Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 766 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8220 Week
» 10802 Month
» 275435 Year
» 1497000 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Collett "56xx" Class 0-6-2T


Class GWR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
5600 5600 12/1924 88A
88F
W
Cardiff Cathays
Treherbert
Withdrawn
04/12/1954
16/07/1955
07/1962
27/07/1962
5600 5601 12/1924 88E
88D
W
Abercynon
Rhymney
Withdrawn
02/11/1957
08/11/1964
01/1965
15/01/1965
5600 5602 12/1924 86H
86C
87F
87D
88D
88B
W
Aberbeeg
Cardiff Canton
Llanelly
Swansea East Dock
Merthyr Tydfil
Radyr
Withdrawn
17/05/1952
27/03/1954
13/08/1960
27/07/1963
30/11/1963
20/07/1964
09/1964
07/09/1964
5600 5603 12/1924 NPT
CED
88D
88D
88D
88D
88D
88D
W
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff East Dock
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
30/06/1949
31/12/1949
20/05/1950
31/08/1950
31/10/1950
30/11/1950
31/12/1950
28/01/1961
09/1964
28/09/1964
5600 5604 01/1925 87B
87F
W
Duffryn Yard
Llanelly
Withdrawn
12/06/1958
09/09/1961
13/11/1962
13/11/1962
5600 5605 01/1925 RHY
88D
88E
88D
2A
6C
W
Rhymney
Merthyr Tydfil
Abercynon
Rhymney
Tyseley
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
28/01/1961
22/06/1964
08/11/1964
25/04/1965
11/12/1965
05/1966
21/05/1966
5600 5606 02/1925 84F
84E
84K
84J
84B
2A
W
Stourbridge Junction
Tyseley
Wrexham Rhosddu
Croes Newydd
Oxley
Tyseley
Withdrawn
30/11/1950
04/10/1958
24/01/1959
30/01/1960
05/11/1960
21/03/1964
13/11/1965
13/11/1965
5600 5607 02/1925 88F
W
Treherbert
Withdrawn
28/01/1961
12/1963
16/12/1963
5600 5608 02/1925 FDL
FDL
88F
88A
88F
W
Ferndale
Ferndale
Treherbert
Cardiff Cathays
Treherbert
Withdrawn
30/06/1949
05/11/1949
20/05/1950
04/12/1954
16/07/1955
08/1963
29/08/1963
5600 5609 02/1925 87D
88D
W
Swansea East Dock
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
05/11/1960
28/12/1963
10/1964
19/10/1964
5600 5610 02/1925 88A
88F
88D
88D
W
Cardiff Cathays
Treherbert
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
04/12/1954
16/07/1955
30/01/1960
28/01/1961
12/1963
16/12/1963
5600 5611 02/1925 88F
W
Treherbert
Withdrawn
28/01/1961
09/02/1963
09/01/1963
5600 5612 02/1925 87K
87F
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Withdrawn
30/09/1951
31/10/1953
04/1963
25/04/1963
5600 5613 02/1925 88F
W
Treherbert
Withdrawn
28/01/1961
05/1965
07/05/1965
5600 5614 02/1925 BRY
85A
88E
W
Barry
Worcester
Abercynon
Withdrawn
05/11/1949
07/10/1961
08/09/1962
08/1963
29/08/1963
5600 5615 03/1925 88D
88A
88C
88A
88E
88D
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Radyr
Barry
Radyr
Abercynon
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
04/12/1954
04/10/1958
29/11/1958
18/04/1959
09/09/1961
01/06/1963
07/1963
02/07/1963
5600 5616 03/1925 87C
87D
W
Danygraig
Swansea East Dock
Withdrawn
13/06/1959
31/10/1959
09/1963
23/09/1963
5600 5617 03/1925 88A
88D
88D
88E
W
Cardiff Cathays
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Abercynon
Withdrawn
31/01/1952
17/05/1952
30/06/1952
30/01/1954
09/1962
01/09/1962
5600 5618 03/1925 88A
88D
88D
W
Radyr
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
03/10/1959
13/08/1960
28/01/1961
03/1965
19/03/1965
5600 5619 03/1925 88C
W
Barry
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
06/1964
15/06/1964
5600 5620 06/1925 86G
86C
86E
86G
88J
W
Pontypool Road
Cardiff Canton
Severn Tunnel Junction
Pontypool Road
Aberdare
Withdrawn
30/09/1950
30/01/1954
08/10/1955
14/07/1962
06/04/1963
07/1963
16/07/1963
5600 5621 06/1925 88D
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
30/11/1963
06/1965
03/06/1965
5600 5622 06/1925 88A
88C
88D
88D
W
Cardiff Cathays
Barry
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
26/01/1957
25/01/1958
18/04/1959
28/01/1961
06/1963
06/06/1963
5600 5623 06/1925 88D
88E
87D
88B
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Abercynon
Swansea East Dock
Radyr
Withdrawn
30/09/1950
31/10/1950
05/11/1960
28/12/1963
02/1964
14/02/1964
5600 5624 06/1925 86F
86J
86E
88B
W
Tondu
Aberdare
Severn Tunnel Junction
Radyr
Withdrawn
01/11/1952
18/06/1955
02/11/1963
28/12/1963
06/1964
01/06/1964
5600 5625 08/1925 86G
88B
W
Pontypool Road
Radyr
Withdrawn
27/03/1954
15/12/1962
10/1963
25/10/1963
5600 5626 08/1925 81E
87B
88A
88D
W
Didcot
Duffryn Yard
Cardiff Cathays
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
25/11/1953
26/12/1953
18/06/1955
26/01/1957
12/1963
02/12/1963
5600 5627 08/1925 88A
88E
W
Cardiff Cathays
Abercynon
Withdrawn
28/01/1956
30/11/1957
04/1963
11/04/1963
5600 5628 08/1925 87C
87D
W
Danygraig
Swansea East Dock
Withdrawn
13/06/1959
31/10/1959
09/02/1963
11/02/1963
5600 5629 08/1925 81E
87H
86G
86F
88E
W
Didcot
Neyland
Pontypool Road
Tondu
Abercynon
Withdrawn
26/12/1953
13/07/1957
07/09/1957
02/11/1957
12/01/1963
05/1964
14/05/1964
5600 5630 08/1925 88A
88E
88D
88E
W
Cardiff Cathays
Abercynon
Merthyr Tydfil
Abercynon
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
25/01/1958
17/05/1958
28/01/1961
05/12/1962
05/12/1962
5600 5631 08/1925 87D
W
Swansea East Dock
Withdrawn
17/06/1961
09/1962
13/09/1962
5600 5632 09/1925 88D
88F
88F
88E
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Treherbert
Treherbert
Abercynon
Withdrawn
28/01/1956
25/02/1956
28/01/1961
06/04/1963
09/1964
07/09/1964
5600 5633 09/1925 86C
86J
88B
W
Cardiff Canton
Aberdare
Radyr
Withdrawn
19/05/1951
13/07/1957
28/09/1963
05/1965
07/05/1965
5600 5634 09/1925 84G
84A
84G
88C
87F
88C
87H
W
Shrewsbury
Stafford Road
Shrewsbury
Barry
Llanelly
Barry
Neyland
Withdrawn
30/04/1952
27/02/1954
18/06/1955
21/05/1960
07/10/1961
02/12/1961
06/10/1962
07/1964
24/07/1964
5600 5635 09/1925 88D
88D
88B
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Radyr
Withdrawn
30/09/1950
31/10/1950
28/01/1961
05/1964
14/05/1964
5600 5636 09/1925 88F
88A
88D
88C
88D
W
Treherbert
Cardiff Cathays
Merthyr Tydfil
Barry
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
24/03/1956
21/04/1956
24/01/1959
26/03/1960
28/01/1961
05/1962
21/05/1962
5600 5637 09/1925 88A
88C
W
Cardiff Cathays
Barry
Withdrawn
10/09/1955
27/02/1960
06/1964
15/06/1964
5600 5638 09/1925 86J
86G
W
Aberdare
Pontypool Road
Withdrawn
19/05/1951
17/05/1952
02/1964
14/02/1964
5600 5639 09/1925 87F
87F
88A
87H
88A
81E
88C
W
Llanelly
Llanelly
Cardiff Cathays
Neyland
Cardiff Cathays
Didcot
Barry
Withdrawn
31/12/1951
17/05/1952
29/11/1952
16/05/1953
11/07/1953
03/10/1953
16/07/1960
05/1962
21/05/1962
5600 5640 10/1925 108
58
88A
82B
84D
W
Rhymney
Cardiff Cathays
Radyr
St Philips Marsh
Leamington
Withdrawn
03/11/1945
01/12/1945
24/01/1959
08/10/1960
06/10/1962
06/1963
06/06/1963
5600 5641 10/1925 W Withdrawn 09/1964 07/09/1964
5600 5642 10/1925 84F
88B
85B
82B
86J
W
Stourbridge Junction
Cardiff East Dock
Gloucester Horton Road
St Philips Marsh
Aberdare
Withdrawn
01/11/1952
30/01/1954
16/07/1955
05/11/1955
08/08/1959
09/1962
21/09/1962
5600 5643 10/1925 88C
W
Barry
Withdrawn
17/06/1961
07/1963
02/07/1963
5600 5644 11/1925 86J
88E
W
Aberdare
Abercynon
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
14/06/1958
06/1963
17/06/1963
5600 5645 11/1925 86H
86G
83D
W
Aberbeeg
Pontypool Road
Laira
Withdrawn
08/08/1953
25/01/1958
19/05/1962
06/1963
07/06/1963
5600 5646 11/1925 87K
87H
88F
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Neyland
Treherbert
Withdrawn
31/08/1951
31/01/1952
08/10/1955
09/1962
01/09/1962
5600 5647 11/1925 81E
88E
88J
W
Didcot
Abercynon
Aberdare
Withdrawn
29/12/1956
13/08/1960
06/10/1962
03/1964
10/03/1964
5600 5648 11/1925 88B
88A
W
Cardiff East Dock
Radyr
Withdrawn
30/11/1957
25/01/1958
09/1964
28/09/1964
5600 5649 11/1925 W Withdrawn 03/1963 15/03/1963
5600 5650 01/1926 88A
88D
88D
W
Cardiff Cathays
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
04/10/1952
05/11/1955
28/01/1961
06/1963
24/06/1963
5600 5651 01/1926 84E
84G
84K
84J
88B
88D
W
Tyseley
Shrewsbury
Wrexham Rhosddu
Croes Newydd
Radyr
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
05/10/1957
01/11/1958
27/12/1958
30/01/1960
15/12/1962
01/06/1963
12/1964
26/12/1964
5600 5652 01/1926 88D
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
28/01/1961
09/1962
27/09/1962
5600 5653 01/1926 88A
88F
88C
W
Cardiff Cathays
Treherbert
Barry
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
25/01/1958
14/07/1962
01/1963
01/01/1963
5600 5654 01/1926 88A
88F
W
Cardiff Cathays
Treherbert
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
30/11/1957
12/1963
16/12/1963
5600 5655 01/1926 18
88D
88D
88D
88D
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
03/11/1945
31/08/1950
17/05/1952
30/06/1952
28/01/1961
06/1965
03/06/1965
5600 5656 02/1926 87A
87F
87D
87E
W
Neath (Court Sart)
Llanelly
Swansea East Dock
Landore
Withdrawn
08/08/1959
26/12/1959
17/11/1962
28/12/1963
02/1964
14/02/1964
5600 5657 02/1926 87H
84B
87F
87K
87F
86A
86H
86A
88E
W
Neyland
Oxley
Llanelly
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Aberbeeg
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Abercynon
Withdrawn
30/06/1952
01/11/1952
29/11/1952
08/08/1953
31/10/1953
31/12/1955
02/11/1957
30/11/1957
19/05/1962
07/1962
27/07/1962
5600 5658 02/1926 84E
84D
W
Tyseley
Leamington
Withdrawn
04/10/1958
17/11/1962
13/11/1965
13/11/1965
5600 5659 02/1926 88D
88D
88D
86G
88F
88D
2C
6C
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Pontypool Road
Treherbert
Merthyr Tydfil
Stourbridge Junction
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
30/11/1950
31/01/1951
16/07/1955
04/05/1964
22/06/1964
25/04/1965
02/10/1965
27/11/1965
27/11/1965
5600 5660 02/1926 88D
88D
88E
88D
88D
88D
W
88B
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Abercynon
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
Radyr
31/01/1951
28/02/1951
03/10/1953
30/01/1954
30/01/1960
28/01/1961
10/1964
12/10/1964
23/10/1964
5600 5661 02/1926 58
88D
88D
88D
W
Cardiff Cathays
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
01/12/1945
31/10/1950
30/11/1950
31/01/1952
07/1962
27/07/1962
5600 5662 02/1926 88D
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
28/01/1961
11/1964
13/11/1964
5600 5663 02/1926 88A
88F
88A
88A
W
Cardiff Cathays
Treherbert
Radyr
Radyr
Withdrawn
31/10/1953
25/01/1958
24/01/1959
03/10/1959
08/1962
03/08/1962
5600 5664 02/1926 W Withdrawn 08/1962 31/08/1962
5600 5665 06/1926 88C
88F
86G
W
Barry
Treherbert
Pontypool Road
Withdrawn
31/08/1950
08/10/1955
07/03/1965
06/1965
16/06/1965
5600 5666 06/1926 88D
88D
88D
88D
88D
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
30/06/1951
31/03/1952
17/05/1952
30/06/1952
28/01/1961
07/1963
16/07/1963
5600 5667 06/1926 BRY
6C
W
Barry
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
30/10/1948
08/09/1963
07/1965
17/07/1965
5600 5668 06/1926 88F
88C
W
Treherbert
Barry
Withdrawn
31/08/1951
17/06/1961
09/1964
07/09/1964
5600 5669 06/1926 88F
88A
88F
88B
W
Treherbert
Radyr
Treherbert
Radyr
Withdrawn
04/10/1958
01/11/1958
09/02/1963
22/06/1964
09/1964
07/09/1964
5600 5670 08/1926 88D
87B
88D
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Duffryn Yard
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
17/05/1958
26/12/1959
28/12/1963
10/1964
19/10/1964
5600 5671 08/1926 88F
88D
88D
88D
W
Treherbert
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
08/08/1953
05/09/1953
30/01/1960
28/01/1961
01/1964
06/01/1964
5600 5672 08/1926 88D
88D
88D
88D
88D
88D
88B
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Radyr
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
31/07/1951
31/03/1952
17/05/1952
04/10/1952
28/01/1961
15/12/1962
09/1963
13/09/1963
5600 5673 08/1926 87H
87K
87E
87A
88B
W
Neyland
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Landore
Neath (Court Sart)
Radyr
Withdrawn
12/07/1952
04/10/1952
01/11/1952
17/06/1961
28/09/1963
03/1965
08/03/1965
5600 5674 08/1926 88D
88D
88F
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Treherbert
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
20/04/1946
30/01/1960
28/01/1961
04/11/1961
04/1964
20/04/1964
5600 5675 09/1926 87F
87K
87F
82B
81E
81D
88A
87D
87F
W
Llanelly
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
St Philips Marsh
Didcot
Reading (W.R.)
Radyr
Swansea East Dock
Llanelly
Withdrawn
04/10/1952
24/01/1953
21/02/1953
05/09/1953
05/11/1955
17/05/1958
24/01/1959
03/10/1959
29/06/1963
12/1964
26/12/1964
5600 5676 09/1926 88B
6C
W
Radyr
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
22/06/1964
06/09/1964
11/1965
06/11/1965
5600 5677 09/1926 88A
88D
87A
88D
88D
6C
W
Cardiff Cathays
Merthyr Tydfil
Neath (Court Sart)
Merthyr Tydfil
Rhymney
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
27/02/1954
03/11/1956
06/10/1962
15/12/1962
08/11/1964
25/04/1965
11/1965
06/11/1965
5600 5678 09/1926 88A
88F
88F
W
Cardiff Cathays
Treherbert
Treherbert
Withdrawn
31/08/1950
03/11/1956
15/12/1962
01/1964
15/01/1964
5600 5679 09/1926 86E
86G
89B
88C
89B
84F
W
Severn Tunnel Junction
Pontypool Road
Croes Newydd
Barry
Croes Newydd
Stourbridge Junction
Withdrawn
21/02/1959
28/11/1959
21/04/1962
12/01/1963
09/02/1963
30/03/1963
07/1963
29/07/1963
5600 5680 09/1926 88E
88A
88E
88J
W
Abercynon
Cardiff Cathays
Abercynon
Aberdare
Withdrawn
29/02/1952
30/01/1954
27/02/1954
06/10/1962
12/1963
02/12/1963
5600 5681 10/1926 88D
88D
88D
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
04/12/1954
26/03/1960
28/01/1961
05/1965
07/05/1965
5600 5682 10/1926 W Withdrawn 05/1962 07/05/1962
5600 5683 10/1926 88A
W
Cardiff Cathays
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
03/1964
10/03/1964
5600 5684 10/1926 88A
88F
2B
2A
W
Radyr
Treherbert
Oxley
Tyseley
Withdrawn
25/01/1958
12/06/1958
08/09/1963
21/03/1964
07/1965
17/07/1965
5600 5685 01/1927 86H
86C
88C
88C
88A
88E
W
Aberbeeg
Cardiff Canton
Barry
Barry
Cardiff Canton
Abercynon
Withdrawn
23/04/1955
22/03/1958
03/12/1960
12/08/1961
09/09/1961
11/08/1962
02/1964
14/02/1964
5600 5686 01/1927 88D
W
Rhymney
Withdrawn
08/11/1964
03/1965
08/03/1965
5600 5687 01/1927 58
88B
88A
88F
88D
W
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff East Dock
Radyr
Treherbert
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
03/11/1945
20/04/1957
25/01/1958
12/06/1958
15/12/1962
12/1963
02/12/1963
5600 5688 01/1927 88E
88D
W
Abercynon
Rhymney
Withdrawn
04/05/1963
08/11/1964
06/1965
03/06/1965
5600 5689 01/1927 88C
88B
W
Barry
Radyr
Withdrawn
09/02/1963
12/10/1964
05/1965
21/05/1965
5600 5690 01/1927 84G
86F
W
Shrewsbury
Tondu
Withdrawn
06/11/1954
21/05/1960
08/1963
01/08/1963
5600 5691 01/1927 88E
88B
W
Abercynon
Radyr
Withdrawn
09/03/1963
08/11/1964
06/1965
25/06/1965
5600 5692 01/1927 88A
88F
88A
87F
88H
88B
W
Cardiff Cathays
Treherbert
Radyr
Llanelly
Tondu
Radyr
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
12/06/1958
27/12/1958
08/10/1960
27/07/1963
04/05/1964
07/1965
21/07/1965
5600 5693 01/1927 W Withdrawn 09/02/1963 14/01/1963
5600 5694 01/1927 88F
88B
W
Treherbert
Radyr
Withdrawn
16/06/1956
13/04/1964
11/1964
13/11/1964
5600 5695 01/1927 W Withdrawn 26/01/1946
23/03/1946
18/12/1962
18/12/1962
5600 5696 01/1927 88D
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
28/01/1961
05/1965
07/05/1965
5600 5697 01/1927 81E
81F
82B
81E
88A
W
Didcot
Oxford
St Philips Marsh
Didcot
Radyr
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
05/09/1959
26/03/1960
21/05/1960
16/07/1960
04/1963
25/04/1963
5600 5698 01/1927 86J
W
Aberdare
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
09/1962
21/09/1962
5600 5699 01/1927 W
88B
Withdrawn
Radyr
11/1964
08/11/1964
13/11/1964
5600 6600 08/1927 86C
86D
W
Cardiff Canton
Llantrisant
Withdrawn
19/05/1951
03/10/1959
08/1962
24/08/1962
5600 6601 08/1927 88H
W
Tondu
Withdrawn
27/01/1962
05/11/1962
05/11/1962
5600 6602 08/1927 86C
88C
86C
87B
87E
87B
87H
87D
87E
W
Cardiff Canton
Barry
Cardiff Canton
Duffryn Yard
Landore
Duffryn Yard
Neyland
Swansea East Dock
Landore
Withdrawn
19/05/1951
31/07/1951
17/05/1952
08/10/1955
18/06/1960
17/06/1961
15/07/1961
12/08/1961
28/12/1963
10/1964
23/10/1964
5600 6603 09/1927 86C
88A
88E
W
Cardiff Canton
Cardiff Cathays
Abercynon
Withdrawn
18/05/1946
31/03/1951
31/07/1951
29/06/1963
03/1964
20/03/1964
5600 6604 09/1927 85A
84F
84E
89B
W
Worcester
Stourbridge Junction
Tyseley
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
01/11/1958
21/03/1959
07/10/1961
08/09/1962
10/1965
02/10/1965
5600 6605 09/1927 88B
W
Radyr
Withdrawn
02/11/1963
01/1964
22/01/1964
5600 6606 09/1927 85C
88D
88A
88B
W
Hereford
Merthyr Tydfil
Cardiff Cathays
Radyr
Withdrawn
26/03/1955
13/08/1955
03/11/1956
25/01/1964
01/1965
15/01/1965
5600 6607 09/1927 86C
88A
W
Cardiff Canton
Cardiff Cathays
Withdrawn
31/03/1951
31/08/1951
03/1963
15/03/1963
5600 6608 09/1927 88D
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
27/07/1963
06/1964
15/06/1964
5600 6609 09/1927 84F
84E
W
Stourbridge Junction
Tyseley
Withdrawn
31/01/1951
07/10/1961
09/1963
13/09/1963
5600 6610 09/1927 84K
84J
87H
W
Wrexham Rhosddu
Croes Newydd
Neyland
Withdrawn
21/02/1959
30/01/1960
13/08/1960
02/02/1963
01/02/1963
5600 6611 09/1927 84J
W
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
30/06/1951
11/1965
06/11/1965
5600 6612 10/1927 88D
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
29/06/1963
05/1965
07/05/1965
5600 6613 10/1927 SED
87A
87D
88D
87F
88D
87F
W
Swansea East Dock
Neath (Court Sart)
Swansea East Dock
Merthyr Tydfil
Llanelly
Merthyr Tydfil
Llanelly
Withdrawn
03/12/1949
09/08/1958
03/10/1959
09/03/1963
04/05/1963
27/07/1963
02/11/1963
10/1965
01/10/1965
5600 6614 10/1927 84E
88A
W
87A
Tyseley
Cardiff Cathays
Withdrawn
Neath (Court Sart)
03/10/1953
16/06/1956
06/1965
13/06/1965
16/06/1965
5600 6615 12/1927 128
58
84J
W
Treherbert
Cardiff Cathays
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
03/11/1945
01/12/1945
05/09/1959
05/1963
13/05/1963
5600 6616 12/1927 87G
W
Carmarthen
Withdrawn
26/03/1960
09/1962
27/09/1962
5600 6617 12/1927 84J
W
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
30/06/1951
09/1962
01/09/1962
5600 6618 12/1927 85A
84E
84D
W
Worcester
Tyseley
Leamington
Withdrawn
08/10/1960
25/03/1961
12/08/1961
11/1963
13/11/1963
5600 6619 01/1928 88F
88C
W
Treherbert
Barry
Withdrawn
08/09/1956
06/10/1956
03/1963
14/03/1963
5600 6620 01/1928 86H
88C
84E
84G
87H
84E
87B
W
Aberbeeg
Barry
Tyseley
Shrewsbury
Neyland
Tyseley
Duffryn Yard
Withdrawn
21/03/1953
18/04/1953
03/10/1953
28/01/1956
16/06/1956
11/08/1956
06/10/1956
12/1963
02/12/1963
5600 6621 01/1928 86F
86H
86C
86H
88B
88F
88C
88B
W
Tondu
Aberbeeg
Cardiff Canton
Aberbeeg
Radyr
Treherbert
Barry
Radyr
Withdrawn
20/05/1950
27/03/1954
10/09/1955
20/04/1957
11/08/1962
29/06/1963
22/06/1964
20/07/1964
12/1964
26/12/1964
5600 6622 01/1928 ABDR
88D
W
86G
Aberdare
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
Pontypool Road
05/11/1949
04/05/1964
12/1964
27/12/1964
26/12/1964
5600 6623 01/1928 87H
87B
87H
87B
87H
87F
W
Neyland
Duffryn Yard
Neyland
Duffryn Yard
Neyland
Llanelly
Withdrawn
18/06/1960
13/08/1960
05/11/1960
03/12/1960
28/01/1961
06/04/1963
06/1963
24/06/1963
5600 6624 01/1928 84G
84D
88A
W
Shrewsbury
Leamington
Cardiff Cathays
Withdrawn
19/05/1951
06/09/1952
02/11/1957
06/1964
15/06/1964
5600 6625 01/1928 84C
84J
82D
89B
2A
W
Banbury
Croes Newydd
Westbury
Croes Newydd
Tyseley
Withdrawn
30/04/1952
01/11/1952
27/12/1952
17/11/1962
17/07/1965
11/1965
06/11/1965
5600 6626 01/1928 88A
6C
W
Cardiff Cathays
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
31/07/1951
06/09/1964
11/1965
06/11/1965
5600 6627 02/1928 88D
81D
87H
88J
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Reading (W.R.)
Neyland
Aberdare
Withdrawn
31/10/1950
03/10/1953
03/10/1959
06/04/1963
11/1963
01/11/1963
5600 6628 02/1928 88E
87A
W
Abercynon
Neath (Court Sart)
Withdrawn
28/09/1963
08/11/1964
05/1965
21/05/1965
5600 6629 02/1928 86H
88D
W
Aberbeeg
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
04/10/1958
20/05/1961
22/10/1962
15/10/1962
5600 6630 08/1928 84F
87F
82B
88A
W
Stourbridge Junction
Llanelly
St Philips Marsh
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
01/11/1952
21/03/1953
16/07/1955
24/02/1962
09/1962
01/09/1962
5600 6631 08/1928 LLY
84E
84B
W
Llanelly
Tyseley
Oxley
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
20/04/1957
08/09/1962
09/1963
10/09/1963
5600 6632 08/1928 84J
W
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
31/01/1952
09/1963
10/09/1963
5600 6633 08/1928 84D
84J
88F
86E
2A
W
Leamington
Croes Newydd
Treherbert
Severn Tunnel Junction
Tyseley
Withdrawn
26/03/1955
16/07/1955
08/10/1955
03/11/1962
01/12/1963
05/1965
29/05/1965
5600 6634 08/1928 RYR
86G
W
Radyr
Pontypool Road
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
19/05/1951
04/1964
24/04/1964
5600 6635 08/1928 84C
88A
W
Banbury
Radyr
Withdrawn
25/01/1958
22/03/1958
06/1964
15/06/1964
5600 6636 08/1928 W Withdrawn 06/1963 24/06/1963
5600 6637 08/1928 88B
W
Radyr
Withdrawn
02/12/1961
06/1964
15/06/1964
5600 6638 09/1928 OXY
86F
86H
85C
88A

88B
W
Oxley
Tondu
Aberbeeg
Hereford
Cardiff Cathays

Radyr
Withdrawn
03/12/1949
01/11/1952
24/01/1953
30/01/1954
04/12/1954
11/04/1963
01/05/1963
06/1964
15/06/1964
5600 6639 09/1928 86A
82C
88B
88G
84D
84D
W
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Swindon
Radyr
Llantrisant
Leamington
Leamington
Withdrawn
13/08/1955
03/12/1955
05/11/1960
25/03/1961
29/06/1963
20/07/1963
10/1963
21/10/1963
5600 6640 09/1928 W Withdrawn 09/1962 01/09/1962
5600 6641 09/1928 87E
82B
87F
87A
W
Landore
St Philips Marsh
Llanelly
Neath (Court Sart)
Withdrawn
03/10/1959
26/12/1959
27/02/1960
23/04/1960
09/1962
01/09/1962
5600 6642 09/1928 86H
86A
86E
W
Aberbeeg
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Severn Tunnel Junction
Withdrawn
30/09/1950
21/02/1953
03/12/1955
09/02/1963
14/01/1963
5600 6643 09/1928 87F
W
Llanelly
Withdrawn
20/07/1964
08/1965
06/08/1965
5600 6644 09/1928 87K
87D
87H
84E
86C
86H
84F
84D
84B
2L
2A
W
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Swansea East Dock
Neyland
Tyseley
Cardiff Canton
Aberbeeg
Stourbridge Junction
Leamington
Oxley
Leamington
Tyseley
Withdrawn
31/08/1951
29/11/1952
13/08/1955
10/09/1955
25/02/1956
22/03/1958
20/05/1961
21/04/1962
08/09/1962
02/11/1963
19/06/1965
07/1965
03/07/1965
5600 6645 09/1928 W Withdrawn 08/1962 02/08/1962
5600 6646 09/1928 84E
84F
84E
W
Tyseley
Stourbridge Junction
Tyseley
Withdrawn
31/10/1953
25/11/1953
22/06/1963
05/1964
16/05/1964
5600 6647 09/1928 W Withdrawn 09/1962 01/09/1962
5600 6648 09/1928 88A
W
Cardiff Cathays
Withdrawn
03/11/1956
05/1965
07/05/1965
5600 6649 09/1928 86J
87E
87A
88J
88E
88E
88D
W
Aberdare
Landore
Neath (Court Sart)
Aberdare
Abercynon
Abercynon
Rhymney
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
04/10/1958
17/06/1961
27/07/1963
02/11/1963
12/10/1964
08/11/1964
02/1965
06/02/1965
5600 6650 08/1928 87A
87E
87D
88C
88B
W
Neath (Court Sart)
Landore
Swansea East Dock
Barry
Radyr
Withdrawn
26/01/1957
18/06/1960
17/06/1961
09/03/1963
12/10/1964
05/1965
07/05/1965
5600 6651 08/1928 86G
89B
W
Pontypool Road
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
09/02/1963
15/05/1963
10/1965
09/10/1965
5600 6652 08/1928 86G
87F
W
Pontypool Road
Llanelly
Withdrawn
11/08/1962
17/11/1962
12/1963
16/12/1963
5600 6653 08/1928 86C
86G
86H
87F
W
Cardiff Canton
Pontypool Road
Aberbeeg
Llanelly
Withdrawn
31/03/1951
19/05/1951
22/03/1958
03/10/1959
12/1963
16/12/1963
5600 6654 08/1928 86J
86C
86E
81E
81C
81D
82B
88F
88C
88E
88B
W
Aberdare
Cardiff Canton
Severn Tunnel Junction
Didcot
Southall
Reading (W.R.)
St Philips Marsh
Treherbert
Barry
Abercynon
Radyr
Withdrawn
30/09/1951
30/06/1952
01/11/1952
31/10/1953
30/01/1954
14/06/1958
18/06/1960
17/11/1962
22/06/1964
12/10/1964
08/11/1964
06/1965
25/06/1965
5600 6655 08/1928 81C
81D
81B
88C
88F
87F
88D
W
Southall
Reading (W.R.)
Slough
Barry
Treherbert
Llanelly
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
14/06/1958
03/10/1959
26/03/1960
27/07/1963
28/09/1963
02/11/1963
03/1965
08/03/1965
5600 6656 08/1928 86A
88C
88B
84F
84F
W
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Barry
Radyr
Stourbridge Junction
Stourbridge Junction
Withdrawn
11/07/1959
19/05/1962
08/09/1962
27/07/1963
11/08/1963
09/1965
25/09/1965
5600 6657 08/1928 88C
88A
88H
88B
W
Barry
Radyr
Tondu
Radyr
Withdrawn
26/03/1960
23/04/1960
04/05/1963
04/05/1964
06/1965
16/06/1965
5600 6658 09/1928 88D
88D
86G
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Rhymney
Pontypool Road
Withdrawn
06/10/1962
15/11/1964
27/12/1964
04/1965
21/04/1965
5600 6659 08/1928 W Withdrawn 10/1963 21/10/1963
5600 6660 09/1928 108
58
W
Rhymney
Cardiff Cathays
Withdrawn
03/11/1945
01/12/1945
06/1964
15/06/1964
5600 6661 09/1928 86J
88B
88B
W
Aberdare
Radyr
Radyr
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
04/05/1964
10/01/1965
06/1965
16/06/1965
5600 6662 09/1928 W Withdrawn 04/1963 05/04/1963
5600 6663 09/1928 86C
86H
84F
84D
W
Cardiff Canton
Aberbeeg
Stourbridge Junction
Leamington
Withdrawn
26/03/1955
10/09/1955
22/04/1961
19/05/1962
06/1963
24/06/1963
5600 6664 09/1928 88C
88A
81C
81B
81F
81E
88J
W
Barry
Cardiff Cathays
Southall
Slough
Oxford
Didcot
Aberdare
Withdrawn
28/02/1951
19/05/1951
03/10/1953
24/04/1954
06/09/1958
23/04/1960
05/11/1960
12/1963
16/12/1963
5600 6665 09/1928 6C
2A
W
Croes Newydd
Tyseley
Withdrawn
06/09/1964
17/07/1965
10/1965
09/10/1965
5600 6666 09/1928 W Withdrawn 07/1963 29/07/1963
5600 6667 09/1928 2A
W
Tyseley
Withdrawn
20/06/1964
11/1965
06/11/1965
5600 6668 09/1928 84E
84D
6C
W
Tyseley
Leamington
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
17/11/1962
06/11/1965
04/12/1965
04/12/1965
5600 6669 09/1928 84E
85B
85B
85D
88B
W
Tyseley
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Kidderminster
Radyr
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
16/06/1956
12/06/1958
14/06/1958
08/09/1962
05/12/1962
05/12/1962
5600 6670 09/1928 85A
88G
88C
W
Worcester
Llantrisant
Barry
Withdrawn
07/10/1961
08/09/1962
27/07/1963
10/1963
03/10/1963
5600 6671 09/1928 85A
84D
2D
W
Worcester
Leamington
Banbury
Withdrawn
07/10/1961
24/02/1962
19/06/1965
10/1965
09/10/1965
5600 6672 09/1928 86H
86E
86F
86E
88B
W
Aberbeeg
Severn Tunnel Junction
Tondu
Severn Tunnel Junction
Radyr
Withdrawn
21/02/1953
05/09/1953
16/06/1956
14/07/1956
28/12/1963
07/1965
21/07/1965
5600 6673 09/1928 86F
88J
W
Tondu
Aberdare
Withdrawn
16/06/1956
24/03/1962
03/1963
07/03/1963
5600 6674 09/1928 PFN
87H
84F
84J
W
Pantyffynnon
Neyland
Stourbridge Junction
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
29/12/1945
16/05/1953
11/07/1953
11/07/1959
07/1963
29/07/1963
5600 6675 09/1928 W Withdrawn 06/1963 24/06/1963
5600 6676 09/1928 86F
86G
W
Tondu
Pontypool Road
Withdrawn
09/10/1954
11/07/1959
04/1963
05/04/1963
5600 6677 09/1928 W Withdrawn 09/02/1963 14/01/1963
5600 6678 09/1928 W Withdrawn 11/1964 28/11/1964
5600 6679 09/1928 STJ
86F
85D
2C
W
Severn Tunnel Junction
Tondu
Kidderminster
Stourbridge Junction
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
30/09/1950
26/03/1955
01/02/1964
09/1965
25/09/1965
5600 6680 10/1928 87B
87D
88B
W
Duffryn Yard
Swansea East Dock
Radyr
Withdrawn
17/06/1961
09/03/1963
28/12/1963
04/1964
08/04/1964
5600 6681 10/1928 84F
84G
85A
82B
88A
88L
88F
88B
2A
W
Stourbridge Junction
Shrewsbury
Worcester
St Philips Marsh
Cardiff Canton
Cardiff East Dock
Treherbert
Radyr
Tyseley
Withdrawn
26/12/1953
20/04/1957
01/11/1958
21/03/1959
24/03/1962
08/09/1962
27/07/1963
22/06/1964
06/09/1964
10/1965
09/10/1965
5600 6682 10/1928 W Withdrawn 02/1964 14/02/1964
5600 6683 10/1928 84K
84G
84F
W
6C
Chester West
Shrewsbury
Stourbridge Junction
Withdrawn
Croes Newydd
19/05/1951
27/12/1952
16/05/1953
10/1965
02/10/1965
23/10/1965
5600 6684 10/1928 W Withdrawn 11/1964 27/11/1964
5600 6685 10/1928 86H
86J
86G
88D
88E
W
Aberbeeg
Aberdare
Pontypool Road
Merthyr Tydfil
Abercynon
Withdrawn
20/05/1950
17/05/1952
30/06/1952
29/06/1963
13/04/1964
09/1964
28/09/1964
5600 6686 10/1928 88D
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Withdrawn
25/01/1964
04/1964
24/04/1964
5600 6687 10/1928 86J
W
Aberdare
Withdrawn
16/05/1953
05/1962
21/05/1962
5600 6688 10/1928 LDR
87F
87F
87K
87F
87E
87D
88B
86G
88F
W
Landore
Llanelly
Llanelly
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Llanelly
Landore
Swansea East Dock
Radyr
Pontypool Road
Treherbert
Withdrawn
30/10/1948
31/01/1951
30/04/1951
30/06/1951
31/07/1951
27/12/1952
17/06/1961
09/09/1961
09/02/1963
22/02/1964
04/1964
20/04/1964
5600 6689 10/1928 88A
W
Cardiff Cathays
Withdrawn
10/09/1955
06/1965
03/06/1965
5600 6690 10/1928 85B
85D
85B
86C
86G
88J
88B
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Kidderminster
Gloucester Horton Road
Hereford
Pontypool Road
Aberdare
Radyr
Withdrawn
01/11/1952
21/04/1956
16/06/1956
31/12/1960
25/02/1961
19/05/1962
04/05/1964
06/1964
25/06/1964
5600 6691 10/1928 88D
87F
W
Merthyr Tydfil
Llanelly
Withdrawn
25/01/1964
11/04/1965
06/1965
25/06/1965
5600 6692 10/1928 86H
86J
84F
W
Aberbeeg
Aberdare
Stourbridge Junction
Withdrawn
17/05/1952
30/06/1952
26/12/1953
09/1965
25/09/1965
5600 6693 10/1928 86G
W
Pontypool Road
Withdrawn
31/03/1952
09/02/1963
14/01/1963
5600 6694 10/1928 W Withdrawn 10/1963 25/10/1963
5600 6695 10/1928 87A
88B
W
Neath (Court Sart)
Radyr
Withdrawn
17/06/1961
02/11/1963
07/1964
06/07/1964
5600 6696 10/1928 84J
85A
85B
88C
W
Croes Newydd
Worcester
Gloucester Horton Road
Barry
Withdrawn
01/11/1952
08/10/1960
25/02/1961
30/12/1961
12/1963
02/12/1963
5600 6697 10/1928 88C
88B
2L
2D
2A
6C
W
Barry
Radyr
Leamington
Banbury
Tyseley
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
23/04/1960
20/07/1964
06/09/1964
19/06/1965
23/10/1965
06/11/1965
05/1966
21/05/1966
5600 6698 10/1928 84G
84F
84G
84J
W
Shrewsbury
Stourbridge Junction
Shrewsbury
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
27/12/1952
16/05/1953
21/02/1959
18/06/1960
09/03/1963
07/03/1963
5600 6699 10/1928 82C
88A
W
Swindon
Radyr
Withdrawn
26/03/1955
17/05/1958
12/1963
16/12/1963