Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 62 Today
» 890 Yesterday
» 62 Week
» 24724 Month
» 283583 Year
» 794685 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

MR/LMS Fowler "4F" Class 0-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Mon 02/08/1954 44572 19A   Bow Works visit: Around the works. - In the shops. RO 9/1954  
Sat 25/02/1961 44112,
44165,
44179,
44241,
44279,
44304,
44387,
44404,
44416,
44580
21A,
41B,
21A,
17B,
15D,
16A,
18B,
41E,
16B,
21A
  Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
   
Sun 26/11/1961 44374 99C   Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works shunter. SLS 1/1962  
Sat 09/12/1961 44056,
44146,
44152,
44277,
44342,
44352,
44367,
44373,
44481,
44564,
44602
27C,
82F,
Wdn,
24G,
5B,
5E,
6K,
99C,
27E,
9E,
17C
  Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
SLS 1/1962  
Fri 15/12/1961 44043,
44202,
44211,
44226,
44263,
44288,
44344,
44401,
44539
18A,
16B,
21A,
21A,
17A,
18C,
5D,
16A,
15D
  Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on shed.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on shed.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on shed.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
SLS 1/1962  
Sat 10/03/1962 44319,
44328
Wdn,
63A
  Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Cemetery - boiler and/or firebox only.
Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Awaiting shopping.
   
Fri 16/03/1962 44092,
44180,
44262
21A,
16A,
17C
  Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed.
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
   
Fri 06/04/1962 44092,
44154,
44166,
44243,
44425,
44561,
44583
21A,
18B,
Wdn,
14B,
17A,
Wdn,
21A
  Derby Works visit: Around the works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - "Spike Island" (Gasworks) -
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Works sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Works sidings.
SLS 5/1962  
Sun 08/04/1962 44363,
44364,
44373
99C,
1E,
99C
  Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works shunter.
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - On Crewe South shed waiting
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works shunter.
SLS 5/1962  
Sun 15/04/1962 44061,
44074,
44266,
44334,
44346,
44364,
44379,
44405,
44468,
44554
8B,
5D,
8G,
17C,
12B,
1E,
9F,
5E,
24J,
9F
  Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Light repair shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Test house yard.
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Bolton shed
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Bolton shed
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
SLS 5/1962  
Wed 18/04/1962 44322,
44328
66A,
63A
  Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In shops.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In shops.
SLS 5/1962  
Sat 02/06/1962 44258,
44319
Wdn,
Wdn
  Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In the "Cemetery"
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In the "Cemetery"
SLS 7/1962  
Mon 04/06/1962 44188 27E   At Horwich Works Tony Gillett  
Fri 08/06/1962 44109,
44113,
44154,
44516,
44561,
44583
15D,
15D,
Wdn,
21A,
Wdn,
21A
  Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Klondyke Sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Foundry row.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Klondyke Sidings.
Derby Works visit: Around the works - ex Works on shed.
SLS 7/1962  
Sat 04/08/1962 44279 15D   Worked the 12:58 Hunstanton to Leicester BR passenger service BackTrack Jan 2007  
Sun 21/03/1965 44215,
44250,
44401,
44414,
44429
Wdn,
16E,
16E,
16E,
16E
  A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed John Thickitt - depot visit