BMJR/GWR Dunbar "Unclass" Class 0-6-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 11 | PILL | Newport Pill | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 21 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 332 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 504 | PILL | Newport Pill | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 698 | PILL | Newport Pill | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 426 | PILL | Newport Pill | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1084 | PILL | Newport Pill | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1113 | PILL | Newport Pill | |||
14/11/1947 | Condemned | 1084 | 98W | COND | |||
10/01/1948 | Condemned | 424 | 98W | COND | |||
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 426 | PILL | Newport Pill | LTS | Llantrisant | |
31/05/1948 | Reallocation | 426 | LTS | Llantrisant | PILL | Newport Pill | |
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 426 | PILL | Newport Pill | LTS | Llantrisant | |
04/09/1948 | Reallocation | 426 | LTS | Llantrisant | PILL | Newport Pill | |
30/10/1948 | Reallocation | 426 | PILL | Newport Pill | LTS | Llantrisant | |
17/01/1949 | Condemned | 421 | 98W | COND | |||
09/12/1949 | Condemned | 423 | 98W | COND | |||
28/01/1950 | Reallocation | 425 | PILL | Newport Pill | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |
21/03/1950 | Condemned | 426 | 98W | COND | |||
12/06/1950 | Condemned | 422 | 98W | COND | |||
11/08/1950 | Condemned | 428 | 98W | COND | |||
20/02/1951 | Condemned | 425 | 98W | COND |