Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 672 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 8413 Week
» 28855 Month
» 365701 Year
» 1587266 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BMJR/GWR Dunbar "B_M" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
31/12/1949 Reallocation 433     RYR Radyr  
08/02/1951 Condemned 433 98W     COND  
30/04/1951 Reallocation 434     88A Cardiff Cathays  
26/05/1953 Condemned 432 98W     COND  
22/09/1953 Condemned 434 98W     COND  
05/10/1953 Condemned 431 98W     COND  
15/02/1954 Condemned 436 98W     COND  
19/02/1954 Condemned 435 98W     COND