Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 656 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 8397 Week
» 28839 Month
» 365685 Year
» 1587250 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BMJR/GWR Dunbar "B_M" Class 0-6-2T


BMR GWR GWR (2nd) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Mileage Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
49 1668 435 02/1921 19/02/1954 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 33 492,873 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1955 33.90
50 1670 436 02/1921 15/02/1954 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 33 458,149 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 27/03/1954 33.13
45 1372 431 08/1915 05/10/1953 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 38.17
46 1373 432 09/1915 26/05/1953 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 37.67
47 1374 433 09/1915 08/02/1951 Cardiff Cathays 35.42
48 1375 434 02/1921 22/09/1953 Cardiff Cathays 32.58