GWR Collett "2251" Class 0-6-0
Class | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2251 | 2200 | 27/06/1938 | MCH 81E 84J 89C 84J 82D W |
Machynlleth Didcot Croes Newydd Machynlleth Croes Newydd Westbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/01/1960 18/06/1960 16/07/1960 13/08/1960 08/10/1960 09/1962 |
17/09/1962 |
2251 | 2201 | 28/07/1939 | OSY MCH 85A 89C 82B 85B 89C 81E 84A 89B 84D 81E 81D W |
Oswestry Machynlleth Worcester Machynlleth St Philips Marsh Gloucester Horton Road Machynlleth Didcot Stafford Road Croes Newydd Leamington Didcot Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/12/1949 26/12/1953 30/01/1954 27/03/1954 17/05/1958 14/06/1958 27/02/1960 25/02/1961 17/06/1961 07/10/1961 24/02/1962 25/01/1964 09/1964 |
15/06/1964 |
2251 | 2202 | 01/08/1939 | DID 81F 81F 84C 84J 84C 89C 89A 89C W |
Didcot Oxford Oxford Banbury Croes Newydd Banbury Machynlleth Oswestry Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 11/07/1953 16/07/1955 08/10/1955 24/03/1956 27/12/1958 24/01/1959 10/1960 |
11/10/1960 |
2251 | 2203 | 04/08/1939 | SPM TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84G 84E 84E 84G 84E 82A 82B 82C 82B W |
St Philips Marsh Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Shrewsbury Tyseley Tyseley Shrewsbury Tyseley Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Swindon St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 24/01/1948 21/02/1948 30/06/1948 10/07/1948 26/02/1949 26/03/1949 25/02/1950 25/03/1950 22/04/1950 20/05/1950 17/06/1950 15/07/1950 21/04/1951 01/12/1951 29/12/1951 31/12/1951 26/01/1952 31/01/1952 29/02/1952 18/04/1953 27/02/1954 16/06/1956 03/10/1959 06/1960 |
30/06/1960 |
2251 | 2204 | 08/08/1939 | MCH 82G W |
Machynlleth Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/06/1962 12/1963 |
28/12/1963 |
2251 | 2205 | 15/08/1939 | WOS 85C 85A 82B 82E 82B W |
Worcester Hereford Worcester St Philips Marsh Bristol Barrow Road St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/07/1955 08/10/1955 13/07/1957 29/11/1958 27/12/1958 06/1959 |
15/06/1959 |
2251 | 2206 | 24/08/1939 | SPM TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS 84E 84E 89C 84E 84E 84G 84G 85A 85C 81F 85A 81D W |
St Philips Marsh Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Machynlleth Tyseley Tyseley Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Worcester Hereford Oxford Worcester Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/02/1948 26/03/1949 23/04/1949 08/10/1949 05/11/1949 31/12/1949 22/04/1950 20/05/1950 17/06/1950 31/12/1950 31/01/1951 28/02/1951 31/03/1951 13/08/1955 08/10/1955 13/07/1957 07/09/1957 26/12/1959 12/1961 |
04/12/1961 |
2251 | 2207 | 29/08/1939 | WOS 85D 85B W |
Worcester Kidderminster Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/05/1953 24/03/1956 01/1961 |
12/01/1961 |
2251 | 2208 | 02/09/1939 | RDG 81A 83B 82D 87H W |
Reading (W.R.) Old Oak Common Taunton Westbury Neyland Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/02/1953 21/03/1953 16/07/1955 07/09/1957 06/1959 |
15/06/1959 |
2251 | 2209 | 04/09/1939 | TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS CNYD 84F 84J 84C 84J 84C 84J 87H 85A 86A W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Croes Newydd Stourbridge Junction Croes Newydd Banbury Croes Newydd Banbury Croes Newydd Neyland Worcester Ebbw Junction (Newport) Withdrawn |
03/11/1945 01/12/1945 23/03/1946 15/06/1947 30/04/1948 30/06/1948 07/08/1948 23/04/1949 01/11/1952 16/05/1953 03/10/1953 16/07/1955 08/10/1955 16/06/1956 05/10/1957 02/11/1957 13/08/1960 08/1962 |
02/08/1962 |
2251 | 2210 | 09/09/1939 | OSY 84G 81D 89B 84D 2D W |
Oswestry Shrewsbury Reading (W.R.) Croes Newydd Leamington Banbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/11/1958 28/11/1959 17/06/1961 07/10/1961 14/11/1964 06/1965 |
05/06/1965 |
2251 | 2211 | 17/05/1940 | TN 83C 84J 84C 84E 84D W |
Taunton Exeter Croes Newydd Banbury Tyseley Leamington Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/10/1954 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 13/06/1959 03/12/1960 11/1964 |
14/11/1964 |
2251 | 2212 | 16/05/1940 | TN 81D W |
Taunton Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/06/1958 05/12/1962 |
05/12/1962 |
2251 | 2213 | 18/05/1940 | TN 82B W |
Taunton St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/09/1956 10/11/1960 |
10/11/1960 |
2251 | 2214 | 26/05/1940 | TN 82C 81E 84G 89C 89A 72A 83D W |
Taunton Swindon Didcot Shrewsbury Machynlleth Shrewsbury Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/10/1954 06/11/1954 21/05/1960 10/09/1960 31/12/1960 31/08/1963 27/12/1964 05/1965 |
07/05/1965 |
2251 | 2215 | 29/05/1940 | TN SPM 82C 82B 82E 82B 82C 82B 82G W |
Taunton St Philips Marsh Swindon St Philips Marsh Bristol Barrow Road St Philips Marsh Swindon St Philips Marsh Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/05/1948 05/11/1955 31/12/1955 21/03/1959 18/04/1959 03/10/1959 28/11/1959 28/01/1961 10/1961 |
19/10/1961 |
2251 | 2216 | 02/06/1940 | CARM CARM W |
Carmarthen Carmarthen Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/03/1948 01/1962 |
15/01/1962 |
2251 | 2217 | 14/06/1940 | CARM 89C 82E 83G W |
Carmarthen Machynlleth Bristol Barrow Road Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 17/07/1954 15/12/1962 28/12/1963 11/1964 |
13/11/1964 |
2251 | 2218 | 10/06/1940 | NPT NPT 83C 82G W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Westbury Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
29/12/1945 15/06/1947 30/11/1963 13/04/1964 11/1964 |
13/11/1964 |
2251 | 2219 | 17/06/1940 | MCH 89A 86A 83B W |
Machynlleth Oswestry Ebbw Junction (Newport) Taunton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/11/1953 31/10/1959 18/06/1960 03/1964 |
17/03/1964 |
2251 | 2220 | 18/06/1940 | SPM 87H W |
St Philips Marsh Neyland Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/05/1953 12/1961 |
27/12/1961 |
2251 | 2221 | 20/08/1940 | DID 81D 81E 81F 81E 81F 82E 2D W |
Didcot Reading (W.R.) Didcot Oxford Didcot Oxford Bristol Barrow Road Banbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 29/11/1952 06/11/1954 31/12/1960 28/01/1961 27/01/1962 14/07/1962 17/05/1964 11/1964 |
14/11/1964 |
2251 | 2222 | 23/08/1940 | DID 81A 84G 84J 89C 85A W |
Didcot Old Oak Common Shrewsbury Croes Newydd Machynlleth Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 27/12/1952 21/05/1960 18/06/1960 03/12/1960 16/06/1962 05/1965 |
21/05/1965 |
2251 | 2223 | 29/08/1940 | MCH 87J 86C 86A W |
Machynlleth Fishguard Goodwick Cardiff Canton Ebbw Junction (Newport) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 19/05/1951 05/09/1959 03/10/1959 05/1962 |
11/05/1962 |
2251 | 2224 | 11/09/1940 | SDN 87G 82B W |
Swindon Carmarthen St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/11/1954 05/09/1959 30/09/1963 |
30/09/1963 |
2251 | 2225 | 16/09/1940 | SPM 85C 89B W |
St Philips Marsh Hereford Brecon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/05/1953 14/06/1958 06/1959 |
15/06/1959 |
2251 | 2226 | 30/09/1940 | DID 87H 87E W |
Didcot Neyland Landore Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/05/1953 06/10/1956 08/1959 |
21/08/1959 |
2251 | 2227 | 07/10/1940 | DID NPT W |
Didcot Ebbw Junction (Newport) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/03/1949 01/1961 |
12/01/1961 |
2251 | 2228 | 15/10/1940 | SALOP 85B 82B 87H W |
Shrewsbury Gloucester Horton Road St Philips Marsh Neyland Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/11/1952 21/02/1953 16/05/1953 06/1959 |
15/06/1959 |
2251 | 2229 | 26/10/1940 | SALOP 83B 87H 82E W |
Shrewsbury Taunton Neyland Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/09/1953 31/10/1953 28/11/1959 09/1962 |
01/09/1962 |
2251 | 2230 | 31/10/1940 | EXE 83B 84J 84C 82C 81E W |
Exeter Taunton Croes Newydd Banbury Swindon Didcot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 13/07/1957 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 08/08/1959 26/03/1960 30/01/1962 |
18/01/1962 |
2251 | 2231 | 04/10/1944 | SRD 86E W |
Stafford Road Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 19/06/1954 02/1965 |
06/02/1965 |
2251 | 2232 | 11/10/1944 | CNYD SRD CNYD 84F 84F 84G 89C 82B 85B 85A W |
Croes Newydd Stafford Road Croes Newydd Stourbridge Junction Stourbridge Junction Shrewsbury Machynlleth St Philips Marsh Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Withdrawn |
29/12/1945 15/06/1947 04/09/1948 16/06/1951 30/06/1951 16/05/1953 24/03/1956 25/02/1961 27/01/1962 06/04/1963 09/1964 |
21/09/1964 |
2251 | 2233 | 19/10/1944 | SALOP 89C 84G 89C W |
Shrewsbury Machynlleth Shrewsbury Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/07/1952 04/10/1952 27/12/1952 11/1961 |
03/11/1961 |
2251 | 2234 | 26/10/1944 | SALOP 84C 81E 85A W |
Shrewsbury Banbury Didcot Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/10/1958 03/10/1959 26/03/1960 05/1962 |
21/05/1962 |
2251 | 2235 | 27/10/1944 | SALOP 89B 83B W |
Shrewsbury Brecon Taunton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/08/1954 04/10/1958 08/1959 |
17/08/1959 |
2251 | 2236 | 28/10/1944 | CARM 83B 81F 84K 89A 86A 89B 89C 89C W |
Carmarthen Taunton Oxford Wrexham Rhosddu Oswestry Ebbw Junction (Newport) Croes Newydd Machynlleth Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/03/1953 03/10/1953 01/11/1958 29/11/1958 31/10/1959 17/06/1961 07/10/1961 15/12/1962 05/1965 |
15/05/1965 |
2251 | 2237 | 07/11/1944 | WOS 81A 89C W |
Worcester Old Oak Common Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/10/1955 14/07/1956 06/1959 |
15/06/1959 |
2251 | 2238 | 15/11/1944 | TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS 89C 89C 84E W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Machynlleth Machynlleth Tyseley Withdrawn |
03/11/1945 01/12/1945 23/03/1946 07/09/1946 15/06/1947 21/02/1948 30/04/1948 23/04/1949 18/06/1949 16/07/1949 10/09/1949 08/10/1949 05/11/1949 31/12/1949 11/08/1951 31/08/1951 03/11/1951 06/1959 |
15/06/1959 |
2251 | 2239 | 25/11/1944 | NPT NPT 89A 89C W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Oswestry Machynlleth Withdrawn |
29/12/1945 15/06/1947 21/04/1956 07/10/1961 05/1962 |
21/05/1962 |
2251 | 2240 | 01/12/1944 | DID 82B 83B 86A W |
Didcot St Philips Marsh Taunton Ebbw Junction (Newport) Withdrawn |
03/11/1945 15/06/1947 25/03/1961 17/06/1961 07/10/1961 06/1962 |
22/06/1962 |
2251 | 2241 | 29/03/1945 | WOS 85C 72A 86C W |
Worcester Hereford Exmouth Junction Hereford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 17/05/1958 27/07/1963 31/08/1963 02/1964 |
14/02/1964 |
2251 | 2242 | 04/04/1945 | WOS 85C 85B W |
Worcester Hereford Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 13/07/1957 08/11/1964 05/1965 |
21/05/1965 |
2251 | 2243 | 11/04/1945 | HFD 81A 85A 86A W |
Hereford Old Oak Common Worcester Ebbw Junction (Newport) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 17/05/1952 29/11/1958 13/08/1960 09/02/1963 |
14/01/1963 |
2251 | 2244 | 19/04/1945 | OSY 84G 89C 82C 85A W |
Oswestry Shrewsbury Machynlleth Swindon Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/10/1953 24/03/1956 08/09/1962 12/10/1964 05/1965 |
21/05/1965 |
2251 | 2245 | 25/04/1945 | RDG 85B W |
Reading (W.R.) Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 27/02/1960 27/05/1963 |
23/05/1963 |
2251 | 2246 | 09/08/1945 | STB 84C 81E 85A W |
Stourbridge Junction Banbury Didcot Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/05/1953 25/01/1958 05/11/1960 12/1963 |
28/12/1963 |
2251 | 2247 | 10/08/1945 | WOS 84C 84J 85A 86A 82G W |
Worcester Banbury Croes Newydd Worcester Ebbw Junction (Newport) Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/05/1953 13/07/1957 05/10/1957 26/03/1960 09/02/1963 02/1964 |
26/02/1964 |
2251 | 2248 | 14/08/1945 | GLO 87G 81D W |
Gloucester Horton Road Carmarthen Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/09/1960 30/11/1963 09/1964 |
01/09/1964 |
2251 | 2249 | 24/08/1945 | OXF 85C 81D W |
Oxford Hereford Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 17/05/1952 29/06/1963 09/1964 |
01/09/1964 |
2251 | 2250 | 14/09/1945 | SDN 82B 82C W |
Swindon St Philips Marsh Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/11/1952 31/10/1959 08/1962 |
02/08/1962 |
2251 | 2251 | 03/1930 | SPM 85B 82B 85B 89C 87H 89C 89D 82E 83G W |
St Philips Marsh Gloucester Horton Road St Philips Marsh Gloucester Horton Road Machynlleth Neyland Machynlleth Oswestry Bristol Barrow Road Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/11/1957 22/02/1958 22/03/1958 14/06/1958 27/12/1958 16/07/1960 28/01/1961 15/12/1962 30/11/1963 12/1963 |
28/12/1963 |
2251 | 2252 | 03/1930 | DID W |
Didcot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1959 |
07/12/1959 |
2251 | 2253 | 03/1930 | SPM 85A 81D 85A 85B 85A W |
St Philips Marsh Worcester Reading (W.R.) Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/12/1953 08/10/1955 27/12/1958 21/02/1959 28/12/1963 03/1965 |
08/03/1965 |
2251 | 2254 | 03/1930 | CARM GLO W |
Carmarthen Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/03/1948 01/1959 |
19/01/1959 |
2251 | 2255 | 03/1930 | OSY 89C W |
Oswestry Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/07/1955 05/1962 |
08/05/1962 |
2251 | 2256 | 03/1930 | BAN 84J 84C 86C W |
Banbury Croes Newydd Banbury Hereford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/07/1955 08/10/1955 15/07/1961 09/1962 |
21/09/1962 |
2251 | 2257 | 04/1930 | TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84J 84J 84E 84D 89B 81D W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Croes Newydd Croes Newydd Tyseley Leamington Croes Newydd Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 24/01/1948 31/03/1948 31/05/1948 18/06/1949 16/07/1949 15/07/1950 31/01/1951 28/02/1951 31/03/1951 19/05/1951 16/06/1951 30/06/1951 14/07/1951 31/07/1951 09/08/1952 31/08/1952 01/11/1952 03/12/1960 14/07/1962 15/12/1962 09/1964 |
01/09/1964 |
2251 | 2258 | 04/1930 | SPM 83D 83D 82B 82B 85A 89C 85A 82C W |
St Philips Marsh Laira Laira St Philips Marsh St Philips Marsh Worcester Machynlleth Worcester Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/08/1950 31/08/1950 09/09/1950 30/09/1950 26/12/1953 21/04/1956 06/10/1956 20/04/1957 12/1958 |
15/12/1958 |
2251 | 2259 | 04/1930 | CNYD 89C 89C 84J 84J 89C 89C 84J 84C 87H W |
Croes Newydd Machynlleth Machynlleth Croes Newydd Croes Newydd Machynlleth Machynlleth Croes Newydd Banbury Neyland Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/06/1951 30/06/1951 11/08/1951 31/08/1951 08/09/1951 30/09/1951 03/11/1951 03/10/1953 27/12/1958 04/1959 |
13/04/1959 |
2251 | 2260 | 04/1930 | MCH W |
Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1961 |
03/11/1961 |
2251 | 2261 | 04/1930 | TN 82B 81D 89A 82B 83B 81D W |
Taunton St Philips Marsh Reading (W.R.) Oswestry St Philips Marsh Taunton Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/11/1952 21/05/1955 21/04/1956 14/07/1956 17/06/1961 07/10/1961 09/1964 |
01/09/1964 |
2251 | 2262 | 04/1930 | SRD CHR CNYD 85A 81F 82C 81D W |
Stafford Road Chester West Croes Newydd Worcester Oxford Swindon Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 15/06/1947 21/05/1949 31/10/1951 04/12/1954 01/01/1955 08/10/1955 11/1959 |
30/11/1959 |
2251 | 2263 | 04/1930 | WOS 87H W |
Worcester Neyland Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/09/1955 01/1959 |
05/01/1959 |
2251 | 2264 | 04/1930 | RDG 89C W |
Reading (W.R.) Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/04/1956 06/1960 |
30/06/1960 |
2251 | 2265 | 05/1930 | spm SPM W |
Wells St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 06/1960 |
30/06/1960 |
2251 | 2266 | 05/1930 | TN 85C W |
Taunton Hereford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/10/1954 10/1959 |
06/10/1959 |
2251 | 2267 | 06/1930 | tn TN 89C 85A 84E 84D W |
Minehead Taunton Machynlleth Worcester Tyseley Leamington Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 21/04/1956 25/01/1958 21/02/1959 03/12/1960 11/1961 |
21/11/1961 |
2251 | 2268 | 06/1930 | TN 82D 6F W |
Taunton Westbury Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/07/1955 14/06/1964 05/1965 |
22/05/1965 |
2251 | 2269 | 07/1930 | brd SPM W |
Weston-super-Mare St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 15/06/1947 01/1959 |
27/01/1959 |
2251 | 2270 | 04/1930 | STB W |
Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/1959 |
21/09/1959 |
2251 | 2271 | 27/08/1934 | CARM 89C 87H 87J 89C W |
Carmarthen Machynlleth Neyland Fishguard Goodwick Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 17/07/1954 16/05/1959 03/10/1959 14/07/1962 09/1962 |
21/09/1962 |
2251 | 2272 | 28/08/1934 | CARM 87K 87K 87G W |
Carmarthen Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Carmarthen Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 28/02/1951 31/03/1951 30/04/1951 08/1959 |
17/08/1959 |
2251 | 2273 | 29/08/1934 | LDR 87G 87H 85A 85B 82D W |
Landore Carmarthen Neyland Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Westbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/11/1952 24/01/1959 28/11/1959 15/07/1961 06/10/1962 12/1963 |
02/12/1963 |
2251 | 2274 | 30/08/1934 | WOS 85B 85C 84G 87G W |
Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Hereford Shrewsbury Carmarthen Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 22/03/1958 21/03/1959 06/1960 |
30/06/1960 |
2251 | 2275 | 31/08/1934 | TN 89A 89C W |
Taunton Oswestry Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/04/1956 11/07/1959 02/1960 |
29/02/1960 |
2251 | 2276 | 12/09/1934 | PDN 84G 89C W |
Old Oak Common Shrewsbury Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/05/1960 17/06/1961 09/1962 |
17/09/1962 |
2251 | 2277 | 12/09/1934 | WOS 82B 83B 82B 82G 82E 83D W |
Worcester St Philips Marsh Taunton St Philips Marsh Templecombe (S&D) Bristol Barrow Road Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/02/1959 18/06/1960 15/07/1961 04/11/1961 17/11/1962 30/11/1963 12/1963 |
28/12/1963 |
2251 | 2278 | 13/09/1934 | WOS 85B 87J W |
Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Fishguard Goodwick Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/12/1955 13/07/1957 09/1959 |
14/09/1959 |
2251 | 2279 | 14/09/1934 | STB 84E W |
Stourbridge Junction Tyseley Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/01/1954 01/1959 |
30/01/1959 |
2251 | 2280 | 14/09/1934 | NPT 85B 89C 89B W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Gloucester Horton Road Machynlleth Brecon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 17/05/1958 14/06/1958 18/04/1959 09/1959 |
14/09/1959 |
2251 | 2281 | 10/01/1936 | STB KDR GLO KDR HFD 85B 89C W |
Stourbridge Junction Kidderminster Gloucester Horton Road Kidderminster Hereford Gloucester Horton Road Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/10/1948 25/12/1948 29/01/1949 05/11/1949 25/01/1958 14/06/1958 11/1959 |
25/11/1959 |
2251 | 2282 | 13/01/1936 | PDN W |
Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/1960 |
30/05/1960 |
2251 | 2283 | 15/01/1936 | MCH 87H 82F 86E W |
Machynlleth Neyland Bath Green Park (S&D) Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 19/05/1951 31/08/1963 02/11/1963 12/1963 |
28/12/1963 |
2251 | 2284 | 18/01/1936 | NEA CARM 87E W |
Neath (Court Sart) Carmarthen Landore Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 15/06/1947 05/09/1953 06/1959 |
24/06/1959 |
2251 | 2285 | 18/01/1936 | SHL 89A 89C W |
Southall Oswestry Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/04/1956 16/06/1956 11/1959 |
02/11/1959 |
2251 | 2286 | 23/01/1936 | HFD 89B 89C 89A 89C 86C W |
Hereford Brecon Machynlleth Oswestry Machynlleth Hereford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/08/1953 14/08/1954 09/10/1954 16/07/1955 06/10/1962 09/1964 |
28/09/1964 |
2251 | 2287 | 23/01/1936 | CNYD CNYD BCN 89A 89C 87G 87H 86E 86C 85B W |
Croes Newydd Croes Newydd Brecon Oswestry Machynlleth Carmarthen Neyland Severn Tunnel Junction Hereford Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 15/06/1947 23/04/1949 26/12/1959 05/11/1960 19/05/1962 29/06/1963 28/12/1963 22/02/1964 08/11/1964 05/1965 |
21/05/1965 |
2251 | 2288 | 28/01/1936 | WTD WTD 82B 85B W |
Whitland Whitland St Philips Marsh Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 15/06/1947 28/11/1959 17/06/1961 12/1961 |
19/12/1961 |
2251 | 2289 | 28/01/1936 | DID 81F 89A 89C 81F 84G 85B 89A 85A 85B 84C 89C 84C W |
Didcot Oxford Oswestry Machynlleth Oxford Shrewsbury Gloucester Horton Road Oswestry Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Banbury Machynlleth Banbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/10/1954 21/04/1956 14/07/1956 25/01/1958 01/11/1958 31/10/1959 28/11/1959 30/01/1960 31/12/1960 06/10/1962 22/06/1963 29/06/1963 05/1964 |
23/05/1964 |
2251 | 2290 | 31/01/1936 | WOS 87G W |
Worcester Carmarthen Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/06/1955 06/1959 |
15/06/1959 |
2251 | 2291 | 31/01/1938 | CARM GLO 87E 82C 85A W |
Carmarthen Gloucester Horton Road Landore Swindon Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/02/1948 08/08/1959 28/11/1959 25/01/1964 09/1964 |
28/09/1964 |
2251 | 2292 | 31/01/1938 | TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS 89C 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 89C 89C 84E 81F 85B 84J 86E W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Machynlleth Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Machynlleth Machynlleth Tyseley Oxford Gloucester Horton Road Croes Newydd Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/07/1948 07/08/1948 04/09/1948 30/10/1948 25/12/1948 29/01/1949 16/07/1949 05/11/1949 17/06/1950 31/12/1950 31/01/1951 14/07/1951 31/07/1951 08/09/1951 30/09/1951 23/02/1952 31/03/1952 14/06/1952 30/06/1952 04/10/1952 29/11/1952 11/07/1953 17/07/1954 09/10/1954 06/1962 |
22/06/1962 |
2251 | 2293 | 02/02/1938 | SPM 82C W |
St Philips Marsh Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/12/1955 07/1959 |
20/07/1959 |
2251 | 2294 | 03/02/1938 | WOS 81F 84K 89A 84J 89C W |
Worcester Oxford Wrexham Rhosddu Oswestry Croes Newydd Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/06/1955 01/11/1958 29/11/1958 11/07/1959 31/10/1959 09/1962 |
21/09/1962 |
2251 | 2295 | 08/02/1938 | BAN 85A 85B 85B 85B 84J 85A 85C W |
Banbury Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Gloucester Horton Road Gloucester Horton Road Croes Newydd Worcester Hereford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/10/1951 01/12/1951 31/12/1951 17/05/1952 17/07/1954 09/10/1954 18/06/1955 07/1962 |
04/07/1962 |
2251 | 2296 | 03/06/1938 | TYS TYS 84E 84J 84E 84E 84E 84E 84E 84J 87H 85A 86G W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Croes Newydd Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Croes Newydd Neyland Worcester Pontypool Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/11/1949 25/02/1950 20/05/1950 17/06/1950 08/09/1951 30/09/1951 23/02/1952 31/03/1952 16/06/1956 05/10/1957 02/11/1957 21/02/1959 10/1959 |
12/10/1959 |
2251 | 2297 | 15/06/1938 | TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS TYS CNYD 84C W |
Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Tyseley Croes Newydd Banbury Withdrawn |
23/03/1946 15/06/1947 30/06/1948 10/07/1948 21/05/1949 18/06/1949 28/01/1950 03/10/1953 06/1960 |
30/06/1960 |
2251 | 2298 | 22/06/1938 | MCH 86A W |
Machynlleth Ebbw Junction (Newport) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/08/1962 12/1963 |
28/12/1963 |
2251 | 2299 | 23/06/1938 | RDG W |
Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/1959 |
28/09/1959 |
2251 | 3200 | 21/09/1946 | MCH 89D 83G W |
Machynlleth Oswestry Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 20/07/1963 28/12/1963 01/1965 |
15/01/1965 |
2251 | 3201 | 30/09/1946 | MCH 89A 84K 84J 86A 83G W |
Machynlleth Oswestry Wrexham Rhosddu Croes Newydd Ebbw Junction (Newport) Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/07/1955 29/11/1958 11/07/1959 08/09/1962 13/04/1964 05/1965 |
21/05/1965 |
2251 | 3202 | 05/10/1946 | OSY MCH 89A W |
Oswestry Machynlleth Oswestry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 28/01/1950 16/07/1955 06/1960 |
20/06/1960 |
2251 | 3203 | 09/10/1946 | CNYD CNYD 84G 84G 89A 89A 84G 85B W |
Croes Newydd Croes Newydd Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Oswestry Oswestry Shrewsbury Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
30/11/1946 15/06/1947 23/02/1952 31/03/1952 09/08/1952 31/08/1952 04/10/1952 01/11/1952 12/1963 |
28/12/1963 |
2251 | 3204 | 11/10/1946 | GLO CHEL 85A 89A 84K S 85A 89A 86C W |
Gloucester Horton Road Cheltenham Malvern Road Worcester Oswestry Wrexham Rhosddu Stored Worcester (Re-instd) Shrewsbury Hereford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/1948 09/10/1954 14/06/1958 01/11/1958 16/01/1959 17/02/1960 12/08/1961 12/01/1963 28/03/1963 |
01/03/1963 |
2251 | 3205 | 18/10/1946 | GLO CHEL 85B 85A 85B 85A 84G 89C 89A 86C 83D 83D W 83G |
Gloucester Horton Road Cheltenham Malvern Road Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Shrewsbury Machynlleth Shrewsbury Hereford Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Withdrawn Templecombe (S&D) |
15/06/1947 07/1948 03/11/1951 18/06/1955 10/09/1955 08/10/1955 13/08/1960 22/04/1961 17/06/1961 12/01/1963 28/12/1963 27/12/1964 05/1965 16/05/1965 |
21/05/1965 |
2251 | 3206 | 21/10/1946 | CNYD 84F 81E 87J 82G W |
Croes Newydd Stourbridge Junction Didcot Fishguard Goodwick Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/05/1953 30/01/1954 10/09/1960 16/06/1962 12/1963 |
28/12/1963 |
2251 | 3207 | 25/10/1946 | MCH 89A 84K 84G 84J 85A W |
Machynlleth Oswestry Wrexham Rhosddu Shrewsbury Croes Newydd Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/06/1955 29/11/1958 11/07/1959 18/06/1960 08/10/1960 05/12/1962 |
05/12/1962 |
2251 | 3208 | 29/10/1946 | OSY S 89D 89C W |
Oswestry Stored Oswestry (Re-instd) Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/09/1962 17/12/1962 22/06/1963 05/1965 |
08/05/1965 |
2251 | 3209 | 08/11/1946 | HFD 85A 89A 89B 89C W |
Hereford Worcester Oswestry Croes Newydd Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/06/1955 14/06/1958 08/09/1962 12/01/1963 06/1964 |
13/06/1964 |
2251 | 3210 | 03/12/1947 | 84J 82G W |
Croes Newydd Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
16/07/1960 05/11/1960 11/1964 |
13/11/1964 |
2251 | 3211 | 04/12/1947 | 86A W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Withdrawn |
28/01/1961 09/1962 |
01/09/1962 |
2251 | 3212 | 09/12/1947 | 82D 87J 82D 86E W |
Westbury Fishguard Goodwick Westbury Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
11/07/1959 21/05/1960 10/09/1960 14/07/1962 10/1963 |
21/10/1963 |
2251 | 3213 | 11/12/1947 | 85A 89C 85A 81D W |
Worcester Machynlleth Worcester Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
06/11/1954 13/08/1960 15/12/1962 28/09/1963 12/1963 |
28/12/1963 |
2251 | 3214 | 15/12/1947 | 89D 87H W |
Oswestry Neyland Withdrawn |
08/10/1960 27/01/1962 10/1963 |
25/10/1963 |
2251 | 3215 | 17/12/1947 | SPM 82G W |
St Philips Marsh Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
24/01/1948 18/06/1960 09/02/1963 |
09/01/1963 |
2251 | 3216 | 19/12/1947 | 84F 87G 85A 82G W |
Stourbridge Junction Carmarthen Worcester Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
16/05/1953 30/01/1954 18/06/1955 08/10/1960 12/1963 |
02/12/1963 |
2251 | 3217 | 24/12/1947 | 84F 85A 81F 85A 84C 84D W |
Stourbridge Junction Worcester Oxford Worcester Banbury Leamington Withdrawn |
16/05/1953 30/01/1954 24/04/1954 18/06/1955 26/03/1960 16/06/1962 11/1964 |
14/11/1964 |
2251 | 3218 | 02/01/1948 | 84F 85A 82G 82B 82E 83G W |
Stourbridge Junction Worcester Templecombe (S&D) St Philips Marsh Bristol Barrow Road Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
16/05/1953 30/01/1954 23/04/1960 18/06/1960 03/11/1962 28/12/1963 05/1965 |
21/05/1965 |
2251 | 3219 | 30/01/1948 | 81D 84D 81D W |
Reading (W.R.) Leamington Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
25/11/1953 28/01/1961 25/02/1961 12/1963 |
02/12/1963 |