Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 576 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1703 Week
» 12996 Month
» 277629 Year
» 1499194 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

RR/GWR Hurry Riches "R" Class 0-6-2T


Class GWR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
RRR 30 12/1907 W Withdrawn 05/1949 09/05/1949
RRR 31 12/1907 W Withdrawn 03/1951 03/1951
RRR 32 12/1907 W Withdrawn 02/1950 20/02/1950
RRR 34 09/1909 W Withdrawn 11/1949 24/11/1949
RRR 46 10/1909 W Withdrawn 07/1950 10/07/1950