Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 117 Today
» 1044 Yesterday
» 3383 Week
» 20034 Month
» 213878 Year
» 724980 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

MR/LMS Fowler "4F" Class 0-6-0


Class LMS BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
4F-C 4027 44027 11/1924 3B
3A
12F
W
Bushbury
Bescot
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
17/08/1963
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4028 44028 11/1924 14A
17D
20B
W
Cricklewood East
Rowsley
Stourton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
28/01/1956
11/1965
11/1965
4F-C 4029 44029 12/1924 14A
W
Cricklewood East
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1960
07/1960
4F-C 4030 44030 12/1924 16A
15C
W
Nottingham
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/11/1961
04/1964
04/1964
4F-C 4031 44031 12/1924 17A
W
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1960
05/1960
4F-C 4032 44032 12/1924 20H
6B
5D
W
Lancaster Green Ayre
Mold Junction
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
03/12/1955
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4033 44033 12/1924 15A
14A
16A
W
Wellingborough
Cricklewood East
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
29/11/1952
10/1961
10/1961
4F-C 4034 44034 12/1924 15C
W
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1963
07/1963
4F-C 4035 44035 01/1925 17B
11B
2F
W
Burton
Workington
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/03/1960
05/12/1964
02/1965
02/1965
4F-C 4036 44036 01/1925 19C
41B
41E
W
Canklow
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1958
07/05/1960
21/06/1962
21/06/1962
4F-C 4037 44037 01/1925 20B
18A
19C
W
Stourton
Toton
Canklow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
24/01/1953
09/1961
09/1961
4F-C 4038 44038 01/1925 25E
24B
27E
21A
18A
W
Sowerby Bridge
Rose Grove
Walton on the Hill
Saltley
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
07/10/1950
13/10/1962
10/08/1963
04/1964
04/1964
4F-C 4039 44039 01/1925 16A
19A
55F
56E
56A
W
Nottingham
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Manningham
Sowerby Bridge
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1956
15/04/1961
13/04/1963
11/01/1964
06/1964
06/1964
4F-C 4040 44040 01/1925 19E
26A
27E
21A
16B
W
Belle Vue
Newton Heath
Walton on the Hill
Saltley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/10/1955
03/12/1955
13/10/1962
22/06/1963
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4041 44041 02/1925 20F
8F
10G
8F
12A
W
Skipton
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Skipton
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/04/1963
30/11/1963
11/01/1964
04/04/1964
06/1964
06/1964
4F-C 4042 44042 02/1925 25E
25D
25C
25D
26G
17A
17C
16C
W
Sowerby Bridge
Mirfield
Goole
Mirfield
Belle Vue
Derby
Rowsley
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
26/01/1952
19/04/1952
28/11/1953
21/04/1956
20/06/1959
09/05/1964
10/1964
10/1964
4F-C 4043 44043 02/1925 18A
21D
15D
14B
14C
18A
15E
16G
16E
W
Toton
Stratford upon Avon
Bedford
Kentish Town
St Albans
Toton
Coalville
Westhouses
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
21/02/1953
06/09/1958
10/01/1959
16/01/1960
01/08/1964
19/12/1964
13/03/1965
07/1965
07/1965
4F-C 4044 44044 02/1925 20A
55B
W
Holbeck (MR)
Stourton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/03/1959
07/1965
07/1965
4F-C 4045 44045 03/1925 22B
85B
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/05/1964
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4046 44046 03/1925 17B
W
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1963
09/1963
4F-C 4047 44047 03/1925 17B
18A
17B
16A
17A
18A
17A
21A
16A
W
Burton
Toton
Burton
Nottingham
Derby
Toton
Derby
Saltley
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1953
03/12/1955
07/11/1959
16/09/1961
27/01/1962
10/03/1962
07/04/1962
12/01/1963
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4048 44048 03/1925 17B
17A
5E
5F
W
Burton
Derby
Alsager
Uttoxeter
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/01/1955
09/12/1961
23/06/1962
08/1964
08/1964
4F-C 4049 44049 03/1925 21A
17A
16G
W
Saltley
Derby
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1954
07/12/1963
12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4050 44050 03/1925 17D
W
Rowsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4051 44051 04/1925 14A
15B
18A
16D
16A
15E
W
Cricklewood East
Kettering
Toton
Nottingham
Toton
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1962
06/04/1963
09/11/1963
07/03/1964
01/08/1964
12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4052 44052 04/1925 14B
W
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1960
06/1960
4F-C 4053 44053 04/1925 18C
16B
18C
W
Hasland
Spital Bridge
Hasland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
02/12/1950
23/03/1963
23/03/1963
4F-C 4054 44054 05/1925 18C
16G
W
Hasland
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/10/1964
12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4055 44055 05/1925 16A
20A
55F
56E
W
Nottingham
Holbeck (MR)
Manningham
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/01/1955
24/01/1959
15/12/1962
11/1963
11/1963
4F-C 4056 44056 05/1925 23C
55D
W
Southport
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/03/1965
11/1965
11/1965
4F-C 4057 44057 08/1925 3E
2E
21B
66A
65F
21B
9G
2F
2E
2F
W
Monument Lane
Northampton
Bescot
Polmadie
Grangemouth
Bescot
Gorton
Bescot
Saltley
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/11/1960
11/04/1961
09/03/1963
16/03/1963
06/07/1963
14/09/1963
05/12/1964
17/07/1965
13/11/1965
13/11/1965
13/11/1965
4F-C 4058 44058 08/1925 3D
2A
6E
1A
W
Aston
Rugby
Wrexham Rhosddu
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
29/11/1952
01/11/1958
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4059 44059 09/1925 11B
9F
3E
9B
9D
W
Barrow in Furness
Heaton Mersey
Monument Lane
Stockport Edgeley
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/03/1955
31/12/1955
19/05/1956
07/11/1959
08/1964
08/1964
4F-C 4060 44060 09/1925 11A
12A
24L
12A
W
Carnforth
Carlisle Upperby
Carnforth
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1952
10/03/1962
16/06/1962
03/1964
03/1964
4F-C 4061 44061 09/1925 3A
4B
9A
5E
8B
24G
9F
24G
12D
W
Bescot
Northampton
Longsight
Alsager
Warrington Dallam
Skipton
Heaton Mersey
Skipton
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
23/03/1957
07/11/1959
05/11/1960
12/01/1963
06/04/1963
27/04/1963
19/09/1964
06/1965
06/1965
4F-C 4062 44062 09/1925 23C
25D
25A
25D
56F
56A
W
Southport
Mirfield
Wakefield
Mirfield
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
30/01/1954
06/11/1954
21/09/1957
16/12/1961
09/1962
09/1962
4F-C 4063 44063 09/1925 5E
5E
8B
9M
10G
9L
W
Alsager
Alsager
Warrington Dallam
Bury
Skipton
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
19/11/1960
20/06/1964
28/11/1964
01/05/1965
06/1965
06/1965
4F-C 4064 44064 10/1925 12D
8E
2A
5D
W
Workington
Brunswick
Rugby
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
16/05/1953
23/05/1959
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4065 44065 10/1925 6B
8C
12F
W
Mold Junction
Speke Junction
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/06/1960
17/09/1960
01/1965
01/1965
4F-C 4066 44066 10/1925 18D
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4067 44067 10/1925 5D
1C
1A
5F
3D
5E
W
Stoke
Watford
Willesden
Uttoxeter
Aston
Alsager
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
16/06/1956
23/02/1957
04/10/1958
22/11/1958
04/1961
04/1961
4F-C 4068 44068 10/1925 5D
W
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4069 44069 10/1925 3C
9B
9A
8F
W
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Stockport Edgeley
Longsight
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
04/10/1952
22/03/1958
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4070 44070 11/1925 18D
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/06/1962
26/06/1962
4F-C 4071 44071 11/1925 19C
41E
W
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/09/1962
22/04/1963
22/04/1963
4F-C 4072 44072 11/1925 2B
1E
W
Bletchley
Bletchley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/01/1954
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4073 44073 11/1925 6B
W
Mold Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4074 44074 11/1925 9B
5D
66A
67B
5D
W
Stockport Edgeley
Stoke
Polmadie
Hurlford
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1953
09/03/1963
16/03/1963
27/07/1963
09/1963
09/1963
4F-C 4075 44075 11/1925 12D
5D
9B
5E
9B
6H
2E
8G
W
Workington
Stoke
Stockport Edgeley
Alsager
Stockport Edgeley
Bangor
Northampton
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
21/02/1953
20/12/1958
03/01/1959
07/11/1959
11/06/1960
18/03/1961
27/11/1965
27/11/1965
4F-C 4076 44076 11/1925 2C
8F
8B
9L
W
Northampton
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Warrington Dallam
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/04/1961
13/07/1963
02/05/1964
07/1965
07/1965
4F-C 4077 44077 11/1925 3D
5D
W
Aston
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4078 44078 11/1925 9A
3A
9G
9E
17C
17A
9G
W
Longsight
Bescot
Gorton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Rowsley
Derby
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
21/02/1959
09/05/1959
09/01/1960
14/01/1961
11/02/1961
04/1964
04/1964
4F-C 4079 44079 11/1925 10D
5B
5D
W
Plodder Lane
Crewe South
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
23/06/1962
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4080 44080 11/1925 9D
19D
9E
17C
16C
15E
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Heaton Mersey
Trafford Park (LMS)
Rowsley
Derby
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
28/01/1956
09/01/1960
09/05/1964
30/05/1964
07/1964
07/1964
4F-C 4081 44081 11/1925 12B
24L
12B
W
Carlisle Upperby
Carnforth
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/11/1962
09/03/1963
09/1965
09/1965
4F-C 4082 44082 09/1925 16C
18A
16B
19C
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Toton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Canklow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/01/1956
16/06/1956
11/08/1956
09/1961
09/1961
4F-C 4083 44083 09/1925 11E
24L
9D
W
Tebay
Carnforth
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
21/04/1962
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4084 44084 10/1925 21A
W
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4085 44085 10/1925 17C
W
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4086 44086 11/1925 12B
11B
8G
12C
W
Carlisle Upperby
Barrow in Furness
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
18/06/1960
21/08/1965
13/11/1965
13/11/1965
4F-C 4087 44087 11/1925 17B
19A
55D
W
Burton
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/03/1957
15/04/1961
27/02/1962
27/02/1962
4F-C 4088 44088 11/1925 21A
18A
16B
18D
W
Saltley
Toton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1953
16/06/1956
05/10/1957
10/11/1961
10/11/1961
4F-C 4089 44089 11/1925 18A
19C
W
Toton
Canklow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4090 44090 11/1925 19D
9A
9F
W
Heaton Mersey
Longsight
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
09/08/1952
10/1961
10/1961
4F-C 4091 44091 11/1925 18A
18A
21A
16B
W
Toton
Toton
Saltley
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/09/1958
06/12/1958
16/12/1961
02/1964
02/1964
4F-C 4092 44092 11/1925 21A
9D
W
Saltley
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/04/1964
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4093 44093 11/1925 5D
W
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4094 44094 11/1925 20B
56E
W
Stourton
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/12/1962
03/05/1963
03/05/1963
4F-C 4095 44095 11/1925 16A
W
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4096 44096 11/1925 22C
26D
9G
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Bury
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/03/1960
22/02/1964
10/1964
10/1964
4F-C 4097 44097 11/1925 16B
41B
56A
55F
W
Spital Bridge
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Wakefield
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1960
15/04/1961
25/11/1961
06/1963
06/1963
4F-C 4098 44098 11/1925 20D
55D
W
Normanton
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1962
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4099 44099 12/1925 20D
55D
W
Normanton
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1962
02/1965
02/1965
4F-C 4100 44100 12/1925 17B
W
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/03/1963
30/03/1963
4F-C 4101 44101 12/1925 17A
17D
W
Derby
Rowsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
05/1963
05/1963
4F-C 4102 44102 12/1925 22D
82F
W
Templecombe (S&D)
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/11/1963
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4103 44103 12/1925 17C
W
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4104 44104 12/1925 18D
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/05/1962
24/05/1962
4F-C 4105 44105 12/1925 25C
24D
27D
24G
W
Goole
Lower Darwen
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
11/08/1951
05/10/1957
10/1961
10/1961
4F-C 4106 44106 01/1926 18A
W
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1964
02/1964
4F-C 4107 44107 12/1924 18C
20C
55B
W
Hasland
Royston
Stourton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
07/11/1959
09/1961
09/1961
4F-C 4108 44108 01/1925 21A
W
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4109 44109 02/1925 17C
W
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4110 44110 03/1925 19D
16B
2E
2B
2E
21B
21D
8F
9D
W
Heaton Mersey
Spital Bridge
Northampton
Nuneaton
Northampton
Bescot
Aston
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
06/02/1960
07/05/1960
11/06/1960
11/04/1961
10/06/1961
14/07/1962
15/09/1962
04/1964
04/1964
4F-C 4111 44111 03/1925 19D
W
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1961
09/1961
4F-C 4112 44112 03/1925 22A
17A
17B
21A
21A
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Derby
Burton
Saltley
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
19/05/1951
16/06/1951
11/04/1961
19/01/1963
19/01/1963
4F-C 4113 44113 05/1925 16C
17B
17C
16G
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Burton
Coalville
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/02/1954
24/04/1954
19/12/1964
01/1966
01/1966
4F-C 4114 44114 05/1925 19E
39A
W
Belle Vue
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1956
05/1963
05/1963
4F-C 4115 44115 05/1925 3C
3E
5E
5D
8B
W
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Monument Lane
Alsager
Stoke
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
20/06/1959
12/12/1959
09/11/1963
07/1965
07/1965
4F-C 4116 44116 05/1925 1A
W
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4117 44117 06/1925 19D
16B
9G
6B
1E
2A
8G
W
Heaton Mersey
Spital Bridge
Northwich
Mold Junction
Bletchley
Rugby
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
29/11/1952
31/10/1953
28/11/1959
18/06/1960
17/09/1960
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4118 44118 06/1925 11A
5D
16A
18B
27F
18B
27E
15A
18A
17A
16G
W
Carnforth
Stoke
Nottingham
Westhouses
Brunswick
Westhouses
Walton on the Hill
Wellingborough
Toton
Derby
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
27/01/1951
16/06/1951
22/04/1961
01/07/1961
15/09/1962
22/09/1962
08/12/1962
20/07/1963
05/12/1964
05/1965
05/1965
4F-C 4119 44119 06/1925 10D
19E
26A
24G
24D
W
Plodder Lane
Belle Vue
Newton Heath
Skipton
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
21/04/1956
05/10/1957
23/01/1960
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4120 44120 07/1925 1B
11B
4B
3D
W
Camden
Barrow in Furness
Northampton
Aston
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
03/01/1953
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4121 44121 07/1925 1B
12B
8F
W
Camden
Carlisle Upperby
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
29/04/1961
01/1965
01/1965
4F-C 4122 44122 07/1925 18D
18B
18D
15B
17C
18C
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Westhouses
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Kettering
Rowsley
Hasland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/02/1954
27/03/1954
29/12/1956
19/04/1958
06/09/1958
09/1962
09/1962
4F-C 4123 44123 07/1925 15C
22B
85B
W
Leicester Midland
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
04/05/1964
06/1965
06/1965
4F-C 4124 44124 07/1925 17B
9G
W
Burton
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/05/1962
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4125 44125 08/1925 10E
5B
9D
12B
8F
24G
10H
10G
W
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Crewe South
Buxton (LNWR)
Carlisle Upperby
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Skipton
Lower Darwen
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
09/07/1960
15/10/1960
29/04/1961
12/01/1963
26/09/1964
24/10/1964
03/1965
03/1965
4F-C 4126 44126 08/1925 11A
5E
12A
5E
5D
6C
5D
W
Carnforth
Alsager
Carlisle Upperby
Alsager
Stoke
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
08/10/1955
09/12/1961
23/06/1962
29/06/1963
24/08/1963
09/1963
09/1963
4F-C 4127 44127 08/1925 19C
8E
8C
99C
8G
W
Canklow
Brunswick
Speke Junction
Crewe Works
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/03/1957
16/09/1961
30/09/1961
25/11/1961
01/1965
01/1965
4F-C 4128 44128 08/1925 19C
W
Canklow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
4F-C 4129 44129 08/1925 18D
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/09/1962
27/09/1962
4F-C 4130 44130 09/1925 18B
W
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4131 44131 09/1925 16A
16A
18B
21A
9M
W
Nottingham
Nottingham
Westhouses
Saltley
Bury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
18/11/1961
07/04/1962
25/04/1964
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4132 44132 09/1925 16A
W
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1963
08/1963
4F-C 4133 44133 09/1925 18A
18C
18A
W
Toton
Hasland
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1957
07/11/1959
11/1963
11/1963
4F-C 4134 44134 09/1925 17D
15E
W
Rowsley
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/05/1964
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4135 44135 09/1925 22A
22B
22A
82G
82E
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Gloucester Barnwood
Bristol Barrow Road
Templecombe (S&D)
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
31/10/1953
21/03/1959
05/09/1959
04/1965
04/1965
4F-C 4136 44136 10/1925 18B
18C
W
Westhouses
Hasland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/03/1955
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4137 44137 10/1925 21A
5D
2E
99C
W
Saltley
Stoke
Saltley
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/09/1964
17/10/1964
05/12/1964
02/1965
02/1965
4F-C 4138 44138 10/1925 21B
21A
9E
14B
16A
17A
W
Bournville
Saltley
Trafford Park (LMS)
Kentish Town
Nottingham
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
09/05/1959
18/06/1960
28/10/1961
18/11/1961
14/07/1962
14/07/1962
4F-C 4139 44139 10/1925 21A
14A
16F
16D
16D
16E
2F
W
Saltley
Cricklewood East
Burton
Nottingham
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
25/04/1964
23/05/1964
30/05/1964
08/08/1964
06/02/1965
08/1965
08/1965
4F-C 4140 44140 10/1925 16C
18A
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/01/1956
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4141 44141 11/1925 20C
W
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1961
07/1961
4F-C 4142 44142 11/1925 17A
W
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4143 44143 11/1925 17B
14B
21A
W
Burton
Kentish Town
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/01/1955
04/10/1958
13/10/1962
13/10/1962
4F-C 4144 44144 11/1925 19D
9A
9F
W
Heaton Mersey
Longsight
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/08/1952
04/10/1952
08/1959
08/1959
4F-C 4145 44145 11/1925 21A
W
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1959
02/1959
4F-C 4146 44146 11/1925 22D
71G
W
Templecombe (S&D)
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/07/1957
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4147 44147 11/1925 18D
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1961
09/1961
4F-C 4146 44148 11/1925 17C
W
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1961
05/1961
4F-C 4149 44149 11/1925 20G
24G
W
Hellifield
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/06/1963
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4150 44150 11/1925 18A
18A
18B
15D
W
Toton
Toton
Westhouses
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/08/1955
05/11/1955
28/03/1959
26/01/1963
26/01/1963
4F-C 4151 44151 12/1925 20A
16A
17A
9G
W
Holbeck (MR)
Nottingham
Derby
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/01/1953
18/11/1961
12/05/1962
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4152 44152 12/1925 16B
31B
W
Spital Bridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1960
09/1961
09/1961
4F-C 4153 44153 12/1925 20D
20B
56E
W
Normanton
Stourton
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
15/12/1962
29/04/1963
29/04/1963
4F-C 4154 44154 12/1925 18D
18A
27F
18B
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Toton
Brunswick
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/08/1952
04/10/1958
09/05/1959
07/04/1962
07/04/1962
4F-C 4155 44155 12/1925 16B
9G
2F
W
Spital Bridge
Northwich
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
05/12/1964
10/1965
10/1965
4F-C 4156 44156 12/1925 17B
15A
15D
W
15C
Burton
Wellingborough
Coalville
Withdrawn
Kettering
01/01/1948
16/01/1960
01/12/1962
02/1964
01/02/1964
02/1964
4F-C 4157 44157 12/1925 18A
2B
12C
W
Toton
Nuneaton
Carlisle Canal
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/12/1956
12/07/1958
07/1965
07/1965
4F-C 4158 44158 12/1925 16A
15C
W
Nottingham
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/11/1961
14/07/1962
14/07/1962
4F-C 4159 44159 02/1926 30B
67B
67D
67A
67B
W
Hurlford
Hurlford
Ardrossan
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1952
08/06/1957
19/12/1959
18/11/1961
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
4F-C 4160 44160 02/1926 15A
21A
9G
9E
12D
W
Wellingborough
Saltley
Gorton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1954
25/04/1964
05/12/1964
02/01/1965
12/1965
12/1965
4F-C 4161 44161 02/1926 20C
18A
W
Royston
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4162 44162 02/1926 18C
18A
W
Hasland
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4163 44163 02/1926 17D
16B
W
Rowsley
Spital Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
07/1960
07/1960
4F-C 4164 44164 02/1926 16A
6B
9G
W
Nottingham
Mold Junction
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/08/1953
12/05/1962
07/1963
07/1963
4F-C 4165 44165 02/1926 19A
9L
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/04/1964
08/1964
08/1964
4F-C 4166 44166 02/1926 17B
17D
17C
W
Burton
Rowsley
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1954
01/01/1955
27/01/1962
27/01/1962
4F-C 4167 44167 03/1926 22B
82G
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/12/1962
01/1964
01/1964
4F-C 4168 44168 03/1926 17D
17B
21A
16A
16B
W
Rowsley
Burton
Saltley
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/01/1959
07/11/1959
12/01/1963
06/07/1963
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4169 44169 03/1926 22A
17A
15A
9G
9E
9L
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Derby
Wellingborough
Gorton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1954
04/03/1961
18/03/1961
08/08/1964
28/11/1964
08/1965
08/1965
4F-C 4170 44170 03/1926 17B
20D
55H
55E
W
Burton
Normanton
Neville Hill
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
14/04/1962
28/12/1963
11/1965
11/1965
4F-C 4171 44171 03/1926 17B
20D
21A
14E
15A
15E
W
Burton
Normanton
Saltley
Bedford
Wellingborough
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
01/01/1955
16/12/1961
03/08/1963
23/11/1963
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4172 44172 03/1926 17D
W
16C
Rowsley
Withdrawn
Derby
01/01/1948
05/1964
09/05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4173 44173 04/1926 19C
18B
W
Canklow
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4174 44174 04/1926 17D
19A
41D
41E
W
Rowsley
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1952
16/09/1961
16/06/1962
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4175 44175 04/1926 22B
22B
17B
15C
15A
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Burton
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
01/12/1956
29/12/1956
26/01/1957
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4176 44176 04/1926 21A
17A
W
Saltley
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1956
07/1963
07/1963
4F-C 4177 44177 12/1924 17A
17C
18B
27E
9G
9E
W
Derby
Rowsley
Westhouses
Walton on the Hill
Gorton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1959
25/07/1959
15/09/1962
04/01/1964
10/10/1964
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4178 44178 12/1924 19D
17C
18A
16G
W
Heaton Mersey
Rowsley
Toton
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
12/07/1958
05/10/1963
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4179 44179 01/1925 20D
20B
21A
2F
2E
5D
2E
W
Normanton
Stourton
Saltley
Bescot
Saltley
Stoke
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
14/01/1950
28/12/1963
18/04/1964
15/08/1964
24/10/1964
12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4180 44180 02/1925 16A
21A
W
Nottingham
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/04/1962
04/1964
04/1964
4F-C 4181 44181 02/1925 12A
8B
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/11/1963
08/1965
08/1965
4F-C 4182 44182 02/1925 18D
14A
15C
15A
15C
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Cricklewood East
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/08/1954
09/10/1954
21/05/1955
08/10/1960
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4183 44183 03/1925 12A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4184 44184 03/1925 21A
15C
21A
16A
15E
W
Saltley
Leicester Midland
Saltley
Nottingham
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1954
06/09/1958
12/01/1963
21/09/1963
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4185 44185 03/1925 21A
9G
W
Saltley
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/04/1964
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4186 44186 03/1925 21A
2E
5B
5D
12H
12E
W
Saltley
Northampton
Crewe South
Stoke
Stranraer
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1953
05/11/1955
15/08/1959
18/06/1960
17/09/1960
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4187 44187 04/1925 18A
W
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1962
21/07/1962
4F-C 4188 44188 04/1925 18B
27E
9G
10G
2F
W
Westhouses
Walton on the Hill
Gorton
Skipton
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/03/1957
04/01/1964
03/10/1964
05/12/1964
13/11/1965
13/11/1965
4F-C 4189 44189 04/1925 12A
68B
67A
67C
67B
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Dumfries
Corkerhill
Ayr
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/11/1955
27/10/1956
18/11/1961
08/09/1962
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
4F-C 4190 44190 05/1925 21A
18A
17C
16B
16A
9G
W
Saltley
Toton
Coalville
Kirkby in Ashfield
Nottingham
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1953
08/10/1955
10/01/1959
20/06/1959
25/02/1961
09/1963
09/1963
4F-C 4191 44191 05/1925 18B
W
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1964
08/1964
4F-C 4192 44192 06/1925 12D
8G
27E
10H
9E
12D
W
Workington
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Walton on the Hill
Lower Darwen
Trafford Park (LMS)
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1958
22/06/1963
04/01/1964
22/02/1964
12/12/1964
04/1965
04/1965
4F-C 4193 44193 06/1925 29A
66A
66B
W
Perth South
Polmadie
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/12/1958
16/06/1962
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
4F-C 4194 44194 06/1925 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
4F-C 4195 44195 07/1925 17A
14A
9E
9G
8B
W
Derby
Cricklewood East
Trafford Park (LMS)
Gorton
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
18/11/1961
12/05/1962
12/12/1964
03/1965
03/1965
4F-C 4196 44196 07/1925 29A
66C
66B
W
Perth South
Hamilton (West)
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1957
26/09/1959
08/01/1962
08/01/1962
4F-C 4197 44197 10/1925 20F
W
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4198 44198 10/1925 30B
67B
W
Hurlford
Hurlford
Withdrawn
(Re-instd)
01/01/1948
18/11/1961
29/12/1962
02/1963
29/12/1962
4F-C 4199 44199 10/1925 12A
65B
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/12/1956
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
4F-C 4200 44200 10/1925 21A
8G
12C
W
Saltley
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/11/1963
19/09/1964
07/1965
07/1965
4F-C 4201 44201 10/1925 20H
21A
W
Lancaster Green Ayre
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
09/1959
09/1959
4F-C 4202 44202 10/1925 16C
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1963
09/1963
4F-C 4203 44203 11/1925 21A
21B
21A
17C
17A
15C
14E
16B
15C
15E
16G
W
Saltley
Bournville
Saltley
Rowsley
Derby
Leicester Midland
Bedford
Kirkby in Ashfield
Kettering
Coalville
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1957
22/11/1958
30/12/1961
06/01/1962
24/03/1962
07/04/1962
03/08/1963
14/09/1963
10/10/1964
19/12/1964
03/1966
03/1966
4F-C 4204 44204 11/1925 21D
21A
18B
16A
W
Stratford upon Avon
Saltley
Westhouses
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
25/02/1956
14/06/1958
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4205 44205 11/1925 16C
14A
16C
18A
18D
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Cricklewood East
Kirkby in Ashfield
Toton
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1954
17/07/1954
28/01/1956
11/08/1956
03/03/1963
03/03/1963
4F-C 4206 44206 11/1925 16C
19C
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Canklow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1956
06/1961
06/1961
4F-C 4207 44207 11/1925 21A
55B
W
Saltley
Stourton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/01/1959
11/1963
11/1963
4F-C 4208 44208 11/1925 1A
8B
12A
5E
5D
6C
5D
W
Willesden
Warrington Dallam
Carlisle Kingmoor
Alsager
Stoke
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1960
15/10/1960
09/12/1961
07/04/1962
29/06/1963
14/09/1963
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4209 44209 11/1925 17D
22B
82E
W
Rowsley
Gloucester Barnwood
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1951
16/06/1962
06/1963
06/1963
4F-C 4210 44210 11/1925 14A
14B
14A
18A
15E
2F
W
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Toton
Coalville
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
25/08/1962
16/02/1963
18/07/1964
05/12/1964
10/1965
10/1965
4F-C 4211 44211 12/1925 19A
21A
10A
10G
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Saltley
Carnforth
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1952
25/04/1964
17/10/1964
03/1965
03/1965
4F-C 4212 44212 12/1925 19A
41D
41E
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/09/1961
26/05/1962
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4213 44213 12/1925 21A
18A
16E
W
Saltley
Toton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/02/1962
09/11/1963
06/1964
06/1964
4F-C 4214 44214 12/1925 17A
W
16G
Derby
Withdrawn
Westhouses
01/01/1948
12/1964
05/12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4215 44215 12/1925 16A
16A
16E
W
Nottingham
Toton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/04/1964
08/08/1964
02/1965
02/1965
4F-C 4216 44216 12/1925 20D
W
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1962
09/1962
4F-C 4217 44217 01/1926 20D
15D
18A
18C
W
Normanton
Bedford
Toton
Hasland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/08/1954
06/11/1954
26/01/1957
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4218 44218 01/1926 16B
27E
17B
17A
21A
5B
5D
5B
16G
W
Spital Bridge
Walton on the Hill
Burton
Derby
Saltley
Crewe South
Stoke
Crewe South
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1953
03/02/1962
10/02/1962
07/04/1962
28/12/1963
22/08/1964
24/10/1964
02/01/1965
03/1966
03/1966
4F-C 4219 44219 01/1926 3D
2E
8B
W
Aston
Northampton
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
30/06/1962
11/1963
11/1963
4F-C 4220 44220 01/1926 23B
24D
27D
24G
9F
9G
W
Aintree
Lower Darwen
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Skipton
Heaton Mersey
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
11/08/1951
08/11/1958
04/05/1963
03/08/1963
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4221 44221 01/1926 25C
24B
27E
27D
26A
W
Goole
Rose Grove
Walton on the Hill
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
07/10/1950
28/11/1953
15/09/1962
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4222 44222 01/1926 20F
91E
27D
10G
10H
W
10G
Skipton
To Eastern Region
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Skipton
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
Skipton
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
09/04/1960
18/04/1964
24/10/1964
11/1964
07/11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4223 44223 01/1926 16A
91E
W
Nottingham
To Eastern Region
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
11/1963
11/1963
4F-C 4224 44224 01/1926 21A
17A
16C
18A
W
Saltley
Derby
Kirkby in Ashfield
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1954
21/05/1955
28/01/1956
03/02/1962
03/02/1962
4F-C 4225 44225 02/1926 24D
27D
W
Lower Darwen
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1951
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4226 44226 02/1926 17B
21A
W
Burton
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4227 44227 02/1926 17C
21A
W
Coalville
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4228 44228 02/1926 13A
14B
91E
14A
14E
W
Plaistow
Kentish Town
To Eastern Region
Cricklewood East
Bedford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
19/05/1951
22/03/1952
18/11/1961
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
4F-C 4229 44229 02/1926 22B
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4230 44230 02/1926 16A
16D
16C
15A
21A
W
Nottingham
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Wellingborough
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/08/1953
02/01/1954
30/01/1954
01/01/1955
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4231 44231 02/1926 15C
W
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1963
06/1963
4F-C 4232 44232 03/1926 19C
19C
8E
8C
8B
W
Canklow
Canklow
Brunswick
Speke Junction
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
23/03/1957
16/09/1961
04/11/1961
11/1963
11/1963
4F-C 4233 44233 03/1926 18A
18B
W
Toton
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/11/1955
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4234 44234 03/1926 27A
65F
W
Polmadie
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/04/1959
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
4F-C 4235 44235 03/1926 22B
21A
14B
15A
18A
16H
16G
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Saltley
Kentish Town
Wellingborough
Toton
Hasland
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
14/02/1959
25/08/1962
08/12/1962
08/08/1964
24/10/1964
12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4236 44236 03/1926 19G
9F
9G
W
Trafford Park (LMS)
Heaton Mersey
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/11/1955
19/12/1959
10/1964
10/1964
4F-C 4237 44237 03/1926 19D
10D
8B
W
Heaton Mersey
Plodder Lane
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
09/10/1954
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4238 44238 03/1926 16B
20B
W
Spital Bridge
Stourton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4239 44239 04/1926 16B
2E
2B
2E
8B
W
Spital Bridge
Northampton
Nuneaton
Northampton
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1960
07/05/1960
11/06/1960
30/06/1962
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4240 44240 04/1926 24D
27D
10G
W
Lower Darwen
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1951
18/04/1964
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4241 44241 04/1926 18A
20C
20B
17D
27E
17D
17B
9G
17A
16A
W
Toton
Royston
Stourton
Rowsley
Walton on the Hill
Rowsley
Burton
Gorton
Derby
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
16/06/1951
19/06/1954
26/01/1957
23/03/1957
10/01/1959
12/05/1962
17/11/1962
05/01/1963
07/1963
07/1963
4F-C 4242 44242 04/1926 15A
16B
21D
2E
5E
5D
9G
W
Wellingborough
Spital Bridge
Stratford upon Avon
Northampton
Alsager
Stoke
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
27/01/1951
21/02/1953
15/04/1961
07/04/1962
09/11/1963
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4243 44243 04/1926 14A
14B
15A
18A
17C
16C
16G
W
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Wellingborough
Toton
Rowsley
Derby
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
25/08/1962
16/02/1963
10/08/1963
09/05/1964
05/12/1964
09/1965
09/1965
4F-C 4244 44244 04/1926 18C
18B
15C
15E
W
Hasland
Westhouses
Kettering
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/07/1960
14/09/1963
01/02/1964
10/1964
10/1964
4F-C 4245 44245 04/1926 20B
20G
19C
W
Stourton
Hellifield
Canklow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/01/1953
24/04/1954
17/05/1962
17/05/1962
4F-C 4246 44246 05/1926 17D
5D
8F
W
Rowsley
Stoke
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
10/11/1962
12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4247 44247 05/1926 16A
40A
40A
35C
2E
9D
9D
W
Nottingham
Lincoln
Lincoln
Spital Bridge
Northampton
Buxton (LNWR)
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
20/06/1953
19/09/1953
06/02/1960
18/08/1962
17/10/1964
04/12/1965
04/12/1965
4F-C 4248 44248 05/1926 21A
15A
16A
16F
16E
W
Saltley
Wellingborough
Nottingham
Burton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1957
06/09/1958
07/03/1964
27/06/1964
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4249 44249 06/1926 17D
17A
18D
W
Rowsley
Derby
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
09/10/1954
08/11/1961
08/11/1961
4F-C 4250 44250 06/1926 18A
16B
17D
17E
16E
W
Toton
Spital Bridge
Rowsley
Heaton Mersey
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
05/11/1955
23/02/1957
08/02/1964
05/1965
05/1965
4F-C 4251 44251 06/1926 29A
66A
W
Perth South
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/12/1958
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
4F-C 4252 44252 07/1926 17C
15C
16C
16B
W
Coalville
Leicester Midland
Mansfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1955
10/01/1959
09/04/1960
04/05/1963
04/05/1963
4F-C 4253 44253 07/1926 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
4F-C 4254 44254 07/1926 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
4F-C 4255 44255 07/1926 31A
65J
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Fort William
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/01/1958
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
4F-C 4256 44256 07/1926 31A
66A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/03/1959
30/04/1962
30/04/1962
4F-C 4257 44257 07/1926 31A
W
St Rollox (Balornock)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
4F-C 4258 44258 08/1926 29A
60A
W
Perth South
Inverness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/09/1961
21/05/1962
21/05/1962
4F-C 4259 44259 08/1926 13C
16A
15D
W
Tilbury
Nottingham
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/02/1963
06/07/1963
08/1964
08/1964
4F-C 4260 44260 08/1926 17C
15C
15E
W
Coalville
Kettering
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/02/1964
19/09/1964
10/1964
10/1964
4F-C 4261 44261 09/1926 19E
10D
8B
9F
18C
18A
18C
W
Belle Vue
Plodder Lane
Warrington Dallam
Heaton Mersey
Hasland
Toton
Hasland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
09/10/1954
29/01/1955
30/04/1960
27/01/1962
10/03/1962
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4262 44262 09/1926 17D
W
Rowsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1963
09/1963
4F-C 4263 44263 10/1926 17A
10H
10G
W
Derby
Lower Darwen
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/04/1964
26/09/1964
03/1965
03/1965
4F-C 4264 44264 10/1926 16A
82E
82E
85B
W
Nottingham
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1962
29/06/1963
13/06/1965
11/1965
11/1965
4F-C 4265 44265 10/1926 17B
19A
41D
41E
W
Burton
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/01/1955
16/09/1961
16/06/1962
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4266 44266 10/1926 22A
22A
15D

8G
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bedford

Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
03/11/1956
22/03/1958
04/10/1958
03/1965
03/1965
4F-C 4267 44267 10/1926 16A
18D
W
Nottingham
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/10/1953
24/05/1962
24/05/1962
4F-C 4268 44268 10/1926 16C
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/03/1963
02/03/1963
4F-C 4269 44269 10/1926 22B
22A
85B
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Bristol Barrow Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
13/06/1965
03/12/1965
03/12/1965
4F-C 4270 44270 11/1926 17B
14B
18A
W
Burton
Kentish Town
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
16/01/1960
11/1963
11/1963
4F-C 4271 44271 11/1926 19D
19E
9B
5D
5F
5D
9D
W
Heaton Mersey
Belle Vue
Stockport Edgeley
Stoke
Uttoxeter
Stoke
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
04/10/1952
22/11/1958
17/10/1959
24/10/1959
10/11/1962
12/1965
12/1965
4F-C 4272 44272 11/1926 22B
84D
85C
82G
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Leamington
Gloucester Barnwood
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/08/1961
09/09/1961
11/08/1962
06/1963
06/1963
4F-C 4273 44273 11/1926 16B
31B
W
Spital Bridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1960
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
4F-C 4274 44274 11/1926 18C
20C
W
Hasland
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/11/1954
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4275 44275 11/1926 16A
19A
9E
9G
9E
9G
W
9E
Nottingham
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Trafford Park (LMS)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Gorton
Withdrawn
Trafford Park (LMS)
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
11/07/1953
09/05/1959
12/11/1960
19/05/1962
10/1964
03/10/1964
10/1964
4F-C 4276 44276 12/1926 20F
24G
W
Skipton
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/06/1963
05/1965
05/1965
4F-C 4277 44277 12/1926 20F
W
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1965
05/1965
4F-C 4278 44278 12/1926 15B
17C
15D
15A
18A
16G
W
Kettering
Rowsley
Coalville
Wellingborough
Toton
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1958
06/09/1958
16/01/1960
08/12/1962
22/08/1964
01/1966
01/1966
4F-C 4279 44279 12/1926 17C
W
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1964
01/1964
4F-C 4280 44280 12/1926 20H
10E
8F
W
Lancaster Green Ayre
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1952
22/03/1958
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4281 44281 12/1926 27A
67B
W
Polmadie
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
4F-C 4282 44282 12/1926 20G
24G
24H
12A
W
Hellifield
Skipton
Hellifield
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/01/1960
15/09/1962
22/06/1963
07/1963
07/1963
4F-C 4283 44283 12/1926 31B
66A
67B
W
Stirling
Polmadie
Hurlford
Withdrawn
(Re-instd)
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
08/09/1962
29/12/1962
02/1963
29/12/1962
4F-C 4284 44284 12/1926 19A
18B
18A
9G
16A
15C
16C
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Westhouses
Toton
Gorton
Nottingham
Leicester Midland
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1954
04/10/1958
13/08/1960
17/11/1962
20/07/1963
28/09/1963
08/1964
08/1964
4F-C 4285 44285 12/1926 19A
18B
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1954
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4286 44286 12/1926 19D
16A
W
Heaton Mersey
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/02/1964
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4287 44287 12/1926 15A
17A
15A
15B
19A
41D
41E
W
Wellingborough
Derby
Wellingborough
Kettering
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1951
06/09/1952
04/10/1952
29/11/1952
16/09/1961
26/05/1962
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4288 44288 01/1927 18C
W
Hasland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1964
04/1964
4F-C 4289 44289 01/1927 21B
18A
18B
17A
21A
9F
15E
W
Bournville
Toton
Westhouses
Derby
Saltley
Heaton Mersey
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1953
04/10/1958
07/10/1961
07/04/1962
15/09/1962
15/02/1964
06/1964
06/1964
4F-C 4290 44290 01/1927 20D
19C
20C
W
Normanton
Canklow
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
07/10/1950
06/1964
06/1964
4F-C 4291 44291 01/1927 24D
27D
26G
26A
27E
W
Lower Darwen
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Belle Vue
Newton Heath
Walton on the Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1951
30/01/1954
08/10/1955
31/12/1955
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4292 44292 01/1927 11E
2B
12C
11B
W
Tebay
Nuneaton
Carlisle Canal
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1957
12/07/1958
06/09/1958
08/1963
08/1963
4F-C 4293 44293 01/1927 16B
22B
8E
W
Spital Bridge
Gloucester Barnwood
Brunswick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
23/03/1957
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4294 44294 02/1927 18C
14B
14A
18A
8B
W
Hasland
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Toton
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/03/1959
25/08/1962
16/02/1963
09/11/1963
11/1965
11/1965
4F-C 4295 44295 02/1927 17B
17A
17B
18A
W
Burton
Derby
Burton
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/01/1953
25/04/1959
28/11/1959
02/1964
02/1964
4F-C 4296 44296 02/1927 16B
22B
22A
22B
82E
W
Spital Bridge
Gloucester Barnwood
Bristol Barrow Road
Gloucester Barnwood
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
31/10/1953
16/06/1957
29/06/1963
01/1964
01/1964
4F-C 4297 44297 02/1927 13A
14A
15A
16A
W
Plaistow
Cricklewood East
Wellingborough
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
15/09/1962
26/01/1963
09/1963
09/1963
4F-C 4298 44298 02/1927 14A
14A
14B
W
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
31/10/1953
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4299 44299 02/1927 20F
27E
17B
5E
5D
W
Skipton
Walton on the Hill
Burton
Alsager
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/03/1957
04/06/1960
09/12/1961
23/06/1962
05/1963
05/1963
4F-C 4300 44300 02/1927 5B
5B
5E
10D
10A
W
Crewe South
Crewe South
Alsager
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
02/12/1950
11/08/1956
18/01/1964
04/12/1965
04/12/1965
4F-C 4301 44301 03/1927 5E
21D
8F
W
Alsager
Aston
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/07/1961
14/07/1962
04/1964
04/1964
4F-C 4302 44302 10/1926 3D
12F
24L
21B
8F
W
Aston
Workington
Carnforth
Bescot
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/11/1960
17/06/1961
15/07/1961
17/08/1963
03/1964
03/1964
4F-C 4303 44303 10/1926 9A
9A
8F
W
Longsight
Longsight
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
22/03/1958
09/1963
09/1963
4F-C 4304 44304 10/1926 21A
14A
17A
16A
W
Saltley
Cricklewood East
Derby
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
21/02/1953
05/12/1959
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4305 44305 10/1926 7B
24L
8G
12A
W
Bangor
Carnforth
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1959
18/06/1960
25/11/1961
04/1965
04/1965
4F-C 4306 44306 10/1926 11B
12C
11A
W
Barrow in Furness
Durran Hill (Carlisle)
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
04/10/1952
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4307 44307 10/1926 5F
6B
6E
5D
W
Uttoxeter
Mold Junction
Wrexham Rhosddu
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1954
03/12/1955
01/11/1958
06/10/1962
06/10/1962
4F-C 4308 44308 09/1926 9A
8E
5D
1E
5D
6C
5D
W
Longsight
Brunswick
Stoke
Bletchley
Stoke
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
27/01/1951
27/02/1960
21/05/1960
29/06/1963
14/09/1963
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4309 44309 10/1926 9D
6C
W
5D
Buxton (LNWR)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
Stoke
01/01/1948
29/06/1963
07/1963
20/07/1963
07/1963
4F-C 4310 44310 10/1926 5D
6H
10G
9L
10G
12D
12C
W
Stoke
Bangor
Skipton
Buxton (LNWR)
Skipton
Workington
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1963
02/01/1965
17/04/1965
01/05/1965
08/05/1965
03/01/1966
02/1966
02/1966
4F-C 4311 44311 10/1926 26A
26D
9K
12C
W
Newton Heath
Bury
Bolton
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1961
10/04/1965
27/11/1965
07/1966
07/1966
4F-C 4312 44312 11/1927 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
4F-C 4313 44313 11/1927 16A
16C
16A
W
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
11/07/1953
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4314 44314 12/1927 29A
63C
63B
63A
63C
63A
W
Perth South
Forfar
Stirling
Perth South
Forfar
Perth South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/04/1955
09/07/1955
06/08/1955
09/06/1956
22/11/1958
16/07/1962
16/07/1962
4F-C 4315 44315 12/1927 12A
2A
5D
8G
9D
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Rugby
Stoke
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1959
23/05/1959
20/02/1960
01/09/1962
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4316 44316 12/1927 17B
W
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4317 44317 12/1927 21A
22A
15D

8G
W
Saltley
Bristol Barrow Road
Bedford

Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
27/03/1954
22/03/1958
04/10/1958
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4318 44318 01/1928 28B
63C
63B
63C
63B
63C
63B
66A
W
Dalry Road
Forfar
Stirling
Forfar
Stirling
Forfar
Stirling
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/03/1953
11/07/1953
26/12/1953
07/08/1954
23/11/1957
12/04/1958
05/07/1958
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
4F-C 4319 44319 01/1928 30B
67A
67C
W
Hurlford
Corkerhill
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/10/1958
13/02/1960
27/11/1961
27/11/1961
4F-C 4320 44320 01/1928 31D
W
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
4F-C 4321 44321 01/1928 18B
W
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1964
04/1964
4F-C 4322 44322 01/1928 29A
66A
66B
67A
W
Perth South
Polmadie
Motherwell
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
(Re-instd)
01/01/1948
05/07/1958
16/06/1962
08/09/1962
29/12/1962
02/1963
29/12/1962
4F-C 4323 44323 01/1928 30B
67C
67A
W
Hurlford
Ayr
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/04/1955
13/02/1960
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
4F-C 4324 44324 01/1928 12A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/11/1961
11/11/1961
4F-C 4325 44325 02/1928 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
4F-C 4326 44326 02/1928 12A
12B
5D
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carlisle Upperby
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1958
22/08/1959
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4327 44327 02/1928 17D
14E
17B
W
Rowsley
Bedford
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1963
03/08/1963
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4328 44328 02/1928 29A
W
Perth South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
4F-C 4329 44329 03/1928 30B
67C
W
Hurlford
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/10/1957
16/07/1962
16/07/1962
4F-C 4330 44330 03/1928 31B
67B
67C
67A
W
Stirling
Hurlford
Ayr
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/06/1954
29/10/1955
19/12/1959
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
4F-C 4331 44331 03/1928 31B
67B
67C
67B
W
Stirling
Hurlford
Ayr
Hurlford
Withdrawn
(Re-instd)
01/01/1948
07/08/1954
29/10/1955
08/09/1962
29/12/1962
02/1963
29/12/1962
4F-C 4332 44332 10/1926 15A
W
Wellingborough
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4333 44333 10/1926 21B
15D
17A
W
Bournville
Coalville
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/12/1961
21/07/1962
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4334 44334 10/1926 19A
17D
17A
17C
16C
15E
16E
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Rowsley
Derby
Rowsley
Derby
Coalville
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1954
01/01/1955
14/01/1961
09/05/1964
27/06/1964
19/12/1964
06/1965
06/1965
4F-C 4335 44335 10/1926 20D
20B
W
Normanton
Stourton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
25/02/1963
25/02/1963
4F-C 4336 44336 10/1926 20D
W
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4337 44337 10/1926 20D
W
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4338 44338 10/1926 20D
W
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1962
09/1962
4F-C 4339 44339 10/1926 3C
W
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1965
12/1965
4F-C 4340 44340 10/1926 9B
1A
2E
1C
21B
W
55A
Stockport Edgeley
Willesden
Northampton
Watford
Bescot
Withdrawn
Holbeck (MR)
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
10/09/1960
11/04/1961
23/06/1962
03/12/1962
08/12/1962
03/12/1962
4F-C 4341 44341 12/1926 10D
5B
9G
8E
9G
W
Plodder Lane
Crewe South
Northwich
Brunswick
Northwich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
06/10/1951
25/02/1956
11/08/1956
16/02/1963
16/02/1963
4F-C 4342 44342 12/1926 5B
5D
W
Crewe South
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1962
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4343 44343 01/1927 5D
1C
12C
W
Stoke
Watford
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
10/08/1957
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4344 44344 01/1927 5B
5B
5D
W
Crewe South
Crewe South
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
15/08/1959
12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4345 44345 01/1927 3C
11D
24L
12E
9F
W
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Tebay
Carnforth
Barrow in Furness
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1957
07/11/1959
16/09/1961
08/06/1963
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4346 44346 01/1927 12B
12D
W
Carlisle Upperby
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/03/1964
06/11/1965
06/11/1965
4F-C 4347 44347 03/1927 11B
24D
W
Barrow in Furness
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/06/1963
03/1965
03/1965
4F-C 4348 44348 04/1927 1A

6K
1C
21B
8F
12D
W
Willesden

Rhyl
Watford
Bescot
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
10/08/1957
05/10/1957
23/06/1962
17/08/1963
21/03/1964
08/1964
08/1964
4F-C 4349 44349 04/1927 5D
5E
5D
8B
W
Stoke
Alsager
Stoke
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
23/06/1962
09/11/1963
07/1965
07/1965
4F-C 4350 44350 04/1927 3D
9E
10D
12C
W
Aston
Trafford Park (LMS)
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/08/1953
16/06/1956
21/08/1965
12/1965
12/1965
4F-C 4351 44351 05/1927 11B
W
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/04/1963
06/04/1963
4F-C 4352 44352 05/1927 10D
5E
5D
W
Plodder Lane
Alsager
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/12/1958
23/06/1962
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4353 44353 05/1927 5D
2E
5B
9E
9L
W
Stoke
Northampton
Crewe South
Trafford Park (LMS)
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/01/1959
30/06/1962
07/03/1964
28/11/1964
02/1965
02/1965
4F-C 4354 44354 05/1927 2A
3D
1A
5E
5D
W
Rugby
Aston
Willesden
Alsager
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/01/1953
09/10/1954
03/11/1956
23/06/1962
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4355 44355 06/1927 19A
8F
6H
5F
16G
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Bangor
Uttoxeter
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/10/1959
07/11/1959
27/02/1960
12/12/1964
09/1965
09/1965
4F-C 4356 44356 06/1927 10D
8B
9E
8B
8G
12D
W
Plodder Lane
Warrington Dallam
Trafford Park (LMS)
Warrington Dallam
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/10/1954
22/02/1964
07/03/1964
03/10/1964
20/02/1965
11/1965
11/1965
4F-C 4357 44357 01/1927 9A
5F
W
Longsight
Uttoxeter
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/03/1957
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4358 44358 01/1927 10E
21B
9G
8B
9G
W
12D
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Bescot
Gorton
Warrington Dallam
Gorton
Withdrawn
Workington
01/01/1948
15/07/1961
17/08/1963
05/12/1964
12/12/1964
01/1965
23/01/1965
01/1965
4F-C 4359 44359 01/1927 5B
5E
8D
6B
W
Crewe South
Alsager
Widnes
Mold Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
18/06/1960
24/09/1960
07/1963
07/1963
4F-C 4360 44360 02/1927 9D
3E
11D
12C
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Monument Lane
Tebay
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
23/03/1957
16/06/1957
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4361 44361 02/1927 11B
9E
9F
W
Barrow in Furness
Trafford Park (LMS)
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/01/1955
28/01/1956
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4362 44362 04/1927 15D
18A
18B
W
Bedford
Toton
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1953
04/10/1958
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4363 44363 04/1927 5D
1C
5D
99C
W
Stoke
Watford
Stoke
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
05/10/1957
12/07/1958
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4364 44364 04/1927 12D
11A
4A
6E
84K
1E
1E
2E
9D
W
Workington
Carnforth
Bletchley
Wrexham Rhosddu
Wrexham Rhosddu
Bletchley
Bletchley
Northampton
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/02/1951
17/07/1951
30/11/1957
22/02/1958
08/11/1958
31/01/1959
12/05/1962
02/06/1962
01/1964
01/1964
4F-C 4365 44365 05/1927 9D
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4366 44366 05/1927 2C
6B
11B
W
Northampton
Mold Junction
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/02/1954
28/01/1956
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4367 44367 06/1927 6B
6K
12E
W
Mold Junction
Rhyl
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/07/1953
06/10/1962
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4368 44368 07/1927 11B
55B
W
Barrow in Furness
Stourton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/11/1957
09/1962
09/1962
4F-C 4369 44369 07/1927 5D
17A
W
Stoke
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1953
12/1959
12/1959
4F-C 4370 44370 07/1927 1A

1A
1C
1A
1E
2E
5D
66A
67B
5D
W
Willesden

Willesden
Watford
Willesden
Bletchley
Northampton
Stoke
Polmadie
Hurlford
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
19/05/1951
19/04/1952
16/05/1953
30/11/1957
12/05/1962
18/08/1962
09/03/1963
16/03/1963
27/07/1963
09/1963
09/1963
4F-C 4371 44371 08/1927 19E
18D
W
Belle Vue
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/08/1952
06/1961
06/1961
4F-C 4372 44372 09/1927 1A
1D
1A
1D
1A
W
Willesden
Devons Road (Bow)
Willesden
Devons Road (Bow)
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
18/04/1953
16/05/1953
11/07/1953
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4373 44373 10/1927 5D
99C
W
Stoke
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1958
12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4374 44374 10/1927 11A
5D
99C
W
Carnforth
Stoke
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
12/07/1958
02/03/1963
02/03/1963
4F-C 4375 44375 11/1927 11A
9G
9D
W
Carnforth
Gorton
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/05/1958
22/08/1959
10/1960
10/1960
4F-C 4376 44376 11/1927 18A
16F
16E
W
Toton
Burton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/08/1964
26/09/1964
12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4377 44377 12/1927 5D
5B
12D
2F
99C
W
Stoke
Crewe South
Workington
Bescot
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/11/1960
08/08/1964
05/12/1964
08/05/1965
10/1966
10/1966
4F-C 4378 44378 12/1927 5D
17A
17E
27F
9E
W
Stoke
Derby
Heaton Mersey
Brunswick
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
22/02/1958
11/02/1961
16/09/1961
04/05/1963
04/05/1963
4F-C 4379 44379 12/1927 10D
10E
9B
9F
16E
W
Plodder Lane
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Stockport Edgeley
Heaton Mersey
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
19/05/1951
05/09/1953
15/02/1964
26/09/1964
26/09/1964
4F-C 4380 44380 01/1928 5D
17A
17B
W
Stoke
Derby
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
05/12/1959
08/1964
08/1964
4F-C 4381 44381 01/1928 1A
1D

14B
14A
18A
18C
16G
16H
W
Willesden
Devons Road (Bow)

Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Toton
Hasland
Westhouses
Hasland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1956
22/03/1958
09/08/1958
04/08/1962
16/02/1963
06/04/1963
14/12/1963
02/05/1964
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4382 44382 09/1926 9D
9B
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1954
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4383 44383 09/1926 5D
W
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4384 44384 09/1926 5E
10D
9F
8B
W
Alsager
Plodder Lane
Heaton Mersey
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
09/10/1954
29/01/1955
10/1964
10/1964
4F-C 4385 44385 10/1926 12D
5D
5B
W
Workington
Stoke
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
05/11/1955
08/1959
08/1959
4F-C 4386 44386 10/1926 10D
5B
5E
5B
12F
12A
10A
W
Plodder Lane
Crewe South
Alsager
Crewe South
Workington
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
02/12/1950
23/06/1962
10/11/1962
02/02/1963
16/11/1963
05/1965
05/1965
4F-C 4387 44387 10/1926 5B
11B
9F
18B
W
Crewe South
Barrow in Furness
Heaton Mersey
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
31/12/1955
30/04/1960
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4388 44388 10/1926 5D
2A
2F
15A
18A
W
Stoke
Rugby
Market Harborough
Wellingborough
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/01/1955
05/11/1955
26/03/1960
30/04/1960
29/12/1962
29/12/1962
4F-C 4389 44389 10/1926 7A
10G
9L
10G
W
Llandudno Junction
Skipton
Buxton (LNWR)
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/01/1965
17/04/1965
01/05/1965
07/1965
07/1965
4F-C 4390 44390 10/1926 12B
12C
12D
24L
12F
10A
12D
12B
12D
W
Carlisle Upperby
Durran Hill (Carlisle)
Workington
Carnforth
Workington
Carnforth
Workington
Carlisle Upperby
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1952
17/07/1954
10/11/1962
09/03/1963
09/11/1963
16/11/1963
24/10/1964
14/08/1965
11/1965
11/1965
4F-C 4391 44391 10/1926 5D
2E
W
Stoke
Northampton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1952
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4392 44392 10/1926 2A
8E
9E
W
Rugby
Brunswick
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
11/07/1953
06/1964
06/1964
4F-C 4393 44393 10/1926 5D
W
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/11/1962
05/11/1962
4F-C 4394 44394 10/1926 16D
16A
16A
17A
21A
9F
9B
9L
12C
W
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Derby
Saltley
Heaton Mersey
Stockport Edgeley
Buxton (LNWR)
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/09/1958
28/02/1959
18/11/1961
07/04/1962
15/09/1962
30/11/1963
18/09/1965
11/12/1965
07/1966
07/1966
4F-C 4395 44395 10/1926 2A
5D
6C
5D
8F
W
Rugby
Stoke
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Stoke
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/05/1959
29/06/1963
14/09/1963
09/11/1963
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4396 44396 10/1926 1C
8E
9E
W
Watford
Brunswick
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
16/09/1961
06/1964
06/1964
4F-C 4397 44397 12/1926 1A
14B
1A
1E
W
Willesden
Kentish Town
Willesden
Bletchley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
24/03/1951
25/01/1958
31/03/1962
31/03/1962
4F-C 4398 44398 12/1926 24D
W
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1963
07/1963
4F-C 4399 44399 12/1926 12D
12B
9E
W
Workington
Carlisle Upperby
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1962
25/05/1963
02/1964
02/1964
4F-C 4400 44400 01/1927 20E
55E
W
Manningham
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1963
11/1965
11/1965
4F-C 4401 44401 01/1927 16A
16F
16E
W
Nottingham
Burton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/03/1964
26/09/1964
06/1965
06/1965
4F-C 4402 44402 01/1927 17A
17F
W
Derby
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
01/1965
01/1965
4F-C 4403 44403 01/1927 15C
15C
15E
W
Leicester Midland
Kettering
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/09/1963
01/02/1964
06/1964
06/1964
4F-C 4404 44404 01/1927 20A
18D
W
Holbeck (MR)
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/10/1954
02/12/1962
02/12/1962
4F-C 4405 44405 01/1927 20H
5D
5E
5B
99C
W
Lancaster Green Ayre
Stoke
Alsager
Crewe South
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
09/08/1958
23/06/1962
02/03/1963
06/1966
06/1966
4F-C 4406 44406 01/1927 21A
W
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4407 44407 08/1927 19D
W
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1962
09/1962
4F-C 4408 44408 08/1927 16A
14A
16A
20C
20D
W
Nottingham
Cricklewood East
Nottingham
Royston
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1954
17/07/1954
16/07/1955
10/09/1955
11/1965
11/1965
4F-C 4409 44409 08/1927 17A
14B
18A
W
Derby
Kentish Town
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/04/1959
16/01/1960
09/12/1961
09/12/1961
4F-C 4410 44410 08/1927 18C
W
Hasland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4411 44411 09/1927 22A
82F
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1962
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4412 44412 09/1927 16A
W
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4413 44413 09/1927 21A
9E
17C
21A
W
Saltley
Trafford Park (LMS)
Rowsley
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1959
09/01/1960
23/06/1962
02/03/1963
02/03/1963
4F-C 4414 44414 09/1927 16A
17B
15C
15E
16E
W
Nottingham
Burton
Leicester Midland
Coalville
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/06/1961
05/08/1961
19/09/1964
19/12/1964
05/1965
05/1965
4F-C 4415 44415 09/1927 16C
16C
16D
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Kirkby in Ashfield
Mansfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
11/07/1953
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4416 44416 09/1927 16A
16B
W
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/04/1960
07/1963
07/1963
4F-C 4417 44417 09/1927 22D
W
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/11/1962
27/11/1962
4F-C 4418 44418 09/1927 19A
15B
17C
16B
16A
16B
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Kettering
Coalville
Kirkby in Ashfield
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/08/1955
05/10/1957
10/01/1959
20/06/1959
09/01/1960
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4419 44419 09/1927 17A
17C
21A
W
Derby
Rowsley
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/03/1961
23/06/1962
09/1963
09/1963
4F-C 4420 44420 10/1927 17A
16G
W
Derby
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/12/1964
09/1965
09/1965
4F-C 4421 44421 10/1927 19D
8E
5D
9F
17A
17C
15E
5D
W
Heaton Mersey
Brunswick
Stoke
Heaton Mersey
Derby
Rowsley
Coalville
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
27/01/1951
11/09/1954
01/07/1961
06/01/1962
09/05/1964
07/11/1964
12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4422 44422 10/1927 22C
82E
82G
82E
85B
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Bristol Barrow Road
Templecombe (S&D)
Bristol Barrow Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/04/1960
03/12/1960
22/11/1964
07/02/1965
06/1965
06/1965
4F-C 4423 44423 10/1927 15C
W
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1959
11/1959
4F-C 4424 44424 10/1927 22A
5D
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/10/1959
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4425 44425 10/1927 14A
17A
9G
9E
9L
W
Cricklewood East
Derby
Gorton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1956
12/05/1962
21/11/1964
12/12/1964
02/1965
02/1965
4F-C 4426 44426 10/1927 19A
41D
41E
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/09/1961
16/06/1962
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4427 44427 10/1927 21A
18A
W
Saltley
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/08/1955
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4428 44428 10/1927 17B
17A
17C
W
Burton
Derby
Rowsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
30/07/1960
02/1964
02/1964
4F-C 4429 44429 10/1927 17B
17D
16F
16E
W
Burton
Rowsley
Burton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
08/02/1964
10/10/1964
05/1965
05/1965
4F-C 4430 44430 11/1927 17A
W
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4431 44431 11/1927 20A
20F
24H
26A
W
Holbeck (MR)
Skipton
Hellifield
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1952
09/04/1960
13/08/1960
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4432 44432 11/1927 17A
5D
W
Derby
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1953
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4433 44433 11/1927 17B
14B
17A
14E
17C
16C
15E
W
Burton
Kentish Town
Derby
Bedford
Rowsley
Derby
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/07/1960
24/09/1960
07/04/1962
03/08/1963
09/05/1964
30/05/1964
12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4434 44434 11/1927 17B
W
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1963
09/1963
4F-C 4435 44435 12/1927 17B
W
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/10/1962
13/10/1962
4F-C 4436 44436 12/1927 17B
W
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1964
04/1964
4F-C 4437 44437 11/1927 19A
41D
41E
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Canklow
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/09/1961
26/05/1962
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4438 44438 12/1927 2B
8E
10E
8F
W
Bletchley
Brunswick
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
02/01/1954
14/06/1958
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4439 44439 12/1927 3B
3D
12E
12F
12E
12B
10A
8G
W
Bushbury
Aston
Barrow in Furness
Workington
Barrow in Furness
Carlisle Upperby
Carnforth
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
12/11/1960
10/12/1960
20/04/1963
14/09/1963
30/11/1963
18/01/1964
04/1964
04/1964
4F-C 4440 44440 12/1927 1A
14B
1A
1C
21B
66A
65D
21B
W
Willesden
Kentish Town
Willesden
Watford
Bescot
Polmadie
Dawsholm
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
24/03/1951
05/10/1957
23/06/1962
09/03/1963
16/03/1963
27/07/1963
04/1964
04/1964
4F-C 4441 44441 12/1927 1A
1D

16C
14A
15A
18A
16E
W
Willesden
Devons Road (Bow)

Mansfield
Cricklewood East
Wellingborough
Toton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
22/03/1958
10/01/1959
16/01/1960
15/09/1962
08/12/1962
09/11/1963
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4442 44442 12/1927 1A
1C
21B
W
Willesden
Watford
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1956
23/06/1962
07/1963
07/1963
4F-C 4443 44443 12/1927 1C
11B
W
Watford
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1956
08/1965
08/1965
4F-C 4444 44444 12/1927 9B
3C
3E
21D
8F
W
Stockport Edgeley
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Monument Lane
Aston
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1954
14/06/1958
10/02/1962
14/07/1962
09/1963
09/1963
4F-C 4445 44445 12/1927 7B
24L
6B
8C
8F
24L
5B
9B
W
Bangor
Carnforth
Mold Junction
Speke Junction
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Carnforth
Crewe South
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1959
05/12/1959
11/06/1960
17/09/1960
28/10/1961
07/07/1962
10/11/1962
06/1963
06/1963
4F-C 4446 44446 12/1927 20C
W
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1965
11/1965
4F-C 4447 44447 01/1928 2B
12E
W
Bletchley
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/05/1962
07/1963
07/1963
4F-C 4448 44448 01/1928 5D
4B
5D
3C
3A
66A
66F
21B
W
Stoke
Northampton
Stoke
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Polmadie
Beattock
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
24/02/1951
29/11/1952
14/06/1958
09/03/1963
16/03/1963
27/07/1963
11/1963
11/1963
4F-C 4449 44449 01/1928 12D
W
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1965
08/1965
4F-C 4450 44450 02/1928 5E
5B
6B
W
Alsager
Crewe South
Mold Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1962
16/03/1963
05/1965
05/1965
4F-C 4451 44451 02/1928 1A
8B
12A
12D
W
Willesden
Warrington Dallam
Carlisle Kingmoor
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1960
15/10/1960
23/10/1965
12/1965
12/1965
4F-C 4452 44452 02/1928 5E
5E
17B
5B
12B
W
Alsager
Alsager
Burton
Crewe South
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
29/11/1952
22/07/1961
10/11/1962
06/1964
06/1964
4F-C 4453 44453 02/1928 5B
W
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4454 44454 02/1928 3C
10D
12D
11A
12F
12E
9D
5D
17A
W
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Plodder Lane
Workington
Carnforth
Workington
Barrow in Furness
Buxton (LNWR)
Stoke
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
11/07/1953
27/03/1954
17/09/1960
24/09/1960
18/08/1962
10/11/1962
01/12/1962
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4455 44455 02/1928 2A
W
Rugby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/03/1963
23/03/1963
4F-C 4456 44456 02/1928 2A
9G
10G
W
Rugby
Northwich
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
19/12/1964
03/1965
03/1965
4F-C 4457 44457 03/1928 19C
19C
19A
56A
55E
W
Canklow
Canklow
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Wakefield
Normanton
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
15/04/1961
04/08/1962
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4458 44458 03/1928 16B
20D
W
Spital Bridge
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/09/1954
11/1965
11/1965
4F-C 4459 44459 04/1928 19E
5D
W
Belle Vue
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1957
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4460 44460 05/1928 24A
24D
9D
W
Accrington
Lower Darwen
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
30/11/1963
10/1964
10/1964
4F-C 4461 44461 05/1928 5B
12D
W
Crewe South
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/08/1954
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4462 44462 05/1928 23B
25D
25A
25D
27E
17B
27E
10H
10G
12D
W
Aintree
Mirfield
Wakefield
Mirfield
Walton on the Hill
Burton
Walton on the Hill
Lower Darwen
Skipton
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
23/04/1955
16/07/1955
16/06/1956
20/01/1962
27/01/1962
04/01/1964
07/11/1964
20/03/1965
13/11/1965
13/11/1965
4F-C 4463 44463 05/1928 16C
21A
21A
21B
21A
18C
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Saltley
Saltley
Bournville
Saltley
Hasland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/01/1954
07/09/1957
20/06/1959
20/02/1960
16/12/1961
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4464 44464 05/1928 25E
27E
27D
12A
10A
W
Sowerby Bridge
Walton on the Hill
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
08/08/1953
02/03/1963
16/11/1963
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4465 44465 06/1928 15B
17F
17A
15A
18A
W
Kettering
Trafford Park (LMS)
Derby
Wellingborough
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/10/1957
30/11/1957
04/03/1961
08/12/1962
07/1963
07/1963
4F-C 4466 44466 07/1928 22A
15A
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Wellingborough
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
05/1965
05/1965
4F-C 4467 44467 05/1928 20B
W
Stourton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1964
04/1964
4F-C 4468 44468 05/1928 20H
W
Lancaster Green Ayre
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4469 44469 05/1928 11E
24L
12B
W
Tebay
Carnforth
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/11/1958
23/06/1962
30/03/1963
30/03/1963
4F-C 4470 44470 05/1928 18A
W
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1963
06/1963
4F-C 4471 44471 06/1928 23C
27E
W
Southport
Walton on the Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/02/1956
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4472 44472 06/1928 16C
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1963
05/1963
4F-C 4473 44473 07/1928 10E
10D
1A
5D
W
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Plodder Lane
Willesden
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
09/10/1954
18/05/1957
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4474 44474 07/1928 23C
27E
25D
W
Southport
Walton on the Hill
Mirfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
31/12/1950
21/12/1961
21/12/1961
4F-C 4475 44475 08/1928 21A
20C
18D
W
Saltley
Royston
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1951
26/01/1952
10/02/1963
10/02/1963
4F-C 4476 44476 08/1928 16B
15C
17B
14B
17A
15A
14E
16A
W
Spital Bridge
Leicester Midland
Burton
Kentish Town
Derby
Wellingborough
Bedford
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1960
28/05/1960
09/07/1960
08/10/1960
18/03/1961
07/04/1962
26/01/1963
04/05/1963
04/05/1963
4F-C 4477 44477 12/1927 19C
19A
W
Canklow
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
07/1961
07/1961
4F-C 4478 44478 12/1927 5D
6H
W
Stoke
Bangor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1961
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4479 44479 12/1927 24A
24D
W
Accrington
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4480 44480 11/1927 16A
W
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4481 44481 12/1927 23B
27E
9D
W
Aintree
Walton on the Hill
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
21/12/1963
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4482 44482 12/1927 17B
18D
W
Burton
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1957
02/05/1962
02/05/1962
4F-C 4483 44483 12/1927 24D
W
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4484 44484 12/1927 5D
21B
8G
12B
12D
W
Stoke
Bescot
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Carlisle Upperby
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1960
17/08/1963
04/07/1964
24/10/1964
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4485 44485 12/1927 25C
25D
56A
55B
W
Goole
Mirfield
Wakefield
Stourton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
30/01/1960
04/08/1962
19/04/1963
19/04/1963
4F-C 4486 44486 12/1927 25C
26G
26A
27D
8F
10G
8F
9G
W
Goole
Belle Vue
Newton Heath
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Skipton
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
21/04/1956
01/12/1956
02/11/1963
30/11/1963
25/01/1964
04/04/1964
01/1965
01/1965
4F-C 4487 44487 12/1927 11B
W
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/04/1962
07/04/1962
4F-C 4488 44488 12/1927 3C
3B
3A
W
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bushbury
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/03/1957
14/06/1958
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4489 44489 12/1927 5D
8E
9E
12D
W
Stoke
Brunswick
Trafford Park (LMS)
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/01/1953
24/09/1960
12/12/1964
08/1965
08/1965
4F-C 4490 44490 12/1927 3D
9D
5F
W
Aston
Buxton (LNWR)
Uttoxeter
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/11/1960
28/01/1961
08/1965
08/1965
4F-C 4491 44491 12/1927 2C
1A
2E
8B
W
Northampton
Willesden
Northampton
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/12/1956
26/01/1957
30/06/1962
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
4F-C 4492 44492 10/1927 3B
3D
1A
3D
8F
9F
15E
W
Bushbury
Aston
Willesden
Aston
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Heaton Mersey
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1956
29/12/1956
26/01/1957
14/07/1962
22/06/1963
08/02/1964
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4493 44493 11/1927 6B
8C
6H
8G
W
Mold Junction
Speke Junction
Bangor
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/06/1960
17/09/1960
10/06/1961
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4494 44494 11/1927 5E
5E
NTH
8E
8C
8B
W
Alsager
Alsager
Northwich
Brunswick
Speke Junction
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
14/01/1950
04/11/1950
16/09/1961
04/11/1961
07/1963
07/1963
4F-C 4495 44495 11/1927 12D
W
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4496 44496 11/1927 5D
W
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4497 44497 11/1927 1A
8G
9D
W
Willesden
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/09/1960
18/08/1962
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4498 44498 11/1927 5D
W
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4499 44499 11/1927 5D
W
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4500 44500 11/1927 5D
5B
8F
12C
W
Stoke
Crewe South
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/12/1963
26/12/1964
04/12/1965
07/1966
07/1966
4F-C 4501 44501 11/1927 20A
20C
20A
17A
17E
16J
15E
W
Holbeck (MR)
Royston
Holbeck (MR)
Derby
Heaton Mersey
Rowsley
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
24/04/1954
06/10/1956
20/04/1957
15/02/1964
09/05/1964
12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4502 44502 11/1927 5D
W
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4503 44503 11/1927 5D
2A
5D
5E
W
Stoke
Rugby
Stoke
Alsager
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
29/12/1951
06/09/1952
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4504 44504 11/1927 5F
6H
2E
9D
6H
W
Uttoxeter
Bangor
Northampton
Buxton (LNWR)
Bangor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/01/1960
11/06/1960
02/07/1960
10/09/1960
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4505 44505 11/1927 12D
W
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1965
09/1965
4F-C 4506 44506 12/1927 W Withdrawn 01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4507 44507 06/1928 1A
W
Willesden
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4508 44508 06/1928 5D
9D
W
Stoke
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/12/1960
09/1962
09/1962
4F-C 4509 44509 08/1928 16B
31B
W
Spital Bridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1960
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
4F-C 4510 44510 06/1928 11A
W
Carnforth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1960
02/1960
4F-C 4511 44511 06/1928 2A
W
Rugby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4512 44512 06/1928 3B
3E
3C
3A
66A
66B
21B
9G
W
Bushbury
Monument Lane
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Polmadie
Motherwell
Bescot
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
29/12/1951
24/03/1956
14/06/1958
09/03/1963
16/03/1963
06/07/1963
14/09/1963
02/1964
02/1964
4F-C 4513 44513 06/1928 5D
W
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4514 44514 06/1928 3E
21D
8F
9F
16E
W
Monument Lane
Aston
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Heaton Mersey
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/02/1962
14/07/1962
06/07/1963
08/02/1964
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4515 44515 06/1928 21A
W
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4516 44516 06/1928 21A
21B
21A
17C
21A
2F
2E
W
Saltley
Bournville
Saltley
Rowsley
Saltley
Bescot
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/11/1958
20/02/1960
16/12/1961
30/12/1961
04/01/1964
18/04/1964
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4517 44517 07/1928 3D
5D
5D
8F
5D
17A
17C
W
Aston
Stoke
Stoke
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Stoke
Derby
Rowsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/09/1957
05/10/1957
14/07/1962
10/11/1962
01/12/1962
22/06/1963
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4518 44518 07/1928 16B
41B
41E
W
Spital Bridge
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1960
04/03/1961
09/1962
09/1962
4F-C 4519 44519 07/1928 16B
15C
W
Spital Bridge
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1960
26/01/1963
26/01/1963
4F-C 4520 44520 07/1928 21A
21A
21B
21A
W
1A
Saltley
Saltley
Bournville
Saltley
Withdrawn
Willesden
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
21/02/1953
18/04/1953
01/1964
04/01/1964
01/1964
4F-C 4521 44521 07/1928 16B
31B
W
Spital Bridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1960
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
4F-C 4522 44522 07/1928 16B
2E
8B
W
Spital Bridge
Northampton
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/02/1960
30/06/1962
10/1965
10/1965
4F-C 4523 44523 08/1928 22C
82E
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/06/1960
08/1963
08/1963
4F-C 4524 44524 08/1928 21A
21D
2E
8B
9D
W
Saltley
Stratford upon Avon
Northampton
Warrington Dallam
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
21/02/1953
30/06/1962
06/10/1962
19/01/1963
19/01/1963
4F-C 4525 44525 08/1928 21A
21D
2E
3D
12D
6G
99C
W
Saltley
Stratford upon Avon
Northampton
Aston
Workington
Llandudno Junction
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
19/04/1952
03/01/1953
06/11/1954
04/12/1954
19/12/1964
10/1966
10/1966
4F-C 4526 44526 08/1928 17B
W
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1963
11/1963
4F-C 4527 44527 08/1928 17B
10G
W
Burton
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1964
03/1965
03/1965
4F-C 4528 44528 08/1928 17B
16G
W
Burton
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/10/1964
05/1965
05/1965
4F-C 4529 44529 08/1928 14B
18A
15C
W
Kentish Town
Toton
Kettering
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/04/1963
08/08/1964
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4530 44530 09/1928 13A
14B
91E
14A
15C
W
Plaistow
Kentish Town
To Eastern Region
Cricklewood East
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
19/05/1951
22/03/1952
21/01/1961
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4531 44531 09/1928 14B
14A
18A
W
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/08/1962
16/02/1963
04/1964
04/1964
4F-C 4532 44532 09/1928 14B
14A
16A
W
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/08/1962
23/02/1963
27/04/1963
27/04/1963
4F-C 4533 44533 09/1928 16A
9E
W
Nottingham
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/11/1961
02/1964
02/1964
4F-C 4534 44534 09/1928 22A
91S
82E
W
Bristol Barrow Road
To Southern Region
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
29/06/1963
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4535 44535 09/1928 22C
21A
15C
15B
19A
41E
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Saltley
Leicester Midland
Kettering
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
23/02/1952
22/03/1952
05/10/1957
04/03/1961
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4536 44536 09/1928 22A
5D
8F
8G
12D
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Stoke
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/10/1959
09/11/1963
29/02/1964
20/02/1965
08/1965
08/1965
4F-C 4537 44537 09/1928 22A
8F
11A
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/10/1959
07/11/1959
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
4F-C 4538 44538 10/1928 21A
17B
W
Saltley
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/01/1954
01/1964
01/1964
4F-C 4539 44539 10/1928 17C
W
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1963
09/1963
4F-C 4540 44540 10/1928 17D
14E
15B
15A
W
Rowsley
Bedford
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/04/1962
14/09/1963
02/11/1963
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4541 44541 10/1928 23B
27E
17B
18A
W
Aintree
Walton on the Hill
Burton
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
14/06/1958
01/06/1963
11/1963
11/1963
4F-C 4542 44542 11/1928 17A
17B
W
Derby
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/01/1956
07/1963
07/1963
4F-C 4543 44543 11/1928 26A
W
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4544 44544 11/1928 26A
24B
27E
27D
9G
9D
W
Newton Heath
Rose Grove
Walton on the Hill
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Gorton
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
07/10/1950
18/04/1953
18/04/1964
14/11/1964
04/1965
04/1965
4F-C 4545 44545 11/1928 21A
17A
17C
17A
W
Saltley
Derby
Rowsley
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
04/03/1961
13/10/1962
23/03/1963
23/03/1963
4F-C 4546 44546 11/1928 16A
W
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4547 44547 11/1928 18A
19A
W
Toton
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1956
09/1961
09/1961
4F-C 4548 44548 11/1928 9D
8F
10H
10G
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Lower Darwen
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/11/1963
14/12/1963
07/11/1964
01/1965
01/1965
4F-C 4549 44549 12/1928 2B
12D
W
Bletchley
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
05/1964
05/1964
4F-C 4550 44550 12/1928 19A
20C
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/01/1954
02/03/1962
02/03/1962
4F-C 4551 44551 12/1928 17B
18A
17B
W
Burton
Toton
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1962
10/03/1962
05/1963
05/1963
4F-C 4552 44552 12/1928 18A
W
Toton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4553 44553 12/1928 22B
22A
9D
8B
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Bristol Barrow Road
Buxton (LNWR)
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
18/08/1962
06/10/1962
27/10/1962
27/10/1962
4F-C 4554 44554 12/1928 20H
9F
15E
W
Lancaster Green Ayre
Heaton Mersey
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/12/1958
15/02/1964
03/1964
03/1964
4F-C 4555 44555 12/1928 20G
17A
20E
14A
16A
W
Hellifield
Derby
Manningham
Cricklewood East
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
30/01/1954
27/03/1954
06/11/1954
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4556 44556 12/1928 20H
17D
W
Lancaster Green Ayre
Rowsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1954
12/1963
12/1963
4F-C 4557 44557 04/1922 22C
71H
12A
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Templecombe (S&D)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/07/1957
18/08/1962
15/09/1962
15/09/1962
4F-C 4558 44558 04/1922 22C
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4559 44559 04/1922 22C
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/02/1963
09/02/1963
4F-C 4560 44560 04/1922 22C
82G
85B
85B
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Templecombe (S&D)
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/04/1960
22/11/1964
13/06/1965
09/1965
09/1965
4F-C 4561 44561 04/1922 22C
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1962
04/1962
4F-C 4562 44562 05/1937 20D
20B
17B
W
Normanton
Stourton
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
06/10/1956
11/1963
11/1963
4F-C 4563 44563 07/1937 14B
W
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4564 44564 07/1937 17D
9E
W
Rowsley
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/01/1960
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4565 44565 07/1937 17A
9E
W
Derby
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/01/1960
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4566 44566 07/1937 17A
9E
W
Derby
Trafford Park (LMS)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/01/1960
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4567 44567 07/1937 21A
21D
22B
24G
26D
W
Saltley
Stratford upon Avon
Gloucester Barnwood
Skipton
Bury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
21/02/1953
26/03/1960
15/09/1962
06/1964
06/1964
4F-C 4568 44568 08/1937 19A
41D
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Canklow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/09/1961
11/1963
11/1963
4F-C 4569 44569 08/1937 22A
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1964
07/1964
4F-C 4570 44570 08/1937 20D
23A
W
Normanton
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1951
11/1965
11/1965
4F-C 4571 44571 08/1937 21A
21B
21A
5B
8D
5B
W
Saltley
Bournville
Saltley
Crewe South
Widnes
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/11/1958
20/02/1960
25/07/1964
22/08/1964
24/10/1964
12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4572 44572 09/1937 19A
14B
14A
18A
16E
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Toton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1959
25/08/1962
16/02/1963
09/11/1963
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4573 44573 09/1937 19A
41E
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/03/1961
24/05/1962
24/05/1962
4F-C 4574 44574 09/1937 15A
18A
W
16E
Wellingborough
Toton
Withdrawn
Kirkby in Ashfield
01/01/1948
08/12/1962
10/1963
05/10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4575 44575 09/1937 15A
18A
15A
15E
W
Wellingborough
Toton
Leicester Midland
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1963
08/08/1964
03/10/1964
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4576 44576 10/1937 22B
19C
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Canklow
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
17/05/1962
17/05/1962
4F-C 4577 44577 04/1939 16A
16A
W
Nottingham
Nottingham
Withdrawn
04/1939
01/01/1948
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4578 44578 04/1939 16A
17A
14E
16B
W
Nottingham
Derby
Bedford
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/11/1961
07/04/1962
22/06/1963
02/1964
02/1964
4F-C 4579 44579 04/1939 20G
24G
W
Hellifield
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/01/1960
03/11/1962
03/11/1962
4F-C 4580 44580 05/1939 21A
W
2F
2E
Saltley
Withdrawn
Bescot
Saltley
01/01/1948
11/1964
07/11/1964
21/11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4581 44581 05/1939 14A
15D
W
Cricklewood East
Coalville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/03/1962
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4582 44582 05/1939 15D
20C
W
Bedford
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/10/1955
11/1963
11/1963
4F-C 4583 44583 06/1939 21A
15C
21A
5B
99C
5B
W
Saltley
Leicester Midland
Saltley
Crewe South
Crewe Works
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
19/06/1954
28/12/1963
25/04/1964
25/07/1964
08/1964
08/1964
4F-C 4584 44584 07/1939 21A
20B
W
Saltley
Stourton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/02/1951
11/1963
11/1963
4F-C 4585 44585 07/1939 22C
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1960
09/1960
4F-C 4586 44586 09/1939 20D
20B
W
Normanton
Stourton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4587 44587 09/1939 21D
22B
8E
9E
9L
W
Stratford upon Avon
Gloucester Barnwood
Brunswick
Trafford Park (LMS)
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1953
23/03/1957
16/09/1961
27/03/1965
05/1965
05/1965
4F-C 4588 44588 09/1939 17D
16C
W
Rowsley
Derby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/05/1964
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4589 44589 09/1939 16C
17A
21A
27F
8C
8B
W
Kirkby in Ashfield
Derby
Saltley
Brunswick
Speke Junction
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1956
06/12/1958
10/01/1959
16/09/1961
04/11/1961
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4590 44590 09/1939 18D
W
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1961
09/1961
4F-C 4591 44591 10/1939 21A
17B
16E
W
Saltley
Burton
Kirkby in Ashfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/01/1954
26/09/1964
11/1964
11/1964
4F-C 4592 44592 10/1939 3E
5B
W
Monument Lane
Crewe South
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/11/1955
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4593 44593 10/1939 12D
9F
4A
2B
6C
8B
5D
6C
5D
99C
W
Workington
Heaton Mersey
Bletchley
Nuneaton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Warrington Dallam
Stoke
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Stoke
Crewe Works
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
08/09/1951
25/01/1958
22/03/1958
19/04/1958
01/11/1958
29/06/1963
14/09/1963
09/11/1963
12/1964
12/1964
4F-C 4594 44594 10/1939 11B
12A
W
Barrow in Furness
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/09/1961
08/10/1962
08/10/1962
4F-C 4595 44595 10/1939 5E
8D
6B
W
Alsager
Widnes
Mold Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/06/1960
24/09/1960
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4596 44596 11/1939 2C
5D
12A
9D
8G
W
Northampton
Stoke
Carlisle Upperby
Buxton (LNWR)
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
24/03/1956
17/09/1960
15/10/1960
09/1963
09/1963
4F-C 4597 44597 03/1940 17B
10G
12D
W
Burton
Skipton
Workington
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1964
20/03/1965
09/1965
09/1965
4F-C 4598 44598 03/1940 16A
18B
W
Nottingham
Westhouses
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
10/1963
10/1963
4F-C 4599 44599 04/1940 17B
16G
9L
W
Burton
Westhouses
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/10/1964
07/11/1964
11/1965
11/1965
4F-C 4600 44600 07/1940 17B
W
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
4F-C 4601 44601 08/1940 17A
17B
22B
17A
5D
11A
W
Derby
Burton
Gloucester Barnwood
Derby
Stoke
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/01/1954
24/04/1954
24/03/1956
07/11/1959
28/11/1959
13/11/1965
13/11/1965
4F-C 4602 44602 08/1940 17A
17D
9G
W
Derby
Rowsley
Gorton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/03/1955
12/05/1962
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4603 44603 09/1940 20D
21A
18C
W
Normanton
Saltley
Hasland
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/10/1953
31/10/1953
10/1964
10/1964
4F-C 4604 44604 09/1940 20D
W
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1964
01/1964
4F-C 4605 44605 02/1941 17A
27E
21A
W
Derby
Walton on the Hill
Saltley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/03/1957
13/10/1962
09/1964
09/1964
4F-C 4606 44606 03/1941 21D
18D
W
Stratford upon Avon
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
23/03/1962
23/03/1962