Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1046 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3691 Week
» 6273 Month
» 270906 Year
» 1492471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BMJR/GWR Dunbar "45" Class 0-6-2T


Old Number Company Old Num Type New Number Company Subtype New Num Type Date
45 BMR Pre Grouping 1372 GWR   Big Four y/e 1923
46 BMR Pre Grouping 1373 GWR   Big Four y/e 1923
47 BMR Pre Grouping 1374 GWR   Big Four y/e 1923
48 BMR Pre Grouping 1375 GWR   Big Four y/e 1923
49 BMR Pre Grouping 1668 GWR   Big Four y/e 1923
50 BMR Pre Grouping 1670 GWR   Big Four y/e 1923
1374 GWR Big Four 433 GWR 2nd Big Four m/e 31/05/1947
1373 GWR Big Four 432 GWR 2nd Big Four 19/11/1948
1375 GWR Big Four 434 GWR 2nd Big Four 08/04/1949
1372 GWR Big Four 431 GWR 2nd Big Four 21/07/1949
1670 GWR Big Four 436 GWR 2nd Big Four 28/10/1949
1668 GWR Big Four 435 GWR 2nd Big Four 28/04/1950