Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 913 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2252 Week
» 31750 Month
» 368596 Year
» 1590161 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BMJR/GWR Dunbar "B_M" Class 0-6-2T


BMR GWR (1st) GWR (2nd) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
36 11 421 12/1909 17/01/1949 39.08
37 21 422 12/1909 12/06/1950 Severn Tunnel Junction 40.5
38 332 423 12/1909 09/12/1949 Severn Tunnel Junction 40
39 504 424 01/1910 10/01/1948 38
40 698 425 03/1914 20/02/1951 Cardiff Canton 36.92
41 888 426 03/1914 21/03/1950 Llantrisant 36
42 1084 04/1914 14/11/1947 33.58
43 1113 428 04/1914 11/08/1950 Duffryn Yard 36.33