Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 145 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5723 Week
» 25456 Month
» 322470 Year
» 399057 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Collett "64xx" Class 0-6-0PT


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Mon 09/08/1954 6427 ??   Barry Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954  
Sun 12/11/1961 6415 Wdn   Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Triangle. SLS 1/1962  
Sun 04/03/1962 6408 Wdn   Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.    
Sun 29/11/1964 6430 Wdn   Swindon Works visit: Outside the stock shed RO 1/1965