Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 365 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4225 Week
» 6807 Month
» 271440 Year
» 1493005 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BMJR/GWR Dunbar "Unclassified" Class 0-6-2T


Old Number Company Old Num Type New Number Company Subtype New Num Type Date
36 BMR Pre Grouping 11 GWR 1st Big Four y/e 1924
37 BMR Pre Grouping 21 GWR 1st Big Four y/e 1924
38 BMR Pre Grouping 332 GWR 1st Big Four y/e 1924
39 BMR Pre Grouping 504 GWR 1st Big Four y/e 1924
40 BMR Pre Grouping 698 GWR 1st Big Four y/e 1924
41 BMR Pre Grouping 888 GWR 1st Big Four y/e 1924
42 BMR Pre Grouping 1084 GWR 1st Big Four y/e 1924
43 BMR Pre Grouping 1113 GWR 1st Big Four y/e 1924
888 GWR Big Four 426 GWR 2nd Big Four m/e 30/04/1947
698 GWR Big Four 425 GWR 2nd Big Four m/e 31/07/1947
21 GWR Big Four 422 GWR 2nd Big Four m/e 30/09/1947
1113 GWR Big Four 428 GWR 2nd Big Four m/e 31/10/1947