GWR Collett "5600" Class 0-6-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5604 | LDR | Landore | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5612 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5613 | SED | Swansea East Dock | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5628 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5631 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5654 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5678 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6674 | LLY.3 | Llandovery | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6689 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 5659 | BRY | Barry | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 5672 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 5678 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6623 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6635 | RYR | Radyr | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6654 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 5644 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 5659 | BRY | Barry | THT | Treherbert | |
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 5671 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | |||
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 5672 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 5675 | LLY.3 | Llandovery | |||
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 5684 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 6635 | RYR | Radyr | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 6654 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 6696 | LMTN | Leamington | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 5607 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 5615 | FDL | Ferndale | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 5644 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | AYN | Abercynon | |
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 5671 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 5684 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | AYN | Abercynon | |
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 5697 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 6601 | CHR | Chester West | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 6651 | TDU | Tondu | |||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 5615 | FDL | Ferndale | THT | Treherbert | |
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 5671 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | |
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 6625 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 6651 | TDU | Tondu | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |
03/11/1945 | Reallocation | 5655 | 18 | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |||
29/12/1945 | Reallocation | 6674 | LLY.3 | Llandovery | PFN | Pantyffynnon | |
29/12/1945 | Reallocation | 6674 | LLY.3 | Llandovery | PFN | Pantyffynnon | |
23/03/1946 | Reallocation | 6631 | LLY | Llanelli | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5600 | FDL | Ferndale | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5601 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5602 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5603 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5604 | LDR | Landore | LDR | Landore | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5605 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5606 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5607 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | THT | Treherbert | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5608 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5609 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5610 | FDL | Ferndale | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5611 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5612 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5613 | SED | Swansea East Dock | THT | Treherbert | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5614 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5615 | THT | Treherbert | THT | Treherbert | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5616 | OXF | Oxford | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5617 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5618 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5619 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5620 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5621 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5622 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5623 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5624 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5625 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5626 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5627 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5628 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5629 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5630 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5631 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | LDR | Landore | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5632 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5633 | TDU | Tondu | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5634 | TYS | Tyseley | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5635 | RHY | Rhymney | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5636 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5637 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5638 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5639 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5640 | 58 | RYR | Radyr | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5641 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5642 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5643 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5644 | AYN | Abercynon | AYN | Abercynon | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5645 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5646 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5647 | CHR | Chester West | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5648 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5649 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5650 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5651 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5652 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5653 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5654 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5655 | 18 | Birkenhead Mollington Street | RYR | Radyr | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5656 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5657 | OXY | Oxley | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5658 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5659 | THT | Treherbert | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5660 | RHY | Rhymney | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5661 | 58 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5662 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5663 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5664 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5665 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5666 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5667 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5668 | FDL | Ferndale | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5669 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5670 | OXY | Oxley | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5671 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5672 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5673 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5674 | CVCH | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5675 | LLY.3 | Llandovery | LLY | Llanelli | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5676 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5677 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5678 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5679 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5680 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5681 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5682 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5683 | RHY | Rhymney | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5684 | AYN | Abercynon | OXY | Oxley | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5685 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5686 | AYN | Abercynon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5687 | 58 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5688 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5689 | WES | Westbury | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5690 | CHR | Chester West | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5691 | THT | Treherbert | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5692 | RHY | Rhymney | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5693 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5694 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5695 | CVTRT | THT | Treherbert | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5696 | RHY | Rhymney | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5697 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5698 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 5699 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6600 | OXY | Oxley | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6601 | CHR | Chester West | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6602 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6603 | CVCH | RYR | Radyr | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6604 | LDR | Landore | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6605 | ABDR | Aberdare | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6606 | LDR | Landore | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6607 | RYR | Radyr | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6608 | RYR | Radyr | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6609 | OXY | Oxley | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6610 | OXY | Oxley | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6611 | TYS | Tyseley | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6612 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6613 | NEATH | Neath (Court Sart) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6614 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6615 | 58 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6616 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6617 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6618 | RYR | Radyr | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6619 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6620 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6621 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6622 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6623 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6624 | CHR | Chester West | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6625 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | LMTN | Leamington | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6626 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6627 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6628 | ABDR | Aberdare | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6629 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6630 | LMTN | Leamington | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6631 | LLY | Llanelli | HFD | Hereford | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6632 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6633 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6634 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6635 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6636 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6637 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6638 | LDR | Landore | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6639 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6640 | OXY | Oxley | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6641 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6642 | TDU | Tondu | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6643 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6644 | LDR | Landore | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6645 | OXY | Oxley | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6646 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6647 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6648 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6649 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6650 | NEATH | Neath (Court Sart) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6651 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6652 | ABDR | Aberdare | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6653 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6654 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6655 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6656 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6657 | LMTN | Leamington | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6658 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6659 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6660 | 58 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6661 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6662 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6663 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6664 | RYR | Radyr | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6665 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6666 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6667 | LDR | Landore | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6668 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6669 | BRY | Barry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6670 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6671 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6672 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6673 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6674 | PFN | Pantyffynnon | LLY | Llanelli | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6674 | PFN | Pantyffynnon | LLY | Llanelli | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6675 | TDU | Tondu | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6676 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6677 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6678 | LDR | Landore | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6679 | LDR | Landore | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6680 | NEATH | Neath (Court Sart) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6681 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6682 | OXF | Oxford | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6683 | LDR | Landore | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6684 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6685 | TDU | Tondu | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6686 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6687 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6688 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6689 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6690 | WES | Westbury | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6691 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6692 | ABDR | Aberdare | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6693 | ABDR | Aberdare | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6694 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6695 | SED | Swansea East Dock | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6696 | LMTN | Leamington | BAN | Banbury | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6697 | LMTN | Leamington | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6698 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 6699 | WES | Westbury | |||
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6644 | LDR | Landore | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 6623 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 6650 | NEATH | Neath (Court Sart) | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |
31/03/1948 | Reallocation | 5664 | BRY | Barry | FDL | Ferndale | |
31/03/1948 | Reallocation | 6608 | RYR | Radyr | RHY | Rhymney | |
30/04/1948 | Reallocation | 5697 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |
30/04/1948 | Reallocation | 5698 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/04/1948 | Reallocation | 6688 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | LLY | Llanelli | |
31/05/1948 | Reallocation | 5656 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | LDR | Landore | |
31/05/1948 | Reallocation | 5675 | LLY | Llanelli | LLY | Llanelli | |
31/05/1948 | Reallocation | 6622 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ABDR | Aberdare | |
31/05/1948 | Reallocation | 6688 | LLY | Llanelli | LDR | Landore | |
30/06/1948 | Reallocation | 5622 | BRY | Barry | THT | Treherbert | |
30/06/1948 | Reallocation | 5659 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/06/1948 | Reallocation | 5664 | FDL | Ferndale | BRY | Barry | |
30/06/1948 | Reallocation | 5667 | BRY | Barry | FDL | Ferndale | |
30/06/1948 | Reallocation | 6608 | RHY | Rhymney | RYR | Radyr | |
30/06/1948 | Reallocation | 6626 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | RHY | Rhymney | |
30/06/1948 | Reallocation | 6627 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | |
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 5659 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 6626 | RHY | Rhymney | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 6631 | HFD | Hereford | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |
07/08/1948 | Reallocation | 5628 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |
07/08/1948 | Reallocation | 5665 | BRY | Barry | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | |
07/08/1948 | Reallocation | 6659 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | |
07/08/1948 | Reallocation | 6660 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | THT | Treherbert | |
07/08/1948 | Reallocation | 6681 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | HFD | Hereford | |
04/09/1948 | Reallocation | 6627 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
04/09/1948 | Reallocation | 6660 | THT | Treherbert | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
04/09/1948 | Reallocation | 6663 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | PPRD | Pontypool Road | |
14/10/1948 | Reallocation | 5622 | THT | Treherbert | BRY | Barry | |
14/10/1948 | Reallocation | 5662 | BRY | Barry | RHY | Rhymney | |
14/10/1948 | Reallocation | 5665 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | BRY | Barry | |
14/10/1948 | Reallocation | 6659 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
14/10/1948 | Reallocation | 6688 | LDR | Landore | LLY | Llanelli | |
30/10/1948 | Reallocation | 5667 | FDL | Ferndale | BRY | Barry | |
30/10/1948 | Reallocation | 6688 | LLY | Llanelli | LDR | Landore | |
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 5638 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | PILL | Newport Pill | |
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 5649 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ABDR | Aberdare | |
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 6644 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | DG | Danygraig | |
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 6651 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ABDR | Aberdare | |
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 6688 | LDR | Landore | LLY | Llanelli | |
29/01/1949 | Reallocation | 5675 | LLY | Llanelli | LDR | Landore | |
29/01/1949 | Reallocation | 6644 | DG | Danygraig | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |
26/03/1949 | Reallocation | 5603 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | PILL | Newport Pill | |
26/03/1949 | Reallocation | 5608 | THT | Treherbert | FDL | Ferndale | |
23/04/1949 | Reallocation | 5608 | FDL | Ferndale | THT | Treherbert | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 5601 | THT | Treherbert | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 5605 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 5624 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | OXY | Oxley | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 5636 | THT | Treherbert | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 5651 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 5658 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 5669 | AYN | Abercynon | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 5670 | OXY | Oxley | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 5675 | LDR | Landore | LLY | Llanelli | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 6612 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 6615 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | BRY | Barry | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 6647 | BRY | Barry | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 6648 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | THT | Treherbert | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 6662 | BRY | Barry | OXF | Oxford | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 6665 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 6682 | OXF | Oxford | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 6684 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
18/06/1949 | Reallocation | 5603 | PILL | Newport Pill | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
18/06/1949 | Reallocation | 5608 | THT | Treherbert | FDL | Ferndale | |
30/06/1949 | Reallocation | 5603 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
30/06/1949 | Reallocation | 5608 | FDL | Ferndale | FDL | Ferndale | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 5646 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 5697 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 6655 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | THT | Treherbert | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 6661 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | AYN | Abercynon | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 5608 | FDL | Ferndale | THT | Treherbert | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 5628 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | LLY | Llanelli | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 6691 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |
10/09/1949 | Reallocation | 5603 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | SED | Swansea East Dock | |
10/09/1949 | Reallocation | 5616 | OXF | Oxford | SED | Swansea East Dock | |
10/09/1949 | Reallocation | 5675 | LLY | Llanelli | LLY | Llanelli | |
10/09/1949 | Reallocation | 5691 | THT | Treherbert | FDL | Ferndale | |
10/09/1949 | Reallocation | 6622 | ABDR | Aberdare | SED | Swansea East Dock | |
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 5603 | SED | Swansea East Dock | NEATH | Neath (Court Sart) | |
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 5628 | LLY | Llanelli | SED | Swansea East Dock | |
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 5691 | FDL | Ferndale | THT | Treherbert | |
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 6622 | SED | Swansea East Dock | OXF | Oxford | |
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 6638 | LDR | Landore | LMTN | Leamington | |
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 6662 | OXF | Oxford | SED | Swansea East Dock | |
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 5608 | THT | Treherbert | FDL | Ferndale | |
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 5614 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | BRY | Barry | |
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 6622 | OXF | Oxford | ABDR | Aberdare | |
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 6688 | LLY | Llanelli | LLY | Llanelli | |
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 6613 | NEATH | Neath (Court Sart) | SED | Swansea East Dock | |
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 6638 | LMTN | Leamington | OXY | Oxley | |
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 6688 | LLY | Llanelli | LLY | Llanelli | |
31/12/1949 | Reallocation | 5603 | NEATH | Neath (Court Sart) | CED | Cardiff East Dock | |
31/12/1949 | Reallocation | 5605 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | RHY | Rhymney | |
31/12/1949 | Reallocation | 6634 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | RYR | Radyr | |
31/12/1949 | Reallocation | 6679 | LDR | Landore | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
28/01/1950 | Reallocation | 5650 | THT | Treherbert | AYN | Abercynon | |
25/02/1950 | Reallocation | 6649 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86F | Tondu | |
25/03/1950 | Reallocation | 5675 | LLY | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
25/03/1950 | Reallocation | 6688 | LLY | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
20/05/1950 | Reallocation | 5603 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
20/05/1950 | Reallocation | 5608 | FDL | Ferndale | 88F | Treherbert | |
20/05/1950 | Reallocation | 6621 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 86F | Tondu | |
20/05/1950 | Reallocation | 6685 | TDU | Tondu | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 5617 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 5659 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 5660 | RHY | Rhymney | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 6688 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 5608 | 88F | Treherbert | 88F | Treherbert | |
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 5659 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 5660 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 5665 | BRY | Barry | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 5693 | BRY | Barry | 88F | Treherbert | |
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 6688 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
12/08/1950 | Reallocation | 5603 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
12/08/1950 | Reallocation | 5655 | RYR | Radyr | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
12/08/1950 | Reallocation | 5665 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88C | Barry | |
12/08/1950 | Reallocation | 5678 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
31/08/1950 | Reallocation | 5603 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/08/1950 | Reallocation | 5655 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/08/1950 | Reallocation | 5665 | 88C | Barry | 88C | Barry | |
31/08/1950 | Reallocation | 5678 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 5620 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 5623 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 5635 | RHY | Rhymney | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 6642 | TDU | Tondu | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 6679 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86F | Tondu | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 5620 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 5623 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 5635 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 6642 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 6679 | 86F | Tondu | 86F | Tondu | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5603 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5619 | AYN | Abercynon | 88C | Barry | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5623 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88E | Abercynon | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5630 | AYN | Abercynon | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5635 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5653 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5654 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5659 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5661 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5672 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5683 | RHY | Rhymney | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5692 | RHY | Rhymney | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5699 | BRY | Barry | 88E | Abercynon | |
17/10/1950 | Reallocation | 6627 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5603 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5619 | 88C | Barry | 88C | Barry | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5623 | 88E | Abercynon | 88E | Abercynon | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5630 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5635 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5653 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5654 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5659 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5661 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5672 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5683 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 5692 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
31/10/1950 | Reallocation | 6627 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 5603 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 5606 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 5659 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 5661 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 5603 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 5606 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 5659 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 5661 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
02/12/1950 | Reallocation | 5603 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 5603 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 5659 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 5660 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 6609 | OXY | Oxley | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 6688 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 5659 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 5660 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 6609 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 6664 | RYR | Radyr | 88C | Barry | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 6688 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 5660 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 6603 | RYR | Radyr | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 6607 | RYR | Radyr | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 6653 | BRY | Barry | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 6664 | 88C | Barry | 88C | Barry | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 6603 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 6607 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 6653 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 5638 | PILL | Newport Pill | 86J | Aberdare | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 5666 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 5675 | 87F | Llanelli | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 6600 | OXY | Oxley | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 6604 | LDR | Landore | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 6634 | RYR | Radyr | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 6653 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
30/04/1951 | Reallocation | 6688 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 5633 | TDU | Tondu | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 5638 | 86J | Aberdare | 86J | Aberdare | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 5675 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87F | Llanelli | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 6600 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 6602 | BRY | Barry | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 6624 | CHR | Chester West | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 6634 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 6653 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 6664 | 88C | Barry | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 6683 | LDR | Landore | 84K | Chester West | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 6688 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 5666 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 6611 | TYS | Tyseley | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 6617 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 6688 | 87F | Llanelli | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 5666 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 6611 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 6617 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 6688 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
14/07/1951 | Reallocation | 5672 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
14/07/1951 | Reallocation | 6602 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 88C | Barry | |
14/07/1951 | Reallocation | 6603 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
14/07/1951 | Reallocation | 6626 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
14/07/1951 | Reallocation | 6688 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87F | Llanelli | |
31/07/1951 | Reallocation | 5672 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/07/1951 | Reallocation | 6602 | 88C | Barry | 88C | Barry | |
31/07/1951 | Reallocation | 6603 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
31/07/1951 | Reallocation | 6626 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
31/07/1951 | Reallocation | 6688 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 5646 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 5668 | FDL | Ferndale | 88F | Treherbert | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 6607 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 6644 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 5646 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 5668 | 88F | Treherbert | 88F | Treherbert | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 6607 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
31/08/1951 | Reallocation | 6644 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 5612 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 6654 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86J | Aberdare | |
30/09/1951 | Reallocation | 5612 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
30/09/1951 | Reallocation | 6654 | 86J | Aberdare | 86J | Aberdare | |
31/10/1951 | Reallocation | 5602 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
31/10/1951 | Reallocation | 6688 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 5640 | RYR | Radyr | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 5659 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 5666 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 6621 | 86F | Tondu | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 6663 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 6675 | TDU | Tondu | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 6688 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
01/12/1951 | Reallocation | 5639 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 87F | Llanelli | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 5617 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 5646 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87H | Neyland | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 5661 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 6632 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
31/12/1951 | Reallocation | 5639 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 5680 | THT | Treherbert | 88E | Abercynon | |
31/01/1952 | Reallocation | 5617 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
31/01/1952 | Reallocation | 5646 | 87H | Neyland | 87H | Neyland | |
31/01/1952 | Reallocation | 5661 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
31/01/1952 | Reallocation | 6632 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
23/02/1952 | Reallocation | 6693 | ABDR | Aberdare | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
29/02/1952 | Reallocation | 5680 | 88E | Abercynon | 88E | Abercynon | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 5634 | TYS | Tyseley | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 6625 | LMTN | Leamington | 84C | Banbury | |
31/03/1952 | Reallocation | 5666 | MD | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
31/03/1952 | Reallocation | 5672 | MD | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
31/03/1952 | Reallocation | 6693 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 5666 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 6602 | 88C | Barry | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 6685 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86J | Aberdare | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 6692 | ABDR | Aberdare | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
30/04/1952 | Reallocation | 5634 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
30/04/1952 | Reallocation | 6625 | 84C | Banbury | 84C | Banbury | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 5602 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 5617 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 5638 | 86J | Aberdare | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 5639 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 5655 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 5666 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 5672 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 6602 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 6685 | 86J | Aberdare | 86J | Aberdare | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 6692 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5617 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5655 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5657 | OXY | Oxley | 87H | Neyland | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5666 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 6654 | 86J | Aberdare | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 6685 | 86J | Aberdare | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 6692 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86J | Aberdare | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5617 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5655 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5657 | 87H | Neyland | 87H | Neyland | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 5666 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 6654 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 6685 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 6692 | 86J | Aberdare | 86J | Aberdare | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 5666 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 5673 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 87H | Neyland | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 5675 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 6688 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 6624 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84D | Leamington | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 5650 | AYN | Abercynon | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 5672 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 5673 | 87H | Neyland | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 5675 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5624 | OXY | Oxley | 86F | Tondu | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5639 | 87F | Llanelli | 87F | Llanelli | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5642 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5657 | 87H | Neyland | 84B | Oxley | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5673 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87E | Landore | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6625 | 84C | Banbury | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6630 | LMTN | Leamington | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6638 | OXY | Oxley | 86F | Tondu | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6654 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6690 | WES | Westbury | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6696 | BAN | Banbury | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5639 | 87F | Llanelli | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 5657 | 84B | Oxley | 87F | Llanelli | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 6644 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 6625 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 82D | Westbury | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 6683 | 84K | Chester West | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 6688 | 87F | Llanelli | 87E | Landore | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 6698 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 5675 | 87F | Llanelli | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 6638 | 86F | Tondu | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 5675 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87F | Llanelli | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 6642 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 6672 | NPTG | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 6620 | BRY | Barry | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 6630 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 87F | Llanelli | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 6620 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 88C | Barry | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 5639 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 87H | Neyland | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 6674 | LLY | Llanelli | 87H | Neyland | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 6683 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 6687 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 86J | Aberdare | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 6698 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 5639 | 87H | Neyland | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 6674 | 87H | Neyland | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
08/08/1953 | Reallocation | 5645 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
08/08/1953 | Reallocation | 5657 | 87F | Llanelli | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |
08/08/1953 | Reallocation | 5671 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | 88F | Treherbert | |
05/09/1953 | Reallocation | 5671 | 88F | Treherbert | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
05/09/1953 | Reallocation | 5675 | 87F | Llanelli | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
05/09/1953 | Reallocation | 6672 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5639 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 81E | Didcot | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5644 | AYN | Abercynon | 86J | Aberdare | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5660 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88E | Abercynon | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5697 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 81E | Didcot | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5698 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | 86J | Aberdare | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6614 | BRY | Barry | 84E | Tyseley | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6620 | 88C | Barry | 84E | Tyseley | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6627 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6649 | 86F | Tondu | 86J | Aberdare | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6655 | THT | Treherbert | 81C | Southall | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6661 | AYN | Abercynon | 86J | Aberdare | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6664 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 81C | Southall | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6668 | BRY | Barry | 84E | Tyseley | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6669 | BRY | Barry | 84E | Tyseley | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5612 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87F | Llanelli | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5657 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 87F | Llanelli | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 5663 | THT | Treherbert | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6646 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 84E | Tyseley | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 6654 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 81E | Didcot | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 5626 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 81E | Didcot | |
25/11/1953 | Reallocation | 6646 | 84E | Tyseley | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
26/12/1953 | Reallocation | 5626 | 81E | Didcot | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
26/12/1953 | Reallocation | 5629 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 81E | Didcot | |
26/12/1953 | Reallocation | 6681 | HFD | Hereford | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
26/12/1953 | Reallocation | 6692 | 86J | Aberdare | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 5617 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88E | Abercynon | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 5620 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 5642 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 5660 | 88E | Abercynon | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 5680 | 88E | Abercynon | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 6638 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 85C | Hereford | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 6654 | 81E | Didcot | 81C | Southall | |
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 5634 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84A | Stafford Road | |
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 5677 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 5680 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88E | Abercynon | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 5602 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 5625 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 6621 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 6664 | 81C | Southall | 81B | Slough | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 6676 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86F | Tondu | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 5690 | CHR | Chester West | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 5600 | FDL | Ferndale | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 5608 | 88F | Treherbert | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 5610 | FDL | Ferndale | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 5615 | THT | Treherbert | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 5681 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 6638 | 85C | Hereford | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 6606 | LDR | Landore | 85C | Hereford | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 6633 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 84D | Leamington | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 6663 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 6679 | 86F | Tondu | 85D | Kidderminster | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 6699 | WES | Westbury | 82C | Swindon | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 5685 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
18/06/1955 | Reallocation | 5624 | 86F | Tondu | 86J | Aberdare | |
18/06/1955 | Reallocation | 5626 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
18/06/1955 | Reallocation | 5634 | 84A | Stafford Road | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 5600 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88F | Treherbert | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 5608 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88F | Treherbert | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 5610 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88F | Treherbert | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 5642 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 5659 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 6630 | 87F | Llanelli | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 6633 | 84D | Leamington | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 6606 | 85C | Hereford | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 6639 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 6644 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 87H | Neyland | |
10/09/1955 | Reallocation | 5637 | AYN | Abercynon | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
10/09/1955 | Reallocation | 6621 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
10/09/1955 | Reallocation | 6644 | 87H | Neyland | 84E | Tyseley | |
10/09/1955 | Reallocation | 6663 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
10/09/1955 | Reallocation | 6689 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 5620 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 5646 | 87H | Neyland | 88F | Treherbert | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 5665 | 88C | Barry | 88F | Treherbert | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 6602 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 6633 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 88F | Treherbert | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 5642 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 5650 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 5675 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 81E | Didcot | |
03/12/1955 | Reallocation | 6639 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 82C | Swindon | |
03/12/1955 | Reallocation | 6642 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
31/12/1955 | Reallocation | 5657 | 87F | Llanelli | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
28/01/1956 | Reallocation | 5627 | BRY | Barry | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
28/01/1956 | Reallocation | 5632 | BRY | Barry | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1956 | Reallocation | 6620 | 84E | Tyseley | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 5632 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88F | Treherbert | |
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 6644 | 84E | Tyseley | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 5636 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88F | Treherbert | |
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 5636 | 88F | Treherbert | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 6690 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85D | Kidderminster | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 5694 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | 88F | Treherbert | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6614 | 84E | Tyseley | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6620 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 87H | Neyland | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6669 | 84E | Tyseley | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6672 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86F | Tondu | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6673 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86F | Tondu | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 6690 | 85D | Kidderminster | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
14/07/1956 | Reallocation | 6672 | 86F | Tondu | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 6620 | 87H | Neyland | 84E | Tyseley | |
08/09/1956 | Reallocation | 6619 | BRY | Barry | 88F | Treherbert | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 6619 | 88F | Treherbert | 88C | Barry | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 6620 | 84E | Tyseley | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 5677 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 5678 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88F | Treherbert | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 6606 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 6648 | THT | Treherbert | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
29/12/1956 | Reallocation | 5647 | CHR | Chester West | 81E | Didcot | |
26/01/1957 | Reallocation | 5622 | BRY | Barry | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
26/01/1957 | Reallocation | 5626 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
26/01/1957 | Reallocation | 6650 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 5687 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 6621 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 6631 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 84E | Tyseley | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 6681 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 5629 | 81E | Didcot | 87H | Neyland | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 5633 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86J | Aberdare | |
07/09/1957 | Reallocation | 5629 | 87H | Neyland | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 5651 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 84E | Tyseley | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 5601 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88E | Abercynon | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 5629 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86F | Tondu | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 5657 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 6624 | 84D | Leamington | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 5627 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88E | Abercynon | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 5648 | BRY | Barry | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 5654 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88F | Treherbert | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 5657 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 5622 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88C | Barry | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 5630 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88E | Abercynon | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 5645 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 5648 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88A | Radyr | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 5653 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88F | Treherbert | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 5663 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88F | Treherbert | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 5684 | OXY | Oxley | 88A | Radyr | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 5687 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 88A | Radyr | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 6635 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 84C | Banbury | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 5685 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 6635 | 84C | Banbury | 88A | Radyr | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 6644 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 6653 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 5630 | 88E | Abercynon | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 5670 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 5675 | 81E | Didcot | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 6699 | 82C | Swindon | 88A | Radyr | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5604 | LDR | Landore | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5684 | 88A | Radyr | 88F | Treherbert | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5687 | 88A | Radyr | 88F | Treherbert | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5692 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88F | Treherbert | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 6669 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 5644 | 86J | Aberdare | 88E | Abercynon | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 6654 | 81C | Southall | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 6655 | 81C | Southall | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 6669 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 85D | Kidderminster | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 6613 | SED | Swansea East Dock | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 6664 | 81B | Slough | 81F | Oxford | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 5606 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84E | Tyseley | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 5615 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88A | Radyr | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 5658 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 84E | Tyseley | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 5669 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88F | Treherbert | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 6629 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 86H | Aberbeeg | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 6649 | 86J | Aberdare | 87E | Landore | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 5651 | 84E | Tyseley | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 5669 | 88F | Treherbert | 88A | Radyr | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 6604 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 85A | Worcester | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 6681 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 85A | Worcester | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 5615 | 88A | Radyr | 88C | Barry | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 5651 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 5692 | 88F | Treherbert | 88A | Radyr | |
24/01/1959 | Reallocation | 5606 | 84E | Tyseley | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | |
24/01/1959 | Reallocation | 5636 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
24/01/1959 | Reallocation | 5640 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88A | Radyr | |
24/01/1959 | Reallocation | 5663 | 88F | Treherbert | 88A | Radyr | |
24/01/1959 | Reallocation | 5675 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 88A | Radyr | |
21/02/1959 | Reallocation | 5679 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
21/02/1959 | Reallocation | 6610 | OXY | Oxley | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | |
21/02/1959 | Reallocation | 6698 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 6604 | 85A | Worcester | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
21/03/1959 | Reallocation | 6681 | 85A | Worcester | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 5615 | 88C | Barry | 88A | Radyr | |
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 5622 | 88C | Barry | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
13/06/1959 | Reallocation | 5616 | SED | Swansea East Dock | 87C | Danygraig | |
13/06/1959 | Reallocation | 5628 | SED | Swansea East Dock | 87C | Danygraig | |
11/07/1959 | Reallocation | 6656 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
11/07/1959 | Reallocation | 6674 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
11/07/1959 | Reallocation | 6676 | 86F | Tondu | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
08/08/1959 | Reallocation | 5642 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 86J | Aberdare | |
08/08/1959 | Reallocation | 5656 | LDR | Landore | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
05/09/1959 | Reallocation | 5697 | 81E | Didcot | 81F | Oxford | |
05/09/1959 | Reallocation | 6615 | BRY | Barry | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 5618 | AYN | Abercynon | 88A | Radyr | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 5663 | 88A | Radyr | 88A | Radyr | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 5675 | 88A | Radyr | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 6600 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 86D | Llantrisant | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 6613 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 6627 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 87H | Neyland | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 6641 | BRY | Barry | 87E | Landore | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 6653 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 87F | Llanelli | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 6655 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 81B | Slough | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 5616 | 87C | Danygraig | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 5628 | 87C | Danygraig | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 5679 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
26/12/1959 | Reallocation | 5656 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 87F | Llanelli | |
26/12/1959 | Reallocation | 5670 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
26/12/1959 | Reallocation | 6641 | 87E | Landore | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 5606 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 5610 | 88F | Treherbert | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 5651 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 5660 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 5671 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 5674 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/01/1960 | Reallocation | 6610 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 5637 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88C | Barry | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 6641 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 87F | Llanelli | |
26/03/1960 | Reallocation | 5636 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88C | Barry | |
26/03/1960 | Reallocation | 5681 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
26/03/1960 | Reallocation | 5697 | 81F | Oxford | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
26/03/1960 | Reallocation | 6616 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 87G | Carmarthen | |
26/03/1960 | Reallocation | 6655 | 81B | Slough | 88C | Barry | |
26/03/1960 | Reallocation | 6657 | LMTN | Leamington | 88C | Barry | |
23/04/1960 | Reallocation | 6641 | 87F | Llanelli | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
23/04/1960 | Reallocation | 6657 | 88C | Barry | 88A | Radyr | |
23/04/1960 | Reallocation | 6664 | 81F | Oxford | 81E | Didcot | |
23/04/1960 | Reallocation | 6697 | LMTN | Leamington | 88C | Barry | |
21/05/1960 | Reallocation | 5634 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 88C | Barry | |
21/05/1960 | Reallocation | 5690 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 86F | Tondu | |
21/05/1960 | Reallocation | 5697 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 81E | Didcot | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 6602 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 87E | Landore | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 6623 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 87H | Neyland | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 6650 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 87E | Landore | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 6654 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 6698 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
16/07/1960 | Reallocation | 5639 | 81E | Didcot | 88C | Barry | |
16/07/1960 | Reallocation | 5697 | 81E | Didcot | 88A | Radyr | |
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 5602 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 87F | Llanelli | |
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 5618 | 88A | Radyr | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 5647 | 81E | Didcot | 88E | Abercynon | |
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 6610 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 87H | Neyland | |
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 6623 | 87H | Neyland | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 5640 | 88A | Radyr | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 5692 | 88A | Radyr | 87F | Llanelli | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 6618 | RYR | Radyr | 85A | Worcester | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 6696 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 85A | Worcester | |
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 5606 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 84B | Oxley | |
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 5609 | BRY | Barry | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 5623 | 88E | Abercynon | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 6623 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 87H | Neyland | |
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 6639 | 82C | Swindon | 88B | Radyr | |
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 6664 | 81E | Didcot | 88J | Aberdare | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 5685 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 88C | Barry | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 6623 | 87H | Neyland | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
31/12/1960 | Reallocation | 6690 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 86C | Hereford | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5603 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5605 | RHY | Rhymney | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5607 | THT | Treherbert | 88F | Treherbert | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5610 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5611 | THT | Treherbert | 88F | Treherbert | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5613 | THT | Treherbert | 88F | Treherbert | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5618 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5622 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5630 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88E | Abercynon | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5632 | 88F | Treherbert | 88F | Treherbert | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5635 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88B | Radyr | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5636 | 88C | Barry | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5650 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5652 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5655 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5660 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5662 | RHY | Rhymney | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5666 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5671 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5672 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5674 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5681 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 5696 | RHY | Rhymney | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 6623 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 87H | Neyland | |
25/02/1961 | Reallocation | 6690 | 86C | Hereford | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
25/02/1961 | Reallocation | 6696 | 85A | Worcester | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
25/03/1961 | Reallocation | 6618 | 85A | Worcester | 84E | Tyseley | |
25/03/1961 | Reallocation | 6639 | 88B | Radyr | 88G | Llantrisant | |
22/04/1961 | Reallocation | 6663 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
20/05/1961 | Reallocation | 6629 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
20/05/1961 | Reallocation | 6644 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 5631 | LDR | Landore | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 5643 | AYN | Abercynon | 88C | Barry | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 5668 | 88F | Treherbert | 88C | Barry | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 5673 | 87E | Landore | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 6602 | 87E | Landore | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 6649 | 87E | Landore | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 6650 | 87E | Landore | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 6680 | NEATH | Neath (Court Sart) | 87B | Duffryn Yard | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 6688 | 87E | Landore | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 6695 | SED | Swansea East Dock | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
15/07/1961 | Reallocation | 6602 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 87H | Neyland | |
12/08/1961 | Reallocation | 5685 | 88C | Barry | 88C | Barry | |
12/08/1961 | Reallocation | 6602 | 87H | Neyland | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
12/08/1961 | Reallocation | 6618 | 84E | Tyseley | 84D | Leamington | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 5604 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 87F | Llanelli | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 5615 | 88A | Radyr | 88E | Abercynon | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 5685 | 88C | Barry | 88A | Cardiff Canton | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 6688 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 88B | Radyr | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 5614 | BRY | Barry | 85A | Worcester | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 5634 | 88C | Barry | 87F | Llanelli | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 6604 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84E | Tyseley | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 6609 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84E | Tyseley | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 6670 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 85A | Worcester | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 6671 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 85A | Worcester | |
04/11/1961 | Reallocation | 5674 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88F | Treherbert | |
02/12/1961 | Reallocation | 5634 | 87F | Llanelli | 88C | Barry | |
02/12/1961 | Reallocation | 6637 | BRY | Barry | 88B | Radyr | |
30/12/1961 | Reallocation | 6696 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 88C | Barry | |
27/01/1962 | Reallocation | 6601 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 88H | Tondu | |
24/02/1962 | Reallocation | 6630 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 88A | Cardiff Canton | |
24/02/1962 | Reallocation | 6671 | 85A | Worcester | 84D | Leamington | |
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 6673 | 86F | Tondu | 88J | Aberdare | |
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 6681 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 88A | Cardiff Canton | |
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 5679 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 6644 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84D | Leamington | |
07/05/1962 | Condemned | 5682 | 98W | COND | |||
19/05/1962 | Reallocation | 5645 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 83D | Laira | |
19/05/1962 | Reallocation | 5657 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 88E | Abercynon | |
19/05/1962 | Reallocation | 6656 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 88C | Barry | |
19/05/1962 | Reallocation | 6663 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84D | Leamington | |
19/05/1962 | Reallocation | 6690 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 88J | Aberdare | |
21/05/1962 | Condemned | 5636 | 98W | COND | |||
21/05/1962 | Condemned | 5639 | 98W | COND | |||
21/05/1962 | Condemned | 6687 | 98W | COND | |||
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 5620 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 5653 | 88F | Treherbert | 88C | Barry | |
27/07/1962 | Condemned | 5600 | 98W | COND | |||
27/07/1962 | Condemned | 5657 | 98W | COND | |||
27/07/1962 | Condemned | 5661 | 98W | COND | |||
02/08/1962 | Condemned | 6645 | 98W | COND | |||
03/08/1962 | Condemned | 5663 | 98W | COND | |||
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 5685 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 88E | Abercynon | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 6621 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 88B | Radyr | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 6652 | ABDR | Aberdare | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
24/08/1962 | Condemned | 6600 | 98W | COND | |||
31/08/1962 | Condemned | 5664 | 98W | COND | |||
01/09/1962 | Condemned | 5617 | 98W | COND | |||
01/09/1962 | Condemned | 5646 | 98W | COND | |||
01/09/1962 | Condemned | 6617 | 98W | COND | |||
01/09/1962 | Condemned | 6630 | 98W | COND | |||
01/09/1962 | Condemned | 6640 | 98W | COND | |||
01/09/1962 | Condemned | 6641 | 98W | COND | |||
01/09/1962 | Condemned | 6647 | 98W | COND | |||
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 5614 | 85A | Worcester | 88E | Abercynon | |
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 6604 | 84E | Tyseley | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 6631 | 84E | Tyseley | 84B | Oxley | |
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 6644 | 84D | Leamington | 84B | Oxley | |
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 6656 | 88C | Barry | 88B | Radyr | |
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 6669 | 85D | Kidderminster | 88B | Radyr | |
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 6670 | 85A | Worcester | 88G | Llantrisant | |
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 6681 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | |
13/09/1962 | Condemned | 5631 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1962 | Condemned | 5642 | 98W | COND | |||
21/09/1962 | Condemned | 5698 | 98W | COND | |||
27/09/1962 | Condemned | 5652 | 98W | COND | |||
27/09/1962 | Condemned | 6616 | 98W | COND | |||
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 5634 | 88C | Barry | 87H | Neyland | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 5640 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 84D | Leamington | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 5647 | 88E | Abercynon | 88J | Aberdare | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 5677 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 5680 | 88E | Abercynon | 88J | Aberdare | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 6658 | BRY | Barry | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
15/10/1962 | Condemned | 6629 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | COND | ||
03/11/1962 | Reallocation | 6633 | 88F | Treherbert | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
05/11/1962 | Condemned | 6601 | 88H | Tondu | COND | ||
13/11/1962 | Condemned | 5604 | 87F | Llanelli | COND | ||
17/11/1962 | Reallocation | 5656 | 87F | Llanelli | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
17/11/1962 | Reallocation | 5658 | 84E | Tyseley | 84D | Leamington | |
17/11/1962 | Reallocation | 6625 | 82D | Westbury | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
17/11/1962 | Reallocation | 6652 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 87F | Llanelli | |
17/11/1962 | Reallocation | 6654 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 88F | Treherbert | |
17/11/1962 | Reallocation | 6668 | 84E | Tyseley | 84D | Leamington | |
05/12/1962 | Condemned | 5630 | 88E | Abercynon | COND | ||
05/12/1962 | Condemned | 6669 | 88B | Radyr | COND | ||
15/12/1962 | Reallocation | 5625 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 88B | Radyr | |
15/12/1962 | Reallocation | 5651 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 88B | Radyr | |
15/12/1962 | Reallocation | 5672 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88B | Radyr | |
15/12/1962 | Reallocation | 5677 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
15/12/1962 | Reallocation | 5678 | 88F | Treherbert | 88F | Treherbert | |
15/12/1962 | Reallocation | 5687 | 88F | Treherbert | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
18/12/1962 | Condemned | 5695 | THT | Treherbert | COND | ||
01/01/1963 | Condemned | 5653 | 98W | COND | |||
09/01/1963 | Condemned | 5611 | 88F | Treherbert | COND | ||
12/01/1963 | Reallocation | 5629 | 86F | Tondu | 88E | Abercynon | |
12/01/1963 | Reallocation | 5679 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 88C | Barry | |
14/01/1963 | Condemned | 5693 | 88F | Treherbert | COND | ||
14/01/1963 | Condemned | 6642 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | COND | ||
14/01/1963 | Condemned | 6677 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | COND | ||
14/01/1963 | Condemned | 6693 | 86G | Pontypool Road | COND | ||
01/02/1963 | Condemned | 6610 | 87H | Neyland | COND | ||
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 5669 | 88A | Radyr | 88F | Treherbert | |
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 5679 | 88C | Barry | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 5689 | WES | Westbury | 88C | Barry | |
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 6651 | ABDR | Aberdare | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 6688 | 88B | Radyr | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
11/02/1963 | Condemned | 5628 | 98W | COND | |||
07/03/1963 | Condemned | 6673 | 98W | COND | |||
07/03/1963 | Condemned | 6698 | 84J | Croes Newydd | COND | ||
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 5691 | THT | Treherbert | 88E | Abercynon | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 6613 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 6650 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 88C | Barry | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 6680 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
14/03/1963 | Condemned | 6619 | 98W | COND | |||
15/03/1963 | Condemned | 5649 | 98W | COND | |||
15/03/1963 | Condemned | 6607 | 98W | COND | |||
30/03/1963 | Reallocation | 5679 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
05/04/1963 | Condemned | 6662 | 98W | COND | |||
05/04/1963 | Condemned | 6676 | 98W | COND | |||
06/04/1963 | Reallocation | 5620 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 88J | Aberdare | |
06/04/1963 | Reallocation | 5632 | 88F | Treherbert | 88E | Abercynon | |
06/04/1963 | Reallocation | 6623 | 87H | Neyland | 87F | Llanelli | |
06/04/1963 | Reallocation | 6627 | 87H | Neyland | 88J | Aberdare | |
11/04/1963 | Condemned | 5627 | 98W | COND | |||
25/04/1963 | Condemned | 5612 | 98W | COND | |||
25/04/1963 | Condemned | 5697 | 98W | COND | |||
01/05/1963 | Reallocation | 6638 | 98W | 88B | Radyr | ||
04/05/1963 | Reallocation | 5688 | THT | Treherbert | 88E | Abercynon | |
04/05/1963 | Reallocation | 6613 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 87F | Llanelli | |
04/05/1963 | Reallocation | 6657 | 88A | Radyr | 88H | Tondu | |
13/05/1963 | Condemned | 6615 | 98W | COND | |||
15/05/1963 | Reallocation | 6651 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 89B | Croes Newydd | |
01/06/1963 | Reallocation | 5615 | 88E | Abercynon | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
01/06/1963 | Reallocation | 5651 | 88B | Radyr | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
06/06/1963 | Condemned | 5622 | 98W | COND | |||
06/06/1963 | Condemned | 5640 | 98W | COND | |||
07/06/1963 | Condemned | 5645 | 98W | COND | |||
17/06/1963 | Condemned | 5644 | 98W | COND | |||
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 6646 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84E | Tyseley | |
24/06/1963 | Condemned | 5650 | 98W | COND | |||
24/06/1963 | Condemned | 6623 | 98W | COND | |||
24/06/1963 | Condemned | 6636 | 98W | COND | |||
24/06/1963 | Condemned | 6663 | 98W | COND | |||
24/06/1963 | Condemned | 6675 | 98W | COND | |||
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 5675 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 87F | Llanelli | |
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 6603 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88E | Abercynon | |
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 6612 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 6621 | 88B | Radyr | 88F | Treherbert | |
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 6639 | 88G | Llantrisant | 84D | Leamington | |
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 6685 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
02/07/1963 | Condemned | 5615 | 98W | COND | |||
02/07/1963 | Condemned | 5643 | 98W | COND | |||
16/07/1963 | Condemned | 5620 | 98W | COND | |||
16/07/1963 | Condemned | 5666 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1963 | Reallocation | 6639 | 84D | Leamington | 84D | Leamington | |
27/07/1963 | Reallocation | 5602 | 87F | Llanelli | 87D | Swansea East Dock | |
27/07/1963 | Reallocation | 5692 | 87F | Llanelli | 88H | Tondu | |
27/07/1963 | Reallocation | 6608 | RYR | Radyr | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
27/07/1963 | Reallocation | 6613 | 87F | Llanelli | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
27/07/1963 | Reallocation | 6649 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 88J | Aberdare | |
27/07/1963 | Reallocation | 6655 | 88C | Barry | 88F | Treherbert | |
27/07/1963 | Reallocation | 6656 | 88B | Radyr | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
27/07/1963 | Reallocation | 6670 | 88G | Llantrisant | 88C | Barry | |
27/07/1963 | Reallocation | 6681 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 88F | Treherbert | |
29/07/1963 | Condemned | 5679 | 98W | COND | |||
29/07/1963 | Condemned | 6666 | 98W | COND | |||
29/07/1963 | Condemned | 6674 | 98W | COND | |||
01/08/1963 | Condemned | 5690 | 98W | COND | |||
11/08/1963 | Reallocation | 6656 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
29/08/1963 | Condemned | 5608 | 98W | COND | |||
29/08/1963 | Condemned | 5614 | 98W | COND | |||
08/09/1963 | Reallocation | 5667 | BRY | Barry | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
08/09/1963 | Reallocation | 5684 | 88F | Treherbert | 2B | Oxley | |
10/09/1963 | Condemned | 6631 | 98W | COND | |||
10/09/1963 | Condemned | 6632 | 98W | COND | |||
13/09/1963 | Condemned | 5672 | 98W | COND | |||
13/09/1963 | Condemned | 6609 | 98W | COND | |||
23/09/1963 | Condemned | 5616 | 98W | COND | |||
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 5633 | 86J | Aberdare | 88B | Radyr | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 5673 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 88B | Radyr | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 6628 | ABDR | Aberdare | 88E | Abercynon | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 6655 | 88F | Treherbert | 87F | Llanelli | |
03/10/1963 | Condemned | 6670 | 98W | COND | |||
21/10/1963 | Condemned | 6639 | 98W | COND | |||
21/10/1963 | Condemned | 6659 | 98W | COND | |||
25/10/1963 | Condemned | 5625 | 98W | COND | |||
25/10/1963 | Condemned | 6694 | 98W | COND | |||
01/11/1963 | Condemned | 6627 | 98W | COND | |||
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 5624 | 86J | Aberdare | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 6605 | ABDR | Aberdare | 88B | Radyr | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 6613 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 87F | Llanelli | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 6644 | 84B | Oxley | 2L | Leamington | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 6649 | 88J | Aberdare | 88E | Abercynon | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 6655 | 87F | Llanelli | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 6695 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 88B | Radyr | |
13/11/1963 | Condemned | 6618 | 98W | COND | |||
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 5602 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 5621 | BRY | Barry | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
01/12/1963 | Reallocation | 6633 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 2A | Tyseley | |
02/12/1963 | Condemned | 5626 | 98W | COND | |||
02/12/1963 | Condemned | 5680 | 98W | COND | |||
02/12/1963 | Condemned | 5687 | 98W | COND | |||
02/12/1963 | Condemned | 6620 | 98W | COND | |||
02/12/1963 | Condemned | 6696 | 98W | COND | |||
16/12/1963 | Condemned | 5607 | 98W | COND | |||
16/12/1963 | Condemned | 5610 | 98W | COND | |||
16/12/1963 | Condemned | 5654 | 98W | COND | |||
16/12/1963 | Condemned | 6652 | 98W | COND | |||
16/12/1963 | Condemned | 6653 | 98W | COND | |||
16/12/1963 | Condemned | 6664 | 98W | COND | |||
16/12/1963 | Condemned | 6699 | 98W | COND | |||
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 5609 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 5623 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 88B | Radyr | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 5624 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 88B | Radyr | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 5656 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 87E | Landore | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 5670 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 6602 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 87E | Landore | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 6672 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 88B | Radyr | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 6680 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 88B | Radyr | |
06/01/1964 | Condemned | 5671 | 98W | COND | |||
15/01/1964 | Condemned | 5678 | 98W | COND | |||
22/01/1964 | Condemned | 6605 | 98W | COND | |||
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 6606 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 88B | Radyr | |
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 6686 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 6691 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
01/02/1964 | Reallocation | 6679 | 85D | Kidderminster | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | |
14/02/1964 | Condemned | 5623 | 98W | COND | |||
14/02/1964 | Condemned | 5638 | 98W | COND | |||
14/02/1964 | Condemned | 5656 | 98W | COND | |||
14/02/1964 | Condemned | 5685 | 98W | COND | |||
14/02/1964 | Condemned | 6682 | 98W | COND | |||
22/02/1964 | Reallocation | 6688 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 88F | Treherbert | |
10/03/1964 | Condemned | 5647 | 98W | COND | |||
10/03/1964 | Condemned | 5683 | 98W | COND | |||
20/03/1964 | Condemned | 6603 | 98W | COND | |||
21/03/1964 | Reallocation | 5606 | 84B | Oxley | 2A | Tyseley | |
21/03/1964 | Reallocation | 5684 | 2B | Oxley | 2A | Tyseley | |
08/04/1964 | Condemned | 6680 | 98W | COND | |||
13/04/1964 | Reallocation | 5694 | 88F | Treherbert | 88B | Radyr | |
13/04/1964 | Reallocation | 6685 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88E | Abercynon | |
20/04/1964 | Condemned | 5674 | 98W | COND | |||
20/04/1964 | Condemned | 6688 | 98W | COND | |||
24/04/1964 | Condemned | 6634 | 98W | COND | |||
24/04/1964 | Condemned | 6686 | 98W | COND | |||
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 5659 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 88F | Treherbert | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 5692 | 88H | Tondu | 88B | Radyr | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 6622 | ABDR | Aberdare | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 6657 | 88H | Tondu | 88B | Radyr | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 6661 | 86J | Aberdare | 88B | Radyr | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 6690 | 88J | Aberdare | 88B | Radyr | |
14/05/1964 | Condemned | 5629 | 98W | COND | |||
14/05/1964 | Condemned | 5635 | 98W | COND | |||
16/05/1964 | Condemned | 6646 | 98W | COND | |||
01/06/1964 | Condemned | 5624 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 5619 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 5637 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 6608 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 6624 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 6635 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 6637 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 6638 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1964 | Condemned | 6660 | 98W | COND | |||
20/06/1964 | Reallocation | 6667 | LDR | Landore | 2A | Tyseley | |
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 5605 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88E | Abercynon | |
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 5659 | 88F | Treherbert | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 5669 | 88F | Treherbert | 88B | Radyr | |
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 5676 | THT | Treherbert | 88B | Radyr | |
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 6621 | 88F | Treherbert | 88C | Barry | |
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 6654 | 88F | Treherbert | 88C | Barry | |
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 6681 | 88F | Treherbert | 88B | Radyr | |
25/06/1964 | Condemned | 6690 | 98W | COND | |||
06/07/1964 | Condemned | 6695 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1964 | Reallocation | 5602 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88B | Radyr | |
20/07/1964 | Reallocation | 6621 | 88C | Barry | 88B | Radyr | |
20/07/1964 | Reallocation | 6643 | BRY | Barry | 87F | Llanelli | |
20/07/1964 | Reallocation | 6697 | 88C | Barry | 88B | Radyr | |
24/07/1964 | Condemned | 5634 | 98W | COND | |||
06/09/1964 | Reallocation | 5676 | 88B | Radyr | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
06/09/1964 | Reallocation | 6626 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
06/09/1964 | Reallocation | 6665 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
06/09/1964 | Reallocation | 6681 | 88B | Radyr | 2A | Tyseley | |
06/09/1964 | Reallocation | 6697 | 88B | Radyr | 2L | Leamington | |
07/09/1964 | Condemned | 5602 | 98W | COND | |||
07/09/1964 | Condemned | 5632 | 98W | COND | |||
07/09/1964 | Condemned | 5641 | 98W | COND | |||
07/09/1964 | Condemned | 5668 | 98W | COND | |||
07/09/1964 | Condemned | 5669 | 98W | COND | |||
28/09/1964 | Condemned | 5603 | 98W | COND | |||
28/09/1964 | Condemned | 5648 | 98W | COND | |||
28/09/1964 | Condemned | 6685 | 98W | COND | |||
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 5660 | 98W | 88B | Radyr | ||
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 5689 | 88C | Barry | 88B | Radyr | |
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 6649 | 88E | Abercynon | 88E | Abercynon | |
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 6650 | 88C | Barry | 88B | Radyr | |
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 6654 | 88C | Barry | 88E | Abercynon | |
19/10/1964 | Condemned | 5609 | 98W | COND | |||
19/10/1964 | Condemned | 5670 | 98W | COND | |||
23/10/1964 | Condemned | 5660 | 88B | Radyr | COND | ||
23/10/1964 | Condemned | 6602 | 98W | COND | |||
08/11/1964 | Reallocation | 5601 | 88E | Abercynon | 88D | Rhymney | |
08/11/1964 | Reallocation | 5605 | 88E | Abercynon | 88D | Rhymney | |
08/11/1964 | Reallocation | 5677 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Rhymney | |
08/11/1964 | Reallocation | 5686 | AYN | Abercynon | 88D | Rhymney | |
08/11/1964 | Reallocation | 5688 | 88E | Abercynon | 88D | Rhymney | |
08/11/1964 | Reallocation | 5691 | 88E | Abercynon | 88B | Radyr | |
08/11/1964 | Reallocation | 5699 | 98W | 88B | Radyr | ||
08/11/1964 | Reallocation | 6628 | 88E | Abercynon | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | |
08/11/1964 | Reallocation | 6649 | 88E | Abercynon | 88D | Rhymney | |
08/11/1964 | Reallocation | 6654 | 88E | Abercynon | 88B | Radyr | |
13/11/1964 | Condemned | 5662 | 98W | COND | |||
13/11/1964 | Condemned | 5694 | 98W | COND | |||
13/11/1964 | Condemned | 5699 | 88B | Radyr | COND | ||
15/11/1964 | Reallocation | 6658 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 88D | Rhymney | |
27/11/1964 | Condemned | 6684 | 98W | COND | |||
28/11/1964 | Condemned | 6678 | 98W | COND | |||
26/12/1964 | Condemned | 5651 | 98W | COND | |||
26/12/1964 | Condemned | 5675 | 98W | COND | |||
26/12/1964 | Condemned | 6621 | 98W | COND | |||
26/12/1964 | Condemned | 6622 | 98W | COND | |||
27/12/1964 | Reallocation | 6622 | 98W | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
27/12/1964 | Reallocation | 6658 | 88D | Rhymney | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
10/01/1965 | Reallocation | 6661 | 88B | Radyr | 88B | Radyr | |
15/01/1965 | Condemned | 5601 | 98W | COND | |||
15/01/1965 | Condemned | 6606 | 98W | COND | |||
06/02/1965 | Condemned | 6649 | 98W | COND | |||
07/03/1965 | Reallocation | 5665 | 88F | Treherbert | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
08/03/1965 | Condemned | 5673 | 98W | COND | |||
08/03/1965 | Condemned | 5686 | 98W | COND | |||
08/03/1965 | Condemned | 6655 | 98W | COND | |||
19/03/1965 | Condemned | 5618 | 98W | COND | |||
11/04/1965 | Reallocation | 6691 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 87F | Llanelli | |
21/04/1965 | Condemned | 6658 | 98W | COND | |||
25/04/1965 | Reallocation | 5605 | 88D | Rhymney | 2A | Tyseley | |
25/04/1965 | Reallocation | 5659 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | |
25/04/1965 | Reallocation | 5677 | 88D | Rhymney | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
07/05/1965 | Condemned | 5613 | 98W | COND | |||
07/05/1965 | Condemned | 5633 | 98W | COND | |||
07/05/1965 | Condemned | 5681 | 98W | COND | |||
07/05/1965 | Condemned | 5696 | 98W | COND | |||
07/05/1965 | Condemned | 6612 | 98W | COND | |||
07/05/1965 | Condemned | 6648 | 98W | COND | |||
07/05/1965 | Condemned | 6650 | 98W | COND | |||
21/05/1965 | Condemned | 5689 | 98W | COND | |||
21/05/1965 | Condemned | 6628 | 98W | COND | |||
29/05/1965 | Condemned | 6633 | 98W | COND | |||
03/06/1965 | Condemned | 5621 | 98W | COND | |||
03/06/1965 | Condemned | 5655 | 98W | COND | |||
03/06/1965 | Condemned | 5688 | 98W | COND | |||
03/06/1965 | Condemned | 6689 | 98W | COND | |||
13/06/1965 | Reallocation | 6614 | 98W | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
16/06/1965 | Condemned | 5665 | 98W | COND | |||
16/06/1965 | Condemned | 6614 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | COND | ||
16/06/1965 | Condemned | 6657 | 98W | COND | |||
16/06/1965 | Condemned | 6661 | 98W | COND | |||
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 6644 | 2L | Leamington | 2A | Tyseley | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 6671 | 84D | Leamington | 2D | Banbury | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 6697 | 2L | Leamington | 2D | Banbury | |
25/06/1965 | Condemned | 5691 | 98W | COND | |||
25/06/1965 | Condemned | 6654 | 98W | COND | |||
25/06/1965 | Condemned | 6691 | 98W | COND | |||
03/07/1965 | Condemned | 6644 | 98W | COND | |||
17/07/1965 | Condemned | 5667 | 98W | COND | |||
17/07/1965 | Condemned | 5684 | 98W | COND | |||
17/07/1965 | Reallocation | 6625 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 2A | Tyseley | |
17/07/1965 | Reallocation | 6665 | 6C | Croes Newydd | 2A | Tyseley | |
21/07/1965 | Condemned | 5692 | 98W | COND | |||
21/07/1965 | Condemned | 6672 | 98W | COND | |||
06/08/1965 | Condemned | 6643 | 98W | COND | |||
25/09/1965 | Condemned | 6656 | 98W | COND | |||
25/09/1965 | Condemned | 6679 | 98W | COND | |||
25/09/1965 | Condemned | 6692 | 98W | COND | |||
01/10/1965 | Condemned | 6613 | 98W | COND | |||
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 5659 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
02/10/1965 | Condemned | 6604 | 98W | COND | |||
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 6683 | 98W | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
09/10/1965 | Condemned | 6651 | 98W | COND | |||
09/10/1965 | Condemned | 6665 | 98W | COND | |||
09/10/1965 | Condemned | 6671 | 98W | COND | |||
09/10/1965 | Condemned | 6681 | 98W | COND | |||
23/10/1965 | Condemned | 6683 | 6C | Croes Newydd | COND | ||
23/10/1965 | Reallocation | 6697 | 2D | Banbury | 2A | Tyseley | |
06/11/1965 | Condemned | 5676 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1965 | Condemned | 5677 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1965 | Condemned | 6611 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1965 | Condemned | 6625 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1965 | Condemned | 6626 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1965 | Condemned | 6667 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1965 | Reallocation | 6668 | 84D | Leamington | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
06/11/1965 | Reallocation | 6697 | 2A | Tyseley | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
13/11/1965 | Condemned | 5606 | 2A | Tyseley | COND | ||
13/11/1965 | Condemned | 5658 | 84D | Leamington | COND | ||
27/11/1965 | Condemned | 5659 | 6C | Croes Newydd | COND | ||
04/12/1965 | Condemned | 6668 | 6C | Croes Newydd | COND | ||
11/12/1965 | Reallocation | 5605 | 2A | Tyseley | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
21/05/1966 | Condemned | 5605 | 98W | COND | |||
21/05/1966 | Condemned | 6697 | 98W | COND |