GWR Dean "2301" Class 0-6-0
Class | GWR | GWR (Prairie) | WD (WD) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2301 | 2301 | 05/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1934 | 05/01/1934 | ||
2301 | 2302 | 06/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1931 | 03/1931 | ||
2301 | 2303 | 06/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1935 | 02/1935 | ||
2301 | 2304 | 06/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1929 | 01/1929 | ||
2301 | 2305 | 07/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1935 | 06/1935 | ||
2301 | 2306 | 07/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1929 | 04/1929 | ||
2301 | 2307 | 07/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1932 | 04/1932 | ||
2301 | 2308 | 08/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 21/04/1921 | 21/04/1921 | ||
2301 | 2309 | 08/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1931 | 04/1931 | ||
2301 | 2310 | 08/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 17/11/1934 | ||
2301 | 2311 | 08/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 16/11/1934 | ||
2301 | 2312 | 09/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1931 | 02/1931 | ||
2301 | 2313 | 09/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1938 | 12/1938 | ||
2301 | 2314 | 09/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 | ||
2301 | 2315 | 10/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 14/11/1945 | ||
2301 | 2316 | 10/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 16/11/1934 | ||
2301 | 2317 | 10/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 17/11/1934 | ||
2301 | 2318 | 11/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1929 | 08/1929 | ||
2301 | 2319 | 11/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1931 | 02/1931 | ||
2301 | 2320 | 11/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1944 | 24/11/1944 | ||
2301 | 2321 | 01/1884 | ABH W |
Aberystwyth Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 10/1938 |
10/1938 | ||
2301 | 2322 | 01/1884 | WES BRD BRD W |
Westbury Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
26/01/1946 15/06/1947 03/12/1949 06/1951 |
11/06/1951 | ||
2301 | 2323 | 01/1884 | MCH 89A W |
Machynlleth Oswestry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/04/1953 06/1953 |
30/06/1953 | ||
2301 | 2324 | 02/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1931 | 02/1931 | ||
2301 | 2325 | 02/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 30/11/1945 | ||
2301 | 2326 | 02/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 | ||
2301 | 2327 | 02/1884 | OSY W |
Oswestry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1953 |
20/04/1953 | ||
2301 | 2328 | 03/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1938 | 09/1938 | ||
2301 | 2329 | 03/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1933 | 11/12/1933 | ||
2301 | 2330 | 03/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1931 | 07/1931 | ||
2301 | 2331 | 03/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1931 | 03/1931 | ||
2301 | 2332 | 04/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1938 | 07/1938 | ||
2301 | 2333 | 04/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1931 | 11/1931 | ||
2301 | 2334 | 05/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 21/04/1921 | 21/04/1921 | ||
2301 | 2335 | 05/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1933 | 30/09/1933 | ||
2301 | 2336 | 05/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 16/11/1934 | ||
2301 | 2337 | 05/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1935 | 11/1935 | ||
2301 | 2338 | 06/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1931 | 04/1931 | ||
2301 | 2339 | 06/1884 | BCN OSY WOS 85B 85A W |
Brecon Oswestry Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 07/03/1936 15/06/1947 12/08/1950 02/12/1950 03/1952 |
17/03/1952 | ||
2301 | 2340 | 06/1884 | 91W SPM 82D W |
To Western Region / GWR (Re-instd) St Philips Marsh Westbury Withdrawn |
06/1939 12/1939 03/11/1945 26/01/1946 15/06/1947 24/01/1953 06/1954 |
04/06/1954 | ||
2301 | 2341 | 07/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 03/11/1934 | ||
2301 | 2342 | 08/1884 | OSY BCN W |
Oswestry Brecon Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 07/03/1936 08/1938 |
08/1938 | ||
2301 | 2343 | 08/1884 | BCN BCN W |
Brecon Brecon Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 02/1953 |
24/02/1953 | ||
2301 | 2344 | 08/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1931 | 02/1931 | ||
2301 | 2345 | 09/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1947 | 03/05/1947 | ||
2301 | 2346 | 09/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1936 | 09/1936 | ||
2301 | 2347 | 10/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1938 | 04/1938 | ||
2301 | 2348 | 10/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1945 | 28/07/1945 | ||
2301 | 2349 | 11/1884 | HFD W |
Hereford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/1952 |
26/03/1952 | ||
2301 | 2350 | 11/1884 | LYD LYD 85C 85C W |
Lydney Lydney Hereford Hereford Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 15/06/1947 29/12/1951 31/01/1952 01/1953 |
29/01/1953 | ||
2301 | 2351 | 11/1884 | BCN W |
Brecon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 02/1953 |
20/02/1953 | ||
2301 | 2352 | 11/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1935 | 05/1935 | ||
2301 | 2353 | 11/1884 | OSY MCH W |
Oswestry Machynlleth Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 07/03/1936 12/1936 |
12/1936 | ||
2301 | 2354 | 11/1884 | DID OSY 89B W |
Didcot Oswestry Brecon Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 15/06/1947 01/11/1952 04/1953 |
27/04/1953 | ||
2301 | 2355 | 12/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1930 | 03/1930 | ||
2301 | 2356 | 12/1884 | MCH W |
Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/1948 |
26/07/1948 | ||
2301 | 2357 | 12/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1935 | 07/1935 | ||
2301 | 2358 | 12/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 16/11/1934 | ||
2301 | 2359 | 12/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1935 | 12/1935 | ||
2301 | 2360 | 12/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1945 | 22/02/1945 | ||
2301 | 2381 | 06/1890 | brd W |
Weston-super-Mare Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 11/1945 |
03/11/1945 | ||
2301 | 2382 | 06/1890 | OSY W |
Oswestry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1950 |
13/04/1950 | ||
2301 | 2383 | 06/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1946 | 08/08/1946 | ||
2301 | 2384 | 06/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1938 | 12/1938 | ||
2301 | 2385 | 07/1890 | PPRD W |
Pontypool Road Withdrawn |
22/07/1939 15/06/1947 10/1951 |
29/10/1951 | ||
2301 | 2386 | 07/1890 | OSY BCN OSY OSY W |
Oswestry Brecon Oswestry Oswestry Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 08/02/1936 07/03/1936 15/06/1947 12/1950 |
06/12/1950 | ||
2301 | 2387 | 07/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 21/04/1921 | 21/04/1921 | ||
2301 | 2388 | 07/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1938 | 06/1938 | ||
2301 | 2389 | 08/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1944 | 29/07/1944 | ||
2301 | 2390 | 08/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1937 | 08/1937 | ||
2301 | 2391 | 08/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1933 | 06/12/1933 | ||
2301 | 2392 | 187 | 08/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2393 | 113 | 09/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2394 | 09/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1938 | 05/1938 | ||
2301 | 2395 | 09/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 03/11/1945 | ||
2301 | 2396 | 09/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1934 | 30/06/1934 | ||
2301 | 2397 | 10/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1935 | 04/1935 | ||
2301 | 2398 | 10/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1938 | 12/1938 | ||
2301 | 2399 | 94 | 10/1890 | WES W |
Westbury Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 12/1940 |
12/1940 | |
2301 | 2400 | 126 | 10/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2401 | 10/1891 | BCN OSY BCN W |
Brecon Oswestry Brecon Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 08/02/1936 15/06/1947 01/1953 |
09/01/1953 | ||
2301 | 2402 | 181 | 10/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2403 | 182 | 10/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2404 | 190 | 10/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2405 | 152 | 11/1891 | RDG W |
Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2406 | 11/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 03/11/1945 | ||
2301 | 2407 | 11/1891 | NPT CDF 89A W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Oswestry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/03/1949 31/01/1951 01/1952 |
21/01/1952 | ||
2301 | 2408 | 11/1891 | BAN OXY BAN 89A W |
Banbury Oxley Banbury Oswestry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/06/1949 05/11/1949 20/05/1950 01/1953 |
12/01/1953 | ||
2301 | 2409 | 11/1891 | LLY NEY NEA CARM MCH 89A 89B W |
Llanelli Neyland Neath (Court Sart) Carmarthen Machynlleth Oswestry Brecon Withdrawn |
23/03/1946 20/04/1946 18/05/1946 15/06/1947 04/09/1948 23/04/1949 15/07/1950 27/12/1952 04/1953 |
22/04/1953 | ||
2301 | 2410 | 183 | 11/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2411 | 11/1891 | CARM NEA 87A 82B W |
Carmarthen Neath (Court Sart) Neath (Court Sart) St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 29/01/1949 04/11/1950 21/02/1953 04/1954 |
14/04/1954 | ||
2301 | 2412 | 122 | 11/1891 | wes W |
Salisbury (GWR) Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2413 | 137 | 11/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2414 | 12/1891 | STJ 86G 86E 86E W |
Severn Tunnel Junction Pontypool Road Severn Tunnel Junction Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/12/1951 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 03/1953 |
23/03/1953 | ||
2301 | 2415 | 98 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1940 | 12/1940 | |
2301 | 2416 | 135 | 12/1891 | CDF W |
Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2417 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1939 | 02/1939 | ||
2301 | 2418 | 119 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2419 | 106 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2420 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 21/04/1921 | 21/04/1921 | ||
2301 | 2421 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1938 | 05/1938 | ||
2301 | 2422 | 193 | 01/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2423 | 145 | 01/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1940 | 12/1940 | |
2301 | 2424 | 01/1892 | OSY W |
Oswestry Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 07/1946 |
22/07/1946 | ||
2301 | 2425 | 96 | 01/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1940 | 12/1940 | |
2301 | 2426 | 02/1892 | SPM WES 82B 82D W |
St Philips Marsh Westbury St Philips Marsh Westbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/06/1949 09/09/1950 24/01/1953 12/1953 |
14/12/1953 | ||
2301 | 2427 | 117 | 02/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2428 | 155 | 02/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2429 | 131 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2430 | 177 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2431 | 02/1893 | BCN CARM W |
Brecon Carmarthen Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 15/06/1947 11/1951 |
26/11/1951 | ||
2301 | 2432 | 134 | 03/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2433 | 93 | 03/1893 | CDF W |
Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 12/1940 |
12/1940 | |
2301 | 2434 | 164 | 03/1893 | STJ W |
Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2435 | 188 | 03/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2436 | 108 | 03/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2437 | 191 | 04/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2438 | 160 | 04/1893 | MCH ABH W |
Machynlleth Aberystwyth Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 07/03/1936 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2439 | 102 | 04/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2440 | 185 | 04/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2441 | 120 | 04/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2442 | 97 | 05/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1940 | 12/1940 | |
2301 | 2443 | 141 | 05/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2444 | 05/1893 | SPM SPM SPM WES W |
St Philips Marsh St Philips Marsh St Philips Marsh Westbury Withdrawn |
23/03/1946 15/06/1947 05/11/1949 03/12/1949 11/1952 |
05/11/1952 | ||
2301 | 2445 | 05/1893 | WES BRD 82B W |
Westbury Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/03/1949 09/09/1950 03/1953 |
27/03/1953 | ||
2301 | 2446 | 178 | 06/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2447 | 128 | 06/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2448 | 06/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1907 | 01/1907 | ||
2301 | 2449 | 07/1893 | OSY OSY W |
Oswestry Oswestry Withdrawn |
18/05/1946 15/06/1947 01/1953 |
08/01/1953 | ||
2301 | 2450 | 07/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1938 | 05/1938 | ||
2301 | 2451 | 174 | 10/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2452 | 10/1895 | OSY W |
Oswestry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/1952 |
27/10/1952 | ||
2301 | 2453 | 11/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 06/08/1921 | 06/08/1921 | ||
2301 | 2454 | 133 | 11/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2455 | 127 | 11/1895 | BCN OSY W |
Brecon Oswestry Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 08/02/1936 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2456 | 114 | 12/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2457 | 148 | 12/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2458 | 12/1895 | WOS 89B W |
Worcester Brecon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/01/1954 05/1954 |
11/05/1954 | ||
2301 | 2459 | 154 | 12/1895 | RDG W |
Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2460 | 12/1895 | STJ W |
Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
01/12/1945 15/06/1947 04/1954 |
14/04/1954 | ||
2301 | 2461 | 184 | 12/1895 | SPM W |
St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2462 | 12/1895 | SPM BRD SPM W |
St Philips Marsh Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
29/12/1945 15/06/1947 26/03/1949 01/1953 |
16/01/1953 | ||
2301 | 2463 | 167 | 12/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2464 | 01/1896 | MCH W |
Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1949 |
19/12/1949 | ||
2301 | 2465 | 162 | 01/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2466 | 179 | 01/1896 | ABH W |
Aberystwyth Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2467 | 158 | 01/1896 | SPM W |
St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2468 | 02/1896 | OSY MCH BCN W |
Oswestry Machynlleth Brecon Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 11/01/1936 22/07/1939 15/06/1947 01/1953 |
12/01/1953 | ||
2301 | 2469 | 161 | 02/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2470 | 95 | 02/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1940 | 12/1940 | |
2301 | 2471 | 121 | 02/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2472 | 189 | 03/1896 | SPM W |
St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2473 | 192 | 03/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2474 | 03/1896 | CARM 85C 81D W |
Carmarthen Hereford Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
22/07/1939 15/06/1947 08/08/1953 06/11/1954 04/1955 |
27/04/1955 | ||
2301 | 2475 | 157 | 03/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2476 | 163 | 04/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2477 | 143 | 04/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2478 | 172 | 04/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2479 | 169 | 04/1896 | CDF W |
Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2480 | 111 | 05/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2481 | 125 | 05/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2482 | 05/1896 | WES wes WES OSY 89B W |
Westbury Salisbury (GWR) Westbury Oswestry Brecon Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 14/12/1935 11/01/1936 22/07/1939 15/06/1947 17/10/1950 12/1952 |
22/12/1952 | ||
2301 | 2483 | 05/1896 | OSY 89B W |
Oswestry Brecon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 17/10/1950 09/1952 |
19/09/1952 | ||
2301 | 2484 | 06/1896 | CDF ABDR CDF W |
Cardiff Canton Aberdare Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 11/01/1936 22/07/1939 15/06/1947 04/09/1948 05/1954 |
13/05/1954 | ||
2301 | 2485 | 173 | 06/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2486 | 103 | 06/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2487 | 159 | 07/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2488 | 194 | 07/1896 | OXY W |
Oxley Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2489 | 142 | 07/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2490 | 118 | 07/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2491 | 3901 | 08/1896 | W PDN |
Withdrawn Old Oak Common |
05/1934 24/01/1948 |
14/05/1934 | |
2301 | 2492 | 3906 | 08/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 | |
2301 | 2493 | 3915 | 08/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 | |
2301 | 2494 | 3916 | 08/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 16/11/1934 | |
2301 | 2495 | 3918 | 08/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 | |
2301 | 2496 | 3919 | 09/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1934 | 10/03/1934 | |
2301 | 2497 | 3908 | 09/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1930 | 09/1930 | |
2301 | 2498 | 3902 | 09/1896 | W LA |
Withdrawn Laira |
08/1932 24/01/1948 |
08/1932 | |
2301 | 2499 | 3905 | 09/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1930 | 08/1930 | |
2301 | 2500 | 3910 | 09/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1931 | 04/1931 | |
2301 | 2501 | 3903 | 10/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 | |
2301 | 2502 | 3920 | 10/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1931 | 02/1931 | |
2301 | 2503 | 3913 | 10/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1931 | 06/1931 | |
2301 | 2504 | 3904 | 10/1896 | W SDN |
Withdrawn Swindon |
10/1933 24/01/1948 |
19/10/1933 | |
2301 | 2505 | 3917 | 10/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1932 | 10/1932 | |
2301 | 2506 | 3914 | 11/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1931 | 06/1931 | |
2301 | 2507 | 3909 | 11/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1930 | 10/1930 | |
2301 | 2508 | 3907 | 11/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1934 | 14/09/1934 | |
2301 | 2509 | 3911 | 11/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1932 | 07/1932 | |
2301 | 2510 | 3912 | 12/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1931 | 04/1931 | |
2301 | 2511 | 175 | 02/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2512 | 107 | 02/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2513 | 02/1897 | CHR 89B W |
Chester West Brecon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/12/1954 07/1955 |
01/07/1955 | ||
2301 | 2514 | 180 | 03/1897 | BCN OSY W |
Brecon Oswestry Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 14/12/1935 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2515 | 03/1897 | GLO GLO LYD HFD W |
Gloucester Horton Road Gloucester Horton Road Lydney Hereford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/02/1948 29/01/1949 23/04/1949 02/1953 |
05/02/1953 | ||
2301 | 2516 | 03/1897 | BCN OSY 81D 89A W |
Brecon Oswestry Reading (W.R.) Oswestry Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 15/06/1947 21/02/1953 22/05/1954 05/1956 |
28/05/1956 | ||
2301 | 2517 | 199 | 04/1897 | hfd WOS W |
Ledbury Worcester Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 11/01/1936 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2518 | 104 | 04/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2519 | 144 | 04/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2520 | 140 | 04/1897 | OSY W |
Oswestry Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2521 | 100 | 05/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1940 | 12/1940 | |
2301 | 2522 | 146 | 05/1897 | OSY BCN W |
Oswestry Brecon Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 14/12/1935 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2523 | 05/1897 | BCN W |
Brecon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/1949 |
13/09/1949 | ||
2301 | 2524 | 112 | 05/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2525 | 05/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1945 | 22/12/1945 | ||
2301 | 2526 | 132 | 05/1897 | BRD SPM BRD W |
Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 11/01/1936 08/02/1936 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2527 | 150 | 06/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2528 | 99 | 06/1897 | BRD SPM W |
Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 11/01/1936 12/1940 |
12/1940 | |
2301 | 2529 | 156 | 06/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2530 | 06/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1945 | 20/10/1945 | ||
2301 | 2531 | 195 | 06/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2532 | 06/1897 | RDG DID DID W |
Reading (W.R.) Didcot Didcot Withdrawn |
26/01/1946 20/04/1946 15/06/1947 05/1954 |
11/05/1954 | ||
2301 | 2533 | 101 | 07/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2534 | 07/1897 | BRD SPM BRD 82D W |
Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Bristol Bath Road Westbury Withdrawn |
01/12/1945 26/01/1946 15/06/1947 08/10/1949 31/12/1950 01/1953 |
01/01/1953 | ||
2301 | 2535 | 07/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1946 | 13/06/1946 | ||
2301 | 2536 | 170 | 07/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2537 | 07/1897 | CDF W |
Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/1953 |
20/01/1953 | ||
2301 | 2538 | 08/1897 | CDF CNYD 89B 85C 89A W |
Cardiff Canton Croes Newydd Brecon Hereford Oswestry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 23/04/1949 28/01/1950 29/11/1952 24/01/1953 08/08/1953 05/1957 |
15/05/1957 | ||
2301 | 2539 | 105 | 08/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2540 | 197 | 08/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2541 | 08/1897 | GLO HFD W |
Gloucester Horton Road Hereford Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 01/12/1945 29/12/1945 06/1954 |
04/06/1954 | ||
2301 | 2542 | 08/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 21/04/1921 | 21/04/1921 | ||
2301 | 2543 | 08/1897 | OSY W |
Oswestry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 02/1953 |
04/02/1953 | ||
2301 | 2544 | 123 | 09/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2545 | 171 | 09/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2546 | 138 | 09/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2547 | 115 | 09/1897 | SHL W |
Southall Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2548 | 168 | 09/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2549 | 165 | 09/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2550 | 153 | 09/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2551 | 11/1897 | WOS W |
Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/1953 |
22/09/1953 | ||
2301 | 2552 | 200 | 11/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2553 | 130 | 11/1897 | RDG W |
Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2554 | 11/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 14/11/1945 | ||
2301 | 2555 | 149 | 11/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2556 | 11/1897 | BCN OSY BCN OSY 85C W |
Brecon Oswestry Brecon Oswestry Hereford Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 14/12/1935 11/01/1936 15/06/1947 21/02/1953 06/1953 |
29/06/1953 | ||
2301 | 2557 | 151 | 11/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2558 | 176 | 12/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2559 | 198 | 12/1897 | OSY BCN W |
Oswestry Brecon Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 14/12/1935 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2560 | 129 | 12/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2561 | 110 | 01/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2562 | 124 | 01/1898 | WES W |
Westbury Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2563 | 01/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 21/04/1921 | 21/04/1921 | ||
2301 | 2564 | 01/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1945 | 01/09/1945 | ||
2301 | 2565 | 109 | 02/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2566 | 147 | 02/1898 | DID W |
Didcot Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2567 | 116 | 02/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2568 | 02/1898 | SDN W |
Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/1953 |
18/05/1953 | ||
2301 | 2569 | 04/1898 | BCN W |
Brecon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/1948 |
04/10/1948 | ||
2301 | 2570 | 04/1898 | CDF W |
Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/1949 |
17/01/1949 | ||
2301 | 2571 | 139 | 10/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2572 | 11/1898 | MCH W |
Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/12/1949 12/1952 |
22/12/1952 | ||
2301 | 2573 | 11/1898 | RDG W |
Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 02/1953 |
03/02/1953 | ||
2301 | 2574 | 166 | 11/1898 | OSY BCN W |
Oswestry Brecon Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 07/03/1936 10/1940 |
10/1940 | |
2301 | 2575 | 12/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1947 | 28/02/1947 | ||
2301 | 2576 | 196 | 12/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2577 | 136 | 01/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |
2301 | 2578 | 01/1899 | SPM SPM WES SPM W |
St Philips Marsh St Philips Marsh Westbury St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
26/01/1946 15/06/1947 29/01/1949 18/06/1949 09/1953 |
07/09/1953 | ||
2301 | 2579 | 01/1899 | OXF DID 81F W |
Oxford Didcot Oxford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/05/1948 19/05/1951 01/1954 |
04/01/1954 | ||
2301 | 2580 | 186 | 01/1899 | wos W |
Evesham Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 10/1940 |
10/1940 |