Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 710 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 8451 Week
» 28893 Month
» 365739 Year
» 1587304 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRR1" Class 0-6-2T


GWR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Mileage Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
35 07/1921 12/11/1956 Cardiff East Dock 35.33 552,473 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 22/03/1958 36.71
36 07/1921 08/10/1957 Cardiff East Dock 36.25 547,103 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/11/1957 36.33
37 09/1921 24/09/1956 Cardiff East Dock 35 583,577 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 29/12/1956 35.31
38 09/1921 08/10/1957 Cardiff East Dock 36.08 559,474 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/11/1957 36.16
39 12/1921 22/08/1955 Cardiff East Dock 33.67 633,967 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/12/1955 33.99
40 12/1921 26/10/1953 Cardiff East Dock 31.83
41 12/1921 22/05/1956 Cardiff East Dock 34.42 538,182 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 14/07/1956 34.60
42 12/1921 16/09/1957 Cardiff East Dock 35.75 599,671 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/11/1957 35.91
43 12/1921 25/02/1957 Cardiff East Dock 35.17 565,698 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 23/03/1957 35.29
44 12/1921 23/07/1956 Cardiff East Dock 34.58 556,840 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/09/1956 34.76