Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 615 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 8356 Week
» 28798 Month
» 365644 Year
» 1587209 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BMJR/GWR Dunbar "B_M" Class 0-6-2T


Class BMR GWR GWR (2nd) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
B 49 1668 435 02/1921 W Withdrawn 02/1954 19/02/1954
B 50 1670 436 02/1921 W Withdrawn 02/1954 15/02/1954
B 45 1372 431 08/1915 W Withdrawn 10/1953 05/10/1953
B 46 1373 432 09/1915 W Withdrawn 05/1953 26/05/1953
B 47 1374 433 09/1915 RYR
W
Radyr
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
02/1951
08/02/1951
B 48 1375 434 02/1921 88A
W
Cardiff Cathays
Withdrawn
30/04/1951
09/1953
22/09/1953