RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRAP" Class 0-6-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 79 | RHY | Rhymney | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 80 | RHY | Rhymney | |||
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 78 | RHY.1 | Dowlais Central | |||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 78 | RHY.1 | Dowlais Central | RHY.1 | Dowlais Central | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 78 | RHY.1 | Dowlais Central | RHY | Rhymney | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 79 | RHY | Rhymney | RHY | Rhymney | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 80 | RHY | Rhymney | RHY | Rhymney | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 81 | RHY | Rhymney | |||
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 80 | RHY | Rhymney | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
01/02/1954 | Condemned | 80 | 98W | COND | |||
17/05/1954 | Condemned | 81 | 98W | COND | |||
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 79 | RHY | Rhymney | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 78 | RHY | Rhymney | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
21/07/1955 | Condemned | 79 | 98W | COND | |||
02/08/1955 | Condemned | 78 | 98W | COND |