|
01/11/1950 |
|
41.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
77
|
04/1917 |
|
23/11/1953 |
|
36.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
82
|
07/1909 |
|
17/05/1954 |
|
44.83 |
1,037,523 |
|
|
|
44.96 |
83
|
08/1909 |
|
09/05/1955 |
|
45.75 |
615,716 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
18/06/1955 |
45.87 |